Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with Kevin J. McCormick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin J. McCormick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2007 |
Category(Breach Of Contract/Warranty) |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Opposition
Date: December 22, 2010Trial Brief Supplemental Brief Re: Election of Remedies
Date: January 12, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 06, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion
Date: December 06, 2010Motion in Limine No 1
Date: December 07, 2010Statement Defandants' Index of Motions in Limine
Date: December 07, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 1
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 3
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 5
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 2
Date: December 07, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 2
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine Supplemental Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony
Date: January 03, 2011Motion in Limine #16
Date: January 03, 2011Motion in Limine Supplemental Motion in Limine to Allow Testimony by Expert Bryan Hill
Date: January 03, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 03, 2011Opposition to Motion in Limine to Allow Testimony by Percipient Expert Bryan Hill
Date: January 06, 2011Reply to motion in limine
Date: January 06, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: January 06, 2011Trial Brief Supplemental Brief Re: Election of Remedies
Date: January 12, 2011[mche] Minute Order re: Pre-Trial Orders
Date: January 07, 2011Motion re: to Sever Issue of Successor Liability; Declaration in support thereof
Date: January 11, 2011[mche] Order re: Severing Action (Cadre Design)
Date: January 12, 2011Statement Supplemental Brief Regarding Election of Remedies
Date: January 12, 2011Opposition to plf supplemental motion in limine
Date: January 13, 2011Declaration Gregory K Federico in support of opposition to supplemental motion in limine
Date: January 13, 2011Opposition motion in limine to bifurcase the issue of CA Constructions B&P Code violations
Date: January 13, 2011Exhibit List
Date: January 14, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 20, 2011Witness List
Date: January 14, 2011[mche] Stipulation to Sever Issues of Successor Liability of Defendant R4 Corp
Date: January 14, 2011[mche] Plaintiff's Proposed Deposition Testiomony of Witness Bryan Hill
Date: January 14, 2011[mche] Plaintiff's Proposed Depostion Testimony of Unavailable Witness Bryan Hill
Date: January 18, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 21, 2011Jury Instructions
Date: January 24, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 24, 2011Statement Proposed Joint Statement of the Case
Date: January 24, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 28, 2011[mche] Minute Order re: Jury Trial Day Six
Date: January 25, 2011[mche] Minute Order: Jury Trial Day Seven
Date: January 26, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 25, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 31, 2011[mche] Proposed Verdict Form Stipulated as to Form
Date: January 31, 2011[mche] Exhibits - Defendant CA Construction
Date: January 31, 2011[mche] Exhibits - Plaintiffs
Date: January 31, 2011Minute Order
Date: February 02, 2011[mche] Juror Questions
Date: February 02, 2011[mche] Final Exhibit List - Joint
Date: February 02, 2011[mche] Final Exhibit List - Plaintiff
Date: February 02, 2011[mche] Final Exhibit List - Defendant
Date: February 02, 2011Opposition to MOtion for Attorney Fees
Date: March 25, 2011[mche] Judgment on the Verdict
Date: February 03, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 25, 2011Declaration in Support of Reply to Opposition
Date: April 01, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 25, 2011Declaration
Date: March 25, 2011Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 30, 2011Reply
Date: April 01, 2011Request for Dismissal
Date: March 28, 2011Reply
Date: March 30, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 01, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: April 07, 2011[mche] Notice of Appeal
Date: April 06, 2011Notice Of Unavailability
Date: April 26, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 18, 2011Minute Order
Date: April 08, 2011[mche] Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal.
Date: April 12, 2011[mche] Amended Notice of Appeal.
Date: April 27, 2011Declaration of Gregory K Federico
Date: April 18, 2011Declaration Todd A Jones
Date: April 18, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 18, 2011[mche] Amended Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal.
Date: April 29, 2011[mche] Minute Order re: Amended Hearing Date
Date: May 03, 2011Declaration of Gegory K Federico in support of Notice of Non-Opposition
Date: May 03, 2011Correspondence
Date: May 06, 2011[mche] 3DCA order for court fees and correspondence.
Date: May 10, 2011Opposition to Supplemental Brief Re: Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: May 06, 2011[mche] Minute Order re: Notice of Ex Parte Hearing
Date: May 03, 2011[mche] Notice of Default.
Date: May 13, 2011[mche] 3DCA order placing case into mediation.
Date: June 01, 2011Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order of order
Date: May 27, 2011Reply Supplemental
Date: May 13, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: May 24, 2011Declaration Of Gregory K Federico In Support Of Motion
Date: July 15, 2011Notice
Date: June 14, 2011[mche] Judgment on the Verdict Amended and Updated with Fees and Costs
Date: June 06, 2011Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 29, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 19, 2011[mche] 3DCA order granting appellants counsels request for withdraw.
Date: July 19, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 15, 2011Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 15, 2011[mche] 3DCA Appeal not Selected Notice.
Date: July 21, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support Of Motion
Date: July 15, 2011Ex Parte Application
Date: August 08, 2011[mche] Notice of Default
Date: August 04, 2011Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 08, 2011Declaration of R Abbott in support
Date: August 08, 2011Declaration of F Abbott in support
Date: August 08, 2011Notice
Date: August 08, 2011Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Issued
Date: December 05, 2011Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE
Date: August 09, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) 2ND AMENDED
Date: August 09, 2011Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 30, 2012[mche] Application and Order for Appearance and Examination (Florentine Abbott)
Date: December 06, 2011[mche] Application and Order for Appearance and Examination (Refers to Rodney Abbott)
Date: December 06, 2011Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 31, 2012Request for withdrawal of bench warrant for Rodney Abbott
Date: February 02, 2012Minute Order
Date: January 30, 2012[mche] 3DCA order dismissing appeal
Date: December 07, 2011[mche] 3DCA remittitur issued, appeal is dismissed
Date: February 06, 2012Minute Order
Date: January 31, 2012Notice
Date: February 24, 2012Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 22, 2012Notice
Date: March 05, 2014Minute Order
Date: March 12, 2012Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 13, 2012Answer
Date: November 13, 2007Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: March 24, 2014Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 08, 2007Cross-Complaint
Date: November 13, 2007[mche] Dismissal enetered as requested.
Date: December 03, 2007Request for Dismissal
Date: December 07, 2007Request for Dismissal
Date: December 03, 2007Answer
Date: December 14, 2007Cross-Complaint
Date: December 14, 2007Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 20, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: March 19, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 21, 2007[mche] Ret Doc-Substitution of Attorney-not complete
Date: December 21, 2007Mediation Statement
Date: March 18, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 03, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: March 18, 2008Summons
Date: March 20, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 27, 2008Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: February 22, 2008Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 20, 2008[mche] Notice Of Case Management Conference And Order To Appear
Date: February 28, 2008Tentative Ruling
Date: April 01, 2008Minute Order
Date: April 03, 2008Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: April 22, 2008[mche] Return Document Notice-summons and cross complaint
Date: May 05, 2008Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Issued
Date: December 05, 2011[mche] 3DCA order dismissing appeal
Date: December 07, 2011[mche] Application and Order for Appearance and Examination (Refers to Rodney Abbott)
Date: December 06, 2011[mche] Application and Order for Appearance and Examination (Florentine Abbott)
Date: December 06, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 31, 2012Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 30, 2012Minute Order
Date: January 30, 2012Notice
Date: February 24, 2012Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 31, 2012[mche] 3DCA remittitur issued, appeal is dismissed
Date: February 06, 2012Request for withdrawal of bench warrant for Rodney Abbott
Date: February 02, 2012Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 22, 2012Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 13, 2012Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 08, 2007Minute Order
Date: March 12, 2012Answer
Date: November 13, 2007Cross-Complaint
Date: November 13, 2007Request for Dismissal
Date: December 07, 2007[mche] Dismissal enetered as requested.
Date: December 03, 2007Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 3
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 4
Date: December 07, 2010Reply
Date: December 23, 2010Opposition to R4Corps motion in limine to exclude documentary evidence not produced in discovery
Date: December 22, 2010Opposition
Date: December 23, 2010Reply
Date: December 30, 2010Declaration in support
Date: December 23, 2010Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 22, 2010Objection to Pltfs Late Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure & Expert Witness Declaration
Date: December 29, 2010Answer
Date: December 14, 2007Opposition to Motion in Limine to Allow Testimony by Percipient Expert Bryan Hill
Date: January 06, 2011Reply to motion in limine
Date: January 06, 2011Motion in Limine #16
Date: January 03, 2011Motion in Limine Supplemental Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony
Date: January 03, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: January 06, 2011[mche] Minute Order re: Pre-Trial Orders
Date: January 07, 2011[mche] Minute Order re: Jury Trial Day Six
Date: January 25, 2011[mche] Order re: Severing Action (Cadre Design)
Date: January 12, 2011Motion re: to Sever Issue of Successor Liability; Declaration in support thereof
Date: January 11, 2011Trial Brief Supplemental Brief Re: Election of Remedies
Date: January 12, 2011Opposition to plf supplemental motion in limine
Date: January 13, 2011Statement Supplemental Brief Regarding Election of Remedies
Date: January 12, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 20, 2011Declaration Gregory K Federico in support of opposition to supplemental motion in limine
Date: January 13, 2011Exhibit List
Date: January 14, 2011Opposition motion in limine to bifurcase the issue of CA Constructions B&P Code violations
Date: January 13, 2011[mche] Stipulation to Sever Issues of Successor Liability of Defendant R4 Corp
Date: January 14, 2011[mche] Plaintiff's Proposed Deposition Testiomony of Witness Bryan Hill
Date: January 14, 2011Witness List
Date: January 14, 2011Exhibit List
Date: January 18, 2011[mche] Plaintiff's Proposed Depostion Testimony of Unavailable Witness Bryan Hill
Date: January 18, 2011Jury Instructions
Date: January 24, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 21, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 24, 2011[mche] Proposed Verdict Form Stipulated as to Form
Date: January 31, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 28, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 25, 2011Statement Proposed Joint Statement of the Case
Date: January 24, 2011[mche] Minute Order: Jury Trial Day Seven
Date: January 26, 2011[mche] Exhibits - Defendant CA Construction
Date: January 31, 2011Declaration
Date: February 28, 2011Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: February 16, 2011[mche] Exhibits - Plaintiffs
Date: January 31, 2011[mche] Final Exhibit List - Joint
Date: February 02, 2011Minute Order
Date: February 03, 2011[mche] Notice of Entry of Judgment and Declaration of Mailing
Date: February 03, 2011[mche] Court Reporters Log
Date: February 03, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 28, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 16, 2011Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: February 16, 2011Declaration of Todd A Jones
Date: February 16, 2011Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 16, 2011[mche] Notice of Hearing - Motion for New Trial
Date: February 23, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 16, 2011Motion re: notice of intention to move for ten trial motion for new trial
Date: February 17, 2011Motion to Tax Costs
Date: March 03, 2011Reply
Date: March 11, 2011Minute Order
Date: March 18, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: March 17, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities Opp to plaintiffs Motion for new trial
Date: February 28, 2011[mche] Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 03, 2011Motion re: for judgment notwithstanding the verdict
Date: February 17, 2011[mche] Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: February 25, 2011Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order of Order
Date: March 22, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 07, 2011Opposition to MOtion for Attorney Fees
Date: March 25, 2011Declaration
Date: March 25, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 25, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 25, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 01, 2011Reply
Date: April 01, 2011Declaration in Support of Reply to Opposition
Date: April 01, 2011Minute Order
Date: April 08, 2011Declaration of Gregory K Federico
Date: April 18, 2011Correspondence
Date: May 06, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: April 07, 2011[mche] Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal.
Date: April 12, 2011[mche] Notice of Appeal
Date: April 06, 2011[mche] Notice of Default
Date: August 04, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 18, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 19, 2011Declaration Todd A Jones
Date: April 18, 2011Notice Of Unavailability
Date: April 26, 2011[mche] 3DCA Appeal not Selected Notice.
Date: July 21, 2011Declaration of R Abbott in support
Date: August 08, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 18, 2011Declaration of Gegory K Federico in support of Notice of Non-Opposition
Date: May 03, 2011Ex Parte Application
Date: August 08, 2011Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 08, 2011Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 29, 2011Notice
Date: August 08, 2011[mche] Minute Order re: Notice of Ex Parte Hearing
Date: May 03, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) 2ND AMENDED
Date: August 09, 2011[mche] 3DCA order granting appellants counsels request for withdraw.
Date: July 19, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 15, 2011Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE
Date: August 09, 2011Declaration of F Abbott in support
Date: August 08, 2011Minute Order
Date: August 09, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Oppostition to defs Motion for Order Compelling
Date: August 16, 2011Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims Issued
Date: December 05, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 16, 2011[mche] Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: August 22, 2011[mche] Notice of Non-Availability of Register of Actions
Date: August 22, 2011Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: December 02, 2011Notice
Date: September 08, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 22, 2011Minute Order
Date: September 08, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: August 25, 2011[mche] Application and Order for Appearance and Examination (Refers to Rodney Abbott)
Date: December 06, 2011[mche] Application and Order for Appearance and Examination (Florentine Abbott)
Date: December 06, 2011[mche] 3DCA order dismissing appeal
Date: December 07, 2011Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 30, 2012Minute Order
Date: January 31, 2011[mche] Final Exhibit List - Plaintiff
Date: February 02, 2011Minute Order
Date: February 02, 2011[mche] Juror Questions
Date: February 02, 2011[mche] Final Exhibit List - Defendant
Date: February 02, 2011[mche] Judgment on the Verdict
Date: February 03, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 31, 2012Minute Order
Date: January 30, 2012Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 31, 2012Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 22, 2012Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 13, 2012Minute Order
Date: March 12, 2012Notice
Date: February 24, 2012Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: March 24, 2014Notice
Date: March 05, 2014Request for withdrawal of bench warrant for Rodney Abbott
Date: February 02, 2012[mche] 3DCA remittitur issued, appeal is dismissed
Date: February 06, 2012[mche] Plaintiff's Proposed Deposition Testiomony of Witness Bryan Hill
Date: January 14, 2011Exhibit List
Date: January 18, 2011Cross-Complaint
Date: December 14, 2007Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 20, 2007[mche] Ret Doc-Substitution of Attorney-not complete
Date: December 21, 2007Request for Dismissal
Date: December 03, 2007Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 03, 2008Opposition
Date: December 22, 2010Case Management Statement
Date: March 18, 2008Motion in Limine 1
Date: December 17, 2010Notice
Date: December 16, 2010Motion in Limine 2
Date: December 17, 2010Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 22, 2010Opposition to R4Corps motion in limine to exclude documentary evidence not produced in discovery
Date: December 22, 2010Reply
Date: December 23, 2010Opposition
Date: December 23, 2010Declaration in support
Date: December 23, 2010Reply
Date: December 30, 2010Objection to Pltfs Late Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure & Expert Witness Declaration
Date: December 29, 2010Motion in Limine Supplemental Motion in Limine to Allow Testimony by Expert Bryan Hill
Date: January 03, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 03, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 20, 2011Answer
Date: December 09, 2009Minute Order
Date: July 13, 2010Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 21, 2010Opposition to motion to quash/strike/dismiss service
Date: October 19, 2010Minute Order
Date: August 07, 2009Minute Order
Date: August 13, 2009Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 12
Date: December 07, 2010Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) POS for Association of Counsel
Date: November 10, 2010[mche] Notice of Order Granting Relief From Stay in Bankruptcy Court
Date: July 20, 2010Minute Order
Date: November 16, 2010Motion in Limine No 13
Date: December 07, 2010Motion to Strike portions of first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Motion in Limine No 14
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 15
Date: December 07, 2010Answer
Date: November 19, 2010Motion in Limine No 8
Date: December 07, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 8
Date: December 07, 2010Request for Judicial Notice amended in support
Date: October 07, 2009Opposition
Date: November 03, 2009Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 07, 2011[mche] Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 03, 2011Motion in Limine No 9
Date: December 07, 2010Tentative Ruling
Date: March 17, 2011Reply
Date: March 11, 2011Challenge To Judicial Officer - Cause (170.1)
Date: November 06, 2009Minute Order
Date: March 18, 2011Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order of Order
Date: March 22, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 22, 2011Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 07, 2010Minute Order
Date: September 08, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: May 09, 2008Notice
Date: September 08, 2011Reply to opposition to mtn for judgment on the pleadings
Date: October 08, 2010Tentative Ruling
Date: May 19, 2008Correspondence
Date: December 02, 2010Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 16, 2008Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 04, 2008Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: May 20, 2008Minute Order
Date: May 22, 2008Answer
Date: August 29, 2008Answer
Date: June 03, 2008Order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: December 06, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 9
Date: December 07, 2010Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 10, 2008Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) -Verified Responses from Pltf Rodney Abbott
Date: December 06, 2010Cross-Complaint
Date: August 29, 2008Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 16, 2009Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 29, 2009Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 29, 2009Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion in Limine No 9
Date: December 07, 2010Minute Order
Date: April 03, 2008Motion in Limine No 11
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 12
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 10
Date: December 07, 2010[mche] Exhibits - Defendant CA Construction
Date: January 31, 2011Request for Dismissal
Date: December 03, 2007Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: April 22, 2008[mche] Exhibits - Plaintiffs
Date: January 31, 2011Ex Parte Application
Date: May 06, 2009Request for Dismissal
Date: December 07, 2007[mche] Return Document Notice-summons and cross complaint
Date: May 05, 2008[mche] Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application
Date: May 06, 2009Minute Order
Date: January 31, 2011Answer
Date: December 14, 2007Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: February 16, 2010[mche] Notice of Entry of Judgment and Declaration of Mailing
Date: February 03, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Oppostition to defs Motion for Order Compelling
Date: August 16, 2011Minute Order
Date: August 09, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Motion to Determine GFS
Date: February 16, 2010Cross-Complaint
Date: December 14, 2007Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 07, 2009Minute Order
Date: February 02, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: May 05, 2008Declaration Ronald Britschgis Declaration in support of Motion to Determine GFS
Date: February 16, 2010Minute Order
Date: May 11, 2009Case Management Statement
Date: May 07, 2008Minute Order
Date: May 28, 2009Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 20, 2007[mche] Return Document Notice- Proof of Service
Date: May 08, 2008[mche] Juror Questions
Date: February 02, 2011Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: March 01, 2010Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 16, 2011Opposition
Date: May 28, 2009Notice Amended notice of motion and motion to determine good faith settlement
Date: March 02, 2010[mche] Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: August 22, 2011[mche] Final Exhibit List - Joint
Date: February 02, 2011Answer
Date: May 08, 2008Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) POS 010 Regarding faxed Proof
Date: May 08, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 21, 2007[mche] Dismissal entered as requested
Date: May 09, 2008[mche] Final Exhibit List - Plaintiff
Date: February 02, 2011Notice Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 11, 2009[mche] Final Exhibit List - Defendant
Date: February 02, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: May 07, 2008Motion re: for leave to file first amended complaint
Date: June 24, 2009Answer
Date: May 08, 2008[mche] Notice of Non-Availability of Register of Actions
Date: August 22, 2011[mche] Ret Doc-Substitution of Attorney-not complete
Date: December 21, 2007Case Management Statement
Date: May 05, 2008Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: February 22, 2008[mche] Judgment on the Verdict
Date: February 03, 2011Notice of unavailability of counsel
Date: June 25, 2009[mche] Notice Of Case Management Conference And Order To Appear
Date: February 28, 2008Request for Dismissal
Date: May 09, 2008[mche] Notice of Entry of Judgment and Declaration of Mailing
Date: February 03, 2011Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: June 26, 2009Notice
Date: March 10, 2010[mche] Court Reporters Log
Date: February 03, 2011[mche] Notice of Default
Date: August 04, 2011Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 07, 2009Declaration supplemental brief in response to plaintiffs' objection
Date: March 11, 2010Minute Order
Date: May 11, 2009Minute Order
Date: February 03, 2011Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 12, 2010Ex Parte Application
Date: August 08, 2011Minute Order
Date: May 28, 2009Case Management Statement
Date: May 09, 2008Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: February 16, 2011Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: February 16, 2011Request for Dismissal
Date: April 23, 2010Objection to evidence in support
Date: July 27, 2009Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 16, 2011Ex Parte Application
Date: May 06, 2009Notice
Date: June 07, 2010Request for Dismissal
Date: May 21, 2010Affidavit OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE
Date: August 09, 2011[mche] Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application
Date: May 06, 2009Declaration of Todd A Jones
Date: February 16, 2011Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 16, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 16, 2011Declaration Gregory K Federico in support of demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Motion re: for leave to reopen discovery
Date: June 26, 2009Answer
Date: September 29, 2009Motion re: for judgment notwithstanding the verdict
Date: February 17, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities in opposition
Date: July 27, 2009Answer
Date: October 02, 2009Declaration of Lundgren in support
Date: July 27, 2009Motion re: notice of intention to move for ten trial motion for new trial
Date: February 17, 2011Declaration of G K Federico in support
Date: October 22, 2010[mche] Notice of Hearing - Motion for New Trial
Date: February 23, 2011Request for Judicial Notice in support
Date: October 07, 2009Motion to Strike
Date: August 27, 2009Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support
Date: October 22, 2010[mche] Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: February 25, 2011Request for Judicial Notice to Second Amended Complaint and Notice of Hearing
Date: June 21, 2010Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Minute Order
Date: October 29, 2010Reply to supplemental opposition to mtn
Date: November 04, 2010Amended Complaint Amendment to Second Amended Complaint
Date: November 02, 2010Memorandum of Points & Authorities Opp to plaintiffs Motion for new trial
Date: February 28, 2011Notice of entry of order
Date: December 16, 2010Declaration
Date: February 28, 2011Association of Attorney
Date: November 04, 2010Amended Complaint THIRD
Date: November 05, 2010Minute Order
Date: November 06, 2009Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 28, 2011[mche] Plaintiff's Proposed Depostion Testimony of Unavailable Witness Bryan Hill
Date: January 18, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 21, 2011Jury Instructions
Date: January 24, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 24, 2011Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: May 20, 2008Tentative Ruling
Date: May 19, 2008Minute Order
Date: May 22, 2008Answer
Date: June 03, 2008Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 04, 2008Answer
Date: August 29, 2008Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 16, 2008Cross-Complaint
Date: August 29, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 10, 2008Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: October 02, 2008Answer
Date: October 02, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 03, 2008[mche] Minute Order re: Status Conference
Date: April 12, 2010Answer
Date: October 09, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: March 19, 2008Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 20, 2008Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 31, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 20, 2008Summons
Date: March 20, 2008Statement Supplemental Brief Regarding Election of Remedies
Date: January 12, 2011Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 20, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 27, 2008Notice of Trial
Date: December 01, 2008Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 06, 2009Notice Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 06, 2009General Denial
Date: April 06, 2009Opposition to plf supplemental motion in limine
Date: January 13, 2011Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 15, 2009Tentative Ruling
Date: April 01, 2008Notice Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 11, 2009Opposition motion in limine to bifurcase the issue of CA Constructions B&P Code violations
Date: January 13, 2011Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 15, 2009Memorandum of Points & Authorities in opposition to motion for leave to amend
Date: July 07, 2009Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 29, 2009Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 16, 2009Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 03, 2008Reply for Leave to File First Amended Complaint
Date: July 13, 2009Case Management Statement
Date: March 18, 2008Reply to opposition
Date: July 30, 2009Notice Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 03, 2009Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 29, 2009Declaration Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint
Date: July 30, 2009Opposition
Date: May 28, 2009Summons
Date: August 04, 2009Motion re: for leave to file first amended complaint
Date: June 24, 2009Request for Judicial Notice in support of demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Exhibit List
Date: January 14, 2011Declaration Gregory K Federico in support of opposition to supplemental motion in limine
Date: January 13, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 01, 2009Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 28, 2009Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: June 26, 2009Notice of unavailability of counsel
Date: June 25, 2009Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 17, 2009Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 06, 2009Witness List
Date: January 14, 2011Reply to plaintiffs' opposition
Date: November 09, 2009[mche] Certificate of Service by Mailing (Disqualification)
Date: November 06, 2009Reply memo in support of reply to opposition to demurrer
Date: November 09, 2009Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2009[mche] Stipulation to Sever Issues of Successor Liability of Defendant R4 Corp
Date: January 14, 2011Mediation Statement
Date: March 18, 2008Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 08, 2007Minute Order
Date: November 20, 2009Cross-Complaint
Date: November 13, 2007Answer
Date: November 13, 2007Minute Order
Date: November 23, 2009Minute Order
Date: July 20, 2009[mche] Dismissal enetered as requested.
Date: December 03, 2007Amended Complaint
Date: July 23, 2009Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 23, 2009Summons
Date: April 22, 2010Minute Order
Date: August 27, 2009Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint and Notice of Hearing
Date: June 21, 2010Demurrer
Date: August 27, 2009Declaration William Poulton in support of motion to determine good faith
Date: February 16, 2010Request for Dismissal
Date: December 17, 2009Opposition demurrer
Date: October 19, 2010Motion in Limine No 6
Date: December 07, 2010Answer
Date: October 02, 2009Request for Judicial Notice in support
Date: October 07, 2009Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) 2ND AMENDED
Date: August 09, 2011Request for Judicial Notice amended in support
Date: October 07, 2009Opposition
Date: November 03, 2009Notice
Date: December 09, 2010Joinder to Motion to CA Constructions Motions in Limine
Date: December 15, 2010Tentative Ruling
Date: April 07, 2011Minute Order
Date: August 09, 2011Opposition combined by pltf's F and R Abbott to mtn to compel
Date: December 16, 2010Challenge To Judicial Officer - Cause (170.1)
Date: November 06, 2009[mche] Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal.
Date: April 12, 2011Minute Order
Date: April 08, 2011[mche] Court Reporters Log
Date: February 03, 2011Minute Order
Date: February 03, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 18, 2011Declaration of Gregory K Federico
Date: April 18, 2011Declaration Todd A Jones
Date: April 18, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 18, 2011Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: February 16, 2011[mche] Minute Order re: Jury Trial Day Six
Date: January 25, 2011Notice Of Unavailability
Date: April 26, 2011Statement Proposed Joint Statement of the Case
Date: January 24, 2011Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: February 16, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: May 19, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 03, 2008Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 16, 2011[mche] Amended Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal.
Date: April 29, 2011[mche] Amended Notice of Appeal.
Date: April 27, 2011[mche] Minute Order re: Amended Hearing Date
Date: May 03, 2011Declaration of Todd A Jones
Date: February 16, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 25, 2011[mche] Minute Order: Jury Trial Day Seven
Date: January 26, 2011[mche] Proposed Verdict Form Stipulated as to Form
Date: January 31, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 28, 2011Declaration of Gegory K Federico in support of Notice of Non-Opposition
Date: May 03, 2011[mche] Minute Order re: Notice of Ex Parte Hearing
Date: May 03, 2011Correspondence
Date: May 06, 2011Opposition to Supplemental Brief Re: Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: May 06, 2011[mche] 3DCA order for court fees and correspondence.
Date: May 10, 2011Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 08, 2011[mche] Notice of Default.
Date: May 13, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: May 24, 2011Reply Supplemental
Date: May 13, 2011Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order of order
Date: May 27, 2011[mche] 3DCA order placing case into mediation.
Date: June 01, 2011[mche] Judgment on the Verdict Amended and Updated with Fees and Costs
Date: June 06, 2011Notice
Date: June 14, 2011Declaration Of Gregory K Federico In Support Of Motion
Date: July 15, 2011Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 15, 2011Mediation Statement
Date: March 18, 2008Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support Of Motion
Date: July 15, 2011Notice
Date: August 08, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 22, 2011[mche] 3DCA order granting appellants counsels request for withdraw.
Date: July 19, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 15, 2011[mche] 3DCA Appeal not Selected Notice.
Date: July 21, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 19, 2011Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 29, 2011Substitution of Attorney
Date: March 27, 2008Notice
Date: March 05, 2014Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: April 22, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: December 21, 2007Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Oppostition to defs Motion for Order Compelling
Date: August 16, 2011Answer
Date: October 09, 2008Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 20, 2008Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 16, 2011General Denial
Date: April 06, 2009Minute Order
Date: May 28, 2009Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 15, 2009Minute Order
Date: September 08, 2011[mche] Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: August 22, 2011Notice
Date: September 08, 2011[mche] Notice of Non-Availability of Register of Actions
Date: August 22, 2011Case Management Statement
Date: May 07, 2008Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) POS 010 Regarding faxed Proof
Date: May 08, 2008Notice Notice of Unavailability
Date: June 11, 2009Memorandum of Points & Authorities in opposition
Date: July 27, 2009Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: December 02, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: April 01, 2008Objection to evidence in support
Date: July 27, 2009Motion to Strike
Date: August 27, 2009Minute Order
Date: April 03, 2008Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: March 24, 2014[mche] Dismissal entered as requested
Date: May 09, 2008Demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Answer
Date: October 02, 2009[mche] Return Document Notice-summons and cross complaint
Date: May 05, 2008Request for Judicial Notice in support
Date: October 07, 2009Request for Judicial Notice amended in support
Date: October 07, 2009Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2009Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: February 22, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: March 19, 2008[mche] Notice Of Case Management Conference And Order To Appear
Date: February 28, 2008Case Management Statement
Date: May 05, 2008Answer
Date: August 29, 2008Cross-Complaint
Date: August 29, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 10, 2008Motion in Limine No 8
Date: December 07, 2010Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 16, 2009Motion in Limine No 9
Date: December 07, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 8
Date: December 07, 2010[mche] Return Document Notice- Proof of Service
Date: May 08, 2008Summons
Date: March 20, 2008Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 29, 2009Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 07, 2009Minute Order
Date: May 11, 2009Notice of unavailability of counsel
Date: June 25, 2009Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 9
Date: December 07, 2010Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion in Limine No 9
Date: December 07, 2010Amended Complaint
Date: July 23, 2009Request for Dismissal
Date: May 09, 2008Reply to opposition
Date: July 30, 2009Motion in Limine No 10
Date: December 07, 2010Declaration of Lundgren in support
Date: July 27, 2009Motion in Limine No 11
Date: December 07, 2010Case Management Statement
Date: May 09, 2008Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: May 20, 2008Answer
Date: June 03, 2008Minute Order
Date: May 22, 2008Answer
Date: October 02, 2008Minute Order
Date: August 27, 2009Motion in Limine No 12
Date: December 07, 2010Demurrer
Date: August 27, 2009Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: June 04, 2008Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 16, 2008Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 12
Date: December 07, 2010Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 20, 2008Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 31, 2008Declaration Gregory K Federico in support of demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 29, 2009Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: October 02, 2008Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: March 01, 2010Notice of Trial
Date: December 01, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 20, 2008Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 06, 2009Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 28, 2009Motion in Limine No 13
Date: December 07, 2010Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 01, 2009Notice Amended notice of motion and motion to determine good faith settlement
Date: March 02, 2010Motion in Limine No 14
Date: December 07, 2010Motion re: for leave to file first amended complaint
Date: June 24, 2009Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 15, 2009Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 17, 2009Notice Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 06, 2009Ex Parte Application
Date: May 06, 2009Answer
Date: September 29, 2009Reply for Leave to File First Amended Complaint
Date: July 13, 2009[mche] Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application
Date: May 06, 2009Opposition
Date: November 03, 2009Motion in Limine No 15
Date: December 07, 2010Notice
Date: March 10, 2010Declaration supplemental brief in response to plaintiffs' objection
Date: March 11, 2010Reply to supplemental opposition to mtn
Date: November 04, 2010Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 12, 2010Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: June 26, 2009Notice
Date: December 16, 2010Motion in Limine 1
Date: December 17, 2010Reply memo of P&As in support of reply to opposition to motion to strike
Date: November 09, 2009Motion to Tax Costs
Date: March 03, 2011[mche] Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: March 03, 2011Motion in Limine 2
Date: December 17, 2010Motion in Limine No 7
Date: December 07, 2010Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 07, 2011Reply
Date: March 11, 2011[mche] Return Document Notice- Proof of Service
Date: May 08, 2008Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 16, 2011Motion re: for judgment notwithstanding the verdict
Date: February 17, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 16, 2011Tentative Ruling
Date: March 17, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) POS 010 Regarding faxed Proof
Date: May 08, 2008[mche] Dismissal entered as requested
Date: May 09, 2008Exhibit List
Date: January 18, 2011[mche] Notice of Hearing - Motion for New Trial
Date: February 23, 2011Minute Order
Date: March 18, 2011Request for Dismissal
Date: May 09, 2008Memorandum of Points & Authorities Opp to plaintiffs Motion for new trial
Date: February 28, 2011[mche] Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: February 25, 2011Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: December 02, 2011Motion re: notice of intention to move for ten trial motion for new trial
Date: February 17, 2011Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order of Order
Date: March 22, 2011Motion re: for leave to reopen discovery
Date: June 26, 2009Declaration
Date: February 28, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 28, 2011Amended Complaint
Date: December 04, 2009Memorandum of Points & Authorities in opposition to motion for leave to amend
Date: July 07, 2009Answer
Date: December 18, 2009Tentative Ruling
Date: August 25, 2011Motion to Tax Costs
Date: March 03, 2011Answer
Date: October 02, 2008Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: October 02, 2008Opposition to MOtion for Attorney Fees
Date: March 25, 2011Reply for Leave to File First Amended Complaint
Date: July 13, 2009Minute Order
Date: July 20, 2009Answer
Date: October 09, 2008Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 20, 2008Amended Complaint
Date: July 23, 2009Correspondence
Date: February 04, 2010Tentative Ruling
Date: August 25, 2011Memorandum of Points & Authorities in opposition
Date: July 27, 2009Objection to evidence in support
Date: July 27, 2009Declaration Craig N Lungrens Declaration in support of Motion to Determine GFS
Date: February 16, 2010Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 31, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: November 20, 2008Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 03, 2008Minute Order
Date: November 06, 2009Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: March 25, 2011Declaration of Lundgren in support
Date: July 27, 2009Notice of Trial
Date: December 01, 2008Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 06, 2009Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 25, 2011Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 16, 2010General Denial
Date: April 06, 2009Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 06, 2009Declaration Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint
Date: July 30, 2009Reply to opposition
Date: July 30, 2009Notice Notice of Unavailability
Date: April 06, 2009[mche] Certificate of Service by Mailing (Disqualification)
Date: November 06, 2009Reply to plaintiffs' opposition
Date: November 09, 2009Declaration
Date: March 25, 2011Notice Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 03, 2009Summons
Date: August 04, 2009Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 15, 2009Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 15, 2009Minute Order
Date: August 07, 2009Minute Order
Date: March 16, 2010Reply memo in support of reply to opposition to demurrer
Date: November 09, 2009Request for Dismissal
Date: March 28, 2011Reply memo of P&As in support of reply to opposition to motion to strike
Date: November 09, 2009Minute Order
Date: August 13, 2009Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2009Reply
Date: March 30, 2011[mche] Order Determining that Settlement was Made in Good Faith (Britschgi)
Date: March 24, 2010Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 08, 2010Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 30, 2011Declaration of F Abbott in support
Date: August 08, 2011Minute Order
Date: August 27, 2009Demurrer
Date: August 27, 2009Declaration in Support of Reply to Opposition
Date: April 01, 2011Motion to Strike
Date: August 27, 2009Request for Dismissal
Date: April 28, 2010Demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 21, 2010Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: June 21, 2010Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Reply
Date: April 01, 2011Declaration Gregory K Federico in support of demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Request for Judicial Notice in support of demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 28, 2009Motion to Strike portions of first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 07, 2010Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 01, 2011[mche] Notice of Appeal
Date: April 06, 2011Minute Order
Date: October 21, 2010Opposition to demurrer as moot
Date: October 19, 2010Declaration of R Abbott in support
Date: August 08, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 01, 2009Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 17, 2009Answer
Date: September 29, 2009Challenge To Judicial Officer - Cause (170.1)
Date: November 06, 2009Notice
Date: December 09, 2010[mche] Minute Order re: Status Conference
Date: April 12, 2010[mche] 3DCA order for court fees and correspondence.
Date: May 10, 2011Summons
Date: April 22, 2010Answer
Date: November 19, 2010Tentative Ruling
Date: May 24, 2011Minute Order
Date: August 13, 2009Request for Judicial Notice in support of demurrer to first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Motion to Strike portions of first amended complaint
Date: August 28, 2009Answer
Date: May 08, 2008Correspondence
Date: December 02, 2010Joinder to Motion to CA Constructions Motions in Limine
Date: December 15, 2010Request for Dismissal
Date: April 23, 2010Opposition combined by pltf's F and R Abbott to mtn to compel
Date: December 16, 2010Reply memo of P&As in support of reply to opposition to motion to strike
Date: November 09, 2009Reply to plaintiffs' opposition
Date: November 09, 2009Reply memo in support of reply to opposition to demurrer
Date: November 09, 2009Order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: December 06, 2010Request for Dismissal
Date: April 28, 2010Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) -Verified Responses from Pltf Rodney Abbott
Date: December 06, 2010Notice of entry of order
Date: December 16, 2010Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 06, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion
Date: December 06, 2010Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 21, 2010Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 15, 2011Notice
Date: June 07, 2010Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: June 21, 2010Request for Dismissal
Date: May 21, 2010Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint and Notice of Hearing
Date: June 21, 2010Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support Of Motion
Date: July 15, 2011Reply
Date: March 30, 2011Request for Judicial Notice to Second Amended Complaint and Notice of Hearing
Date: June 21, 2010Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 21, 2010[mche] Amended Notice of Filing Notice of Appeal.
Date: April 29, 2011Motion in Limine No 1
Date: December 07, 2010Statement Defandants' Index of Motions in Limine
Date: December 07, 2010[mche] Judgment on the Verdict Amended and Updated with Fees and Costs
Date: June 06, 2011[mche] 3DCA order placing case into mediation.
Date: June 01, 2011Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 1
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 2
Date: December 07, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 2
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 3
Date: December 07, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 3
Date: December 07, 2010Minute Order
Date: July 13, 2010[mche] Notice of Order Granting Relief From Stay in Bankruptcy Court
Date: July 20, 2010Motion in Limine No 4
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 6
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 5
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 7
Date: December 07, 2010Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 07, 2010Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 07, 2010Opposition to Supplemental Brief Re: Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: May 06, 2011Reply to opposition to mtn for judgment on the pleadings
Date: October 08, 2010[mche] Notice of Default.
Date: May 13, 2011Reply Supplemental
Date: May 13, 2011Opposition demurrer
Date: October 19, 2010Declaration of G K Federico in support
Date: October 22, 2010Opposition to motion to quash/strike/dismiss service
Date: October 19, 2010Minute Order
Date: November 20, 2009Minute Order
Date: November 23, 2009Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 23, 2009Declaration Ronald Britschgis Declaration in support of Motion to Determine GFS
Date: February 16, 2010Declaration Craig N Lungrens Declaration in support of Motion to Determine GFS
Date: February 16, 2010Opposition to demurrer as moot
Date: October 19, 2010Minute Order
Date: October 21, 2010Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support
Date: October 22, 2010Amended Complaint
Date: December 04, 2009Minute Order
Date: October 29, 2010Answer
Date: December 09, 2009Request for Dismissal
Date: December 17, 2009Amended Complaint Amendment to Second Amended Complaint
Date: November 02, 2010Answer
Date: December 18, 2009Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: February 16, 2010Request for Dismissal
Date: March 28, 2011Correspondence
Date: February 04, 2010Declaration William Poulton in support of motion to determine good faith
Date: February 16, 2010Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order of order
Date: May 27, 2011[mche] Amended Notice of Appeal.
Date: April 27, 2011Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: March 30, 2011Opposition
Date: May 28, 2009Motion re: for leave to reopen discovery
Date: June 26, 2009Minute Order
Date: November 06, 2009Association of Attorney
Date: November 04, 2010Memorandum of Points & Authorities in opposition to motion for leave to amend
Date: July 07, 2009Minute Order
Date: July 20, 2009Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 06, 2009Minute Order
Date: March 16, 2010[mche] Order Determining that Settlement was Made in Good Faith (Britschgi)
Date: March 24, 2010[mche] Certificate of Service by Mailing (Disqualification)
Date: November 06, 2009Amended Complaint THIRD
Date: November 05, 2010Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 08, 2010Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) POS for Association of Counsel
Date: November 10, 2010Minute Order
Date: November 16, 2010Summons
Date: August 04, 2009[mche] Minute Order re: Amended Hearing Date
Date: May 03, 2011Notice Notice of Unavailability
Date: August 03, 2009Declaration Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint
Date: July 30, 2009Minute Order
Date: August 07, 2009Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Motion to Determine GFS
Date: February 16, 2010Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 16, 2010Notice
Date: June 14, 2011Declaration Of Gregory K Federico In Support Of Motion
Date: July 15, 2011Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: April 08, 2010Certificate of Mailing for
Date: November 23, 2009Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: March 01, 2010Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 06, 2010Amended Complaint
Date: December 04, 2009Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 16, 2010Declaration supplemental brief in response to plaintiffs' objection
Date: March 11, 2010Answer
Date: December 18, 2009Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support
Date: October 22, 2010Notice Amended notice of motion and motion to determine good faith settlement
Date: March 02, 2010Minute Order
Date: November 20, 2009Motion in Limine No 15
Date: December 07, 2010Minute Order
Date: October 29, 2010Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 12, 2010Minute Order
Date: November 23, 2009Notice
Date: March 10, 2010[mche] Order Determining that Settlement was Made in Good Faith (Britschgi)
Date: March 24, 2010Minute Order
Date: March 16, 2010Request for Dismissal
Date: April 28, 2010Reply to opposition to mtn for judgment on the pleadings
Date: October 08, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 2
Date: December 07, 2010Notice
Date: December 09, 2010Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: June 21, 2010Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion in Limine No 9
Date: December 07, 2010Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 07, 2010Summons
Date: April 22, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion
Date: December 06, 2010Opposition to motion to quash/strike/dismiss service
Date: October 19, 2010Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: October 07, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 1
Date: December 07, 2010Request for Dismissal
Date: April 23, 2010Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: May 21, 2010[mche] Minute Order re: Status Conference
Date: April 12, 2010Motion in Limine No 7
Date: December 07, 2010Opposition demurrer
Date: October 19, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 3
Date: December 07, 2010Declaration of G K Federico in support
Date: October 22, 2010Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 21, 2010Answer
Date: November 19, 2010[mche] Notice of Order Granting Relief From Stay in Bankruptcy Court
Date: July 20, 2010Reply to supplemental opposition to mtn
Date: November 04, 2010Motion in Limine No 3
Date: December 07, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 9
Date: December 07, 2010Opposition to demurrer as moot
Date: October 19, 2010Opposition
Date: December 22, 2010Minute Order
Date: July 13, 2010Statement Defandants' Index of Motions in Limine
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 5
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 4
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 2
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 6
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 1
Date: December 07, 2010Amended Complaint Amendment to Second Amended Complaint
Date: November 02, 2010Motion in Limine No 8
Date: December 07, 2010Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) POS for Association of Counsel
Date: November 10, 2010Minute Order
Date: October 21, 2010Motion in Limine No 10
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 14
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 9
Date: December 07, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 8
Date: December 07, 2010Declaration in Support of Motion in Limine No 12
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine No 11
Date: December 07, 2010Reply
Date: December 30, 2010Motion in Limine No 12
Date: December 07, 2010Opposition combined by pltf's F and R Abbott to mtn to compel
Date: December 16, 2010Motion in Limine No 13
Date: December 07, 2010Motion in Limine 1
Date: December 17, 2010Opposition
Date: December 23, 2010Joinder to Motion to CA Constructions Motions in Limine
Date: December 15, 2010Declaration Craig N Lungrens Declaration in support of Motion to Determine GFS
Date: February 16, 2010Notice of entry of order
Date: December 16, 2010Motion in Limine 2
Date: December 17, 2010Motion in Limine Supplemental Motion in Limine to Allow Testimony by Expert Bryan Hill
Date: January 03, 2011Notice
Date: December 16, 2010[mche] Order re: Severing Action (Cadre Design)
Date: January 12, 2011Reply to motion in limine
Date: January 06, 2011[mche] Minute Order re: Pre-Trial Orders
Date: January 07, 2011Request for Dismissal
Date: December 17, 2009Correspondence
Date: December 02, 2010Minute Order
Date: November 16, 2010Demurrer to Second Amended Complaint and Notice of Hearing
Date: June 21, 2010Motion in Limine Supplemental Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony
Date: January 03, 2011Correspondence
Date: February 04, 2010Request for Dismissal
Date: May 21, 2010Objection to Pltfs Late Supplemental Expert Witness Disclosure & Expert Witness Declaration
Date: December 29, 2010Opposition to R4Corps motion in limine to exclude documentary evidence not produced in discovery
Date: December 22, 2010Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of Motion to Determine GFS
Date: February 16, 2010Declaration Ronald Britschgis Declaration in support of Motion to Determine GFS
Date: February 16, 2010Motion in Limine #16
Date: January 03, 2011Declaration William Poulton in support of motion to determine good faith
Date: February 16, 2010Notice
Date: June 07, 2010Request for Judicial Notice to Second Amended Complaint and Notice of Hearing
Date: June 21, 2010Order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: December 06, 2010Reply
Date: December 23, 2010Association of Attorney
Date: November 04, 2010Opposition to Motion in Limine to Allow Testimony by Percipient Expert Bryan Hill
Date: January 06, 2011Minute Order
Date: January 03, 2011Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 22, 2010Answer
Date: December 09, 2009Amended Complaint THIRD
Date: November 05, 2010Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)
Date: February 16, 2010Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) -Verified Responses from Pltf Rodney Abbott
Date: December 06, 2010Motion re: to Sever Issue of Successor Liability; Declaration in support thereof
Date: January 11, 2011Declaration in support
Date: December 23, 2010Tentative Ruling
Date: January 06, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2014 |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Miscellaneous |
||
March 24, 2014 |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Scheduling |
||
March 24, 2014 |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Document |
||
March 24, 2014 |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed. Filed By: Ruybalid, Richard Kirk (Defendant) Document |
||
March 24, 2014 |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Ruybalid, Richard Kirk (Defendant) |
||
March 05, 2014 |
Notice Miscellaneous |
||
March 05, 2014 |
Notice Scheduling |
||
March 05, 2014 |
Notice Document |
||
March 05, 2014 |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full submitted by Ruybalid, Richard Kirk rejected on 03/05/2014 . Document |
||
March 05, 2014 | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.