Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arata, Thomas, Leake, Joseph, Owyang, Rich, Pecot, Johna, Taylor, Oscar, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kranz, Paul Lawrence, against Does 1-100, Does 1 To 100, Mcdaniels, Shedrick, San Francisco Deputy Sheriff'S Association, San Francisco Deputy Sheriff'S Association, A, (total of 9) See All represented by Cullinane-Smith, Lara, Murray, Lawrence Dale, Ongaro, David R, Stern, Harry S, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Kennedy Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1170 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time2828 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The attorney representing the plaintiffs, Paul L. Kranz, is requesting the dismissal of the action against the defendant, San Francisco Deputy Sheriffs' Association, et al. The case number is...
ORDER GRANTING EX-PARTE APPLICATION SETTING HEARING DATE
Date: May 21, 2015ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: August 04, 2015ORDER TO DISMISS ACTION
Date: October 24, 2016MINUTES FOR AUG-15-2013 8:45 AM
Date: August 15, 2013ORDER ON MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS
Date: October 09, 2013ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: June 18, 2013NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT (X-APPEAL FILED 9/13/2013)
Date: October 02, 2013ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL DENYING NEW TRIAL AND AMENDING THE JUDGMENT
Date: September 11, 2013CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF CROSS-APPEAL
Date: September 16, 2013NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT
Date: August 30, 2013ORDER CONTINUING THE OCT-19-2012 HEARING FOR MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION TO JAN-25-2013
Date: October 25, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO DEPUTY SHERIFF'S ASSOCIATION
Date: August 24, 2012REPLY TO DEFTS OPPOS FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARATA, THOMAS
Date: July 23, 2012ORDER CONTINUING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (STIP FILED 5/7/12 )
Date: May 09, 2012DECLARATION OF WILLIAM A BARNES FILED BY PLAINTIFF PECOT, JOHNA
Date: March 23, 2012REPLY TO OPPOSITION ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF PECOT, JOHNA
Date: March 22, 2012ORDER GRANTING CONTIUANCE OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: December 02, 2011PROOF OF SERCVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO DEPUTY SHERIFF'S ASSOCIATION
Date: March 16, 2012NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY ONGARO, DAVID R
Date: March 01, 2012ORDER CONTINUING ANTI-SLAPP MOTION
Date: July 01, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO DEPUTY SHERIFF'S ASSOCIATION
Date: April 21, 2011NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 30, 2010ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON SLAPP FEE MOTION (FROM 1/31/12 TO 2/10/12)
Date: January 27, 2012MINUTES FOR JUL-07-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 302
Date: July 07, 2011ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2015ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO VACATE
Date: January 29, 2015ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' SECOND MOTION TO STRIKE CLAIMS IN THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 12, 2015ORDER RE CCP 473 MOTION RE 9/26/14 ORDER
Date: November 07, 2014DECLARATION OF PAUL KRANZ (TRANSACTION ID # 56350429) FILED BY PLAINTIFF PECOT, JOHNA
Date: November 17, 2014REMITTITUR PARTIAL ONY AS TO APPEAL FILED 8/19/13 A139566 DIV 4
Date: July 18, 2014DIRECTORY NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT-DEPOSIT (L. WARD)(X-APPEAL FILED 9/13/13)
Date: October 16, 2013NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (8.124)(CROSS-APPEAL FILED 9/13/13)
Date: September 13, 2013ORDER RE: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: September 12, 2013NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY KRANZ, PAUL LAWRENCE
Date: July 01, 2013CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: August 21, 2013CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: November 22, 2013ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: November 10, 2015ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 04, 2015ORDER TO STRIKE THE REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
Date: August 25, 2016REMITTITUR AFFIRMED - A139566 DIV. 4
Date: March 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR AFFIRMED - A139566 DIV. 4 | |
November 29, 2016 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-29-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS ACTION | |
October 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Plaintiffs Johna Pecot, Thomas Arata, Rich Owyang, Stephen Tilton, Joseph Leake And Oscar Taylor'S Motion For Leave For Dismissals To Be Filed
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-24-2016 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 206 | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | DEPT. 206: PLAINTIFFS JOHNA PECOT, THOMAS ARATA, RICH OWYANG, STEPHEN TILTON, JOSEPH LEAKE AND OSCAR TAYLOR'S MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR DISMISSALS TO BE FILED IS GRANTED. THE COURT VACATES ITS AUGUST 24, 2016 ORDER STRIKING THE REQUESTS FOR DISMISSALS. WRITTEN ORDER IS SIGNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: JOHN K. STEWART; CLERK: JOSE RIOS MERIDA; REPORTER: SARA LERSCHEN, CSR NO. 6213, EMAIL: SLERSCHEN@SFTC.ORG. | |
October 21, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion For Leave For Dismissals To Be Filed SET FOR HEARING ON FRIDAY, OCTOBER 21, 2016, LINE 1 PLAINTIFFS JOHNA PECOT, THOMAS ARATA, RICH OWYANG, STEPHEN TILTON, JOSEPH LEAKE and OSCAR TAYL...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
October 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion For Leave For Dismissals To Be Filed
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
October 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR PLAINTIFFS JOHNA PECOT, THOMAS ARATA, RICH OWYANG, STEPHEN TILTON, JOSEPH LEAKE AND OSCAR TAYLOR'S MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR DISMISSALS TO BE FILED HEARING SET FOR OCT-24-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.