Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Meline, Charlen M, Meline, Edward Richard, Meline, Robert J, Meline, Stephen, Iv, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Carter, John Jeffery, Moore, Aaron Wayne, against Edgington, Melanie G, Jessee, Nelda F, Meline, David L, Meline, Jack, Meline & Rabo Farms Inc, A California Corporation, (total of 8) See All represented by Christensen, Nels A, Moore, Aaron Wayne, Ward, William A, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management117 days |
Filing DateMarch 06, 2002 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Time To Trial3932 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions464 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Minute Order
Date: March 14, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: March 06, 2003Answer - No Fee
Date: February 28, 2003Demurrer
Date: April 18, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: March 05, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2003Response - No Fee
Date: May 07, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: June 06, 2003Motion - Fee
Date: May 16, 2003Response - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2003Minute Order
Date: January 09, 2004Order
Date: June 13, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: September 24, 2003Order
Date: June 13, 2003Minute Order
Date: July 18, 2003Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: August 13, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: October 06, 2003Minute Order
Date: February 06, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: December 23, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: September 26, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: January 02, 2004Minute Order
Date: October 10, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: January 30, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: January 30, 2004Minute Order
Date: June 17, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: March 26, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: October 03, 2003Ruling
Date: May 20, 2008Order
Date: November 05, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: July 18, 2007Minute Order
Date: October 24, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: March 25, 2009Order
Date: October 16, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: November 19, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: December 04, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: November 23, 2010Case Management Statement
Date: August 31, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: August 25, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: July 30, 2007Minute Order
Date: December 11, 2009Case Management Statement
Date: April 17, 2008Stipulation
Date: July 26, 2013Minute Order
Date: May 02, 2008Minute Order
Date: March 29, 2013Stipulation and Order
Date: November 05, 2013Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: November 18, 2011Notice
Date: March 29, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: December 01, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: March 18, 2013Minute Order
Date: November 04, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: November 24, 2010Case Management Statement
Date: November 24, 2010Case Management Statement
Date: March 14, 2013Order
Date: May 02, 2014Order
Date: June 30, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: January 02, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: December 23, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: December 27, 2013Stipulation and Order
Date: November 12, 2013Minute Order
Date: January 21, 2014Minute Order
Date: July 15, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: January 03, 2014Notice of Reassignment
Date: December 12, 2014Answer - No Fee
Date: December 06, 2013Notice
Date: February 10, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: April 13, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: January 13, 2014Motion - Fee
Date: January 21, 2014Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 21, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: December 24, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: December 19, 2014Stipulation and Order - No Fee
Date: February 18, 2014Minute Order
Date: April 28, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: April 19, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 13, 2017Minute Order
Date: January 08, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: January 06, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: July 20, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 23, 2019Trial Readiness Conference
Date: July 27, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: April 09, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 06, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: December 22, 2016Case Management Conference
Date: April 28, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: October 14, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: October 27, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: October 04, 2018Case Management Conference
Date: October 26, 2018Notice of Reassignment
Date: December 05, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: October 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 22, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: January 13, 2021Notice of Reassignment
Date: January 15, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 13, 2021Brief
Date: November 01, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: November 02, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: October 27, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: October 27, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 27, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: October 27, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 27, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 27, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: November 01, 2021Other
Date: November 01, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: October 28, 2021Trial Readiness Conference Statement
Date: October 27, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 09, 2021Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: November 09, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 08, 2021Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: November 15, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 15, 2021Notice
Date: June 15, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: June 15, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 27, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 27, 2021Status Conference
Date: November 02, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 27, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 27, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 27, 2021Declaration
Date: November 02, 2021Brief
Date: November 01, 2021Trial Readiness Conference
Date: November 03, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: November 01, 2021Memorandum
Date: November 01, 2021Declaration
Date: October 27, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: April 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: December 23, 2020Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: May 05, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: January 06, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: April 19, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: October 07, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: January 20, 2005Motion - Fee
Date: April 09, 2004Minute Order
Date: April 02, 2004Stipulation and Order
Date: December 05, 2006Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 19, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: July 08, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: November 25, 2009Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 16, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: January 18, 2005Stipulation
Date: November 02, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: December 24, 2003Declaration
Date: September 16, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: August 17, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: October 22, 2004Complaint
Date: March 06, 2002Case Management Statement
Date: June 18, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: January 24, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: January 06, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: October 03, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: July 27, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: February 16, 2006Answer - No Fee
Date: February 15, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: February 10, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: March 22, 2004Declaration
Date: May 05, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: September 21, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: February 03, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: October 09, 2008Reply
Date: June 13, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: December 29, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: March 02, 2005Declaration
Date: September 16, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: April 21, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: December 03, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: June 08, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: October 08, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: September 01, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: December 29, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: September 23, 2005Minute Order
Date: July 01, 2002Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: June 24, 2002Minute Order
Date: October 04, 2002Answer
Date: February 03, 2003Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: December 06, 2002Minute Order
Date: December 09, 2002Reply
Date: June 10, 2003Minute Order
Date: June 13, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: June 10, 2003Answer - No Fee
Date: December 06, 2002Case Management Statement
Date: December 02, 2002Case Management Statement
Date: July 21, 2003Motion - Fee
Date: May 16, 2003Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 16, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: February 26, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: December 06, 2002Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 16, 2003Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 06, 2003Declaration
Date: May 16, 2003Minute Order
Date: April 22, 2004Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: October 01, 2004Motion - No Fee
Date: September 21, 2004Order
Date: September 30, 2004Order
Date: September 28, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: March 29, 2004Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 04, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: October 19, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: March 29, 2004Legacy Docketable Information
Date: June 07, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: January 21, 2005Ex Parte Application - No Fee
Date: October 19, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: October 19, 2004Minute Order
Date: June 24, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: December 02, 2004Order
Date: October 20, 2004Notice
Date: November 01, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: January 18, 2005Notice of Reassignment
Date: November 17, 2004Response - No Fee
Date: July 07, 2004Minute Order
Date: February 03, 2005Answer
Date: September 21, 2004Objection - No Fee
Date: September 17, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: September 20, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: September 21, 2005Order
Date: September 06, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: October 20, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: October 18, 2004Minute Order
Date: December 14, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: April 08, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: April 21, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: November 05, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: January 05, 2006Answer - No Fee
Date: January 30, 2006Motion - Fee
Date: January 19, 2006Cross Complaint - No Fee
Date: December 27, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: February 09, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: January 05, 2006Answer - No Fee
Date: February 02, 2006Minute Order
Date: January 20, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2005Answer - No Fee
Date: February 07, 2006Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: February 09, 2006Order
Date: February 22, 2006Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2004Notice of Reassignment
Date: January 06, 2005Minute Order
Date: March 17, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: February 17, 2006Minute Order
Date: February 24, 2006Order to Show Cause - Court Issued
Date: February 27, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: January 06, 2006Minute Order
Date: March 24, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: March 26, 2009Notice
Date: March 27, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: March 26, 2009Stipulation and Order
Date: November 29, 2012Case Management Statement
Date: March 30, 2009Minute Order
Date: April 10, 2009Case Management Statement
Date: November 24, 2009Case Management Statement
Date: March 27, 2009Minute Order
Date: May 05, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: December 02, 2011Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: February 22, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: November 25, 2009Case Management Statement
Date: November 25, 2009Case Management Statement
Date: November 25, 2009Case Management Statement
Date: September 02, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: December 01, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: December 02, 2011Stipulation and Order
Date: November 29, 2012Minute Order
Date: October 18, 2012Minute Order
Date: December 16, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: March 13, 2013Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: January 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: August 21, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: September 22, 2005Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: May 23, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: January 05, 2006Minute Order
Date: October 07, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: August 21, 2006Notice
Date: May 04, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: August 24, 2006Minute Order
Date: September 08, 2006Minute Order
Date: February 09, 2007Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: May 04, 2007Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: March 14, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: August 22, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: January 29, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: August 25, 2006Order
Date: June 15, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: January 26, 2007Order
Date: May 30, 2007Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: July 24, 2007Order
Date: May 15, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: July 24, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: January 23, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: April 15, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: April 11, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: April 16, 2008Order
Date: March 03, 2009Case Management Statement
Date: October 09, 2008Proof of Mailing
Date: October 04, 2002Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 27, 2003Declaration
Date: May 06, 2005Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 14, 2005Notice
Date: May 20, 2005Declaration
Date: June 06, 2005Notice
Date: June 21, 2006Minute Order
Date: September 27, 2021Change of Address
Date: January 23, 2006Declaration
Date: October 28, 2021Notice
Date: May 30, 2002Notice
Date: January 22, 2003Notice of Hearing
Date: January 16, 2004Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 01, 2004Notice
Date: April 27, 2004Notice
Date: September 28, 2004Proof of Mailing
Date: October 28, 2021Notice
Date: May 13, 2004Case Management Statement
Date: May 26, 2022Declaration
Date: June 08, 2022Legacy Docketable Information
Date: November 30, 2004Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 06, 2005Motion - Fee
Date: May 06, 2005Notice of Hearing
Date: March 02, 2006Notice
Date: December 05, 2006Notice
Date: December 16, 2005Notice
Date: June 18, 2007Stipulation
Date: July 31, 2007Notice
Date: May 07, 2007Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 27, 2021Motion - Fee
Date: October 11, 2011Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 03, 2011Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 02, 2011Clerk's Memo To File
Date: December 11, 2012Notice of Rescheduling
Date: December 26, 2013Declaration
Date: October 11, 2011Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 03, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: January 07, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: January 13, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: December 29, 2015Case Management Statement
Date: January 04, 2017Notice
Date: May 12, 2014Notice of Rescheduling
Date: January 14, 2015Stipulation and Order - No Fee
Date: April 30, 2014Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 28, 2015Notice of Rescheduling
Date: June 03, 2015Substitution of Attorney
Date: January 29, 2015Notice of Hearing
Date: December 02, 2016Notice
Date: December 14, 2016Change of Address
Date: May 15, 2017Notice of Rescheduling
Date: January 02, 2019Settlement Conference
Date: January 08, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: May 01, 2019Minute Order
Date: December 04, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: April 27, 2018Returned Mail
Date: January 07, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 27, 2020Notice
Date: August 24, 2020Order on Communication
Date: January 07, 2020Settlement Conference
Date: December 04, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 08, 2020Trial Readiness Conference
Date: July 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 13, 2021Notice of Returned Documents
Date: August 21, 2020Settlement Conference
Date: September 27, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 10, 2020Settlement Conference
Date: June 10, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: June 25, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 04, 2019Proof of Mailing
Date: July 17, 2020Settlement Conference Statement
Date: June 04, 2020Settlement Conference Statement
Date: December 31, 2019Declaration
Date: June 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 28, 2021Court Trial
Date: July 27, 2020Proof of Service
Date: October 14, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: June 07, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: June 02, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: November 29, 2010Declaration
Date: January 19, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: December 22, 2003Case Management Statement
Date: August 29, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: November 24, 2010Case Management Statement
Date: April 17, 2008Order
Date: January 22, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: April 26, 2005Answer - No Fee
Date: February 03, 2006Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 21, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: July 26, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: March 03, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: March 09, 2005Case Management Statement
Date: January 26, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: March 14, 2013Case Management Statement
Date: February 14, 2006Case Management Statement
Date: August 25, 2006Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement Status Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Plaintiffs' Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Re-Scheduling of Case Management Conference Notice |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Status of Setting Day 3 of Court Trial Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Status of Setting Daay 3 of Court Trial Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Swanson re Case Management Conference Declaration |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Randall Meline, et al.'s Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney as to Ronald Rabo Substitution of Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.