Case Last Refreshed: 20 hours ago
Ellyn Berk, Pamela Goldstein, Paul Benjamin, Tony Berk, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Fattaruso, Paul, Friedland, Amos Emory, Ohlemeyer, William S., Vest, Jeremy Cain, Zach, John T., (total of 5) See All against Houlihan Lawrence Inc., represented by Bholan, Michelle Ann, Donnellan, Alfred E., Hochberg, Shari B., Krinick, Evan H, Lara-Garduno, Nelida, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Linda S. Jamieson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda S. Jamieson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a class action complaint filed by Pamela Goldstein on behalf of herself and others similarly situated against Houlihan/Lawrence Inc. The complaint alleges that Houlihan/Lawrence, a real estate brokerage firm, has engaged in a bait-a...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50A
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26B
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26A
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21A
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10A
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5A
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 14, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 14, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 10, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 07, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 07, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 07, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 07, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 07, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 06, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 06, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 05, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 04, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 27, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 16, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 02, 2018PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: July 31, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 31, 2018RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 111
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 110
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 109
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 109
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 108
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 107
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 106
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 105
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 104
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 104
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 103
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 102
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 101
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 100
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 99
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 98
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 97
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 96
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 95
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 94
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 93
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 92
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 89
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 91
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 90
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 88
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 87
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 86
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 85
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 84
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 83
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 82
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 81
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 80
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 79
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 78
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 77
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 76
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 75
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 74
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 71
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 73
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 72
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27I
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27H
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27G
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27F
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27E
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27D
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27C
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27B
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26B
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 *Corrected*
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2B
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57F
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57G
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57E
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57B
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57D
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57C *Corrected*
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 14, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 14, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 03, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 20, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 17, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 14, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 06, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 06, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P13 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P10 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P12 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P11 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-9 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-8 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-7 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P-1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 02, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: November 02, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2018NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 143
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 142
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 141
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 140
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 139
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 138
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 137
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 136
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 135
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 134
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 133
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 132
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 131
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 130
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 129
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 128
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 127
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 126
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 125 *Corrected*
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 124
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 123
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 120
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 122
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 121
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 118
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 119
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50A
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 117
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 116
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48A
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31A
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27I
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27H
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27G
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27F
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27E
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27D
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27C
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27B
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26B
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27A
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26A
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21A
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10A
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8A
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61
Date: July 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 107
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5A
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2B
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 106
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 105
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2A
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 122
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 104
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 119
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 121
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 120
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 109
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 102
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 118
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 115
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 117
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 109
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 101
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 116
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 114
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 111
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 100
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 113
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 112
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 110
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 99
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 108
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 98
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 104
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 97
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 94
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 103
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 96
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 93
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 95
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 92
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 90
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 138
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 136
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 135
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 124
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 134
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 130
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 133
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 123
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 132
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 131
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 128
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 129
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 126
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 127
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 125
Date: May 14, 2019REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: April 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 19, 2021REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: May 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: April 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 05, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: April 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: April 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 16, 2021REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: April 16, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 13, 2020STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 09, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 09, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 05, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: October 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: October 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: October 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: October 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 28, 2020REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: October 28, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 15, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 14, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 13, 2020NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: October 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: October 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: October 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: October 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: October 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 02, 2020REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: October 02, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 01, 2020NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: October 01, 2020REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: September 29, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 25, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 25, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 18, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 25, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 24, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 25, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 24, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 08, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: August 24, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 03, 2020NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: July 24, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 19, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 21, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: July 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: July 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: July 20, 2020REFEREE REPORT - ATTORNEY
Date: July 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: July 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: July 20, 2020ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021APPENDIX Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: November 01, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 08, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 24, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 08, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 24, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5A
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: October 01, 2018STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: September 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 01, 2018ORDER - EXPARTE
Date: September 20, 2018COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 01, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 20, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 101
Date: October 01, 2018STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 115
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 100
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 114
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 108
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 113
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 99
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 112
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 109
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 105
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 111
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 107
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 110
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 98
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 109
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 104
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 106
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 97
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 104
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 96
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 103
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 95
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 102
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 94
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 93
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 92
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 91 NYSAR - NYSAR Legal Hotline
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 90
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 89
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 88
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 87
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 85
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 86
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 84
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 81
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 83 *Corrected*
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 82
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 80 *Corrected*
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 79
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 78
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 75
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 77
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 76
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 72
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 74
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 73
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 71
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66
Date: October 01, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64
Date: October 01, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 28, 2021REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: May 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 129 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 128 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 127 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 126 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 125 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 124 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 123 Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 122 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 121 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 120 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 119 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 118 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 117 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 116 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 115 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 114 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 113 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 112 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 111 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 110 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 109 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 108 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 107 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 106 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 105 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 104 Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 103 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 102 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 101 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 100 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 99 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 98 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 97 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 96 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 95 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 94 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 93 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 92 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 91 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 133 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 135 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 134 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 132 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 131 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 130 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #5) *Corrected*
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021APPENDIX Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #6) *Corrected*
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 91 NYSAR - NYSAR Legal Hotline
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 89
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 88
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 87
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 86
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 85
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 84
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 83
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 82
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 81
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 80
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 79
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 78
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 77
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 76
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 75
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 72
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 74
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 73
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 71
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61A
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57D
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57G
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57C
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57F
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57E
Date: May 14, 2019NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: May 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57B
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57A
Date: May 14, 2019NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: May 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 14, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: July 14, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 27, 2020NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: May 22, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 01, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 29, 2020ORDER - COMMISSION
Date: May 19, 2020ORDER - EXPARTE
Date: June 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: May 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 29, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: May 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: May 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: May 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: May 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 14, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 13, 2020REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: May 14, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 13, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 21, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 07, 2020REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: February 21, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 07, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: January 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 22, 2020REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: January 22, 2020APPENDIX
Date: September 11, 2019REFEREE REPORT - ATTORNEY
Date: September 11, 2019ANSWER
Date: July 01, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 12, 2019COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 10, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 31, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 24, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 24, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 17, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 16, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 16, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 15, 2019ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: May 16, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 143
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 142
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 141
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 140
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 139
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 137
Date: May 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #6)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5) Self Authenticating Binder - Redacted
Date: March 22, 2022ORDER - REFEREE REPORT
Date: March 18, 2022ORDER - REFEREE REPORT
Date: March 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 09, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: March 02, 2022NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: March 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 01, 2022NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #6) Self Authenticating Binder - Redacted
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 116 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 115 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 114 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 175 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 113 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 170 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 174 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 131 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 171 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 112 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 169 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 126 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 166 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 168 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 111 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 167 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 125 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 165 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 159 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 164 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 109 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 124 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 160 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 158 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 108 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 122 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 151 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 157 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 156 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 107 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 121 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 148 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 144 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 105 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 120 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 138 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 141 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 140 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 100 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 119 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 137 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 133 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 99 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 118 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 98 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 95 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 93 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 90 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #5) Mot for Class Cert (Revised Redactions)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 188 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 187 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 88 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 87 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 186 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 84 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 83 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 82 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 185 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 81 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 76 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 75 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 184 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 74 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 73 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 71 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 183 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 182 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 181 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 180 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 179 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 178 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 177 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 176 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: June 03, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: July 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 90 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 89 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 88 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 87 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 86 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 85 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 84 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 83 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 82 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 81 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 80 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 79 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 78 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 77 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 76 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 75 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 74 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 73 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 72 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 71 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 191 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 190 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 189 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 186 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 188 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 187 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 185 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 184 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 181 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 183 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 182 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 180 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 179 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 178 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 175 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 177 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 176 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 174 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 173 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 172 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 169 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 171 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 170 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 168 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 167 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 164 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 166 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 162 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 165 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 163 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 161 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 159 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 160 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 158 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 157 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 154 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 156 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 155 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 153 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 152 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 151 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 148 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 150 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 149 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 147 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 144 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 146 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 145 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 143 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 142 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 141 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 138 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 140 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 139 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 137 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 136 Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 15, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: July 15, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: May 24, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: July 13, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: May 20, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #7) *Corrected*
Date: April 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #16)
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #17)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #17)
Date: December 01, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #17)
Date: December 01, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #17)
Date: December 01, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #17)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 17, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #17)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #16)
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #16)
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #16)
Date: November 23, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #16)
Date: November 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #16)
Date: November 23, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #16)
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #16)
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #16)
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #16)
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 16, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #16)
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #15)
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #10)
Date: June 17, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #16)
Date: November 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #15)
Date: November 04, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: June 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 16, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #15)
Date: November 23, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #15)
Date: November 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: June 09, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #15)
Date: November 04, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #9)
Date: June 03, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 21, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #9)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #9)
Date: June 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 21, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: September 08, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: November 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 03, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #16)
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #9)
Date: June 03, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: November 09, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 29, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #17)
Date: December 20, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #15)
Date: December 20, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #15)
Date: November 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 15, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #22)
Date: March 14, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #19)
Date: March 14, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #21)
Date: March 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #14)
Date: July 20, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: July 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 15, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #20)
Date: March 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 07, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: March 07, 2023REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: March 09, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #21)
Date: March 06, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #22)
Date: March 03, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #22)
Date: March 03, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #22)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #21)
Date: February 22, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 15, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #20)
Date: February 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 15, 2023REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: February 11, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #20)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #19)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: February 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 07, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 25, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: February 04, 2022NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: February 28, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 25, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #6) *Corrected*
Date: January 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 192 Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 10, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 194 Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 10, 2022APPENDIX Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 195 Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 193 Â (Motion #5)
Date: January 10, 2022REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: January 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #5)
Date: December 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #6)
Date: March 22, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 30, 2023REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 30, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 17, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 12, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 17, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #18) *Corrected*
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #18)
Date: January 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 18, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: October 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 21, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 05, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 15, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 01, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: August 18, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 09, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: August 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 04, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: February 21, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 16, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: February 12, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 09, 2024NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: January 08, 2024NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: December 18, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED
Date: December 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S)  - 69h  (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S)  - 69g  (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S)  - 69f  (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S)  - 69e  (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S)  - 69d  (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S)  - 69c  (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S)  - 69b  (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S)  - 69a  (Motion #25) Exhibits to Third Amended Complaint part 1
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #27)
Date: April 22, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #26)
Date: April 22, 2024ORDER - SEALING
Date: March 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 11, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #27)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #27)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #27)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #27)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #27)
Date: March 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #27)
Date: March 11, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #27)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #12)
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #16)
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #16)
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #11)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #8)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #16)
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #26)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 75 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 76 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 74 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 73 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 72 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 71 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 67 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 63 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #25)
Date: April 22, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 15, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 30, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: May 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 17, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 27, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #24)
Date: May 09, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 27, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 27, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 27, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 27, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 19, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 19, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 19, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 19, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 19, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #24)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #24)
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #24)
Date: April 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #24)
Date: April 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 10, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #23)
Date: April 10, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 16, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 16, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 16, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 15, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #23)
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 52 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #25)
Date: March 11, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 08, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 08, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 23, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #25) Houlihan Lawrences New York On-Boarding Packet (Bates Nos. HL00029858 - HL00029912) |
||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #25) "Real Estate Salesperson Frequently Asked Questions, New York Department of State |
||
April 22, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #25) Declaration of Jeremy Vest in Opposition to Houlihan Lawrences Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 16 (Motion #27) May 17, 2018 e-mail from James Gricar to Christopher Meyers (Bates Nos. HL01112165 - HL01112169) |
||
April 22, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #25) Memorandum of Law in Support of the Classs Opposition to Houlihan Lawrences Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
April 22, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #27) Memorandum of Law in Support of the Classs Opposition to Houlihan Lawrences Motion to Exclude Expert Opinions of Robert Lashway and Gregory Dalzell REDACTED |
||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 15 (Motion #27) June 8, 2012 e-mail from Maryellen Walsh to Debra Dalton (Bates No. HL00148775) |
||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 12 (Motion #27) New York State Disclosure Form for Buyer and Seller associated with the transaction involving the property located at 39 Whispering Pines Way, Lagrangeville, New York 12540 (Bates Nos. HL00020417 - HL00020418) |
||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 14 (Motion #27) Excerpts from Debra Dalton's September 30, 2021 deposition Transcript |
||
April 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 13 (Motion #27) Compliance Is a Culture, Not Just a Policy, by Brent Snyder, U.S. Dept. of Justice, Antitrust Division, dated September 9, 2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.