Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
All Others Similarly Situated, Arana, Tomas R., On Behalf Of Herself And On Behalf Of All Persons Similarly Situated, Spears, Andrea, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Norman B Blumenthal, Shaun Setareh, against Does 1-50, Health Net Of California Inc, represented by Keith A Jacoby, Timothy J Long, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with David De Alba presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid De Alba Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2017 |
Category(Other Employment Complaint Case) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This is a complaint by a former employee against their past employer, alleging causes of action for failure to pay overtime and provide meal and rest breaks, inaccurate wage statements, timely final payment of wages, and unfair business practices in ...
Declaration of Piya Mukherjee in Support of Ex Parte
Date: December 05, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 05, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 23, 2018Declaration of H Scott Leviant ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 17, 2018Proposed Order Granting Motion
Date: July 17, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 23, 2018Reply Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Notice of Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 23, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: December 05, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 17, 2018Notice of Continuance
Date: June 26, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 21, 2018Declaration Supp Dec of Rodes ISO Renewed MSJ
Date: November 21, 2018Opposition to Defs Renewed Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: January 18, 2019Response Separate Statement of Disputed Material Facts in Opposition
Date: January 18, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 09, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 26, 2018Statement Memorandum in Opposition to Ex Parte Application for OST
Date: December 07, 2018Objection to Evidence
Date: February 15, 2019Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Def Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Declaration Dec of Electronic Service
Date: December 07, 2018Objection to Evidence offered by defs ISO defs MSJ
Date: January 18, 2019Declaration of Will Montes in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in Support of ExParte
Date: February 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 08, 2019Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Response to CMC Statement Re: PAGA Trial Plan
Date: September 26, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 21, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 12, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 14, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 14, 2018Declaration of Tomas R Arana ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 30, 2019Notice of Non-Compliance
Date: March 15, 2019Declaration of Thomas Segal in Support of Reply
Date: March 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 18, 2019Declaration of Eric Letzow in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Notice of No Opposition to Motion as to why Case Should not Proceed as a PAGA Action
Date: March 15, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 06, 2019Opposition to Motion for Class Certification
Date: February 15, 2019Stipulation and Order to Withdraw Declarations
Date: February 07, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2019Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Notice of No Opposition to Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Reply in Support of Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Reply Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Reply to Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik in Support of Notice
Date: March 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 07, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order to Withdraw Declarations
Date: February 27, 2019Declaration of Crystal Martinez
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Michael Parker
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Mynor Masaya
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Susan Shaw in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Tomas R. Arana in Support of Reply
Date: March 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 15, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: August 29, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 26, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 18, 2019Statement Brief as to Why no Derivative Claims. . .
Date: September 06, 2019Declaration of Charles Pearson
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Sheena Boehl
Date: February 15, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 26, 2019Proposed Order Granting Class Certification
Date: September 24, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 24, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: May 12, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 30, 2019Statement Trial Presentation and Management Plan
Date: January 24, 2020Motion to Strike Arana's Representative Paga Claims
Date: March 06, 2020Motion to Strike Spears' Representative PAGA Claims
Date: March 06, 2020Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: November 25, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 25, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 11, 2019Declaration of Piy Mucherjee in Support of Motion
Date: November 25, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 05, 2019Objection To Plaintiffs' Trial Plan
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order Approving Class Notice
Date: December 11, 2019Stipulation and Order for Approval of Class Notice
Date: December 11, 2019Order Stipulation and Order for Approval of Class Notice
Date: December 12, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 11, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 19, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 18, 2019Notice of Supplemental Authority
Date: August 27, 2020Joint Case Management Statement
Date: December 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 18, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 16, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: August 04, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 18, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 09, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: October 15, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: January 09, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 04, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: November 12, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) by Electronic Service
Date: November 04, 2020Opposition to Motion to Strike Respresentative PAGA Claims
Date: May 07, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 25, 2021Reply ISO Plaintiff's Trial Presentation and Management Plan
Date: May 06, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 22, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 08, 2021Minute Order
Date: January 04, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2020Joint Case Management Statement
Date: October 09, 2020Notice
Date: May 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 03, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: October 07, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) by Electronic Service
Date: May 06, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 24, 2020Stipulation and Order to Set Case Management Conference and Motion to Strike Hearing Dates
Date: September 22, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Electronic Service
Date: May 06, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 05, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Stipulation and Order Set Case Management Conference and Motion to Strike Hearing Dates
Date: September 25, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 09, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: July 30, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: January 12, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: January 28, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 22, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 29, 2021Declaration of Kyle Nordrehaug ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Notice
Date: June 26, 2017Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: January 17, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: January 17, 2018Motion re: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) By Electronic Service
Date: January 29, 2021Joint Case Management Statement
Date: June 25, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 26, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: March 08, 2018Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik ISO Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Declaration Eric R Lietzow
Date: March 20, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: March 20, 2018Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Evidence ISO its Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Declaration Stephanie Gail ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to requests for Production of Documents
Date: March 20, 2018Declaration AMENDED of Aparajit Bhowmik ISO Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Statement ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Reply in Support of Motion
Date: February 07, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Separate Statement ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Opposition to defs Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 26, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 16, 2018Declaration Dec of Stephanie Gail Lee
Date: January 23, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 20, 2018Stipulation and Order Regarding Document Production
Date: June 19, 2018Declaration Chrissy Schneider ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 08, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 28, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 22, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 05, 2018Declaration of Timothy J Long ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 07, 2018Stipulation - No Order Stipulation Re Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: February 22, 2018Statement ISO Motion to Compel Request for Production Set One
Date: March 20, 2018Order Revised Stipulation and Order Re Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: February 23, 2018Correspondence RE: Dropping 2/13/18 Hearings (2)
Date: February 05, 2018Declaration of Michael Kunkel
Date: May 07, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 08, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 09, 2018Statement ISO Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One
Date: March 20, 2018Statement Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 14, 2018Declaration Ian G Stewart ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Opposition AMENDED Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 03, 2018Reply ISO Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: April 02, 2018Declaration of Victoria B Rivapalacio iso the joint report
Date: May 07, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 02, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 26, 2018Declaration of Nicholas Horton iso of def Health Net of Ca Status report
Date: May 07, 2018Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Continue Hearing Date & Briefing Schedule
Date: August 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 28, 2018Motion to Continue
Date: July 17, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 27, 2018Status Report Status Report
Date: May 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 17, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 09, 2018Stipulation and Order RE: Document Production
Date: June 18, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 09, 2018Reply to Amended Responsive Separate Statement of Disputed Material Facts to Defs MSA
Date: September 14, 2018Declaration of James Toney ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 11, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 07, 2018Statement Separate Stmt ISO Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: June 20, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 17, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 16, 2018Reply ISO plfs Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: July 10, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 10, 2018Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Evidence in Support of Amended Reply
Date: September 14, 2018Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in Support of Oposition to Ex Parte Application for OST
Date: December 07, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 03, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 30, 2018Statement AMENDED Separate Stmt of Disputed Facts and Addtl Facts in Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO defs Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Separate Statement ISO defs Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 10, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 01, 2018Reply Amended Reply Memorandum of Points and Auth in Support of Defs MSA
Date: September 14, 2018Joint Case Management Statement
Date: April 29, 2022Proposed Order Final Approval Order And Judgment
Date: June 17, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Docs
Date: December 01, 2017Order ORDER & Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference
Date: March 27, 2023Declaration Supplemental- of Kyle Nordrehaug ISO Motion for Final Approval
Date: July 11, 2022Response to plfs Statement ISO Motion to Compel Request for Production
Date: July 03, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 06, 2017Motion re: For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement
Date: June 17, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 01, 2017Notice
Date: June 20, 2022Declaration Of Shaun Setareh ISO Motion
Date: June 17, 2022Order
Date: August 10, 2022Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval
Date: March 10, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 12, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: November 27, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 17, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 04, 2022Complaint
Date: April 05, 2017Minute Order
Date: November 04, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: July 11, 2022Declaration of Stephanie Gail Lee in Support of Opposition
Date: December 05, 2017Declaration Of Madely Nava Of ILYM Group Inc ISO Motion
Date: June 17, 2022Proposed Judgment
Date: August 04, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) Production
Date: June 20, 2018Stipulation and Order to Continue Status Conference
Date: March 23, 2023Statement in Support of Motion
Date: December 01, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 23, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: December 06, 2017Tentative Ruling
Date: November 03, 2022Response Joint Response To Objections To Settlement
Date: June 17, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 20, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 05, 2017Opposition to Plntf Andrea Spears Motion for an Order for Optout Privacy Notice
Date: December 05, 2017Statement in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: December 06, 2017Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 31, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: March 22, 2023Minute Order
Date: May 13, 2022Response to Plf Objections to Evidence
Date: January 30, 2019Minute Order
Date: June 19, 2018Exhibit List ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Joint Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: July 09, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: February 25, 2021Amended Complaint First
Date: June 29, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 26, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 30, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: January 21, 2022Declaration of Shaun Setareh ISO Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 14, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: July 08, 2021Order Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation
Date: October 11, 2017Motion re: to Opt Out Privacy Notice to Be Sent to the Class Members
Date: November 16, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: January 14, 2022Minute Order (Status Conference - Civil Special Sets post judgment hearing)
Date: June 01, 2023Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 08, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 08, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 10, 2022Answer of Health Net of California Inc
Date: July 06, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 14, 2022Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: August 09, 2017Correspondence RE: Dropping Motions to Compel hearings of 1/4/2018
Date: December 26, 2017Notice of Department Relocation
Date: January 09, 2024Minute Order
Date: February 08, 2022Order Stipulation and Protective Order Re Confidential Material
Date: December 20, 2017Minute Order
Date: February 07, 2022Complaint Consolidated
Date: December 22, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: June 01, 2017Statement In support of Motion to Compel Request for Production Set One
Date: January 17, 2018Statement Joint Statement Re Remaining Disputes Re Opt-Out Notice
Date: December 27, 2017Stipulation and Order Protective Order re: Confidential Material
Date: December 18, 2017Answer to consolidated complaint
Date: January 22, 2018Reply MemoISO Motion for Opt Out Privacy Notice to Be Sent to the Aggrieved Employees
Date: December 11, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 29, 2017Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Consolidation
Date: September 18, 2017Exhibit List ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: December 12, 2017Objection to Notice of Ruling
Date: December 18, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 23, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 19, 2017Statement In support of Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One
Date: January 17, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 16, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Fed Ex
Date: December 11, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 22, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 17, 2018Notice
Date: October 13, 2017Motion re: To Sequence Discovery
Date: January 23, 2018Declaration Dec of Diane C Rodes
Date: January 23, 2018Correspondence RE: Dropping hearings of 1/4/18
Date: December 28, 2017Declaration Dec of Chrissy Schneider83
Date: January 23, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 12, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 12, 2017Minute Order
Date: December 18, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Amended
Date: September 06, 2019Order Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 08, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 04, 2019Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 04, 2019Notice Of Conformed Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 16, 2019Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: December 12, 2018Declaration of Jeffrey Herman in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Opposition to Motion to Continue Hearing Date & Briefing Schedule
Date: December 12, 2018Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in support of Exparte
Date: February 06, 2019Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause RE Contempt James Bjorseth
Date: February 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: December 07, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 07, 2018Declaration Diane C Rodes ISO Def Reply to Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 06, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 29, 2019[mche] Minute Order from Court of Appeal Staying Proceedings
Date: April 10, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 26, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 05, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 26, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: April 08, 2019Motion re: to Opt Out Privacy Notice to Be Sent to the Class Members
Date: November 16, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 16, 2017Notice
Date: October 13, 2017Statement In support of Motion to Compel Request for Production Set One
Date: January 17, 2018Stipulation and Order Protective Order re: Confidential Material
Date: December 18, 2017Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: January 17, 2018Order Stipulation and Protective Order Re Confidential Material
Date: December 20, 2017Minute Order
Date: October 12, 2017Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: January 17, 2018Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 22, 2017Notice of Ruling
Date: December 12, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 12, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 19, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Fed Ex
Date: December 11, 2017Motion re: to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Statement Joint Statement Re Remaining Disputes Re Opt-Out Notice
Date: December 27, 2017Objection to Notice of Ruling
Date: December 18, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 08, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 22, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 08, 2017Statement In support of Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One
Date: January 17, 2018Correspondence RE: Dropping Motions to Compel hearings of 1/4/2018
Date: December 26, 2017Correspondence RE: Dropping hearings of 1/4/18
Date: December 28, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Declaration Dec of Diane C Rodes
Date: January 23, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 22, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 20, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 23, 2023Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 04, 2017Notice of Motion Amended (Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Prod of Docs
Date: December 04, 2017Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause RE Contempt Toby Alfred
Date: February 06, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 08, 2017Minute Order
Date: December 08, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 21, 2018Motion re: To Sequence Discovery
Date: January 23, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 17, 2018Declaration Dec of Chrissy Schneider83
Date: January 23, 2018Reply Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Order Revised Stipulation and Order Re Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: February 23, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 07, 2018Declaration Chrissy Schneider ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 08, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 08, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in Support of ExParte
Date: February 06, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 26, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 13, 2018Correspondence RE: Dropping 2/13/18 Hearings (2)
Date: February 05, 2018Declaration Dec of Stephanie Gail Lee
Date: January 23, 2018Statement ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Opposition to Motion for Monetary Sanctions
Date: March 14, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 23, 2018Declaration Stephanie Gail ISO Def Reply to its Motion for Monetary Sactions
Date: March 20, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 22, 2018Stipulation - No Order Stipulation Re Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: February 22, 2018Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause RE Contempt James Bjorseth
Date: February 06, 2019Declaration of Timothy J Long ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 16, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: February 14, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 28, 2018Statement ISO Motion to Compel Request for Production Set One
Date: March 20, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 15, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: March 08, 2018Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in support of Exparte
Date: February 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 09, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 09, 2018Declaration Ian G Stewart ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Declaration of Thomas Segal in Support of Reply
Date: March 15, 2019Statement Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 14, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Def Motion for Monetary Sanctions
Date: March 20, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 06, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Fed Ex
Date: March 14, 2018Reply in Support of Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Notice of No Opposition to Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 20, 2018Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Reply to Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order to Withdraw Declarations
Date: February 27, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 15, 2018Notice of No Opposition to Motion as to why Case Should not Proceed as a PAGA Action
Date: March 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 07, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 26, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 15, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 26, 2019Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik in Support of Notice
Date: March 15, 2019Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: November 25, 2019Notice of Continuance
Date: June 26, 2019Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order Approving Class Notice
Date: December 11, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 06, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: August 29, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 04, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 18, 2020Stipulation and Order to Set Hearing Date
Date: May 14, 2019Statement Concerning Any Trial Plan Proposed
Date: September 12, 2019Order Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 08, 2019Statement Trial Presentation and Management Plan
Date: January 24, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 05, 2019[mche] Minute Order from Court of Appeal Staying Proceedings
Date: April 10, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 29, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 26, 2019Opposition to Motion to Strike Respresentative PAGA Claims
Date: May 07, 2020Stipulation - No Order to set Hearing Date
Date: June 18, 2019[mche] 3DCA order denying petition for writ
Date: April 30, 2019Objection To Plaintiffs' Trial Plan
Date: March 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2019Order Stipulation and Order for Approval of Class Notice
Date: December 12, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 11, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: April 08, 2019Joint Case Management Statement
Date: October 09, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 11, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 11, 2019Motion to Strike Arana's Representative Paga Claims
Date: March 06, 2020Proposed Order Granting Class Certification
Date: September 24, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 18, 2019Minute Order
Date: December 18, 2019Stipulation and Order to Set Case Management Conference and Motion to Strike Hearing Dates
Date: September 22, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 24, 2020Motion to Strike Spears' Representative PAGA Claims
Date: March 06, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 08, 2019Notice of Supplemental Authority
Date: August 27, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 04, 2020Reply ISO Plaintiff's Trial Presentation and Management Plan
Date: May 06, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 09, 2020Stipulation - No Order to set Hearing Date
Date: June 18, 2019Notice of Order Granting Application to Seal
Date: September 04, 2019Statement Concerning Any Trial Plan Proposed
Date: September 12, 2019Declaration of Stephenie Gail Lee ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Statement in Support of Motion
Date: December 01, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 04, 2018Declaration Stephanie Gail ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Reply in Support of Motion
Date: February 07, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Docs
Date: December 01, 2017Minute Order
Date: December 18, 2017Complaint Consolidated
Date: December 22, 2017Reply MemoISO Motion for Opt Out Privacy Notice to Be Sent to the Aggrieved Employees
Date: December 11, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 21, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: November 22, 2017Motion to Compel Further Responses to requests for Production of Documents
Date: March 20, 2018Answer to consolidated complaint
Date: January 22, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 24, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: January 09, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Electronic Service
Date: May 06, 2020Notice
Date: May 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) by Electronic Service
Date: May 06, 2020Joint Case Management Statement
Date: December 28, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 22, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 19, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: January 21, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 17, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 30, 2021Declaration of Kyle Nordrehaug ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: January 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 29, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: August 04, 2021Motion re: For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement
Date: June 17, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 07, 2022Declaration Of Madely Nava Of ILYM Group Inc ISO Motion
Date: June 17, 2022Declaration Of Shaun Setareh ISO Motion
Date: June 17, 2022Motion re: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Joint Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 25, 2021Declaration of Shaun Setareh ISO Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: October 07, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: July 30, 2021Proposed Order Final Approval Order And Judgment
Date: June 17, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 26, 2021Minute Order
Date: January 14, 2022Response Joint Response To Objections To Settlement
Date: June 17, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 08, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 09, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 07, 2022Joint Case Management Statement
Date: April 29, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 20, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 08, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 13, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 31, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: May 12, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: January 12, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 20, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 08, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: January 14, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 26, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 27, 2017Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: August 09, 2017Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: February 05, 2018Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik in Support of Opposition
Date: January 18, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 23, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 15, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 30, 2018Motion to Continue
Date: July 17, 2018Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defs MSA
Date: April 20, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 03, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 09, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 26, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 27, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 20, 2018Reply to Amended Responsive Separate Statement of Disputed Material Facts to Defs MSA
Date: September 14, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 09, 2018Declaration Supplemental- of Kyle Nordrehaug ISO Motion for Final Approval
Date: July 11, 2022Notice of Department Relocation
Date: January 09, 2024Minute Order (Status Conference - Civil Special Sets post judgment hearing)
Date: June 01, 2023Minute Order
Date: July 12, 2022Notice
Date: June 20, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: July 11, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 13, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: February 14, 2018Declaration of Stephenie Gail Lee ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Joint Case Management Statement
Date: October 21, 2022Summons
Date: April 05, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: November 22, 2017Opposition to Motion for Monetary Sanctions
Date: March 14, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 15, 2018Declaration Stephanie Gail ISO Def Reply to its Motion for Monetary Sactions
Date: March 20, 2018Motion re: to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 09, 2018Stipulation and Order Regarding Document Production
Date: June 18, 2018[mche] 3DCA order denying petition for writ
Date: April 30, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 11, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 11, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Fed Ex
Date: March 14, 2018Stipulation and Order to Set Hearing Date
Date: May 14, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Def Motion for Monetary Sanctions
Date: March 20, 2018Proposed Order Granting Motion
Date: July 17, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 27, 2018Joint Case Management Statement
Date: October 21, 2022Declaration Supp Dec of Rodes ISO Renewed MSJ
Date: November 21, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 26, 2018Declaration of Jeffrey Herman in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 07, 2018Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Evidence ISO its Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Order
Date: August 10, 2022Minute Order
Date: December 07, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 03, 2020Separate Statement and Additional Facts in Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 30, 2019Reply Separate Statement in Support of MSA
Date: April 20, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 07, 2018Declaration Nicholas J Horton ISO Def Reply to Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Declaration of James Toney ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik in Support of Opposition
Date: January 18, 2019Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing & Resetting Briefing Schedule
Date: August 01, 2018Declaration of Eric Letzow in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Amended
Date: September 06, 2019Reply Separate Statement in Support of MSA
Date: April 20, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 22, 2020Stipulation and Order RE: Document Production
Date: June 18, 2018Order Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation
Date: October 11, 2017Declaration of H Scott Leviant ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 05, 2017Separate Statement ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 24, 2019Response to CMC Statement Re: PAGA Trial Plan
Date: September 26, 2019Declaration of Michael Kunkel
Date: May 07, 2018Declaration of Nicholas Horton iso of def Health Net of Ca Status report
Date: May 07, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 20, 2018Status Report Status Report
Date: May 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 26, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 10, 2018Stipulation and Order Regarding Document Production
Date: June 18, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 30, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 04, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 26, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 30, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 19, 2018Notice Of Conformed Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 16, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 05, 2017Proposed Judgment
Date: August 04, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 16, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) by Electronic Service
Date: November 04, 2020Joint Case Management Statement
Date: June 25, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 10, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 06, 2017Tentative Ruling
Date: July 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 21, 2022Declaration of Victoria B Rivapalacio iso the joint report
Date: May 07, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: December 06, 2017Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Consolidation
Date: September 18, 2017Statement Separate Stmt ISO Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: June 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 28, 2018Stipulation and Order Regarding Document Production
Date: June 19, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) Production
Date: June 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 27, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 02, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 20, 2018Opposition to Plntf Andrea Spears Motion for an Order for Optout Privacy Notice
Date: December 05, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik ISO Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Separate Statement and Additional Facts in Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Declaration Diane C Rodes ISO Def Reply to Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Declaration Eric R Lietzow
Date: March 20, 2018Declaration of Tomas R Arana ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Def Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Amended Complaint First
Date: June 29, 2017Objection to Evidence
Date: February 15, 2019Response to plfs Statement ISO Motion to Compel Request for Production
Date: July 03, 2018Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Continue Hearing Date & Briefing Schedule
Date: August 02, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 26, 2018Declaration AMENDED of Aparajit Bhowmik ISO Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Declaration of Piy Mucherjee in Support of Motion
Date: November 25, 2019Declaration of Tomas R. Arana in Support of Reply
Date: March 15, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: June 01, 2017Answer of Health Net of California Inc
Date: July 06, 2017Notice of Non-Compliance
Date: March 15, 2019Stipulation and Order to Withdraw Declarations
Date: February 07, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 18, 2019Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: March 20, 2018Declaration of Will Montes in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Mynor Masaya
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Sheena Boehl
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 18, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 22, 2020Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval
Date: March 10, 2022Reply ISO Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: April 02, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 25, 2019Statement in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: December 06, 2017Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 13, 2020Summons
Date: April 05, 2017Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Evidence in Support of Amended Reply
Date: September 14, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 29, 2017Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: February 05, 2018Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: October 15, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 23, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: December 05, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 11, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: July 09, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 16, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 23, 2023Stipulation and Order to Continue Status Conference
Date: March 23, 2023Reply ISO plfs Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: July 10, 2018Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: December 12, 2018Declaration of Charles Pearson
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 12, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO defs Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Declaration Nicholas J Horton ISO Def Reply to Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defs MSA
Date: April 20, 2018Reply Amended Reply Memorandum of Points and Auth in Support of Defs MSA
Date: September 14, 2018Objection to Evidence offered by defs ISO defs MSJ
Date: January 18, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 17, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 17, 2018Statement AMENDED Separate Stmt of Disputed Facts and Addtl Facts in Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 14, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 01, 2018Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing & Resetting Briefing Schedule
Date: August 01, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 03, 2018Declaration of Susan Shaw in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration Dec of Electronic Service
Date: December 07, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 21, 2018Separate Statement ISO defs Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Opposition to Defs Renewed Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: January 18, 2019Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 04, 2019Response Separate Statement of Disputed Material Facts in Opposition
Date: January 18, 2019Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Stipulation and Order for Approval of Class Notice
Date: December 11, 2019Statement Brief as to Why no Derivative Claims. . .
Date: September 06, 2019Stipulation and Order Set Case Management Conference and Motion to Strike Hearing Dates
Date: September 25, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: March 22, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) By Electronic Service
Date: January 29, 2021Minute Order
Date: March 23, 2023Tentative Ruling
Date: November 03, 2022Minute Order
Date: November 04, 2022Statement Memorandum in Opposition to Ex Parte Application for OST
Date: December 07, 2018Declaration of Piya Mukherjee in Support of Ex Parte
Date: December 05, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 10, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 17, 2018Opposition to defs Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 26, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 17, 2018Notice of Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 30, 2018Declaration of Stephanie Gail Lee in Support of Opposition
Date: December 05, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 23, 2018Complaint
Date: April 05, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 01, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 09, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 04, 2017Opposition AMENDED Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Notice of Motion Amended (Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Prod of Docs
Date: December 04, 2017Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in Support of Oposition to Ex Parte Application for OST
Date: December 07, 2018Opposition to Motion to Continue Hearing Date & Briefing Schedule
Date: December 12, 2018Declaration of Crystal Martinez
Date: February 15, 2019Notice
Date: June 26, 2017Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Statement ISO Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One
Date: March 20, 2018Declaration of Michael Parker
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 21, 2018Reply Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Minute Order
Date: November 09, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 11, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 05, 2018Order ORDER & Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference
Date: March 27, 2023Response to Plf Objections to Evidence
Date: January 30, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 04, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: February 25, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 14, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 08, 2021Opposition to Motion for Class Certification
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 26, 2021Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause RE Contempt Toby Alfred
Date: February 06, 2019Notice of Order Granting Application to Seal
Date: September 04, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 05, 2019Motion to Continue (name extension)
Date: July 17, 2018Motion to Continue (name extension)
Date: July 17, 2018Order Stipulation and Protective Order Re Confidential Material
Date: December 20, 2017Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Docs
Date: December 01, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 15, 2019Stipulation and Order to Set Hearing Date
Date: May 14, 2019Declaration of Will Montes in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Reply Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 11, 2019Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Def Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 04, 2019Response to CMC Statement Re: PAGA Trial Plan
Date: September 26, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 16, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 30, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 09, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 06, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Electronic Service
Date: May 06, 2020Declaration of H Scott Leviant ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 06, 2019Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Reply to Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 01, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 11, 2018Declaration Diane C Rodes ISO Def Reply to Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: December 12, 2017Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: December 06, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 03, 2018Response to Plf Objections to Evidence
Date: January 30, 2019Notice of Continuance
Date: June 26, 2019Notice
Date: October 13, 2017Statement in Support of Motion
Date: December 01, 2017Statement in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: December 06, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 05, 2017Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Notice
Date: May 18, 2020Reply MemoISO Motion for Opt Out Privacy Notice to Be Sent to the Aggrieved Employees
Date: December 11, 2017Declaration Nicholas J Horton ISO Def Reply to Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 17, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 05, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 18, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: June 01, 2017Opposition to Plntf Andrea Spears Motion for an Order for Optout Privacy Notice
Date: December 05, 2017Reply ISO Plaintiff's Trial Presentation and Management Plan
Date: May 06, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) by Electronic Service
Date: May 06, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 26, 2019Notice of Motion Amended (Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Prod of Docs
Date: December 04, 2017Minute Order
Date: December 18, 2019Opposition to Defs Renewed Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: January 18, 2019Reply in Support of Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Opposition to Motion for Class Certification
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: December 08, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 19, 2017Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Stipulation and Order for Approval of Class Notice
Date: December 11, 2019Declaration of Piy Mucherjee in Support of Motion
Date: November 25, 2019Declaration of Tomas R Arana ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Notice of Supplemental Authority
Date: August 27, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 26, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 19, 2020Notice Of Conformed Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 16, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 26, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 19, 2020Order Stipulation and Order for Approval of Class Notice
Date: December 12, 2019Declaration of Mynor Masaya
Date: February 15, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 24, 2020Opposition to Motion to Strike Respresentative PAGA Claims
Date: May 07, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 15, 2019Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause RE Contempt Toby Alfred
Date: February 06, 2019Stipulation and Order to Set Case Management Conference and Motion to Strike Hearing Dates
Date: September 22, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 26, 2019[mche] 3DCA order denying petition for writ
Date: April 30, 2019Objection to Notice of Ruling
Date: December 18, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Fed Ex
Date: December 11, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 18, 2017Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in Support of ExParte
Date: February 06, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 30, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 11, 2019Stipulation - No Order to set Hearing Date
Date: June 18, 2019Stipulation and Order Protective Order re: Confidential Material
Date: December 18, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 09, 2018Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik ISO Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 04, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 11, 2019Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 24, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 17, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 17, 2018Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: November 25, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 05, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 18, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 22, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 29, 2019Separate Statement and Additional Facts in Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order Approving Class Notice
Date: December 11, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 25, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 08, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 08, 2017Stipulation and Order Set Case Management Conference and Motion to Strike Hearing Dates
Date: September 25, 2020Declaration of James Toney ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration of Stephanie Gail Lee in Support of Opposition
Date: December 05, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: March 18, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 06, 2017Order Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 08, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Statement Brief as to Why no Derivative Claims. . .
Date: September 06, 2019Answer to consolidated complaint
Date: January 22, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 16, 2017Objection to Evidence offered by defs ISO defs MSJ
Date: January 18, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 26, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 30, 2018Motion re: To Sequence Discovery
Date: January 23, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 23, 2018Declaration Ian G Stewart ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Response to plfs Statement ISO Motion to Compel Request for Production
Date: July 03, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 10, 2022Reply Amended Reply Memorandum of Points and Auth in Support of Defs MSA
Date: September 14, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: July 09, 2021Complaint
Date: April 05, 2017Reply ISO Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: April 02, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Complaint Consolidated
Date: December 22, 2017Objection to Evidence
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 16, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 21, 2018Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik in Support of Opposition
Date: January 18, 2019Declaration Eric R Lietzow
Date: March 20, 2018Stipulation - No Order Stipulation Re Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: February 22, 2018Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Evidence ISO its Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Exhibit List ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Statement ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Separate Statement ISO defs Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Declaration of Nicholas Horton iso of def Health Net of Ca Status report
Date: May 07, 2018Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Consolidation
Date: September 18, 2017Opposition to Motion for Monetary Sanctions
Date: March 14, 2018Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Evidence in Support of Amended Reply
Date: September 14, 2018Declaration of Eric Letzow in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Order
Date: August 10, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 27, 2018Statement ISO Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One
Date: March 20, 2018Declaration Of Madely Nava Of ILYM Group Inc ISO Motion
Date: June 17, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 09, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: March 20, 2018Amended Complaint First
Date: June 29, 2017Declaration of Timothy J Long ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 01, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 26, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 05, 2018Notice
Date: June 20, 2022Declaration Dec of Stephanie Gail Lee
Date: January 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: July 30, 2021Declaration Supp Dec of Rodes ISO Renewed MSJ
Date: November 21, 2018Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in Support of Oposition to Ex Parte Application for OST
Date: December 07, 2018Statement In support of Motion to Compel Request for Production Set One
Date: January 17, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 07, 2018Statement Trial Presentation and Management Plan
Date: January 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 04, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: October 15, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 02, 2018Declaration of Victoria B Rivapalacio iso the joint report
Date: May 07, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 07, 2018Statement Memorandum in Opposition to Ex Parte Application for OST
Date: December 07, 2018Order Revised Stipulation and Order Re Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: February 23, 2018Reply in Support of Motion
Date: February 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 14, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: January 21, 2022Motion re: to Opt Out Privacy Notice to Be Sent to the Class Members
Date: November 16, 2017[mche] Minute Order from Court of Appeal Staying Proceedings
Date: April 10, 2019Statement Concerning Any Trial Plan Proposed
Date: September 12, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 18, 2019Declaration of Stephenie Gail Lee ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: July 11, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 28, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) By Electronic Service
Date: January 29, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 23, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 05, 2018Motion to Continue (name extension)
Date: July 17, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 14, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to requests for Production of Documents
Date: March 20, 2018Declaration Of Shaun Setareh ISO Motion
Date: June 17, 2022Declaration of Kyle Nordrehaug ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO defs Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: January 17, 2018Answer of Health Net of California Inc
Date: July 06, 2017Minute Order
Date: February 13, 2018Declaration Stephanie Gail ISO Def Reply to its Motion for Monetary Sactions
Date: March 20, 2018Correspondence RE: Dropping Motions to Compel hearings of 1/4/2018
Date: December 26, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 21, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: July 30, 2021Reply Separate Statement in Support of MSA
Date: April 20, 2018Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Continue Hearing Date & Briefing Schedule
Date: August 02, 2018Status Report Status Report
Date: May 07, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: August 04, 2021Statement Joint Statement Re Remaining Disputes Re Opt-Out Notice
Date: December 27, 2017Motion re: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Declaration of Sheena Boehl
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: December 12, 2018Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval
Date: March 10, 2022Correspondence RE: Dropping hearings of 1/4/18
Date: December 28, 2017Notice of Non-Compliance
Date: March 15, 2019Response Joint Response To Objections To Settlement
Date: June 17, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: November 22, 2017Declaration of Crystal Martinez
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 17, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 26, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 08, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 12, 2017Ex Parte Application
Date: December 05, 2018Declaration Supplemental- of Kyle Nordrehaug ISO Motion for Final Approval
Date: July 11, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: March 08, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 22, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 22, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 04, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: March 15, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 28, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 27, 2017Statement ISO Motion to Compel Request for Production Set One
Date: March 20, 2018Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik in Support of Notice
Date: March 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 12, 2017Opposition to Motion to Continue Hearing Date & Briefing Schedule
Date: December 12, 2018Reply to Amended Responsive Separate Statement of Disputed Material Facts to Defs MSA
Date: September 14, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 24, 2020Correspondence RE: Dropping 2/13/18 Hearings (2)
Date: February 05, 2018Notice
Date: June 26, 2017Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing & Resetting Briefing Schedule
Date: August 01, 2018Response Separate Statement of Disputed Material Facts in Opposition
Date: January 18, 2019Stipulation and Order to Withdraw Declarations
Date: February 07, 2019Notice of Related Case
Date: January 28, 2021Declaration of Jeffrey Herman in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Opposition to defs Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 26, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 31, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Def Motion for Monetary Sanctions
Date: March 20, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 07, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 04, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 20, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 10, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) by Electronic Service
Date: November 04, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 22, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 27, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 09, 2018Proposed Order Granting Motion
Date: July 17, 2018Declaration of Michael Kunkel
Date: May 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 04, 2019Objection To Plaintiffs' Trial Plan
Date: March 06, 2020Proposed Judgment
Date: August 04, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: January 09, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 14, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 04, 2021Declaration Chrissy Schneider ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 04, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 20, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: November 03, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Amended
Date: September 06, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 30, 2018Declaration of Michael Parker
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 29, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 07, 2022Declaration Dec of Chrissy Schneider83
Date: January 23, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: May 12, 2022Declaration of Tomas R. Arana in Support of Reply
Date: March 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 03, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 23, 2018Separate Statement ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 17, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 22, 2017Minute Order
Date: October 23, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 23, 2018Joint Case Management Statement
Date: April 29, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Fed Ex
Date: March 14, 2018Declaration of Susan Shaw in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Thomas Segal in Support of Reply
Date: March 15, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 08, 2018Declaration Stephanie Gail ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 07, 2018Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in support of Exparte
Date: February 06, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order to Withdraw Declarations
Date: February 27, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: April 08, 2019Declaration AMENDED of Aparajit Bhowmik ISO Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Statement Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 14, 2018Motion re: to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Joint Case Management Statement
Date: June 25, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 08, 2018Proposed Order Final Approval Order And Judgment
Date: June 17, 2022Declaration of Charles Pearson
Date: February 15, 2019Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: August 09, 2017Minute Order
Date: June 19, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 26, 2021Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: February 05, 2018Motion to Strike Arana's Representative Paga Claims
Date: March 06, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 21, 2022Motion to Strike Spears' Representative PAGA Claims
Date: March 06, 2020Stipulation and Order to Continue Status Conference
Date: March 23, 2023Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 15, 2018Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Notice of No Opposition to Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 09, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 12, 2018Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defs MSA
Date: April 20, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 17, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 29, 2021Minute Order (Status Conference - Civil Special Sets post judgment hearing)
Date: June 01, 2023Joint Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 13, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 12, 2022Reply Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: January 14, 2022Notice of Order Granting Application to Seal
Date: September 04, 2019Notice of No Opposition to Motion as to why Case Should not Proceed as a PAGA Action
Date: March 15, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 26, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: October 07, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 14, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 23, 2023Tentative Ruling
Date: July 08, 2021Minute Order
Date: April 20, 2022Joint Case Management Statement
Date: December 28, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 07, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 08, 2021Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause RE Contempt James Bjorseth
Date: February 06, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 09, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 26, 2018Stipulation and Order Regarding Document Production
Date: June 18, 2018Statement AMENDED Separate Stmt of Disputed Facts and Addtl Facts in Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 13, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 10, 2018Summons
Date: April 05, 2017Opposition AMENDED Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Order Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation
Date: October 11, 2017Declaration of Shaun Setareh ISO Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Statement In support of Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One
Date: January 17, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: February 25, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: February 14, 2018Stipulation and Order RE: Document Production
Date: June 18, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: August 29, 2019Order ORDER & Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference
Date: March 27, 2023Reply ISO plfs Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: July 10, 2018Declaration Dec of Diane C Rodes
Date: January 23, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 05, 2019Stipulation and Order Regarding Document Production
Date: June 19, 2018Motion re: For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement
Date: June 17, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) Production
Date: June 20, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Declaration Dec of Electronic Service
Date: December 07, 2018Statement Separate Stmt ISO Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: June 20, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 07, 2018Declaration of Piya Mukherjee in Support of Ex Parte
Date: December 05, 2018Proposed Order Granting Class Certification
Date: September 24, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 21, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: January 12, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: March 22, 2023Tentative Ruling
Date: November 12, 2020Joint Case Management Statement
Date: October 09, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 08, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 16, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 23, 2023Joint Case Management Statement
Date: October 21, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 20, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 08, 2022Notice of Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 11, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 25, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 22, 2020Statement Memorandum in Opposition to Ex Parte Application for OST
Date: December 07, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Fed Ex
Date: December 11, 2017Minute Order
Date: December 18, 2017Opposition to defs Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 26, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 21, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Docs
Date: December 01, 2017Minute Order
Date: September 27, 2018Notice of Motion Amended (Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Prod of Docs
Date: December 04, 2017Statement ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 17, 2018Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Evidence ISO its Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 19, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 21, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 07, 2018Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Evidence in Support of Amended Reply
Date: September 14, 2018Complaint
Date: April 05, 2017Declaration of Victoria B Rivapalacio iso the joint report
Date: May 07, 2018Declaration of Michael Kunkel
Date: May 07, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: March 20, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 28, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to requests for Production of Documents
Date: March 20, 2018Stipulation and Order Regarding Document Production
Date: June 19, 2018Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Reply to Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 23, 2018Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 09, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 03, 2018Declaration Chrissy Schneider ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 26, 2019Reply Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Declaration Supp Dec of Rodes ISO Renewed MSJ
Date: November 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 16, 2018Opposition to Defs Renewed Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: January 18, 2019Response to Plf Objections to Evidence
Date: January 30, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 30, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 09, 2018Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) Production
Date: June 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: December 07, 2018Declaration of Piya Mukherjee in Support of Ex Parte
Date: December 05, 2018Stipulation and Order Set Case Management Conference and Motion to Strike Hearing Dates
Date: September 25, 2020Joint Case Management Statement
Date: October 09, 2020Opposition to Motion for Class Certification
Date: February 15, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 07, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 08, 2017Proposed Order Granting Class Certification
Date: September 24, 2019Minute Order
Date: October 08, 2021Motion to Strike Arana's Representative Paga Claims
Date: March 06, 2020Reply ISO Plaintiff's Trial Presentation and Management Plan
Date: May 06, 2020Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in Support of ExParte
Date: February 06, 2019Stipulation and Order to Withdraw Declarations
Date: February 07, 2019Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Continue Hearing Date & Briefing Schedule
Date: August 02, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 22, 2017Minute Order
Date: March 27, 2018Declaration Dec of Stephanie Gail Lee
Date: January 23, 2018Declaration Diane C Rodes ISO Def Reply to Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Amended
Date: September 06, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 11, 2018Stipulation - No Order Stipulation Re Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: February 22, 2018Opposition to Motion for Monetary Sanctions
Date: March 14, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: December 12, 2017Declaration of Stephanie Gail Lee in Support of Opposition
Date: December 05, 2017Statement Joint Statement Re Remaining Disputes Re Opt-Out Notice
Date: December 27, 2017Correspondence RE: Dropping Motions to Compel hearings of 1/4/2018
Date: December 26, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 13, 2018Declaration AMENDED of Aparajit Bhowmik ISO Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Statement In support of Motion to Compel Request for Production Set One
Date: January 17, 2018Status Report Status Report
Date: May 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 16, 2018Order Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation
Date: October 11, 2017Exhibit List ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 19, 2017Reply to Amended Responsive Separate Statement of Disputed Material Facts to Defs MSA
Date: September 14, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 17, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 04, 2018Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defs MSA
Date: April 20, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 29, 2017Stipulation and Order Protective Order re: Confidential Material
Date: December 18, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 07, 2018Motion re: To Sequence Discovery
Date: January 23, 2018Minute Order
Date: October 12, 2017Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Def Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Motion re: to Opt Out Privacy Notice to Be Sent to the Class Members
Date: November 16, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Def Motion for Monetary Sanctions
Date: March 20, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 18, 2019Declaration of Susan Shaw in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Reply Separate Statement in Support of MSA
Date: April 20, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 09, 2018Statement Trial Presentation and Management Plan
Date: January 24, 2020Declaration Eric R Lietzow
Date: March 20, 2018Stipulation and Order RE: Document Production
Date: June 18, 2018Notice
Date: June 26, 2017Declaration of Tomas R. Arana in Support of Reply
Date: March 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 10, 2018Stipulation and Order for Approval of Class Notice
Date: December 11, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: December 05, 2018Stipulation - No Order to set Hearing Date
Date: June 18, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: August 29, 2019Motion for Final Approval of Settlement
Date: November 25, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 26, 2019Motion to Continue (name extension)
Date: July 17, 2018Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 04, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 20, 2018Reply ISO plfs Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: July 10, 2018Statement ISO Motion to Compel Request for Production Set One
Date: March 20, 2018Declaration of Nicholas Horton iso of def Health Net of Ca Status report
Date: May 07, 2018Joint Case Management Statement
Date: December 28, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order to Withdraw Declarations
Date: February 27, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 26, 2018Statement ISO Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One
Date: March 20, 2018Declaration of James Toney ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Minute Order (Status Conference - Civil Special Sets post judgment hearing)
Date: June 01, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 20, 2018Declaration of Thomas Segal in Support of Reply
Date: March 15, 2019Motion to Strike Spears' Representative PAGA Claims
Date: March 06, 2020Opposition AMENDED Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Declaration of H Scott Leviant ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 03, 2018Notice of Continuance
Date: June 26, 2019Declaration Of Madely Nava Of ILYM Group Inc ISO Motion
Date: June 17, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 19, 2020Proposed Order Granting Motion
Date: July 17, 2018Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 31, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: October 15, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 26, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 30, 2019Statement AMENDED Separate Stmt of Disputed Facts and Addtl Facts in Opposition to MSJ
Date: August 23, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 11, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 07, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 04, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: July 08, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 08, 2018Order Stipulation and Protective Order Re Confidential Material
Date: December 20, 2017Reply MemoISO Motion for Opt Out Privacy Notice to Be Sent to the Aggrieved Employees
Date: December 11, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: November 27, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 06, 2019Minute Order
Date: December 08, 2017Notice of Non-Compliance
Date: March 15, 2019Declaration Dec of Diane C Rodes
Date: January 23, 2018Reply in Support of Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Charles Pearson
Date: February 15, 2019Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Notice of No Opposition to Motion as to why Case Should not Proceed as a PAGA Action
Date: March 15, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 05, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 25, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: May 12, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 24, 2020Declaration of Crystal Martinez
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration Nicholas J Horton ISO Def Reply to Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Joint Case Management Statement
Date: June 25, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 30, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: July 30, 2021Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Notice of No Opposition to Motion
Date: March 15, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: October 07, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 05, 2019Joint Case Management Statement
Date: April 29, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 13, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: July 09, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 21, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 26, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 15, 2019Order Stipulation and Order for Approval of Class Notice
Date: December 12, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 12, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 18, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: August 04, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 19, 2020Stipulation and Order to Set Case Management Conference and Motion to Strike Hearing Dates
Date: September 22, 2020Order
Date: August 10, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 16, 2020Notice
Date: May 18, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 09, 2021Motion re: For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement
Date: June 17, 2022Stipulation and Order to Continue Status Conference
Date: March 23, 2023Notice
Date: June 20, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: March 08, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 02, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 30, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 18, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 04, 2019Minute Order
Date: May 30, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: April 08, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: April 09, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Fed Ex
Date: March 14, 2018Joint Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 22, 2020Tentative Ruling
Date: February 25, 2021Tentative Ruling
Date: January 12, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 22, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 26, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 08, 2021Order ORDER & Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference
Date: March 27, 2023Minute Order
Date: February 26, 2021Response Joint Response To Objections To Settlement
Date: June 17, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 11, 2019Stipulation and Order to Set Hearing Date
Date: May 14, 2019Declaration of Piy Mucherjee in Support of Motion
Date: November 25, 2019Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval
Date: March 10, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: February 14, 2018Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause RE Contempt James Bjorseth
Date: February 06, 2019Objection to Notice of Ruling
Date: December 18, 2017Declaration Ian G Stewart ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik in Support of Notice
Date: March 15, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 28, 2018Tentative Ruling
Date: March 22, 2023Minute Order
Date: December 14, 2018Answer of Health Net of California Inc
Date: July 06, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO defs Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 01, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) By Electronic Service
Date: January 29, 2021Declaration of Stephenie Gail Lee ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 23, 2018Declaration Supplemental- of Kyle Nordrehaug ISO Motion for Final Approval
Date: July 11, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 14, 2022Declaration Stephanie Gail ISO Def Reply to its Motion for Monetary Sactions
Date: March 20, 2018Separate Statement ISO defs Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 26, 2018Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik ISO Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: December 12, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 29, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 01, 2017Stipulation and Order Regarding Document Production
Date: June 18, 2018Opposition to Plntf Andrea Spears Motion for an Order for Optout Privacy Notice
Date: December 05, 2017Motion re: to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Notice of Supplemental Authority
Date: August 27, 2020Declaration Stephanie Gail ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 12, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 17, 2022Declaration of Timothy J Long in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Order Revised Stipulation and Order Re Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: February 23, 2018Notice of Order Granting Application to Seal
Date: September 04, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 05, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 06, 2017Tentative Ruling
Date: July 11, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) by Electronic Service
Date: May 06, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: January 09, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 26, 2018Summons
Date: April 05, 2017Objection to Evidence
Date: February 15, 2019Statement Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 14, 2018Declaration of Michael Parker
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 20, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 05, 2017Declaration Dec of Electronic Service
Date: December 07, 2018Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: January 17, 2018[mche] Minute Order from Court of Appeal Staying Proceedings
Date: April 10, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 23, 2018[mche] 3DCA order denying petition for writ
Date: April 30, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 23, 2018Declaration of Mynor Masaya
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 05, 2018Amended Complaint First
Date: June 29, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 04, 2017Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: August 09, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 16, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 17, 2018Proposed Order Final Approval Order And Judgment
Date: June 17, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 17, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 11, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 26, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 06, 2019Declaration of Jeffrey Herman in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 23, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: June 01, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 24, 2019Response to plfs Statement ISO Motion to Compel Request for Production
Date: July 03, 2018Notice Of Conformed Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 16, 2019Joint Case Management Statement
Date: October 21, 2022Notice
Date: October 13, 2017Statement in Support of Motion
Date: December 01, 2017Complaint Consolidated
Date: December 22, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 10, 2018Motion re: Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Objection To Plaintiffs' Trial Plan
Date: March 06, 2020Opposition to Motion to Strike Respresentative PAGA Claims
Date: May 07, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: January 28, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 09, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 15, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 22, 2017Objection to Evidence offered by defs ISO defs MSJ
Date: January 18, 2019Statement in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: December 06, 2017Certificate of Mailing for
Date: December 14, 2018Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: February 05, 2018Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration of Tomas R Arana ISO Motion for Class Certification
Date: December 21, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 04, 2020Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Consolidation
Date: September 18, 2017Proof of Personal Service
Date: February 08, 2018Declaration Dec of Chrissy Schneider83
Date: January 23, 2018Statement Concerning Any Trial Plan Proposed
Date: September 12, 2019Declaration of Shaun Setareh ISO Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: November 12, 2020Answer to consolidated complaint
Date: January 22, 2018Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in Support of Oposition to Ex Parte Application for OST
Date: December 07, 2018Notice of Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA
Date: November 19, 2018Reply Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO Renewed MSA
Date: January 30, 2019Correspondence RE: Dropping 2/13/18 Hearings (2)
Date: February 05, 2018Reply ISO Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: April 02, 2018Reply Amended Reply Memorandum of Points and Auth in Support of Defs MSA
Date: September 14, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 09, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 05, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 21, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 07, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: January 17, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 07, 2022Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Certificate of Mailing for
Date: April 20, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 28, 2021Declaration Of Shaun Setareh ISO Motion
Date: June 17, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 22, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 22, 2018Separate Statement and Additional Facts in Opposition to MSJ
Date: April 11, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 15, 2018Statement Brief as to Why no Derivative Claims. . .
Date: September 06, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Electronic Service
Date: May 06, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 09, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: October 12, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 14, 2022Minute Order
Date: December 18, 2019Declaration of Sheena Boehl
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration of Timothy J Long ISO Motion for Sanctions
Date: February 28, 2018Proposed Judgment
Date: August 04, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 29, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 13, 2020Declaration of Aparajit Bhowmik in Support of Opposition
Date: January 18, 2019Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: December 06, 2017Statement Separate Stmt ISO Motion to Compel Discovery
Date: June 20, 2018Response Separate Statement of Disputed Material Facts in Opposition
Date: January 18, 2019Reply in Support of Motion
Date: February 07, 2018Statement In support of Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One
Date: January 17, 2018Response to CMC Statement Re: PAGA Trial Plan
Date: September 26, 2019Order Order Granting Class Certification
Date: October 08, 2019Separate Statement ISO MSA
Date: February 05, 2018Correspondence RE: Dropping hearings of 1/4/18
Date: December 28, 2017Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing & Resetting Briefing Schedule
Date: August 01, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: January 21, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery
Date: March 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 10, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 22, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 20, 2022Declaration of Kyle Nordrehaug ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 08, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 08, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 04, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 11, 2019Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order Approving Class Notice
Date: December 11, 2019Declaration of Nicholas J Horton in support of Exparte
Date: February 06, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 25, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 23, 2023Opposition to Motion to Continue Hearing Date & Briefing Schedule
Date: December 12, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 17, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 15, 2019Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause RE Contempt Toby Alfred
Date: February 06, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: November 03, 2022Declaration of Eric Letzow in Opposition to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed
Date: February 15, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 03, 2020Declaration of Will Montes in Support of Opposition to Motion
Date: February 15, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 23, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) by Electronic Service
Date: November 04, 2020Certificate of Mailing for
Date: February 08, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: January 14, 2022Paper Exhibits (Compendium of Evidence ISO its Renewed MSA) filed.
Date: November 19, 2018Declaration - Other (of Stephenie Gail Lee ISO Motion for Sanctions) filed.
Date: February 28, 2018Declaration - Other (Diane C Rodes ISO Def Reply to Renewed MSA) filed.
Date: January 30, 2019Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Protective Order re: Confidential Material) filed.
Date: December 18, 2017Motion - Other (to Opt Out Privacy Notice to Be Sent to the Class Members) filed.
Date: November 16, 2017Declaration - Other (AMENDED of Aparajit Bhowmik ISO Opposition to MSJ) filed.
Date: August 23, 2018Statement - Other (Brief as to Why no Derivative Claims. . .) filed.
Date: September 06, 2019Reply (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: February 07, 2018Motion - Other (to Sequence Discovery) filed.
Date: March 09, 2018Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation) filed.
Date: October 11, 2017Notice - Other (of Non-Compliance) filed.
Date: March 15, 2019Declaration - Other (of Aparajit Bhowmik in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: January 18, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: February 22, 2018Motion for Summary Adjudication filed.
Date: February 05, 2018Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to Requests for Production of Doc) filed.
Date: January 17, 2018Reply (Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: March 15, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: December 05, 2018Objection (To Plaintiffs' Trial Plan) filed.
Date: March 06, 2020Minutes finalized for heard on 04/17/2018 10:48:00 AM .
Date: April 17, 2018Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: April 17, 2018Exhibit List (ISO MSA) filed.
Date: February 05, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: August 01, 2017Declaration - Other (of Michael Parker) filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Statement - Other (In support of Motion to Compel Request for Production Set One) filed.
Date: January 17, 2018Correspondence (RE: Dropping 2/13/18 Hearings (2)) filed.
Date: February 05, 2018Motion for Approval of Notice to Class filed.
Date: November 25, 2019Proof of Service filed.
Date: February 14, 2022Proof of Service (Amended) filed.
Date: September 06, 2019Proof of Service filed.
Date: February 28, 2018Declaration - Other (of Stephanie Gail Lee in Support of Opposition) filed.
Date: December 05, 2017Declaration - Other (Of Shaun Setareh ISO Motion) filed.
Date: June 17, 2022Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: February 23, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: September 22, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: November 27, 2017Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Complex set on 10/16/2020 03:00:00 PM published .
Date: October 15, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO defs Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA) filed.
Date: November 19, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: December 05, 2017Proof of Service filed.
Date: January 30, 2019Proof of Service filed.
Date: June 25, 2021Motion - Other (Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement) filed.
Date: February 14, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: January 14, 2022Minutes finalized for heard on 02/08/2022 11:01:00 AM .
Date: February 08, 2022Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: December 22, 2017Statement - Other (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: December 01, 2017Response (to plfs Statement ISO Motion to Compel Request for Production) filed.
Date: July 03, 2018Statement - Other (ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed.
Date: March 09, 2018Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: October 08, 2021Declaration - Other (Nicholas J Horton ISO Def Reply to Renewed MSA) filed.
Date: January 30, 2019Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 10/16/2020 03:00:00 PM .
Date: October 16, 2020Declaration - Other (Dec of Diane C Rodes) filed.
Date: January 23, 2018Opposition (AMENDED Opposition to MSJ) filed.
Date: August 23, 2018Answer filed.
Date: September 06, 2017Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to Requests for Production of Docs) filed.
Date: December 01, 2017Complaint (Consolidated) filed.
Date: December 22, 2017Declaration - Other (of Tomas R Arana ISO Motion for Class Certification) filed.
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration - Other (Stephanie Gail ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed.
Date: March 09, 2018Case Management Statement filed.
Date: October 26, 2018Response (to Plf Objections to Evidence) filed.
Date: January 30, 2019Declaration - Other (of Piya Mukherjee in Support of Ex Parte) filed.
Date: December 05, 2018Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defs MSA) filed.
Date: April 20, 2018Motion to Certify Class filed.
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration - Other (of Michael Kunkel) filed.
Date: May 07, 2018Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: November 26, 2018Statement of Undisputed Facts (ISO MSA) filed.
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Ruling filed.
Date: December 12, 2017Amended Complaint (First) filed.
Date: June 29, 2017Declaration - Other (Eric R Lietzow) filed.
Date: March 20, 2018Statement - Other (ISO Motion to Compel Request for Production Set One) filed.
Date: March 20, 2018Stipulation (Stipulation Re Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed.
Date: February 22, 2018Answer (of Health Net of California Inc) filed.
Date: July 06, 2017Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: April 29, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO MSA) filed.
Date: February 05, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: April 03, 2018Opposition (to Motion for Monetary Sanctions) filed.
Date: March 14, 2018Opposition (to Plntf Andrea Spears Motion for an Order for Optout Privacy Notice) filed.
Date: December 05, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed.
Date: March 09, 2018Summons filed.
Date: April 05, 2017Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: November 21, 2018Statement of Undisputed Facts (ISO defs Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA) filed.
Date: November 19, 2018Response (Separate Statement of Disputed Material Facts in Opposition) filed.
Date: January 18, 2019Proposed Order (Granting Motion) filed.
Date: July 17, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: February 07, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Correspondence (RE: Dropping hearings of 1/4/18) filed.
Date: December 28, 2017Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: November 16, 2017Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories) filed.
Date: December 06, 2017Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: November 22, 2017Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: December 19, 2017Declaration - Other (of Aparajit Bhowmik ISO Opposition to MSJ) filed.
Date: April 11, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: June 20, 2018Stipulation and Order (RE: Document Production) filed.
Date: June 18, 2018Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: February 08, 2018Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories) filed.
Date: January 17, 2018Complaint filed.
Date: April 05, 2017Case Management Statement filed.
Date: March 15, 2018Statement - Other (In support of Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One) filed.
Date: January 17, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Def Motion for Monetary Sanctions) filed.
Date: March 20, 2018Order After Hearing (Granting Motion for Preliminary Approval) filed.
Date: March 10, 2022Case Management Statement filed.
Date: October 30, 2018Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 09/27/2019 03:00:00 PM .
Date: September 27, 2019Reply (ISO Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed.
Date: April 02, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: April 05, 2017Proof of Service filed.
Date: February 06, 2019Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Complex set on 02/15/2018 09:30:00 AM published .
Date: February 14, 2018Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: February 26, 2019Answer (to consolidated complaint) filed.
Date: January 22, 2018Motion to Strike (Arana's Representative Paga Claims) filed.
Date: March 06, 2020Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: July 17, 2018Proposed Judgment filed.
Date: August 04, 2022Declaration - Other (of Susan Shaw in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Motion for Sanctions filed.
Date: February 28, 2018Declaration - Other (Chrissy Schneider ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed.
Date: March 09, 2018Report - Other (Status Report) filed.
Date: May 07, 2018Reply (MemoISO Motion for Opt Out Privacy Notice to Be Sent to the Aggrieved Employees) filed.
Date: December 11, 2017Order - Other (ORDER & Joint Stipulation to Continue Status Conference) filed.
Date: March 27, 2023Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Special Sets heard on 12/14/2018 02:00:00 PM .
Date: December 14, 2018Opposition (to Motion to Strike Respresentative PAGA Claims) filed.
Date: May 07, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: October 23, 2018Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Set Hearing Date) filed.
Date: May 14, 2019Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: October 09, 2020Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: May 07, 2018Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: February 05, 2018Notice - Other (Of Conformed Order Granting Class Certification) filed.
Date: October 16, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: December 14, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: July 10, 2018Proposed Order (Granting Class Certification) filed.
Date: September 24, 2019Opposition (to MSJ) filed.
Date: April 11, 2018Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: August 09, 2017Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Complex heard on 08/30/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: August 30, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: December 04, 2017Declaration - Other (Dec of Chrissy Schneider83) filed.
Date: January 23, 2018Case Management Statement filed.
Date: March 18, 2020Declaration - Other (of Timothy J Long ISO Motion for Sanctions) filed.
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Errata filed.
Date: May 18, 2020Declaration - Other (of Timothy J Long in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration - Other (Dec of Stephanie Gail Lee) filed.
Date: January 23, 2018Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 11/09/2018 10:30:00 AM .
Date: November 09, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: March 15, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: December 08, 2017Minutes finalized for heard on 10/23/2018 11:12:00 AM .
Date: October 23, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: March 20, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: August 23, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: January 21, 2018Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: January 21, 2022Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: June 29, 2017Proof of Service filed.
Date: April 02, 2018Opposition (to defs Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed.
Date: March 26, 2018Minutes finalized for heard on 10/11/2017 11:21:00 AM .
Date: October 11, 2017Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 11/13/2020 01:30:00 PM .
Date: November 13, 2020Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - Complex set on 08/30/2019 02:00:00 PM published .
Date: August 29, 2019Proof of Service (Fed Ex) filed.
Date: December 11, 2017Proof of Service filed.
Date: April 09, 2018Declaration - Other (of Timothy J Long in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: December 12, 2018Minutes finalized for heard on 03/19/2020 10:29:00 AM .
Date: March 19, 2020Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard on 04/11/2019 10:00:00 AM .
Date: April 11, 2019Declaration - Other (of Crystal Martinez) filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 12/08/2017 10:30:00 AM .
Date: December 08, 2017Reply (ISO plfs Motion to Compel Further Responses) filed.
Date: July 10, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: December 12, 2018Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: July 30, 2021Opposition (to Motion for Class Certification) filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard on 08/30/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: August 30, 20193DCA order denying petition for writ
Date: April 30, 2019Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 12/18/2019 02:00:00 PM .
Date: December 18, 2019Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Regarding Document Production) filed.
Date: June 18, 2018Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: February 08, 2022Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 10/08/2021 11:00:00 AM .
Date: October 08, 2021Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Complex heard on 03/09/2018 11:30:00 AM .
Date: March 09, 2018Reply (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: March 15, 2019Minutes finalized for heard on 02/07/2022 01:21:00 PM .
Date: February 07, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (Production) filed.
Date: June 20, 2018Declaration - Other (of Thomas Segal in Support of Reply) filed.
Date: March 15, 2019Notice - Other (of Renewed Motion and Renewed MSA) filed.
Date: November 19, 2018Declaration - Other (of H Scott Leviant ISO Motion for Class Certification) filed.
Date: December 21, 2018Order - Other (Stipulation and Protective Order Re Confidential Material) filed.
Date: December 20, 2017Statement - Other (Joint Statement Re Remaining Disputes Re Opt-Out Notice) filed.
Date: December 27, 2017Notice - Other (of Supplemental Authority) filed.
Date: August 27, 2020Opposition (to Defs Renewed Motion for Summary Adjudication) filed.
Date: January 18, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion for Sanctions) filed.
Date: February 28, 2018Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Complex heard on 10/16/2020 03:00:00 PM .
Date: October 16, 2020Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: December 21, 2018Response (to CMC Statement Re: PAGA Trial Plan) filed.
Date: September 26, 2019Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: April 26, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: February 07, 2022Declaration - Other (Supp Dec of Rodes ISO Renewed MSJ) filed.
Date: November 21, 2018Case Management Statement filed.
Date: December 11, 2019Notice of Entry of Order (to Withdraw Declarations) filed.
Date: February 27, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: July 09, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: March 23, 2023Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 01/14/2022 09:30:00 AM .
Date: January 14, 2022Minutes finalized for heard on 02/04/2021 04:05:00 PM .
Date: February 04, 2021Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Withdraw Declarations) filed.
Date: February 07, 2019Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 11/04/2022 01:30:00 PM .
Date: November 04, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: January 17, 2018Statement - Other (Case Management Conference Statement) filed.
Date: March 14, 2018Order - Other (Order Granting Class Certification) filed.
Date: October 08, 2019Reply (Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Def Renewed MSA) filed.
Date: January 30, 2019Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 12/18/2017 09:00:00 AM .
Date: December 18, 2017Declaration - Other (of Aparajit Bhowmik in Support of Notice) filed.
Date: March 15, 2019Complaint submitted by Spears, Andrea rejected on 06/26/2017 .
Date: June 26, 2017Declaration - Other (Ian G Stewart ISO Def Motion to Sequence Discovery) filed.
Date: March 09, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: December 06, 2017Opposition (to Motion to Continue Hearing Date & Briefing Schedule) filed.
Date: December 12, 2018Proof of Service (Fed Ex) filed.
Date: March 14, 2018Declaration - Other (Of Madely Nava Of ILYM Group Inc ISO Motion) filed.
Date: June 17, 2022Motion to Compel - Other (Further Responses to Special Interrogatories) filed.
Date: March 20, 2018Statement - Other (Memorandum in Opposition to Ex Parte Application for OST) filed.
Date: December 07, 2018Proof of Service filed.
Date: April 11, 2018Minutes finalized for heard on 10/11/2017 11:06:00 AM .
Date: October 11, 2017Proof of Service filed.
Date: January 18, 2019Reply (Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts ISO Renewed MSA) filed.
Date: January 30, 2019Reply (Amended Reply Memorandum of Points and Auth in Support of Defs MSA) filed.
Date: September 14, 2018Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: April 20, 2022Complaint filed.
Date: August 01, 2017Order - Other (Stipulation and Order for Approval of Class Notice) filed.
Date: December 12, 2019Paper Exhibits (Compendium of Evidence in Support of Amended Reply) filed.
Date: September 14, 2018Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Complex heard on 02/15/2018 09:30:00 AM .
Date: February 15, 2018Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: October 11, 2017Case Management Statement filed.
Date: November 22, 2017Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .
Date: June 01, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: January 23, 2018Motion to Continue Hearing filed.
Date: July 17, 2018Opposition (to Motion as to Why SPears Case Should not Proceed) filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Stipulation and Order (Regarding Document Production) filed.
Date: June 19, 2018Minutes finalized for heard on 04/20/2022 04:38:00 PM .
Date: April 20, 2022Motion - Other submitted by Spears, Andrea rejected on 06/20/2022 .
Date: June 20, 2022Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: April 26, 2019Declaration - Other (of Sheena Boehl) filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: August 06, 2019Proof of Service filed.
Date: June 18, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: November 03, 2020Case Management Statement filed.
Date: January 29, 2021Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: December 11, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: September 24, 2019Notice - Other (of Withdrawal of Motion for Order Approving Class Notice) filed.
Date: December 11, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: September 30, 2019Minutes finalized for heard on 04/24/2020 02:54:00 PM .
Date: April 24, 2020Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: August 04, 2021Proof of Service filed.
Date: January 24, 2020Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: June 25, 2021Order After Hearing filed.
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Service (by Electronic Service) filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Continue Status Conference) filed.
Date: March 23, 2023Proof of Service filed.
Date: October 21, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: December 18, 2019Declaration - Other (of Victoria B Rivapalacio iso the joint report) filed.
Date: May 07, 2018Reply (to Amended Responsive Separate Statement of Disputed Material Facts to Defs MSA) filed.
Date: September 14, 2018Statement - Other (Trial Presentation and Management Plan) filed.
Date: January 24, 2020Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: August 01, 2018Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: April 05, 2019Proposed Order ((Proposed) Order Granting Class Certification) filed.
Date: October 04, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: September 20, 2019Motion to Strike (Spears' Representative PAGA Claims) filed.
Date: March 06, 2020Reply (Separate Statement in Support of MSA) filed.
Date: April 20, 2018Objection (to Evidence offered by defs ISO defs MSJ) filed.
Date: January 18, 2019Declaration - Other (Dec of Electronic Service) filed.
Date: December 07, 2018Minute Order from Court of Appeal Staying Proceedings
Date: April 10, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: November 09, 2018Declaration - Other (of Piy Mucherjee in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: November 25, 2019Proof of Service filed.
Date: June 17, 2022Ex Parte Application - Other (for Order to Show Cause RE Contempt Toby Alfred) filed.
Date: February 06, 2019Summons filed.
Date: August 01, 2017Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: March 09, 2018Statement - Other (ISO Motion to Compel Special Interrogatories Set One) filed.
Date: March 20, 2018Reply (ISO Plaintiff's Trial Presentation and Management Plan) filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Statement of Undisputed Facts (and Additional Facts in Opposition to MSJ) filed.
Date: April 11, 2018Motion - Other (To Sequence Discovery) filed.
Date: January 23, 2018Case Management Statement filed.
Date: December 05, 2019Correspondence (RE: Dropping Motions to Compel hearings of 1/4/2018) filed.
Date: December 26, 2017Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (for Approval of Class Notice) filed.
Date: December 11, 2019Proof of Service filed.
Date: February 08, 2018Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: December 07, 2018Proof of Service (Electronic Service) filed.
Date: May 06, 2020Minutes finalized for heard on 01/09/2020 02:13:00 PM .
Date: January 09, 2020Ex Parte Application - Other (for Order to Show Cause RE Contempt James Bjorseth) filed.
Date: February 06, 2019Stipulation (to set Hearing Date) filed.
Date: June 18, 2019Proof of Service filed.
Date: April 20, 2018Case Management Statement filed.
Date: January 28, 2021Declaration - Other (of Tomas R. Arana in Support of Reply) filed.
Date: March 15, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: April 11, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: March 15, 2018Motion - Other (For Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement) filed.
Date: June 17, 2022Case Management Statement filed.
Date: November 04, 2020Stipulation and Order (Set Case Management Conference and Motion to Strike Hearing Dates) filed.
Date: September 25, 2020Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: January 28, 2021Proof of Service filed.
Date: November 25, 2019Declaration - Other (of Nicholas J Horton in Support of ExParte) filed.
Date: February 06, 2019Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: December 05, 2018Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: March 19, 2020Declaration - Other (of Mynor Masaya) filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: November 13, 2020Proposed Order (Final Approval Order And Judgment) filed.
Date: June 17, 2022Declaration - Other (of Charles Pearson) filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: December 28, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: January 09, 2020Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: April 29, 2022Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: February 07, 2019Proof of Service (by Electronic Service) filed.
Date: November 04, 2020Proof of Service (By Electronic Service) filed.
Date: January 29, 2021Declaration - Other (of James Toney ISO Motion for Class Certification) filed.
Date: December 21, 2018Notice - Other (of Order Granting Application to Seal) filed.
Date: September 04, 2019Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: May 31, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: February 04, 2021Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Complex heard on 02/26/2021 11:30:00 AM .
Date: February 26, 2021Declaration - Other (of Nicholas J Horton in support of Exparte) filed.
Date: February 06, 2019Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: September 22, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: April 24, 2020Minutes finalized for heard on 03/23/2023 09:23:00 AM .
Date: March 23, 2023Minutes finalized for heard on 07/30/2021 11:04:00 AM .
Date: July 30, 2021Declaration - Other (of Timothy J Long in Support of Reply to Motion) filed.
Date: March 15, 2019Statement - Other (Concerning Any Trial Plan Proposed) filed.
Date: September 12, 2019Response (Joint Response To Objections To Settlement) filed.
Date: June 17, 2022Objection (to Evidence) filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Declaration - Other (of Will Montes in Support of Opposition to Motion) filed.
Date: February 15, 2019Statement - Other (Separate Stmt ISO Motion to Compel Discovery) filed.
Date: June 20, 2018Objection (to Notice of Ruling) filed.
Date: December 18, 2017Proof of Service filed.
Date: March 26, 2018Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: December 01, 2017Proof of Service filed.
Date: July 03, 2018Minutes finalized for heard on 10/22/2020 02:05:00 PM .
Date: October 22, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: October 22, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: February 26, 2021Joint Case Management Statement filed.
Date: October 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 |
Notice of Department Relocation Document |
||
January 09, 2024 |
Notice of Department Relocation Scheduling |
||
June 01, 2023 |
Minute Order (Status Conference - Civil Special Sets post judgment hearing) Document |
||
June 01, 2023 |
Minute Order (Status Conference - Civil Special Sets post judgment hearing) Scheduling |
||
June 01, 2023 |
Minute Order (Status Conference - Civil Special Sets post judgment hearing) Minute Order |
||
June 01, 2023 |
Minute Order (Status Conference - Civil Special Sets post judgment hearing) Form |
||
June 01, 2023 |
Status Conference - Civil Special Sets post judgment hearing scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 01:30 PM in Gordon D. Schaber Superior Court at Department 27 updated: Result Date to 06/01/2023 Result Type to Held Event |
||
June 01, 2023 |
Minute Order (Status Conference - Civil Special Sets post judgment hearing) Minute Order |
||
June 01, 2023 |
Status Conference compliance hearing scheduled for 06/27/2024 at 01:30 PM in Gordon D. Schaber Superior Court at Department 27 Event |
||
May 31, 2023 |
Tentative Ruling (Status Conference - Civil Special Sets post judgment hearing) Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.