Case Last Refreshed: 18 hours ago
Filed By: Ridge, David, Ridge, David, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by John P Briscoe, Nicholas Scardigli, against Does 1-100, The California Highway Patrol, represented by James F Curran, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with Thadd A. Blizzard presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2019 |
Category(Other Employment Complaint Case) |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint brings disability discrimination, failure to accommodate, failure to engage in the interactive process, retaliation for requesting accommodation, and failure to prevent discrimination and retaliation claims against the California Highw...
Motion to Compel Deposition of Erik Mallory with Production of Documents
Date: February 22, 2022Declaration of John P Briscoe ISO Motion to Compel Answers at Deposition
Date: April 29, 2021Declaration Declaration of James Curran
Date: May 20, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Compel Answers at Deposition
Date: April 29, 2021Declaration of John P Briscoe ISO MTC Deposition of Erik Mallory with Production of Documents
Date: February 22, 2022Reply to Compel Answers at Depo
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates
Date: September 09, 2021Proposed Order Denying plfs motion to compel
Date: May 20, 2021Certificate of Mailing for
Date: July 12, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 12, 2021Request to Trial Setting Conference
Date: April 09, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 24, 2022Minute Order
Date: June 03, 2021Minute Order
Date: April 07, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 12, 2022Correspondence Letter Confirming 04/07/22 Matter Dropped from D53 Calendar
Date: March 25, 2022Opposition to MTC Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three
Date: April 27, 2022Notice
Date: April 14, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 10, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: May 12, 2022Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: September 24, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: August 26, 2022Reply
Date: November 22, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 23, 2019Separate Statement Separate- ISO MSJ/SA
Date: December 16, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 18, 2022Motion to Compel Signature on Authorization Form
Date: August 26, 2022Minute Order
Date: December 01, 2022Notice
Date: November 21, 2019Request Granted Request to Continue MSC
Date: February 02, 2023Declaration of Vue
Date: August 11, 2022Order Order GRANTING Stipulation and Protective Order
Date: August 21, 2020Motion to Compel Further Deposition of Pltf
Date: November 07, 2022Answer To Complaint
Date: December 05, 2019Proposed Order Protective Order
Date: July 07, 2022Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: March 22, 2023Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: November 06, 2019Declaration of David Munis ISO MSJ/SA
Date: February 24, 2023Notice
Date: June 26, 2020Proposed Order Denying Pitchess Motion
Date: July 07, 2022[mche] Ruling on 9:15am Ex Parte for OST on Motion to Compel
Date: November 04, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 26, 2020Notice
Date: March 20, 2023Order
Date: November 04, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: October 03, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: September 27, 2023Declaration of Castle
Date: August 11, 2022Motion to Compel Answers at Deposition
Date: April 29, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 19, 2022Proposed Order
Date: August 26, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: November 07, 2022Stipulation and Order Stipulated Protective Order
Date: August 20, 2020Complaint
Date: September 23, 2019Minute Order
Date: January 11, 2023Declaration of David Munis ISO MSJ/SA
Date: February 16, 2023Order
Date: February 22, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: December 16, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 02, 2023Ex Parte Application for OST Motion to Compel Deposition
Date: November 03, 2022Opposition to Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 16, 2022Declaration of James F Curran ISO Motion to Compel
Date: August 26, 2022Opposition
Date: November 09, 2022Declaration Declaration of service
Date: September 20, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Compel
Date: August 26, 2022Demand for Jury Trial
Date: March 11, 2020Order Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment or Adjudication
Date: March 28, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Opposition to MTC Further Deposition of Pltf
Date: November 16, 2022Attachments/Supporting Documents Compendium of Evidence ISO MSA/SA
Date: December 16, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 21, 2022Objection to Evidence Cited in Opposition to MSJ/SA
Date: February 24, 2023Minute Order
Date: September 26, 2022Objection to Evidence Submitted
Date: February 16, 2023Declaration of James F. Curran ISO MTC Further Deposition of Pltf
Date: November 07, 2022[mche] Notice of Disclosure
Date: June 24, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO MSJ/SA
Date: December 16, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 06, 2023Motion re: to File Inadvertently Admitted Dec Supporting MSJ
Date: February 23, 2023Attachments/Supporting Documents Supplemental Ex Parte App for Shortening Time
Date: August 29, 2022Attachments/Supporting Documents Evidence in Oppo to MSJ
Date: February 16, 2023Order
Date: August 29, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 16, 2023Minute Order
Date: November 23, 2022Ex Parte Application for Order Rescheduling Hearings
Date: November 09, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 15, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 07, 2022Declaration of James F Curran ISO Opp
Date: July 07, 2022Statement of Disputed and Undisputed Material facts
Date: February 16, 2023Reply to motion for discovery
Date: July 13, 2022Declaration of James F Curran ISO Opposition
Date: November 16, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 16, 2023Request for Informal Discovery Conference
Date: April 19, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: March 30, 2023Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: March 16, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 22, 2022Order
Date: November 10, 2022Reply to MSJ/SA
Date: February 24, 2023Request Granted Request to Appear via Zoom at MSC
Date: March 08, 2023Certificate of Mailing for
Date: March 06, 2023Declaration of John P. Briscoe ISO Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 19, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 03, 2022Ex Parte Application for OST fro Hearing on Motion to File Inadvertantly Omitted Declaration
Date: February 21, 2023Minute Order
Date: July 20, 2022Stipulation and Order Protective
Date: June 24, 2020Summons
Date: September 23, 2019[mche] Ruling on 9:00 am Ex Parte Application for OST on Motion to Compel
Date: November 04, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: September 26, 2022Opposition to Pitchess Motion
Date: July 07, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 20, 2020Declaration of John P. Briscoe In Opposition to MTC Further Deposition of Pltf
Date: November 16, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: February 16, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: March 11, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: March 11, 2020Correspondence Letter Confirming Matter Dropped
Date: May 12, 2023Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 30, 2022Statement ISO Motion to Compel Answers at Deposition
Date: April 29, 2021Reply to Motion to Compel Signature on Authorization Form and Compliance with Subpoena
Date: September 12, 2022Declaration of Briscoe
Date: February 16, 2023Ex Parte Application for OST
Date: November 03, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 20, 2023Notice of Entry of Order filed.
Date: November 07, 2022Case Management Statement filed.
Date: May 20, 2020Declaration - Other (of John P. Briscoe ISO Motion for Protective Order) filed.
Date: October 19, 2022Paper Exhibits (Evidence in Oppo to MSJ) filed.
Date: February 16, 2023Motion to Compel - Other (Answers at Deposition) filed.
Date: April 29, 2021Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: February 16, 2023Notice of Disclosure
Date: June 24, 2022Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: March 11, 2020Declaration - Other (of David Munis ISO MSJ/SA) filed.
Date: February 24, 2023Proposed Order (Protective Order) filed.
Date: July 07, 2022Motion to Compel - Other (Deposition of Erik Mallory with Production of Documents) filed.
Date: February 22, 2022Motion to Compel - Other (Signature on Authorization Form) filed.
Date: August 26, 2022Opposition filed.
Date: November 09, 2022Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion filed.
Date: November 22, 2022Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: August 29, 2022Motion to Compel - Other (Further Deposition of Pltf) filed.
Date: November 07, 2022Declaration - Other (Declaration of James Curran) filed.
Date: May 20, 2021Opposition (to Pitchess Motion) filed.
Date: July 07, 2022Order After Hearing filed.
Date: March 28, 2023Default denied as to The California Highway Patrol on Complaint .
Date: November 06, 2019Declaration - Other (of James F Curran ISO Opposition) filed.
Date: November 16, 2022Proposed Order (Denying plfs motion to compel) filed.
Date: May 20, 2021Proposed Order filed.
Date: August 26, 2022Correspondence (Letter Confirming 04/07/22 Matter Dropped from D53 Calendar) filed.
Date: March 25, 2022Ex Parte Application - Other (for OST) filed.
Date: November 03, 2022Request - Other (to Trial Setting Conference) filed.
Date: April 09, 2021Declaration - Other (of James F Curran ISO Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: August 26, 2022Minutes finalized for heard on 05/12/2022 01:30:00 PM .
Date: May 12, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: March 06, 2023Paper Exhibits (Compendium of Evidence ISO MSA/SA) filed.
Date: December 16, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Hearing generated .
Date: March 26, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: February 16, 2023Motion - Other (to File Inadvertently Admitted Dec Supporting MSJ) filed.
Date: February 23, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Opposition to MTC Further Deposition of Pltf) filed.
Date: November 16, 2022Request - Other (for Informal Discovery Conference) filed.
Date: April 19, 2021Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: August 26, 2022Case Management Statement filed.
Date: March 11, 2020Declaration - Other (of Vue) filed.
Date: August 11, 2022Ex Parte Application - Other (for OST Motion to Compel Deposition) filed.
Date: November 03, 2022Declaration - Other (of Castle) filed.
Date: August 11, 2022Order - Other (Order GRANTING Stipulation and Protective Order) filed.
Date: August 21, 2020Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: October 03, 2019Complaint filed.
Date: September 23, 2019Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: November 04, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: August 26, 2022Declaration - Other (of David Munis ISO MSJ/SA) filed.
Date: February 16, 2023Ex Parte Application - Other (for Order Rescheduling Hearings) filed.
Date: November 09, 2022Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Protective) filed.
Date: June 24, 2020Reply to Opposition (to MSJ/SA) filed.
Date: February 24, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: November 22, 2022Minutes finalized for heard on 07/12/2021 09:00:00 AM .
Date: July 12, 2021Notice of Conditional Settlement filed.
Date: March 30, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment filed.
Date: December 16, 2022Objection (to Evidence Cited in Opposition to MSJ/SA) filed.
Date: February 24, 2023Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: September 09, 2021Declaration - Other (of James F. Curran ISO MTC Further Deposition of Pltf) filed.
Date: November 07, 2022Motion for Protective Order filed.
Date: October 19, 2022Supplemental - Other (Supplemental Ex Parte App for Shortening Time) filed.
Date: August 29, 2022Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Stipulated Protective Order) filed.
Date: August 20, 2020Minutes finalized for heard on 09/26/2022 01:30:00 PM .
Date: September 26, 2022Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: November 06, 2019Statement - Other (of Disputed and Undisputed Material facts) filed.
Date: February 16, 2023Declaration - Other (of Briscoe) filed.
Date: February 16, 2023Objection (to Evidence Submitted) filed.
Date: February 16, 2023Demand for Jury Trial filed.
Date: March 11, 2020Opposition (to MTC Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three) filed.
Date: April 27, 2022Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (to Compel Answers at Depo) filed.
Date: May 27, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: September 23, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: February 16, 2023Proposed Order (Denying Pitchess Motion) filed.
Date: July 07, 2022Ruling on 9:15am Ex Parte for OST on Motion to Compel
Date: November 04, 2022Statement - Other (ISO Motion to Compel Answers at Deposition) filed.
Date: April 29, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: November 07, 2022Reply to Opposition (to motion for discovery) filed.
Date: July 13, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: February 24, 2022Opposition (to Motion for Protective Order) filed.
Date: November 16, 2022Declaration - Other (Declaration of service) filed.
Date: September 20, 2022Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: February 22, 2023Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference - Settled filed.
Date: March 22, 2023Minutes finalized for heard on 03/06/2023 01:30:00 PM .
Date: March 06, 2023Ruling on 9:00 am Ex Parte Application for OST on Motion to Compel
Date: November 04, 2022Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: November 10, 2022Declaration - Other (of James F Curran ISO Opp) filed.
Date: July 07, 2022Request - Other (Granted Request to Continue MSC) filed.
Date: February 02, 2023Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: March 16, 2023Request - Other (Granted Request to Appear via Zoom at MSC) filed.
Date: March 08, 2023Answer (To Complaint) filed.
Date: December 05, 2019Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: September 26, 2022Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: December 30, 2022Declaration - Other (of John P. Briscoe In Opposition to MTC Further Deposition of Pltf) filed.
Date: November 16, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO MSJ/SA) filed.
Date: December 16, 2022Proposed Order filed.
Date: March 15, 2023Statement of Undisputed Facts (Separate- ISO MSJ/SA) filed.
Date: December 16, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: May 12, 2022Summons filed.
Date: September 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 |
Request for Dismissal Document |
||
May 12, 2023 |
Correspondence Letter Confirming Matter Dropped Document |
||
May 12, 2023 |
Motion to Inadvertently Omitted Dec scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 01:30 PM in Hall of Justice at Department 53 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 05/12/2023 Event |
||
May 12, 2023 |
Correspondence Letter Confirming Matter Dropped The California Highway Patrol (Defendant) |
||
May 10, 2023 |
Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference Cont'd from 2/14 at parties' request. MSC continued to 3/22, via remote (James Henderson, pro tem). scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 01:30 PM in Hall of Justice at Department 59 updated: Result Date to 03/16/2023 Result Type to Held Event |
||
April 07, 2023 |
The case is placed in special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement Case |
||
March 30, 2023 |
Notice of Settlement Document |
||
March 30, 2023 |
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed. Filed By: Ridge, David (Plaintiff) Document |
||
March 30, 2023 |
Notice of Settlement Ridge, David (Plaintiff) |
||
March 30, 2023 |
Notice of Conditional Settlement filed. Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.