Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Don King'S Concrete Inc., Weathermaster Building Products Inc. A Florida Corporation, Villas At Emerald Lake Homeowners Association Inc, filed a(n) Construction - Torts case against Advanced Wrapping And Concrete Solutions Of Centra, Brown And Company Architecture Inc, Don Kings Concrete Inc, Hugh Macdonald Construction Inc, Imperial Building Corporation, (total of 24) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with JORDAN, JOHN E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 170 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeConstruction |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
DEFENDANT CROSSCLAIM PLAINTIFF ROYAL OAK HOMES LLC NOTICE OF FILING EXPERT REPORT
Date: September 13, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: October 03, 2022WEINTRAUB ENGINEERING AND INSPECTIONS, INC.S CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: August 25, 2021DEFENDANT, IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORATION CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: July 01, 2023THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT HELBERG ENTERPRISES, LLCS CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: August 31, 2021DEFENDANT WEINTRAUB'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 20, 2023NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Date: October 11, 2021RULE 1.720 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATION
Date: February 06, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: May 23, 2023AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR ALL GLASS INSTALLATION CORP.
Date: October 07, 2021CASEY HAWKINS GLASS' CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: September 19, 2023CASEY HAWKINS GLASS INC NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO INSURANCE QUESTIONNAIRE
Date: June 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 15, 2021THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, WELL HUNG WINDOWS & DOORS, LLC'S PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: July 09, 2021SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: May 25, 2021DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM PLAINTIFF, ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLCS CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY
Date: August 19, 2021WEINTRAUB EXPERT DISCLOSURE
Date: October 01, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: April 08, 2024CASEY HAWKINS GLASS, INC.'S, REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: May 18, 2023PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT DON KING CONCRETE INC FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 02, 2021CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT, BROWN + COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INCS CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 29, 2021ROYAL OAKS HOMES, LLC'S REQUEST FOR COPIES TO HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Date: July 07, 2023WEINTRAUB AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: November 19, 2021DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST HOBBIT WINDOWS & WELL DONE WINDOWS
Date: December 10, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT A (PART 1 OF 7)
Date: January 18, 2024NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: January 24, 2024NOTICE OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION
Date: February 27, 2024ROYAL OAK HOMES LLC SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: June 24, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: September 09, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 23, 2021DEFENDANT ROYAL OAK HOMES LLC NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: July 09, 2021PREMIER PLASTERING OF CENTRAL FLORIDA, INC.S CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION
Date: August 31, 2021EXHIBIT F
Date: January 18, 2024PREMIER PLASTERING OF CENTRA; FLORIDA, INC.'S MOTION TO WITH WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: February 17, 2022BROWN + COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INC.'S CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 11, 2023CROSS-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 26, 2023DON KING'S CONCRETE, INC.'S EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: November 05, 2021EXPERT PAINTING & PRESSURE WASHING, INC.'S CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY
Date: September 21, 2023PLAINTIFF THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: November 02, 2021PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (AMENDED AS TO START TIME ONLY
Date: July 19, 2023WOLF'S IRRIGATION & LANDSCAPING INC NOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDARD INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 17, 2021DEFENDANT, ALL GLASS INSTALLATION CORP.'S CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: September 19, 2023WEINTRAUB'S REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT, ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC
Date: April 25, 2023NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: May 05, 2023LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR
Date: March 24, 2023DEFENDANT CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT EXPERT DISCLOSURE
Date: March 19, 2024DEFENDANT, BROWN+COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INC.'S CERTIFICATE OF MEDIAITON AUTHORITY
Date: September 19, 2023ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC’S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: February 05, 2024HOBBIT WINDOWS, LLC'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: July 13, 2022PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: August 16, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: May 31, 2022THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, T&M CONSTRUCTION OF SANFORD, INC.'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: July 14, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DISCLOSURE, AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS
Date: July 27, 2021DEFENDANT BROWN + COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INC.'S INITIAL EXPERT DISCLOSURE
Date: October 15, 2021PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: March 11, 2024PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 4.2 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: May 24, 2021SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT TO BE ISSUED
Date: May 24, 2021DEFENDANT, IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORTATION'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: May 24, 2021DEFENDANT, IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: June 07, 2021NOTICE TO PARTIES
Date: January 03, 2023ROYAL OAK HOMES LLC SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: June 25, 2021WINTRAUB NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH CMO
Date: June 23, 2021PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC’S OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: February 29, 2024EXHIBIT B
Date: January 18, 2024CROSS-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: June 01, 2023CROSS-NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 12, 2024PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: April 22, 2022STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING CLERK DEFAULT AS TO WELL DONE WINDOWS INC
Date: December 29, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 11, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: February 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: August 17, 2021DEFENDANT, BROWN + COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INC.'S, CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: March 15, 2022AMENDED COMPLEX CONSTRUCTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: June 20, 2022EXHIBIT E
Date: January 18, 2024NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONDUCES TECUM
Date: August 08, 2022MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR ALL GLASS INSTALLATION CORP
Date: October 01, 2021IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORARTION'S AMENDED NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: August 16, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: August 30, 2021DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT, TGK STUCCO, INC.'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: July 12, 2023WEINTRAUBS REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT, ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC
Date: April 25, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 20, 2023ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT TO OSCEOLA COUNTY BUSINESS COURT
Date: November 23, 2022DEFENDANT, HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 27, 2023UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR CASEY HAWKIN'S GLASS INC
Date: May 13, 2021DEFENDANT, IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORATIONS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: September 27, 2021DEFENDANT IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORATION REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: July 21, 2021EXHIBIT F
Date: January 19, 2024DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT, TGK STUCCO, INC.’S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: January 11, 2024LETTER TO JUDGE - CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT UNOPPOSED ORDER
Date: October 15, 2021FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 27, 2021THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT LIOS CONCRETE CORP MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: September 29, 2021DEFENDANT, IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORATION'S EXPERT DISCLOSURE
Date: October 15, 2021EXHIBIT G (PART 1 OF 2)
Date: January 19, 2024NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING
Date: June 28, 2022DEFENDANT, ALL GLASS INSTALLATION CORP.S, EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: December 01, 2021DON KING'S CONCRETE, INC.'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 25, 2023DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT, TGK STUCCO, INC.’S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: February 29, 2024AGREED ORDER VACATING CLERK'S DEFAULT AGAINST WELL DONE WINDOWS, INC.
Date: January 04, 2022EXHIBIT D
Date: January 19, 2024SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION
Date: July 07, 2023WEINTRAUB'S CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION
Date: September 20, 2023PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021057882
Date: June 28, 2021PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCEREGARDING TGK STUCCO, INC.’S DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS
Date: February 05, 2024TJIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT HELBERG ENTERPRISES, LLC'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: December 20, 2022WEINTRAUB'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO ROYAL OAK HOMES
Date: November 06, 2023.EXHIBIT G (PART 2 OF 2)
Date: January 19, 2024CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: April 26, 2022PLAINTIFF SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 3.1 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: August 02, 2021DEFENDANT T & M CONSTRUCTION OF SANFORD, INC.'S CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: September 19, 2023WEINTRAUBS REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT, ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC
Date: June 03, 2022ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC'S CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: September 21, 2023DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT,TGK STUCCO, INC.’S NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 10, 2024CROSSCLAIM DEFEDANT WEINTRAUB'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO AMENDED CROSSCLAIM
Date: May 20, 2021BROWN + COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INC.'S RESPONSE TO STANDARD INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 24, 2021DEFENDANT/CROSS DEFENDANT EXPERT PAINTING & PRESSURE WASHING, INC.'S EXPERT WITNESS DISCLSOURE
Date: September 25, 2023AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION OF WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL
Date: February 12, 2024PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 3.1 OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: June 08, 2021AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL
Date: February 12, 2024DEFENDANT, IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORATIONS CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: March 15, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: September 20, 2023EXHIBIT A (PART 4 OF 7)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT A (PART 2 OF 7)
Date: January 18, 2024CASEY HAWKINS GLASS' CERTIFICATE OF SECOND MEDIATION ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: April 22, 2022THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT HELBERG ENTERPRISES, LLC'S CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: April 28, 2022ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC’S OMNIBUS MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: February 05, 2024DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM PLAINITFF, ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC'S NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 12, 2024DEFENDANT BROWN + COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INC'S CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: April 20, 2022WEINTRAUB'S REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT, HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION, INC
Date: July 07, 2023PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO STRIKE TK STUCCO, INC.’S LATE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS
Date: February 05, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 25, 2023DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION, INC.S EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: September 30, 2021CASEY HAWKINS GLASS EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: November 01, 2021DEFENDANT, ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC'S AMENDED DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: May 13, 2021RESPONSE TO BROWN + COMPANY ARCHITECTURES FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 06, 2022NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT
Date: March 29, 2024NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: July 08, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: June 08, 2023DEFENDANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: May 11, 2022ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: November 30, 2021DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT, TGKSTUCCO, INC.’S NOTICE OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION
Date: March 15, 2024THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT HELBERG ENTERPRISES, LLC'S CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: October 02, 2023PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT B
Date: January 19, 2024DEFENDANT IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT A (PART 7 OF 7)
Date: January 18, 2024AMENDED NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION
Date: April 21, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 14, 2021COMPLEX CONSTRUCTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: April 12, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: August 07, 2023DEFENDANT, HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 25, 2023PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2022ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC’S THIRD REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT A (PART 6 OF 7)
Date: January 18, 2024DON KING'S CONCRETE, INC.'S AMENDED REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 27, 2023AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: March 07, 2022WEINTRAUB'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 26 OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 24, 2022DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT, TGK STUCCO, INC.'S AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 16, 2023DEFENDANT HOBBIT WINDOWS LLC AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: April 06, 2022DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFEDNANT, TGK STUCCO, INC.'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: July 12, 2023EXHIBIT C
Date: January 19, 2024CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY
Date: September 20, 2023WEINTRAUB'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT BROWN'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Date: April 11, 2022EXHIBIT A
Date: January 19, 2024WEINTRAUB AMENDED EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: June 22, 2021BROWN + COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INC,'S RESPONSE TO INSURANCE QUESTIONNAIRE
Date: May 24, 2021PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021047603
Date: May 26, 2021NOTICE OF THIRD MEDIATION
Date: August 16, 2022DEFENDANT, ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: June 14, 2021SECOND AMENDED CMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: March 07, 2022PREMIER'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO ROYAL OAKS CROSSCLAIM
Date: August 11, 2022NOTICE OF FULLY BRIEFED MOTION
Date: October 26, 2023THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT WELL HUNG WINDOWS & DOORS, LLCS CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 30, 2021ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 03, 2023DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT, TGK STUCCO, INC.'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: September 08, 2023DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT, TGK STUCCO, INC.'S OTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: August 30, 2023ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO WEATHERMASTER BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC.'S THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: February 17, 2022ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT C
Date: January 18, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 10, 2023DEFENDANT IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORATION'S CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: July 28, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: August 28, 2023DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM PLAINTIFF ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC'S DESIGNATION OF EXPERTS
Date: September 10, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: November 02, 2021THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION INC EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: November 19, 2021EXHIBIT D
Date: January 18, 2024NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 30, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES - ALL GLASS INSTALLATION CORPORATION
Date: October 11, 2021COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: November 23, 2020WOLF'S IRRIGATION AND LANDSCAPING, INC.'S EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: September 30, 2022ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC'S SECOND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: February 21, 2024DEFENDANT CROSSCLAIM PLAINTIFF ROYAL OAK HOMES NOTICE OF HEARING /4/10/24 @ ORANGE COUNTY
Date: February 05, 2024DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516
Date: August 10, 2023SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: November 25, 2020JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Date: April 07, 2023DEFENDANT HUGH MACDONALD CINSTRUCTION, INC. NOTICEOF UNABAILABILITY
Date: January 11, 2023PLAINTIFF’S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Date: November 30, 2020PLAINTIFF’S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT SUMMERPARK HOMES, INC.
Date: November 30, 2020PLAINTIFF’S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC
Date: November 30, 2020PLAINTIFF’S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORATION
Date: November 30, 2020WEINTRAB'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Date: December 24, 2020PLAINTIFF’S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT WOLF’S IRRIGATION & LANDSCAPING, INC.
Date: November 30, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 12/4/2020@ 12:45 PARTY SERVED: ROYAL OAKS HOMES
Date: December 16, 2020PLAINTIFF’S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT WEATHERMASTER BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC.
Date: November 30, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED :12/8/2020 @ 10:59 PARTY SERVED: SUMMERPARK HOMES
Date: December 16, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES ON BEHALF OF ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC
Date: December 11, 2020DEFENDANT IMPERIAL BUILDING CORPORATION'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THE COMPLAINT
Date: December 23, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 28, 2020REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: May 01, 2023CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT BROWN COMPANY ARCHITECTURE INC REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 25, 2021CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT BROWN COMPANY ARCHITECTURE INC REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 19, 2021MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: January 21, 2021PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND PARTY NAME BY INTERLINEATION
Date: December 07, 2021PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT BROWN+COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INC.S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: February 23, 2022PLAINTIFF’S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT BROWN+COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INC.
Date: November 30, 2020DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT, TGK STUCCO, INC.'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: August 28, 2023DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFEDANT, TGK STUCCO, INC.'S CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY
Date: September 20, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE IN FIRM NAME AND E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT A (PART 3 OF 7)
Date: January 18, 2024NOTICE OF IN-PERSON HEARING
Date: February 13, 2024WEINTRAUB INSPECTIONS CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: April 25, 2022NON-PARTY, TOWER HILL INSURANCE GROUP,LLC'S NOTICE OF FILING PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: October 13, 2023PLAINTIFF MOTION TO STRIKE TGK STUCCO INC EXPERT
Date: March 19, 2024AGREED ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER DEADLIINES
Date: February 19, 2024BROWN + COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INC.'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 29, 2022DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT'S TKG STUCCO, INC.'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: October 18, 2022CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT, BROWN + COMPANY ARCHITECTURE, INC.'S, REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: July 07, 2021CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR THE SEPTEMBER 1 & 2, 2021, MEDIATION
Date: July 30, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: July 12, 2021WEINTRAUB'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO STANDARD INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 24, 2021DEFENDANT/CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT, TGK STUCCO, INC.’SNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: March 01, 2024THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF, WEATHERMASTER BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC. CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY
Date: August 30, 2021AMENDED CERTFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR THE SEPTEMBER 1 & 2, 2021, MEDIATION
Date: August 12, 2021UNOPPOSED MOTION TO AMEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER AND EXTEND DEADLINES
Date: February 16, 2024MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR ALL GLASS INSTALLATION CORP
Date: October 02, 2021AGREED ORDER AMENDING THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES
Date: November 23, 2022PREMIER PLASTERING OF CENTRAL FLORIDA, INC.S EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: October 15, 2021PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING CRITICISMS OF EXPERT
Date: February 05, 2024THIRD PARTY DEFENDNAT T&M CONSTRUCTION OF SANFORD INC NOTICE OF FILING EXPERT DISCLOSURE
Date: November 01, 2021THIRD PARTY DEFENDAT WELL HUNG WINDOWS & DOORS LLC EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: November 01, 2021COURT NOTES
Date: April 21, 2023NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: October 06, 2023.EXHIBIT A (PART 5 OF 7)
Date: January 18, 2024REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 26, 2023RULE 1.720 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATEION
Date: September 15, 2023AGREED MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE DEFAULT ORDER
Date: January 13, 2022ORDER GRANTING HOBBIT WINDOWS.LLC'S AGREED MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND VACATE DEFAULT ORDER
Date: February 09, 2022CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT BROWN + COMPANY ARCHITECTURE INC REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: December 28, 2020SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED ON 12/4/2020 FOR HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION INC.
Date: December 08, 2020CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT BROWN COMPANY ARCHITECTURE INC REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: March 08, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED ON 12/7/20 FOR BROWN-COMPANY ARCHITECTURE INC.
Date: March 18, 2021COMPLEX CONSTRUCTION CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: April 09, 2021PLAINTIFF EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE
Date: April 21, 2021DEFENDANT, ROYAL OAK HOMES, LLC NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: April 23, 2021PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SUMMERPARK HOMES, INC.
Date: November 30, 2020PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ROYAL OAK HOMES, INC.
Date: November 30, 2020THIRD PARTY LIOS CONCRETE CORP MOTION TO DISMISS AND OR STAY PROCEEDINGS
Date: April 28, 2021NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE
Date: April 28, 2021WEINTRAUB INSOECTIONSS' NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: April 29, 2021PLAINTIFF’S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT THE DIMILLO GROUP, LLC
Date: November 30, 2020PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT THE DIMILLO GROUP, LLC
Date: November 30, 2020PLAINTIFF’S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT DON KING’S CONCRETE, INC.
Date: November 30, 2020AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL
Date: February 08, 2024EXHIBIT E
Date: January 19, 2024PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DEFENDANT BROWN COMPANY ARCHITECTURE INC REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 25, 2021PLAINTIFF AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: March 10, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: June 16, 2023PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT LIOS CONCRETE CORP
Date: April 28, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: April 20, 2021THIRD-PARTY DEFEDNANT, HOBBIT WINDOWS, LLC'S CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY AT MEDIATION
Date: September 21, 2023PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY
Date: September 19, 2023HUGH MACDONALD CONSTRUCTION INC NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: January 28, 2021ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: January 26, 2021CROSSCLAIM DEFENDANT WEINTRAUB MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 21 OF CROSSCLAIM
Date: January 28, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 02/06/2021 PARTY SERVED: HOBBIT WINDOWS LLC
Date: February 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES ON BEHALF OF ROYAL OAK HOMES LLC
Date: February 12, 2021THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: February 23, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR ALL GLASS INSTALLATION CORP
Date: February 25, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: October 11, 2021DEFENDANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: August 31, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: July 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION
Date: February 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: February 05, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: December 18, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: December 23, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 10, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: March 10, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: January 14, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: December 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2061 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2058 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2036 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2033 | Docket Event | ||
April 30, 2032 | Docket Event | ||
April 26, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.