Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Yasemin Tekiner, Yasemin Tekiner In Her Individual Capacity, As A Beneficiary And A Trustee Of The Yasemin Tekiner 2011 Descendants Trust And Derivatively As A Holder Of Equitable Interests In A Shareholder Or A Member Of The Company Defendants, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Conklin, Donald David, Harwood, Anthony J, Ibrahim, Sanjay P, Mandel, Evan Morgen, Parker, Scott Wesley, (total of 9) See All against 254-258 W. 35Th St. Llc, Berrin Tekiner, Billur Akipek In Her Capacity As A Trustee Of The Yasemin Tekiner 2011 Descendants Trust, Bremen House Inc., Bremen House Texas, Inc., (total of 9) See All represented by Goldberg, Eric Adam, Hill, Meghan Elizabeth, Kahn, Michele E., Keating, Lawrence Polk, Mohler, Bryan T., (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Joel M. Cohen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoel M. Cohen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: December 21, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 18, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: June 28, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: January 21, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 28, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 27, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 08, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 26, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 29, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 12, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 25, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 21, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 21, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #001) Spectrum Bill Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 21, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: February 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 26, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 02, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 02, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 12, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 26, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 27, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 27, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 04, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 27, 2021SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 02, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001) Termination Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 01, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: March 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 29, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 24, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 28, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #013)
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-R Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B-R Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I-R Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 04, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: January 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 06, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 07, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: January 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 06, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 07, 2022ORDER - INTERIM (MOTION RELATED)
Date: April 01, 2022STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 18, 2021STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY
Date: February 23, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 25, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 26, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 04, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1R Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 17, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 06, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #021)
Date: July 20, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #032)
Date: October 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #021)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #032)
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #033)
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #027)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #032)
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #032)
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #033)
Date: August 05, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: August 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #032)
Date: August 12, 2022APPENDIX Â (Motion #032)
Date: August 10, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #029)
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #007) Closing Documents for Greenwich House
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 04, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #023)
Date: October 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 27, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #023)
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: October 03, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #025)
Date: October 03, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #031)
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #026)
Date: October 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #023)
Date: October 07, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #023)
Date: October 07, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #022)
Date: October 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #022)
Date: October 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #022)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #022)
Date: October 11, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: October 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #018)
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 06, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #018)
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 15, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 16, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #025)
Date: June 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 01, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: July 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #021)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 24, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #034) *Corrected*
Date: October 19, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #032)
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #024)
Date: October 20, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #032)
Date: October 20, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #029)
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #028)
Date: June 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #029)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #029)
Date: June 29, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #028)
Date: June 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #029)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #029)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #029)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #029)
Date: June 29, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #028)
Date: June 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #029)
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #029)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #029)
Date: June 29, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #032)
Date: August 10, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #035)
Date: October 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #033)
Date: October 26, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 31, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 10, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 10, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #024) *Corrected*
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #032)
Date: November 21, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 15, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #032)
Date: November 07, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #041)
Date: December 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #045)
Date: December 22, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 23, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #041)
Date: December 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 22, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #041)
Date: December 23, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #047) *Corrected*
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: December 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 06, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: December 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #043)
Date: December 30, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #043)
Date: December 30, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 04, 2023-COPY OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER AO/10/22
Date: January 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 03, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Â (Motion #037)
Date: January 03, 2023SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER
Date: December 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #043)
Date: December 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 27, 2022NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #046)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #046)
Date: January 10, 2023REQUEST FOR RESTRICTED STATUS Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #046)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #046)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #046)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #046)
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #046) *Corrected*
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #046)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #046)
Date: January 10, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #046)
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #047)
Date: December 27, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 17, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 23, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: January 27, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 17, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 17, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 08, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 15, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 22, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 10, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 09, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #008)
Date: March 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #009)
Date: March 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #015)
Date: April 08, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 22, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 24, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: April 05, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #015)
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #015)
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #014)
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #014)
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL Â - H Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #026)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #022)
Date: June 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #018)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #023)
Date: June 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #019)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 07, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 07, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: June 07, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 07, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 07, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020)
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #021)
Date: June 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 05, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #032)
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #033)
Date: August 05, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #032)
Date: August 12, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #016)
Date: April 11, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 19, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 13, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 18, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 20, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: May 12, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #017)
Date: April 20, 2022BOND/UNDERTAKING
Date: April 19, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 25, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 25, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: April 08, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 28, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: May 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #029)
Date: July 11, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 12, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: June 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 20, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #029)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #031)
Date: July 06, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: July 08, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: July 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: July 20, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #014)
Date: July 08, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #029)
Date: July 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #021)
Date: July 20, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #016)
Date: July 08, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: July 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: July 20, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #021)
Date: July 20, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #013)
Date: July 08, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #015)
Date: July 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 50 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 33 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 38 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 74 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 64 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 49 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 46 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 62 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 37 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 45 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 40 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 56 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 39 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 42 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 58 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 47 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 53 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 41 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 54 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 65 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 73 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 72 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 71 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #047)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 30 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 34 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 36 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 32 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 51 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 35 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 44 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 48 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 60 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 66 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 61 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 55 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 69 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 70 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 43 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 57 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 59 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 68 Â (Motion #044)
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #049)
Date: February 02, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 06, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #049)
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #046)
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #049)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #046)
Date: February 02, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #046)
Date: February 02, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #046)
Date: February 02, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #049)
Date: February 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #047)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #045)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9R Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #048)
Date: February 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #042)
Date: February 21, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #046)
Date: February 21, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #047)
Date: February 21, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 07, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 21, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #045)
Date: February 21, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #042)
Date: February 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: March 07, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: March 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #057)
Date: March 07, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 07, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 09, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #057)
Date: March 07, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #054) Email Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #054)
Date: March 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 20, 2023BRIEFING SCHEDULE Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL *Corrected*
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #054) Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: March 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #054) Payment Agrement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #054) Term Sheet Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #054) Email Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #054) Email Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 30, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #057)
Date: March 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #045)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #054) Placeholder Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 03, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: April 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #041)
Date: March 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #054)
Date: March 22, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #052)
Date: March 30, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #049)
Date: March 30, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: March 29, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #043)
Date: March 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 31 Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #060)
Date: April 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #060)
Date: April 03, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #060)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #060)
Date: April 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #054) Text messages Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #050)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #054)
Date: April 18, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 18, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #054) Tekiner Affidavit 02.16.23 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #054) Budget Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: March 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #054) Email Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #024)
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #036)
Date: October 31, 2022STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #022)
Date: August 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 29, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #021)
Date: August 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #030)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #030)
Date: June 30, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #024)
Date: June 29, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #024) Doc # 607 - Affidavit of Yasemin Tekiner Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 18, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #030)
Date: October 19, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #027)
Date: October 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 12, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: August 12, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #023)
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #035) *Corrected*
Date: September 16, 2022TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: August 18, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 16, 2022NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #032)
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #023)
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 16, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 14, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 15, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: September 23, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: September 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #035)
Date: September 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #028)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #031)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #034) *Corrected*
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #034)
Date: October 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #037)
Date: November 28, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 02, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #034)
Date: December 06, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 02, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 12, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #038)
Date: December 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #037)
Date: December 15, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #044)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #044)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #044)
Date: December 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #044)
Date: December 21, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #044)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #044)
Date: December 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #039) *Corrected*
Date: December 19, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #039)
Date: December 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #044)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 04, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 09, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #048)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #042)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #053)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #040)
Date: March 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #050)
Date: April 18, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 18, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 23, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #054)
Date: April 18, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 19, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: May 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #057)
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #062)
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #063)
Date: May 19, 2023ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED)
Date: May 02, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #053)
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #054)
Date: March 22, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #055)
Date: March 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #063)
Date: May 19, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #058)
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #063)
Date: May 19, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 16, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #063)
Date: May 19, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: April 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #053)
Date: May 19, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #053)
Date: May 04, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #053)
Date: May 16, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 22, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #038)
Date: March 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #054) Email Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #059)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #053)
Date: May 04, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 11, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #063)
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 15, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #050)
Date: April 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #053)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #049)
Date: April 12, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #053) *Corrected*
Date: April 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 30, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: May 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #053)
Date: June 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: May 30, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #053)
Date: May 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Â (Motion #063)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 15, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #053)
Date: April 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #063)
Date: May 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 24, 2023ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: May 19, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #053)
Date: May 19, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #053)
Date: May 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #061)
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL Â - JJ Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10R Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5R Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 17, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) Â (Motion #051)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3R Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7R Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6R Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4R Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #051)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL Â - HH Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 17, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: February 13, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #046)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #051)
Date: February 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 17, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1R Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - REQUEST TO SEAL Â - GG Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2R Â (Motion #050)
Date: February 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #044)
Date: February 14, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #053)
Date: February 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 03, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #048)
Date: February 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #045)
Date: February 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #047)
Date: February 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #046)
Date: February 21, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 03, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 13, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 06, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: March 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #056)
Date: March 06, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 03, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: March 03, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #056)
Date: March 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: March 06, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #059)
Date: March 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #058)
Date: March 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #053) Affirmation of Service of Notification of Case Number |
||
June 02, 2023 |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS (Motion #063) 05.23.2023 Transcript of TRO Hearing |
||
June 01, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
May 31, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #053) Letter requesting Extension of Time for Monitor to Provide Report |
||
May 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #061) E-mail dated 6/23/2021 Redacted per 22 NYCRR E-mail dated 6/23/2021 Redacted |
||
May 30, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 30, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
May 30, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
May 26, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.