Case Last Refreshed: 5 days ago
Anthony L Perez, Successor-In-Interest To The Estate Of Jordan Lee Perez, Perez, Anthony L, Perez, Sandra L, Sandra L Perez, Successor-In-Interest To The Estate Of Jordan Lee Perez, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Dayton, Gordon Leigh, Law Offices Of Gordon L Dayton, Pro Se, against Abongwa M.D., Chenue, Barcega M.D., Besh R, Bravo M.D, Thomas P, Brown M.D., Lance A, Collins M.D., Chelsea L, (total of 24) See All represented by La Follette Johnson De Haas Fesler & Ames, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2019 |
CategoryComplaint For Medical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions308 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a proof of service document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff, Anthony L. Perez, and other individuals are named as respondents/defendants. The document states that the proof of servi...
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 06, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 06, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 06, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 06, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: May 06, 2019Amended Complaint Filed
Date: July 31, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 31, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 31, 2019Amended Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 31, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 21, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: August 21, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: August 21, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 21, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 21, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: August 21, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 21, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: August 21, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: August 21, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2019Motion Filed
Date: November 04, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 04, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 07, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 12, 2019Ex-Parte Motion Filed re:
Date: December 30, 2019Reply Filed
Date: December 31, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: December 31, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 06, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 06, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 10, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 25, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 25, 2020Reply Filed
Date: March 02, 2020Reply Filed
Date: March 02, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 03, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 02, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: June 02, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 16, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 17, 2020Demurrer Filed
Date: July 21, 2020Motion Filed
Date: July 21, 2020At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 23, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 23, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 11, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 11, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 11, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 11, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 11, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 14, 2020Reply Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Reply Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 20, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 20, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 02, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Motion Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Motion Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Reply Filed
Date: September 30, 2020Reply Filed
Date: September 30, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 06, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 06, 2020Reply Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Reply Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: November 19, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 19, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: December 23, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 27, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 27, 2021Reply to Motion re:
Date: February 02, 2021Answer Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: March 08, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 09, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: March 09, 2021Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: April 09, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: April 29, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 29, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 24, 2021Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: May 28, 2021Proof of Service
Date: May 28, 2021Answer Filed
Date: June 04, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: June 18, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: June 18, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: June 18, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: June 18, 2021Objection Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 15, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 15, 2021Reply Filed
Date: July 15, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: September 07, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: September 07, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: September 07, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: September 09, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 10, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 21, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: September 21, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 12, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 08, 2021Motion to Deem Requests for Admissions Admitted
Date: March 08, 2022Declaration re:
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: April 27, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: April 27, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: April 27, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 13, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: May 13, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: June 02, 2022Miscellaneous Opposition Filed
Date: June 15, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 15, 2022Objection Filed
Date: June 15, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 15, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Stipulation for Continuance of
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: August 11, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 18, 2023Motion for Protective Order
Date: October 03, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: October 19, 2023Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 19, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 19, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: October 19, 2023Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: November 01, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 08, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: November 08, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: November 15, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 20, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 20, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 05, 2023Proof of Service
Date: December 26, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: December 26, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: January 04, 2024Separate Statement ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: January 04, 2024Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: January 04, 2024Proof of Service
Date: January 04, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 04, 2024Compendium of Exhibits ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: January 04, 2024Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: January 23, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 26, 2024Notice Filed
Date: February 29, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 01, 2024Memorandum of Costs
Date: March 01, 2024Notice Filed
Date: March 06, 2024Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: March 13, 2024Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: April 03, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 29, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: September 03, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: September 03, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: September 03, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 20, 2019Ex Parte Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 28, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 04, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 16, 2020Demurrer Filed
Date: February 06, 2020Motion Filed
Date: February 06, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 25, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 25, 2020Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: 2021-09-07T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
October 17, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 22, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 18, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
March 13, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | CSR Directed to Prepare Transcript of Proceedings | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Matter taken under submission | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL READINGNESS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL DATES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.