Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Arntsen Family Partnership, Lp, Arntsen, Robert, Brian Christopher Dunn Custodianship, Ho, John, Huang, Quanyu, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) (16) Unlimited Fraud case represented by Vierra, Collin J, against Black Horse Holdings, Llc, Bragg, David M, Caproc Iii, Llc, Davis, Gregory J, Huang, Quanyu, (total of 22) See All represented by Aldover, Ernesto F., Chong, Jessica E, Poe, Mark, Steenis, Ryan Van, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Finigan, Jeffrey R. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFinigan, Jeffrey R. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2022 |
Category(16) Unlimited Fraud |
Last RefreshedApril 12, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Bragg_SVRV_Notice_of_2nd_Payment
Date: April 12, 202495102Proof02b6da
Date: April 02, 202495102Plain00ead5
Date: April 02, 202495013Proof01a848
Date: March 30, 202495013Plain006978
Date: March 30, 202494983PARAM00817d
Date: March 29, 202494961MOTIO006446
Date: March 29, 2024Bragg_SVRV_Directed_Verdict_Motion
Date: March 29, 2024Exh. 121_Native_track_record
Date: March 29, 202494922Proof010a95
Date: March 29, 202494922Reque003c28
Date: March 29, 202494467Proof01bad6
Date: March 22, 202494467Plain001f45
Date: March 22, 202494170Proof011230
Date: March 19, 202494170Plain00cdb9
Date: March 19, 202494170Proof017928
Date: March 19, 202494170Decla005509
Date: March 19, 202494170Proof016629
Date: March 19, 202494170Plain00d571
Date: March 19, 202494116DEFEN0058de
Date: March 18, 202493884Proof01e86e
Date: March 14, 202493884Plain00eade
Date: March 14, 202493701Proof01cbcb
Date: March 12, 202493701Decla0065c4
Date: March 12, 202493695Plain007c77
Date: March 12, 202493695Proof01d727
Date: March 12, 202493693Defen00e597
Date: March 12, 202493653Propo014ceb
Date: March 11, 202493653JOINT00255d
Date: March 11, 202493607Proof01fcc9
Date: March 11, 202493607Plain00779c
Date: March 11, 2024Bragg_SVRV_Amended_Witness_List_Final
Date: March 10, 202493555Defen0060cd
Date: March 08, 202493543Proof01d6b3
Date: March 08, 202493543Plain00d825
Date: March 08, 202493544PLAIN005012
Date: March 08, 202493544Proof0146bf
Date: March 08, 2024Proposed_Order_Mod_Feb.23 2024_Order Final_Re
Date: March 08, 202493536Notic00b54e
Date: March 08, 2024Bragg_SVRV_Notice_of_1st_Payment
Date: March 08, 202493519JOINT04b62e
Date: March 08, 202493519Proof0372be
Date: March 08, 202493519JOINT059918
Date: March 08, 202493519Propo026f36
Date: March 08, 202493519Propo0147a6
Date: March 08, 202493519Reque00afa0
Date: March 08, 202493454DEFEN00e980
Date: March 07, 202493373Exhib004c20
Date: March 06, 202493371031120015ca
Date: March 06, 202493310Proof012195
Date: March 06, 202493310Plain00f7ce
Date: March 06, 2024RVS_Decl_Consilio_Mistake_Executed_w_Exh
Date: March 05, 202493205DEFEN0090ac
Date: March 05, 202493201PARAM002217
Date: March 05, 202493167Notic000c8f
Date: March 04, 202493218Proof01932f
Date: March 05, 202493218Reply0090b2
Date: March 05, 202493217Proof017ef0
Date: March 05, 202493217Objec00c466
Date: March 05, 202493217Proof01511b
Date: March 05, 202493217Propo002651
Date: March 05, 202493217Respo00b23b
Date: March 05, 202493217Proof0187eb
Date: March 05, 2024POS for Proposed MIL Order For Filing
Date: March 05, 2024Bragg_SVRV_Opposition_MILs
Date: March 05, 20249320631120022501
Date: March 05, 20249320631124018f75
Date: March 05, 20249320631124005632
Date: March 05, 2024Bragg_SVRV_Declaration_Re__Monetary_Sanctions
Date: March 01, 2024Bragg_SVRV_Notice_Attend_Trial
Date: March 01, 202493021Proof0163a7
Date: March 01, 202493021Ackno003047
Date: March 01, 202493021Proof015987
Date: March 01, 202493021Plain008b69
Date: March 01, 202492758Proof01fd6f
Date: February 27, 202492758Notic008b43
Date: February 27, 2024Bragg_SVRV_WD_MTN_to_Modify
Date: February 27, 202492370Amend0092c8
Date: February 21, 202492359Proof01f6a5
Date: February 21, 202492359Notic00d742
Date: February 21, 202492359Proof025308
Date: February 21, 202492359Exhib01c088
Date: February 21, 202492359Decla00aec8
Date: February 21, 202492359Proof027b05
Date: February 21, 202492359Propo01ecc1
Date: February 21, 202492359Motio001b7d
Date: February 21, 202492359Proof02eb0a
Date: February 21, 202492359Propo01beeb
Date: February 21, 202492359Motio001b96
Date: February 21, 202492359Proof027eaa
Date: February 21, 202492359Propo014a0a
Date: February 21, 202492359Plain009a0d
Date: February 21, 202492359Proof02d51e
Date: February 21, 202492359Propo01cfd5
Date: February 21, 202492359Motio009b4a
Date: February 21, 202492359Proof02e892
Date: February 21, 202492359Propo012552
Date: February 21, 202492359Plain00b600
Date: February 21, 202492359Proof025552
Date: February 21, 202492359Propo010c18
Date: February 21, 202492359Plain00d309
Date: February 21, 202492359Proof02b3d0
Date: February 21, 202492359Propo014dfb
Date: February 21, 202492359Plain00ed84
Date: February 21, 202492359Proof02935b
Date: February 21, 202492359Propo018a16
Date: February 21, 202492359Plain001183
Date: February 21, 202492358Proof03e0a8
Date: February 21, 202492358Propo0295f2
Date: February 21, 202492358Propo017b67
Date: February 21, 202492358Motio0178fc
Date: February 21, 202492358Plain005225
Date: February 21, 202492358Proof024341
Date: February 21, 202492358Plain00e8bf
Date: February 21, 202492358Proof02faac
Date: February 21, 202492358Propo013b1e
Date: February 21, 202492358Plain00920c
Date: February 21, 202492358Proof025c78
Date: February 21, 202492358Propo01bb42
Date: February 21, 202492358Plain0066fd
Date: February 21, 202492357Proof01101f
Date: February 21, 202492357Plain00ea05
Date: February 21, 202492354Proof018c50
Date: February 21, 202492354Plain00f426
Date: February 21, 2024Bragg_SVRV_Motion_in_Limine
Date: February 20, 2024MIL 1_Proposed_Order Final
Date: February 20, 2024Bragg_SVRV_Trial_Brief Updated
Date: February 20, 2024Bragg_SVRV_Witness_List
Date: February 20, 202492265Trial0023ba
Date: February 20, 202492265Propo007756
Date: February 20, 202492261Proof0158ae
Date: February 20, 202492261Plain00b6df
Date: February 20, 202492265Witne00fb69
Date: February 20, 202492126Exhib02fc1b
Date: February 16, 202492126Plain002cdf
Date: February 16, 202492128Proof01b511
Date: February 16, 202492126Proof03cc6e
Date: February 16, 202492126Reply01fa6b
Date: February 16, 202492069Proof006f7b
Date: February 15, 202491809Reque00a15b
Date: February 12, 202491809Proof01d591
Date: February 12, 2024RVS Declaration Add Exhibits
Date: February 09, 2024Bragg_SVRV_Opp_Jan222024_MTC
Date: February 09, 202490515Exhib086f17
Date: January 23, 202490515Proof072557
Date: January 23, 202490515Propo05c88a
Date: January 23, 202490515Separ0303bf
Date: January 23, 202490515Decla020e6c
Date: January 23, 202490515Propo048760
Date: January 23, 202490515Memor014ddf
Date: January 23, 202490515Notic00baee
Date: January 23, 202490515Emerg0606c2
Date: January 23, 202454829Civil015a92
Date: March 16, 202254829Compl007c28
Date: March 16, 202254854Amend001e9c
Date: March 16, 2022Summons Issued / Filed
Date: March 16, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: March 16, 202257715Proof0054a0
Date: May 16, 202257717Affid01c8c1
Date: May 16, 202257715Proof007e62
Date: May 16, 202257717Proof00f414
Date: May 16, 202257716Proof0099cb
Date: May 16, 202257716Proof00352a
Date: May 16, 202257716Proof000350
Date: May 16, 202257716Proof00314e
Date: May 16, 202257717Affid016483
Date: May 16, 202257717Proof003f9b
Date: May 16, 202257740Affid01dfb0
Date: May 17, 202257740Proof0046ff
Date: May 17, 202258808Answe008d0d
Date: June 09, 202258847Proof019b27
Date: June 10, 202258847Reque002770
Date: June 10, 202258847Proof03f89a
Date: June 10, 202258847Proof02dd42
Date: June 10, 202258847Affid001107
Date: June 10, 202258847Proof04e0b0
Date: June 10, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: June 10, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: June 10, 202258877Reque002353
Date: June 10, 202258877Proof05f9b0
Date: June 10, 2022Affidavit
Date: May 16, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of
Date: May 16, 202258877Proof036bf6
Date: June 10, 202258877Proof022365
Date: June 10, 202258877Proof040510
Date: June 10, 202258877Proof01069a
Date: June 10, 202258877Proof07493c
Date: June 10, 202258877Proof062138
Date: June 10, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: June 10, 2022Affidavit
Date: June 09, 2022Answer (Unlimited)
Date: June 09, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of
Date: May 17, 2022(Paramont) [P] Order App Pro Hac Vice tf (2)
Date: June 14, 2022(Paramont) DECL (EFA) ISO App Pro Hac Vice tf (2)
Date: June 14, 2022(Paramont) App Pro Hac Vice tf (2)
Date: June 14, 202259116Reque00756d
Date: June 16, 202259104Demur00a8c0
Date: June 15, 202259104Decla019d15
Date: June 15, 2022(Paramont) [P] Order App Pro Hac Vice tf (2)
Date: June 18, 2022(Paramont) App Pro Hac Vice tf (2)
Date: June 18, 2022(Paramont) DECL (EFA) ISO App Pro Hac Vice tf (2)
Date: June 18, 2022Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties)
Date: June 15, 2022Demurrer to
Date: June 15, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: June 17, 2022Declaration of Demurring or Moving Party Regarding Meet
Date: June 15, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: June 17, 2022Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: June 17, 202259601CaseM00647f
Date: June 27, 202259673CaseM000204
Date: June 29, 202259681CaseM00c958
Date: June 29, 2022Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: June 27, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 28, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 30, 2022Request to Enter Default
Date: June 29, 202260243Propo03f987
Date: July 12, 202260243Motio00d88b
Date: July 12, 202260243Decla019759
Date: July 12, 202260243Proof04c97c
Date: July 12, 202260243Exhib025fda
Date: July 12, 202260315Exhib008462
Date: July 13, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 12, 2022Order Denying
Date: July 07, 2022Exhibits submitted in support of
Date: July 13, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: July 07, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: July 12, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: July 12, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: July 07, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: July 12, 202260527Stipu00c04c
Date: July 18, 202289169Statu00bc18
Date: December 29, 202389169Proof01e6fb
Date: December 29, 2023Complaint
Date: March 15, 202288367Vierr01d011
Date: December 14, 202388367Oppos00ebb4
Date: December 14, 202388367Proof02848b
Date: December 14, 202388204Propo00b669
Date: December 12, 202388204Propo01d917
Date: December 12, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance 12112023
Date: December 07, 202387735Trial00c6ac
Date: December 04, 202387735Proof023a5c
Date: December 04, 202387735Proof018b46
Date: December 04, 202387683Reply05c987
Date: December 04, 202387683Reply04c667
Date: December 04, 202387683Exhib02437b
Date: December 04, 202387683RepyD03a776
Date: December 04, 202387683Proof06c96f
Date: December 04, 202387683Reply016461
Date: December 04, 202387683Plain003bf5
Date: December 04, 2023Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of
Date: May 16, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 02, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: August 25, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 29, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 02, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: August 25, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: August 10, 2022Ex Parte Order
Date: August 15, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 22, 2022Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: August 10, 2022Exhibits submitted in support of
Date: August 25, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: August 25, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 01, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 02, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 01, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 01, 2022Notice of Hearing re
Date: August 03, 2022First Amended Complaint
Date: August 22, 2022Order
Date: August 03, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: August 01, 2022Stipulation & Order
Date: July 26, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: August 01, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: August 01, 2022Declaration in Reply
Date: August 01, 2022Application
Date: August 01, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 27, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: August 03, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 01, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 25, 2022Affidavit
Date: May 17, 2022Stipulation
Date: June 02, 2023Request for Default
Date: June 02, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: September 09, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 15, 2023Application
Date: June 30, 2023Motion / Petition to Compel Arbitration
Date: October 20, 2023Answer
Date: July 31, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: September 29, 2023Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: September 18, 2023Second Amended Complaint
Date: June 30, 2023Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 07, 2022Supplemental
Date: September 12, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: June 12, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: May 15, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 13, 2023Order
Date: June 13, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 11, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: October 05, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 15, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 18, 2023Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: November 04, 2022Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of
Date: September 20, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: December 14, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: September 18, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion to Vacate
Date: March 23, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: September 18, 2023Notice of Hearing re
Date: November 30, 2022Notice of Hearing re
Date: September 18, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 15, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: November 14, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: September 18, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion for Entry of Judgment (CCP 664.6
Date: March 21, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: March 21, 2023Informal Discovery Conference
Date: June 07, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: May 19, 2023Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: September 12, 2023Demurrer to Complaint
Date: August 25, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: August 18, 2023Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: September 30, 2022Declaration in Reply
Date: August 11, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: August 11, 2023Informal Discovery Conference
Date: September 27, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: March 21, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 18, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 12, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: September 15, 2023Order
Date: August 22, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: June 12, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: June 02, 2023Request for Default
Date: May 26, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: September 18, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: May 26, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: May 22, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: May 19, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: June 13, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: June 12, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: May 15, 2023Supplemental
Date: September 12, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: August 25, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: August 22, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: June 09, 2023Order
Date: August 04, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion for Sanctions
Date: October 05, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: May 22, 2023Informal Discovery Conference
Date: April 20, 2023Separate Statement
Date: June 12, 2023Exhibit to Declaration
Date: September 18, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: September 15, 2023Order
Date: December 14, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: October 27, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: September 30, 2022Declaration in Support
Date: September 09, 2022Exhibit to Declaration
Date: September 09, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: September 16, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: September 16, 2022Order
Date: September 30, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: September 21, 2023Notice of Motion and Motion for Trial Preference
Date: September 18, 2023Answer (Unlimited)
Date: October 10, 2023Hearing on Demurrer
Date: September 29, 2023Exhibit to Declaration
Date: June 12, 2023Hearing on Demurrer
Date: May 26, 2023Exhibit to Declaration
Date: August 11, 2023Motion to Set Aside Default/Judgment
Date: June 02, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: September 25, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: September 09, 2022Demurrer to Amended Complaint
Date: March 22, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: May 19, 202387319Decla01a0f0
Date: November 28, 202387319Oppos00cdc0
Date: November 28, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 07, 2023Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: July 17, 2023Exhibits submitted in support of
Date: March 21, 2023Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 30, 2023Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 13, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: June 12, 2023Stipulation & Order
Date: March 15, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: March 22, 2023Proposed Order Received
Date: March 09, 202361170Proof00fd72
Date: July 30, 202261153PlsAp00cac1
Date: July 29, 202261153Decla01fdd1
Date: July 29, 202261153Propo02d1df
Date: July 29, 202261197Plain008783
Date: August 01, 202261197Decla017860
Date: August 01, 202261197Propo020dd3
Date: August 01, 202261240Reply003b28
Date: August 02, 202261240Reply01f82d
Date: August 02, 202261240Proof02fed3
Date: August 02, 2022Defendants Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs
Date: August 02, 2022Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Applicati
Date: August 02, 2022Declaration of Ryan van Steenis ISO of Defend
Date: August 02, 2022NJR App Pro Hac Vice (4475324.1) 8-9-22
Date: August 09, 2022Order NJR Pro Hac Vice
Date: August 09, 2022Dec Aldover Reisch pro hac
Date: August 09, 2022NJR App Pro Hac Vice (4475324.1) 8-10-22
Date: August 10, 2022Dec Aldover ISO PHV of NJR final
Date: August 10, 2022Notice of Ruling re Ex Parte App re PHV 8-15-2022
Date: August 19, 202262329First000b90
Date: August 22, 202262329Proof0169ad
Date: August 22, 202262440Notic00b10b
Date: August 24, 202262440Decla019bdf
Date: August 24, 202262440Exhib022542
Date: August 24, 202262440Propo0355d8
Date: August 24, 202262440Proof043511
Date: August 24, 202262523Decla011bbf
Date: August 25, 202262523Notic00d5b8
Date: August 25, 202262523Exhib02c09b
Date: August 25, 202262523Proof0438cb
Date: August 25, 202262523Propo03efef
Date: August 25, 202262590Amend003ac7
Date: August 26, 202262602Amend00ba57
Date: August 26, 202262936Defen008b6e
Date: September 02, 202262936Decla01b2a8
Date: September 02, 2022Bragg SVRV Opp to MTC 1 and 2
Date: September 02, 2022RVS Declaration to Opp to MTC
Date: September 02, 2022Exhibit 2
Date: September 02, 2022Exhibit 1
Date: September 02, 2022Index of Exhibits to Opp to MTC
Date: September 02, 2022Exhibit 4
Date: September 02, 2022Exhibit 3
Date: September 02, 2022Exhibit 7
Date: September 02, 2022Exhibit 6
Date: September 02, 2022Exhibit 8
Date: September 02, 2022Exhibit 9
Date: September 02, 2022Bragg SVRV Opp to MTC 1 and 2
Date: September 06, 2022Index of Exhibits to Opp to MTC
Date: September 06, 2022RVS Declaration to Opp to MTC
Date: September 08, 202263245Reply0059e5
Date: September 10, 202263245Reply017df4
Date: September 10, 202263245Proof03054b
Date: September 10, 202263245Exhib025976
Date: September 10, 2022Notice of Remote Appearence for 91622 Heari
Date: September 09, 202263321Notic00beb6
Date: September 13, 202263457Notic00e967
Date: September 14, 202263678Proof00894d
Date: September 20, 202263678Proof0010a3
Date: September 20, 202263718Notic009bbf
Date: September 20, 202263825Joint006206
Date: September 22, 202265012CaseM000d22
Date: October 17, 202265112Proof01f543
Date: October 19, 202265112CaseM00cd93
Date: October 19, 2022CM 180 (Bragg)
Date: October 24, 2022Proof of Electronic Service (San Mateo)
Date: November 01, 202266358Propo037501
Date: November 14, 202266358Proof04c1b7
Date: November 14, 202266358Notic00363c
Date: November 14, 202266358Appli01e22a
Date: November 14, 202266358Decla02c455
Date: November 14, 202268685Proof013b96
Date: January 04, 202368685Joint0051ad
Date: January 04, 202370715Proof018caf
Date: February 10, 202370715Reque003a89
Date: February 10, 202370974Proof01abd9
Date: February 15, 202370974Reque00d89c
Date: February 15, 202371474Amend005883
Date: February 24, 202371468Proof01207c
Date: February 24, 202371468Notic004a63
Date: February 24, 202371583Proof02ea0d
Date: February 28, 202371583Reque008713
Date: February 28, 202371583Proof031b84
Date: February 28, 202371583Affid01581b
Date: February 28, 202371846Proof02d4a8
Date: March 03, 202371846Reque000645
Date: March 03, 202371846Decla01df80
Date: March 03, 20238 Mar 2023_Braggs Opposition to Request for E
Date: March 09, 20238 Mar 2023_Proposed Order
Date: March 09, 20238 Mar 2023_Braggs Opposition to Request for E
Date: March 10, 202372183JOINT0067c8
Date: March 10, 20238 Mar 2023_Proposed Order
Date: March 10, 202372237Exhib01ffab
Date: March 10, 202372237Proof024370
Date: March 10, 202372237Plain00006d
Date: March 10, 202372244Stipu00e53f
Date: March 10, 202372226Notic007fc3
Date: March 10, 202372729Exhib17e300
Date: March 21, 202372729Decla08449f
Date: March 21, 202372729Decla065a5a
Date: March 21, 202372729Suppl037935
Date: March 21, 202372729Memor01e7ab
Date: March 21, 202372729Notic00db99
Date: March 21, 202372729Decla12e6ff
Date: March 21, 202372729Decla1070b7
Date: March 21, 202372729Inter0447ce
Date: March 21, 202372729Decla161833
Date: March 21, 202372729Appli056ce3
Date: March 21, 202372729Memor02f5a3
Date: March 21, 202372729Decla1467de
Date: March 21, 202372796Decla007c69
Date: March 22, 202372729Decla18d6e7
Date: March 21, 202372729Propo23bf75
Date: March 21, 202372729Proof22ef76
Date: March 21, 202372794Motio000db3
Date: March 22, 202372729Proof21195d
Date: March 21, 202372795Demur0074b3
Date: March 22, 202372729Reque192b7c
Date: March 21, 202372729Reque2073e7
Date: March 21, 202372781Exhib00f996
Date: March 21, 202372782Exhib00d7cd
Date: March 21, 202372783Exhib0054c9
Date: March 21, 202372782Exhib0034e3
Date: March 21, 202372782Exhib005972
Date: March 21, 202321 Mar 2023 Bragg SVRV CMC
Date: March 21, 202321 Mar 2023 POS for CMC
Date: March 21, 202372729Exhib07a771
Date: March 21, 202372840Notic00bd47
Date: March 22, 202372890Amend00ea51
Date: March 23, 202372811Demur005f90
Date: March 22, 202372826Decla009719
Date: March 22, 202372867CaseM007708
Date: March 23, 2023Bragg_SVRV MTS Memo of Points and Authorities
Date: March 23, 202372874CaseM002238
Date: March 23, 202372874Proof01fb7e
Date: March 23, 2023RVS Decl in support of Mtn to Set Aside Defau
Date: March 24, 2023NTC of Motion and Motion to Set Aside Default
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit 7 Final Filed MPA for MTS
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit 1 Final BK Order
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit 2 Final RFE Default
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit 3 Final Instruction to Resubmit
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit 6 Final Mar 21 2023 email to ES
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit 8 Final 1efile emails
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit 5 Final Mar 16_22 Meet and Confer
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit 11 Final Filed CMS Mar 21 2023
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit 10 Final Defendants Proposed Respons
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit 4 Final Mar 9 2023 Docket Entry
Date: March 24, 2023Exhibit 9 Final Mar 23 2023 MC email to ES
Date: March 24, 202375791Plain003cff
Date: May 16, 202375727INDEX02aa79
Date: May 15, 202375791Decla010ca8
Date: May 16, 202375791Proof020066
Date: May 16, 202375727DECLA01038d
Date: May 15, 202375727OPPOS00e70a
Date: May 15, 202375792Plain00b7d9
Date: May 16, 202375778Notic00482d
Date: May 15, 202375792Proof010ec6
Date: May 16, 202375840Propo005da0
Date: May 16, 202376101DEFEN018059
Date: May 20, 202376101DEFEN007a07
Date: May 20, 202376101ORDER03b009
Date: May 20, 202376101Notic04767f
Date: May 20, 202376101ORDER055509
Date: May 20, 202376101Notic02e6d3
Date: May 20, 202376085Exhib025d71
Date: May 19, 202376085Decla019a2c
Date: May 19, 202376088Reply00965e
Date: May 19, 202376089Proof009d4a
Date: May 19, 202376085Plain001399
Date: May 19, 2023RA10 May 26 2023 Hearing
Date: May 22, 2023RA20 May 26 2023 Hearings
Date: May 22, 2023RA20 June 2 2023 hearing
Date: May 22, 2023Ra10 June 2 2023 Hearing
Date: May 22, 2023Reply ISO of Motion to Vacate Default Final
Date: May 25, 202376703Stipu00b270
Date: June 01, 202376703Proof0166a6
Date: June 01, 202376703Stipu02de58
Date: June 01, 202376793Stipu00608b
Date: June 02, 202376793Proof025366
Date: June 02, 202376793Propo01744d
Date: June 02, 2023June 9 2023 Bragg RJN in support of MTS with
Date: June 09, 2023June 9 2023 Bragg_SVRV Notice of Motion and M
Date: June 09, 2023June 9 2023 Memorandum of Points and Authorit
Date: June 09, 2023Van Steenis Meet and Confer Decl_Motion to St
Date: June 09, 202377262Exhib0517b9
Date: June 12, 202377262Decla022632
Date: June 12, 202377262Propo041642
Date: June 12, 202377262Notic00925e
Date: June 12, 202377262Separ03cbc6
Date: June 12, 202377262Proof06ab82
Date: June 12, 202377262Memor016b82
Date: June 12, 202377285Proof01eea1
Date: June 13, 202377285Corre006ab8
Date: June 13, 202378328Proof02b1aa
Date: July 01, 202378328Secon00728e
Date: July 01, 202378328Appli011689
Date: July 01, 2023POS for General Denial_Affirmative Defenses
Date: July 31, 2023Bragg_SVRV_General Denialsigned
Date: July 31, 202380097Stipu00a3d6
Date: August 04, 202380097Propo01402b
Date: August 04, 202380119JOINT006c3f
Date: August 04, 202380119Propo0155b0
Date: August 04, 202380216Appli0004c3
Date: August 07, 202380216Appli00473c
Date: August 07, 2023Opposition to June 12 2023 Motion to Compel F
Date: August 07, 2023RVS Declaration ISO of Opposition to June 12
Date: August 07, 202380594Reply0183a0
Date: August 12, 202380596Advan00e44c
Date: August 12, 202380594Reply00e5b3
Date: August 12, 202380594Exhib020f75
Date: August 12, 202380594Proof03cac2
Date: August 12, 202380596Proof01c826
Date: August 12, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance_Aug 18 2023
Date: August 15, 202380787Notic002b7d
Date: August 16, 202381565CaseM00e358
Date: August 26, 202381565Proof018d41
Date: August 26, 202381706Demur002915
Date: August 29, 202381706DECLA01bb4a
Date: August 29, 202381706Memor029aef
Date: August 29, 202381706Motio04747e
Date: August 29, 202381706Memor033c17
Date: August 29, 202382007Exhib02e2a6
Date: September 02, 202382007Plain003f6d
Date: September 02, 202382007Decla032ec5
Date: September 02, 202382007Decla01deb9
Date: September 02, 202382007Decla0586d3
Date: September 02, 202382007Exhib048771
Date: September 02, 202382007Exhib06531d
Date: September 02, 202382007Proof076427
Date: September 02, 202382117HRG09003e1c
Date: September 06, 202382079Plain002971
Date: September 05, 202382079Decla01454f
Date: September 05, 202382079Exhib047f66
Date: September 05, 202382079Exhib02e47c
Date: September 05, 202382079Decla0542ae
Date: September 05, 202382079Decla03bbc9
Date: September 05, 202382079Exhib06db7a
Date: September 05, 2023Sept 5 2023 Bragg CMC Statement
Date: September 05, 202382079Proof077b85
Date: September 05, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance Sep 15 2023_01148
Date: September 11, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance Sep 18 2023_01148
Date: September 11, 202382661Exhib02e524
Date: September 12, 202382661Suppl01a027
Date: September 12, 202382661Proof04e1e1
Date: September 12, 202382661Proof03e79f
Date: September 12, 202382661Plain0063e9
Date: September 12, 202382963Plain002b3b
Date: September 15, 202382962Proof019b5c
Date: September 15, 202382962Plain006248
Date: September 15, 202382963Proof01494c
Date: September 15, 202383058Exhib0358c3
Date: September 18, 202383058Motio00929b
Date: September 18, 202383058Decla04e1db
Date: September 18, 202383058Decla028bf0
Date: September 18, 202383058Plain010a59
Date: September 18, 202383058Proof083ffd
Date: September 18, 202383058Decla068480
Date: September 18, 202383058Proof079eba
Date: September 18, 202383058Decla056960
Date: September 18, 202383058Proof09189e
Date: September 18, 202383240Notic008313
Date: September 20, 2023Sep 25 2025 ra010 electronic signature
Date: September 21, 202383240Notic008251
Date: September 20, 202384740Proof02602f
Date: October 16, 202384740Proof034e56
Date: October 16, 202384740Decla015342
Date: October 16, 202384740Plain005b71
Date: October 16, 2023Notice of Change of Firm Address
Date: December 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Bragg_SVRV_Notice_of_2nd_Payment | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | 95102Proof02b6da | |
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | 95102Plain00ead5 | |
March 30, 2024 | Docket Event | 95013Proof01a848 | |
March 30, 2024 | Docket Event | 95013Plain006978 | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | 94983PARAM00817d | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | 94961MOTIO006446 | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Bragg_SVRV_Directed_Verdict_Motion | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Exh. 121_Native_track_record |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.