Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fireman'S Fund Insurance Company, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, Grant, Richard Martin, against Acco Engineered Systems, Inc., Advanced Mechanical, Advance Mechanical Contractors, Inc., Air Systems Mechanical Contractor, A & K Heating Company, Inc., (total of 70) See All represented by Ackley, Lisa R., Adams, Barbara Rose, Bergquist, Kenneth R, Biderman, David T., Blackard, Eugene Charles, (total of 23) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 17, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions20 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time3014 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal of a case. The plaintiff, Robert Ross, and the defendant, C.C. Moore & Co Engineers, are involved in the case with the case number CGC-10-275731. The attorney representing the plaintiff is Alan R. Brayton fro...
DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58168192) AS TO DEFENDANT GIAMPOLINI & CO.
Date: November 16, 2015ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION
Date: October 11, 2016DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58277240) AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.
Date: December 09, 2015DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58262027) AS TO DEFENDANT WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC.
Date: December 07, 2015EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 57740367) FILED BY DEFENDANT GIAMPOLINI & CO.
Date: August 19, 2015MINUTES FOR OCT-01-2018 1:30 PM
Date: October 01, 2018ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY PLAINTIFF FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 14, 2017MINUTES FOR SEP-01-2015 9:00 AM
Date: September 01, 2015ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY PLAINTIFFS FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 05, 2016ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY PLAINTIFFS FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 08, 2016ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY PLAINTIFF FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 06, 2016CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL [S.J. AMOROSO]
Date: December 11, 2013TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY BELL PRODUCTS, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 57690349)
Date: August 11, 2015ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 54742607) [CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL]
Date: December 20, 2013TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 57690349)
Date: August 11, 2015NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT [CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL]
Date: December 11, 2013TRIAL WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 57740367) FILED BY DEFENDANT GIAMPOLINI & CO.
Date: August 19, 2015NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 54284679)
Date: September 25, 2013TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 57702392) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DRYWALL CO.
Date: August 12, 2015MINUTES FOR AUG-19-2015 9:00 AM
Date: August 19, 2015EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 57735918) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, ROBERT ROSS, JEAN
Date: August 19, 2015NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 54614718) FILED BY APPELLANT ROSS, ROBERT ROSS, JEAN
Date: November 25, 2013TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 57687259) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.
Date: August 10, 2015NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT [S.J. AMOROSO]
Date: December 11, 2013TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 57687300) FILED BY DEFENDANT WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC.
Date: August 10, 2015ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY PLAINTIFFS FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 30, 2016REMITTITUR DISMISSED (A137738 DIV 3)
Date: October 21, 2013ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 54742607) [S.J. AMOROSO CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.]
Date: December 20, 2013TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 57690349)
Date: August 11, 2015MINUTES FOR AUG-11-2015 9:15 AM
Date: August 11, 2015TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 57687300) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENRY C. BECK COMPANY
Date: August 10, 2015GENERAL TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 57686760) FILED BY DEFENDANT PERINI CORPORATION
Date: August 10, 2015GIAMPOLINI COMPANYS INDEX OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 53970806)
Date: August 30, 2013TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 57687300) FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMAIR MECHANICAL SERVICES
Date: August 10, 2015ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL (A137738 DIV 3)
Date: October 21, 2013DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63072553)
Date: March 15, 2019ORDER - TRIAL ORDER
Date: October 01, 2018DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58556550) AS TO DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DRYWALL CO.
Date: February 10, 2016ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY PLAINTIFFS FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: October 06, 2016EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 62507456) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSS, ROBERT ROSS, JEAN
Date: October 01, 2018DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58411894) AS TO DEFENDANT FAIRMONT HOTEL COMPANY
Date: January 15, 2016PLEADING JOINDER / JOINDER IN MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 51984200)
Date: April 26, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49776980) FILED BY DEFENDANT SWINERTON BUILDERS
Date: February 25, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49862014) FILED BY DEFENDANT MCCLURE ELECTRIC, INC.
Date: February 28, 2013EXHIBIT M (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT C (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT O (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT J (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT K (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT I (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT H (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT B (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49702341) FILED BY DEFENDANT BELL PRODUCTS INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT D (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT A (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT L (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(TRANSACTION ID # 49817365)
Date: February 27, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49817365) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOLEY ELECTRIC, INC.
Date: February 27, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT N (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT E (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT F (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013INDEX OF EXHIBITS (TRANSACTION ID # 49706098) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUPERTINO ELECTRIC, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49735163) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013SEPARATE STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49703205) FILED BY DEFENDANT EMIL J. WEBER ELECTRIC CO.
Date: February 22, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49699398) FILED BY DEFENDANT ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013EXHIBIT G (TRANSACTION ID # 49709240) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ROSS, ROBERT ROSS, JEAN
Date: May 15, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 47819504) FILED BY DEFENDANT ANDERSON, ROWE & BUCKLEY, INC.
Date: November 16, 2012NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 49097639)(8.124)
Date: January 24, 2013JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 47610416) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT ACCO ENGINEERED SYSTEMS, INC.
Date: November 07, 2012ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL - CIVIL
Date: April 09, 2012JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 46161514) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DRYWALL CO.
Date: August 29, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FOR MSJ (TRANSACTION ID # 49652740) FILED BY DEFENDANT A. TEICHERT & SON, INC.
Date: February 20, 2013JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 45768657) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT PRIBUSS ENGINEERING, INC.
Date: August 07, 2012REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49652740)
Date: February 20, 2013CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: February 15, 2013NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 39737432) FILED BY ATTORNEY HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY
Date: September 09, 2011ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 12, 2011ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT TEMPORARY PLANT CLEANERS, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: March 03, 2011DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 35949295) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROUNTREE PLUMBING & HEATING INC.
Date: February 15, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35217212) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: January 05, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35913293) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARSHCO AUTO PARTS, INC.
Date: February 14, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 17, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 36135927) FILED BY DEFENDANT EMIL J. WEBER ELECTRIC CO.
Date: February 24, 2011INDEX OF EXHIBITS (TRANSACTION ID # 49705602) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Date: February 22, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 49688652) FILED BY DEFENDANT BRAGG INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC.
Date: February 22, 2013ORDER RE: DEFENDANT COSCO FIRE PROTECTION, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 30, 2012CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: January 25, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36083146) FILED BY DEFENDANT SWINERTON BUILDERS
Date: February 22, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35947787) FILED BY DEFENDANT GIAMPOLINI & CO.
Date: February 14, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35722018) FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMAIR MECHANICAL SERVICES
Date: February 02, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35784224) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY
Date: February 07, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36112560) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Date: February 24, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35862964) FILED BY DEFENDANT KENTILE FLOORS, INC.
Date: February 09, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35780515) FILED BY DEFENDANT D. ZELINSKY & SONS, INC.
Date: February 04, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35730323) FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.
Date: February 02, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35799751) FILED BY DEFENDANT A. TEICHERT & SON, INC.
Date: February 07, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35668113) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION
Date: January 31, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35490645) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DRYWALL CO.
Date: January 20, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 35733925) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC.
Date: February 03, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 35731935) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC.
Date: February 02, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 35733209) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLLINS ELECTRICAL COMPANY, INC.
Date: February 03, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36159481) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENRY C. BECK COMPANY
Date: February 25, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 35883935) FILED BY DEFENDANT EMIL J. WEBER ELECTRIC CO.
Date: February 10, 2011REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 35571119) FILED BY DEFENDANT OAKFABCO, INC.
Date: January 25, 2011REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 35733925)
Date: February 03, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35733365) FILED BY DEFENDANT WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC.
Date: February 02, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35730323) FILED BY DEFENDANT CSK AUTO, INC.
Date: February 02, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35621278) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAIRMONT HOTEL COMPANY
Date: January 27, 2011SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF ROSS, ROBERT ROSS, JEAN
Date: May 24, 2011NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 39795613) FILED BY ATTORNEY JENKINS, CHARLES W
Date: September 13, 2011NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 39819469) FILED BY ATTORNEY HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY
Date: September 14, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 42313744) FILED BY DEFENDANT SLAKEY BROTHERS, INC.
Date: February 06, 2012WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 57703907) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENRY C. BECK COMPANY
Date: August 13, 2015GENERAL TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 57686760) FILED BY DEFENDANT SWINERTON BUILDERS
Date: August 10, 2015TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY EMIL J. WEBER ELECTRICAL CO. (TRANSACTION ID # 57690349)
Date: August 11, 2015NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 56241291) FILED BY ATTORNEY HUGO, EDWARD R
Date: October 24, 2014WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 57703400) FILED BY DEFENDANT A. TEICHERT & SON, INC.
Date: August 13, 2015WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 57710155) FILED BY DEFENDANT WEBCOR BUILDERS, INC.
Date: August 13, 2015CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL [CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL]
Date: December 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2022 | Hearing |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION, 503, INTERVENOR TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND, OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL ON FILE. (503) | |
August 15, 2022 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion To Set Aside Default And Default Judgment Entered Against Sfl, Inc.
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ASBESTOS LAW AND MOTION, 503, TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST SFL, INC., OFF CALENDAR PER REQUEST OF MOVING PARTY. (503) | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGEMENT ENTERED AGAINST SFL, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 67922474) FILED BY INTERVENOR TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY , INTERVENING ON BEHALF OF DEFUNCT CORPORATION SFL, INC. | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67907025)PLAINTIFFS HEREBY DISMISS ALL ALLEGATION, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO SFL, INC. ONLY AND HEREBY AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY. | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGEMENT ENTERED AGAINST SFL, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 67862629) FILED BY INTERVENOR TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY , INTERVENING ON BEHALF OF DEFUNCT CORPORATION SFL, INC. | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT/DEFAULT JUDGMENT/LEAVE TO DEFEND, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67862629) FILED BY INTERVENOR TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY , INTERVENING ON BEHALF OF DEFUNCT CORPORATION SFL, INC. HEARING SET FOR AUG-24-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 503 | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF SCOTT HOMERSHAM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGEMENT ENTERED AGAINST SFL, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 67862629) FILED BY INTERVENOR TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY , INTERVENING ON BEHALF OF DEFUNCT CORPORATION SFL, INC. | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER STRUNK IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGEMENT ENTERED AGAINST SFL, INC. (TRANSACTION ID # 67862629) FILED BY INTERVENOR TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY , INTERVENING ON BEHALF OF DEFUNCT CORPORATION SFL, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.