Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Beacon Residential Community Association, Catellus Commericial Development Corp., Catellus Development Corporation, Catellus Operating Limited Partnership, Catellus Residential Construction, Inc., (total of 11) See All filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Angius, Daniel Edwin, Brezine, Adam, Mccarthy, Kevin Patrick, against All Defendants See Scanned Documents, Allied Fire Protection, Anning-Johnson Company, Architectural Glass & Aluminum Co., Inc, Blue'S Roofing Company, (total of 31) See All represented by Blank, Stacey F., Campbell, Randel J., Castles, James Patrick, Cloud, Scott B., Cvitanovic, Steven M, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Curtis E.A. Karnow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCurtis E.A. Karnow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management2323 days |
Filing DateAugust 08, 2008 |
CategoryConstruction |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions895 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
|
Case Cycle Time2751 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The plaintiff, Beacon Residential Community Association, is requesting the dismissal of the case against defendants Catellus Third and King LLC et al. The case number is CGC-08-478453. The re...
MINUTES FOR APR-22-2015 2:00 PM
Date: April 22, 2015MINUTES FOR AUG-18-2015 4:00 PM
Date: August 18, 2015MINUTES FOR MAY-19-2015 2:00 PM
Date: May 19, 2015ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER FOR AUGUST 6, 2014 (TRANSACTION ID # 55852574)
Date: August 06, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-20-2015 9:00 AM
Date: July 20, 2015ORDER CORRECTED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR AUGUST 6, 2014 (TRANSACTION #55864964)
Date: August 08, 2014MINUTES FOR AUG-06-2014 1:30 PM
Date: August 06, 2014MINUTES FOR AUG-06-2014 10:30 AM
Date: August 06, 2014MINUTES FOR NOV-10-2014 2:00 PM
Date: November 10, 2014ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (CCP 877.6(A)(2)) (TRANSACTION #55839636)
Date: August 05, 2014MINUTES FOR SEP-09-2013 4:00 PM
Date: September 09, 2013MINUTES FOR APR-18-2013 11:00 AM
Date: April 18, 2013NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 56091494) FILED BY ATTORNEY LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P.
Date: September 25, 2014MINUTES FOR JAN-15-2014 9:30 AM
Date: January 15, 2014MINUTES FOR MAY-29-2013 9:00 AM
Date: May 29, 2013CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: July 12, 2013ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR MAY 29, 2013 (TRANSACTION #52535664)
Date: May 29, 2013NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT (KAREN, POND, JENNINGS)
Date: May 17, 2013MINUTES FOR FEB-13-2014 9:00 AM
Date: February 13, 2014ORDER DENYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE (A139796 DIV 5)
Date: September 26, 2013MINUTES FOR SEP-27-2013 9:00 AM
Date: September 27, 2013ORDER DENYING THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/PROHIBITION (A139795 DIV 5)
Date: September 26, 2013ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR FEBRUARY 13, 2014 (TRANSACTION NUMBER 55014222)
Date: February 13, 2014ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION #54048221)
Date: September 06, 2013MINUTES FOR APR-10-2013 10:00 AM
Date: April 10, 2013CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: May 07, 2013MINUTES FOR JAN-08-2013 2:30 PM
Date: January 08, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 48884359) FILED BY DEFENDANT ANNING-JOHNSON COMPANY
Date: January 11, 2013ORDER DENYING RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION
Date: March 22, 2013MINUTES
Date: March 29, 2013MINUTES FOR JAN-25-2013 9:00 AM
Date: January 25, 2013ORDER GENERAL ORDER RE: CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT (NO.1) (TRANSACTION # 49077821)
Date: January 17, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 48246727) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SOLUTIA, INC.
Date: December 07, 2012EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS ISO OPPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 50011753)
Date: March 08, 2013COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS ISO OPPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 50011753)
Date: March 08, 2013REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY ANNING-JOHNSON (TRANSACTION ID # 48005778)
Date: November 28, 2012NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 49485675) FILED BY ATTORNEY LUCIA, CHRISTIAN P.
Date: February 13, 2013ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT J.W. MCCLENAHAN CO.
Date: November 14, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT WESTERN ROOFING SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CUPERTINO ELECTRIC,INC.
Date: November 14, 2011ORDER RE DEMURRERS AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE IN REFERENCE TO THE THIRD AMEDED COMPLAINT
Date: November 22, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT N.V. HEATHORN, INC.
Date: November 14, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ALLIED FIRE PROTECTION
Date: November 14, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL, INC.
Date: November 14, 2011ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WINDOW SOLUTIONS, INC.
Date: October 27, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT WEST COAST PROTECTIVE COATINGS, INC.
Date: November 14, 2011ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT AND DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: December 19, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ARCHITECTURAL GLASS & ALUMINUM CO., INC
Date: November 28, 2011MINUTES FOR OCT-28-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: October 28, 2011REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: September 26, 2012THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT
Date: December 15, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CAREFREE TOLAND POOLS, INC.
Date: November 14, 2011ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BRIEF IN EXCESS OF STATUTORY LIMITS
Date: September 26, 2012MINUTES FOR OCT-24-2012 9:15 AM
Date: October 24, 2012ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JANUARY 25, 2013
Date: January 25, 2013CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: March 29, 2012MINUTES FOR MAR-06-2012 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: March 06, 2012DIRECTORY NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT PURSUANT TO DECLARATION
Date: March 01, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MISSION PLACE LLC
Date: September 28, 2012CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: February 09, 2012ORDER DISCOVERY AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER
Date: January 12, 2012MINUTES FOR JAN-12-2012 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 304
Date: January 12, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Date: October 01, 2012NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY BREZINE, ADAM
Date: January 05, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Date: May 07, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ARCHITECTURAL GLASS & ALUMINUM CO., INC
Date: June 01, 2012MINUTES FOR MAY-14-2012 10:30 AM
Date: May 14, 2012REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY WEBCOR (TRANSACTION ID # 47652344)
Date: November 09, 2012NOTICE DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Date: August 13, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SOLUTIA, INC.
Date: September 27, 2012NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY MCCARTHY, KEVIN PATRICK
Date: October 19, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57724869) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUPERTINO ELECTRIC,INC.
Date: August 17, 2015ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ANNING-JOHNSON COMPANY
Date: October 20, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT BLUE'S ROOFING COMPANY
Date: November 14, 2011ORDER - FOURTH CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: February 24, 2011ORDER OF REFERENCE TO SPECIAL MASTER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: November 09, 2010ORDER PARTIALLY SUSTAINING PROLOGIS/CATELLUS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 09, 2011MINUTES FOR OCT-12-2010 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: October 12, 2010MINUTES FOR FEB-18-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: February 18, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SKIMORE OWINGS & MERRILL LLP
Date: December 15, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 08, 2008MINUTES FOR AUG-12-2009 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: August 12, 2009ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MISSION PLACE LLC'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL REFERENCE
Date: September 02, 2009MINUTES FOR MAR-22-2013 9:00 AM
Date: March 22, 2013PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 50011753)
Date: March 08, 2013MINUTES FOR MAR-15-2013 10:00 AM
Date: March 15, 2013ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT VAN-MULDER SHEET METAL, INC.
Date: August 08, 2011MINUTES FOR OCT-12-2012 2:30 PM
Date: October 12, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT MISSION PLACE LLC
Date: September 28, 2012ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CREATIVE MASONRY, INC
Date: July 11, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SOLUTIA, INC.
Date: September 27, 2012MINUTES FOR AUG-07-2012 9:30 AM
Date: August 07, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED ON A CROSS COMPLAINT TO CROSS COMPLAINANT WEBCOR BUILDERS,INC
Date: October 06, 2011ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A BRIEF IN EXCESS OF STATUTORY LIMITS
Date: August 07, 2012ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CREATIVE MASONRY, INC
Date: November 14, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT VAN-MULDER SHEET METAL, INC.
Date: November 14, 2011MINUTES FOR AUG-24-2012 10:00 AM
Date: August 24, 2012ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTERN ROOFING SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2011ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BLUE'S ROOFING COMPANY
Date: July 22, 2011ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CAREFREE TOLAND POOLS, INC.
Date: July 11, 2011ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIED FIRE PROTECTION
Date: June 02, 2011ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CRITCHFIELD MECHANICAL, INC.
Date: July 13, 2011ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ANNING-JOHNSON COMPANY
Date: June 03, 2011MINUTES FOR MAY-20-2011 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: May 20, 2011ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CUPERTINO ELECTRIC,INC.
Date: July 11, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SOLUTIA, INC.
Date: May 17, 2011ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT J.W. MCCLENAHAN CO.
Date: July 11, 2011ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT N.V. HEATHORN, INC.
Date: July 11, 2011SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Date: May 20, 2011ORDER PARTIALLY SUSTAINING WEBCOR'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 09, 2011MINUTES FOR OCT-04-2010 3:30 PM FOR DEPT 304
Date: October 04, 2010MINUTES FOR APR-26-2011 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: April 26, 2011MINUTES FOR APR-21-2011 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 304
Date: April 21, 2011ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2011ORDER - STIPULATED SIXTH CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: April 27, 2011SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Date: April 27, 2011MINUTES FOR JAN-20-2011 1:30 PM FOR DEPT 304
Date: January 20, 2011SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT WINDOW SOLUTIONS, INC.
Date: March 21, 2011MINUTES FOR APR-07-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: April 07, 2011ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT WINDOW SOLUTIONS, INC.
Date: January 31, 2011MINUTES FOR MAR-03-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 304
Date: March 03, 2011ORDER RE OSC (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT; A143282 DIV. 5)
Date: December 24, 2014DISCLOSURE OF EX PARTE COMMUNICATION (TRANSACTION #57214003)
Date: May 08, 2015ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR MAY 19, 2015 (TRANSACTION 57267044)
Date: May 19, 2015ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JUNE 4, 2015 (TRANSACTION 57339950)
Date: June 04, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT NOT SIGNED (TRANSACTION #57621659)
Date: July 28, 2015ORDER FROM COA DISMISSING CASE IN A143282 DIV 5
Date: February 18, 2016ORDER RE SHOW CAUSE PROCEEDING (TRANSACTION #57760819)
Date: August 24, 2015ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION (TRANSACTION #57945268)
Date: September 30, 2015ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (TRANSACTION #57932395)
Date: September 28, 2015ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF PARTY CROSS-COMPLAINTS (TRANSACTION #57945268)
Date: September 30, 2015ORDER GRANTING SKIDMORE,OWNINGS & MERRILL LLP'S MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION #56125032)
Date: October 01, 2014ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE ORDER FOR NOVEMBER 10, 2014 (TRANSACTION NUMBER 56326818)
Date: November 10, 2014ORDER RE POINTS AND AUTHORITIES A143282 DIV 5
Date: November 12, 2014ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR NOVEMBER 10, 2014 (TRANSACTION NUMBER 56390763)
Date: November 18, 2014REMITTITUR FILED A138609 DIV 5 (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)
Date: April 23, 2015ORDER AMENDING PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION #56898628)
Date: March 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58599787) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION | |
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM COA DISMISSING CASE IN A143282 DIV 5 | |
February 16, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58568260) | |
October 21, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58049421) AS TO DEFENDANT MISSION PLACE LLC MISSION PLACE MEZZANINE LLC MISSION PLACE MEZZ HOLDINGS LLC MISSION PLACE PARTNERS LLC CENTURION REAL ESTATE INVESTORS IV,LLC CENTURION REAL ESTATE PARTNERS, LLC | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 57953721) FILED BY DEFENDANT WEBCOR BUILDERS,INC WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION, INC WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION, INC DBA WEBCOR BUILDERS ON ITS OWN BEHALF AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION LP DBA WEBCOR BUILDERS | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 57953721) FILED BY DEFENDANT WEBCOR BUILDERS,INC WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION INC. WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION, INC DBA WEBCOR BUILDERS ON ITS OWN BEHALF AND ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION LP DBA WEBCOR BUILDERS | |
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57941571) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION | |
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION (TRANSACTION #57945268) | |
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF PARTY CROSS-COMPLAINTS (TRANSACTION #57945268) | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 57932481) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BEACON RESIDENTIAL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.