Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Autozone Parts, Inc., Dorman Products, Inc., Idsc Holdings, Llc, Mitchell Repair Information Company, Llc, Mountain View Tire & Service, Inc., (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by London Fischer Llp, Panish Shea & Boyle, against Autozone, Inc., Autozone Parts, Inc., Dorman Products, Inc., Eastwood Garage, Inc., Mcmahon'S Rv Superstore, Inc., (total of 14) See All represented by Anglin, Flewelling, Rasmussen, Campbell &Trytten, Friedenthal, Heffernan & Brown, Llp, Haight Brown & Bonesteel, Hall Huguenin Llp, Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester Llp, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S. Garza presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2017 |
CategoryPi Personal Injury Not Mv |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 28, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 17, 2019Trial Brief Filed
Date: August 01, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: September 06, 2019Exhibits List Filed
Date: July 23, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 19, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 19, 2019Reply Filed
Date: July 08, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 30, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: July 26, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 27, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 25, 2019Trial Brief Filed
Date: July 31, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 18, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 17, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 06, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 23, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 18, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 17, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 18, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Objection Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 26, 2019Reply Filed
Date: July 09, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 25, 2019Ex-Parte Motion Filed re:
Date: May 10, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 23, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: February 08, 2017Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed
Date: December 16, 2020Notice of Cross Appeal Filed
Date: December 17, 2020Notice to Return Exhibits Filed
Date: October 25, 2023Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: December 31, 2020Deposit and Disbursement Order
Date: December 11, 2020Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: January 15, 2021Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: December 11, 2020Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: February 02, 2021GC70632- Reporters Transcript Trust Fee
Date: December 31, 2020Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: February 17, 2021Clerk's Notification of Filing Cross Appeal
Date: December 17, 2020Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: January 14, 2021Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: December 31, 2020Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: December 31, 2020Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: January 08, 2024Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: April 23, 2021Amended Notice to Reporter For Estimate of Costs filed/maile
Date: February 18, 2021Deposit and Disbursement Order
Date: December 11, 2020Respondent's Notice Designating Record on Appeal filed
Date: December 29, 2020GC70632- Reporters Transcript Trust Fee
Date: December 11, 2020Deposit and Disbursement Order
Date: December 31, 2020Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: February 17, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: January 08, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: August 23, 2017Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 14, 2017Notice Sent re:
Date: November 27, 2018Proof of Service as to Clerk's Certified Mail with Costs of:
Date: February 20, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 08, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: May 16, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: April 27, 2017Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 05, 2018Ex Parte Filed
Date: June 10, 2019Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: March 22, 2018At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: January 29, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: October 19, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: May 20, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 23, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 26, 2018Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: March 06, 2017Answer Filed
Date: June 24, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: June 24, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 05, 2017Motion Filed
Date: June 25, 2019Reply Filed
Date: June 30, 2017Proof of Service as to Clerk's Certified Mail with Costs of:
Date: August 03, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Motion Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: July 19, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 12, 2017Ex-Parte Motion Filed re:
Date: June 26, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 01, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: January 10, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: June 28, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 19, 2017Notice Imaged
Date: October 05, 2017Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: June 19, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 20, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: August 31, 2020Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: January 22, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: July 20, 2018Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: November 26, 2018Summons Issued on
Date: November 26, 2018Answer Filed
Date: May 19, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 01, 2017Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 03, 2019Reply Filed
Date: January 03, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 27, 2019Statement of Damages Filed
Date: July 21, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 18, 2019Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: March 15, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 06, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: February 08, 2017Motion Filed
Date: April 13, 2017Ex Parte Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 17, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 07, 2020Remittitur Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Answer Filed
Date: April 06, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 07, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 24, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 13, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 08, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 10, 2017Motion Filed
Date: August 07, 2020Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: April 26, 2017Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 11, 2019Motion Filed
Date: March 28, 2019Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: July 19, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: July 11, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 14, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: June 19, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: January 29, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 31, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: October 25, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: October 21, 2019Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: May 30, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 04, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: February 06, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: March 18, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: August 11, 2020Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 04, 2017Answer Filed
Date: December 06, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: June 24, 2019Reply Filed
Date: November 12, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 09, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: March 01, 2017Motion Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Exhibits List Filed
Date: August 19, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 28, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: January 17, 2020Proof of Service as to Clerk's Certified Mail with Costs of:
Date: August 03, 2017Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: April 26, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: May 30, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: October 21, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 28, 2019Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: April 26, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 23, 2019Opinion Received and Sent to Department
Date: May 17, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: June 19, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: June 19, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: May 12, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 09, 2020Reply Filed
Date: September 09, 2020Answer Filed
Date: May 03, 2019Summons Issued on
Date: September 21, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 23, 2017Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 03, 2017Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 17, 2020Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Answer Filed
Date: August 23, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Summons Issued on
Date: March 22, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: November 30, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: October 05, 2020Motion Filed
Date: December 24, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: January 17, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 25, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 28, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 01, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 01, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: July 03, 2019Answer Filed
Date: March 22, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 27, 2019Summons Issued on
Date: May 09, 2019Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: December 04, 2020Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Amended Notice to Reporter For Estimate of Costs filed/maile
Date: March 15, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 21, 2018Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: November 09, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 01, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 25, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: April 17, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 19, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: May 01, 2017Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 08, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 28, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 17, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Motion Filed
Date: October 05, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 20, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: May 01, 2017Notice Sent re:
Date: July 17, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 01, 2020Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: May 31, 2019Answer Filed
Date: September 21, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: June 26, 2017Ex Parte Filed
Date: October 04, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 01, 2017Motion Filed
Date: July 20, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 11, 2018Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: May 31, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 08, 2017Answer Filed
Date: March 08, 2017Reply Filed
Date: August 07, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 18, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Motion Filed
Date: January 17, 2020Deposit and Disbursement Order
Date: December 31, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: June 23, 2017Notice Filed
Date: November 19, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: January 16, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 07, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 06, 2020Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 29, 2020Motion Filed
Date: October 07, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 26, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: July 02, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 21, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 06, 2019Appeals - Memorandum of Costs on Appeal
Date: August 28, 2023Motion Filed
Date: August 31, 2020Objection Filed
Date: November 06, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 21, 2020Notice of Delivery of Appeal Record
Date: August 10, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 10, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: August 07, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 06, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 09, 2020Memorandum of Costs
Date: October 08, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: September 26, 2023Points and Authorities Filed
Date: August 07, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Summons Issued on
Date: September 20, 2018Motion Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 05, 2020Objection Filed
Date: October 19, 2017Reply Filed
Date: October 25, 2017Witness List Filed
Date: July 23, 2019Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: September 21, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 03, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: April 18, 2017Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 31, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: October 05, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: July 05, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 21, 2017Order Filed Re:
Date: January 23, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 13, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 30, 2019Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: July 20, 2018Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: December 29, 2020Receipt of Records/Exhibits filed
Date: January 25, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 24, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 01, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 10, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 01, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: October 04, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 23, 2017Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: May 02, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: October 04, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 09, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: January 25, 2019Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: December 14, 2020At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: October 25, 2017Motion Filed
Date: June 24, 2019Motion Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: March 05, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 09, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 03, 2017Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: August 23, 2017Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 25, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 04, 2019Answer Filed
Date: May 20, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: June 19, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 21, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 16, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 23, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 27, 2017Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 09, 2020Notice Sent re:
Date: August 24, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 12, 2019Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: January 29, 2018Reply Filed
Date: September 23, 2020Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: June 10, 2019Reply Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: May 03, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: September 22, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 26, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Motion Filed
Date: October 09, 2020Judgment Filed
Date: October 03, 2019Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal
Date: December 01, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non Opposition To The Motion Filed to strike memorandum of costs on appeal |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to Return Exhibits Filed - Div. 2 |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike Second Notice and Motion to Strike Memorandum of Costs on Appeal filed by defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $60 check paid on 10/02/23 for motion |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Motion to Strike; Please Create Reservation prior to submitting Motion to Stike submitted via turbo court |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Appeals - Memorandum of Costs on Appeal | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remittitur Filed Appeal is AFFIRMED and DISMISSED by reviewing court |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remittitur Routed to SBJC to Supervising Judge Ochoa |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opinion Received and Sent to Department SBJC via email for review |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.