Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Zaman, Sajida, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Arash S Khosrowshahi, against Does 1-20, Liqui-Box Corporation, represented by James T Jones, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts Superior with Shama Hakim Mesiwala presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShama Hakim Mesiwala Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2019 |
Category(Wrongful Termination) |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This is a complaint filed in California Superior Court, alleging violations of the California Fair Employment and Housing Act (FEHA), as well as claims for wrongful termination in violation of public policy, disability discrimination, failure to acco...
Motion to Quash to Sockolov & Sockolov
Date: August 08, 2022Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: August 04, 2022Declaration of Arash S Khosrowshahi ISO Motion to Quash
Date: August 08, 2022Declaration of James T Jones ISO Motion
Date: August 09, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 04, 2022Motion to Quash
Date: August 05, 2022Order
Date: August 05, 2022Declaration of Arash S Khosrowshahi ISO Motion to Quash or Modify the Scope of Subpoena
Date: August 05, 2022Reply to MTC Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Five
Date: August 18, 2022Reply to MTC Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set Five
Date: August 18, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 23, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 18, 2022Reply MTC Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set Four
Date: August 18, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 23, 2022Summons
Date: March 08, 2019Proposed Order
Date: August 08, 2022Declaration of Arash S Khosrowshahi
Date: August 08, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion
Date: August 09, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Quash
Date: August 08, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 09, 2022Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: March 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 28, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 13, 2019Tentative Ruling
Date: September 05, 2019Declaration of James T Jones ISO Opp
Date: August 16, 2022Reply to MTC Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three
Date: August 18, 2022Request for Judicial Notice ISO Ex Parte
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 10, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 10, 2022Reply to MTC Further Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Four
Date: August 18, 2022Opposition to Motion for Requests for Admissions
Date: August 16, 2022Opposition to Motion to Compel Form Interrogatories
Date: August 16, 2022Notice
Date: August 24, 2022Order GRANTING OST - Hearing Advanced from 8/24/22 to 8/10/22
Date: May 19, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 27, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: May 27, 2022Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Specially Set Hearing Date on MSJ/SA
Date: May 19, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 29, 2022Declaration Declaration of Angela Kenyon
Date: May 27, 2022Statement Statement of undisputed material facts
Date: May 27, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: May 24, 2021Motion re: for Request for Admissions
Date: June 29, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 29, 2022[mche] Notice of Disclosure
Date: June 29, 2022Request Granted Request to Appear by Zoom at MSC
Date: July 27, 2022Declaration of Khosrowshahi
Date: June 29, 2022Statement Sep Statement in Opposition
Date: July 27, 2022Declaration of Zaman
Date: July 27, 2022Declaration of Torabi
Date: July 27, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 27, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 27, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: July 27, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 01, 2022Declaration Le
Date: July 27, 2022Declaration of Khosrwoshahi iso Opposition
Date: July 27, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) Special Interrogatories, Set 4
Date: August 03, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) Special Interrogatories, Set 5
Date: August 03, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 03, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 24, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: January 24, 2020Answer
Date: March 09, 2020Reply for Leave to File First Amended Complaint
Date: January 09, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 16, 2020Amended Complaint First
Date: January 24, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 09, 2020Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates
Date: July 27, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: May 11, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: May 11, 2022Ex Parte Application to Specially Set hearing Date on MSJ/SA
Date: May 18, 2022Certificate of Mailing for
Date: August 26, 2022Ex Parte Application for OST to Hear Motion to Compel
Date: August 24, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) Special Interrogatories, Set 3
Date: August 03, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 25, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 25, 2022Declaration of Khosrowshahi
Date: August 25, 2022Order 9:00AM
Date: August 25, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 25, 2022Order 9:15AM
Date: August 25, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 26, 2022Order
Date: August 30, 2022Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial
Date: August 29, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 29, 2022Declaration of Arash Khosrowshahi in Opp to Motion to Accept Expert Witness
Date: August 29, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Opp to Motion to Accept Expert Witness Designation
Date: August 29, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 18, 2022Declaration of Arsh S. Khosrowshahi in Opposition to Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: August 30, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 01, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities to Ex Parte motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: August 30, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 20, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 30, 2022Motion to Continue Trial Date
Date: September 01, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion
Date: September 01, 2022Declaration of James T Jones ISO Motion
Date: September 01, 2022Declaration Of Angela Beard ISO Opposition To Motion To Continue Trial Date
Date: September 06, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Opposition To Motion To Continue Trial Date
Date: September 06, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 06, 2022Order Order DENYING Defendants' MSJ/MSA
Date: September 01, 2022Declaration Of Arash S. Khosrowshahi ISO Opposition To Motion To Continue Trial Date
Date: September 06, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 09, 2022Tentative Ruling
Date: September 07, 2022Notice of Settlement
Date: September 12, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 11, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 12, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: October 11, 2022Minute Order
Date: September 16, 2019Declaration of Arash S Khosrowshahi
Date: December 17, 2019Proposed Order
Date: December 17, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: October 18, 2019Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint
Date: December 17, 2019Reply iso Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: August 05, 2022Motion to Quash to Sacramento Orthopedic Center
Date: August 08, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 17, 2019Ex Parte Application for Specially Setting Hearings on Discovery Motions
Date: August 10, 2022Opposition to plfs Motion for Leave to File Fist Amended Complaint
Date: January 03, 2020Proposed Order
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 11, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion to Quash or Modify the Scope of Subpoena
Date: August 05, 2022Proposed Order Denying MSJ/SA
Date: August 23, 2022Motion to Quash Methodist Hospital of Sacramento
Date: August 05, 2022Motion re: to Accept Deft's Expert Witness Designation
Date: August 09, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Ex Parte
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration of Arash S Khosrowshahi ISO Ex Parte
Date: August 10, 2022Order
Date: August 11, 2022Notice Amended Notice of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses
Date: August 11, 2022Declaration Declaration of Arash Khosrowshahi in opposition
Date: August 12, 2022Declaration Declaration of James Jones
Date: August 15, 2022Statement Statement of items in dispute re motion to compel re RFPD set 5
Date: August 15, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 08, 2019Certificate of Mailing for
Date: August 16, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 12, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 16, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 08, 2019Complaint
Date: March 08, 2019Ex Parte Application for Order Extending the Deadline
Date: August 11, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 11, 2022Notice Amended Notice of Motion for Requests
Date: August 11, 2022Order
Date: August 12, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO Motion for Leave to File 1st Amended Complaint
Date: December 17, 2019Proposed Order Proposed First Amended Complaint
Date: December 17, 2019Answer
Date: May 06, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 12, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 12, 2022Motion to Quash to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Date: August 05, 2022Complaint filed.
Date: March 08, 2019Summons filed.
Date: March 08, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: March 08, 2019Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: April 08, 2019Answer filed.
Date: May 06, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: August 13, 2019Case Management Statement filed.
Date: August 28, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.
Date: October 18, 2019Motion for Leave to Amend (to File First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: December 17, 2019Notice of Settlement Conference and Trial Dates filed.
Date: July 27, 2021Proposed Order (Proposed First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: December 17, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion for Leave to File 1st Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: December 17, 2019Declaration - Other (of Arash S Khosrowshahi) filed.
Date: December 17, 2019Proposed Order filed.
Date: December 17, 2019Proof of Service filed.
Date: December 17, 2019Opposition (to plfs Motion for Leave to File Fist Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: January 03, 2020Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion (for Leave to File First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: January 09, 2020Proof of Service filed.
Date: January 09, 2020Amended Complaint (First) filed.
Date: January 24, 2020Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: January 24, 2020Answer filed.
Date: March 09, 2020Minutes finalized for heard on 05/24/2021 09:00:00 AM .
Date: May 24, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: May 24, 2021Declaration - Other (Declaration of Angela Kenyon) filed.
Date: May 27, 2022Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: May 11, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed.
Date: May 27, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: May 11, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: May 27, 2022Statement - Other (Statement of undisputed material facts) filed.
Date: May 27, 2022Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: June 29, 2022Motion - Other (for Request for Admissions) filed.
Date: June 29, 2022Notice of Disclosure
Date: June 29, 2022Declaration - Other (of Torabi) filed.
Date: July 27, 2022Declaration - Other (of Khosrowshahi) filed.
Date: June 29, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: June 29, 2022Request - Other (Granted Request to Appear by Zoom at MSC) filed.
Date: July 27, 2022Statement - Other (Sep Statement in Opposition) filed.
Date: July 27, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (Requests for Production of Documents, Set 5) filed.
Date: August 03, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: August 03, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (Requests for Production of Documents, Set 4) filed.
Date: August 03, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (Special Interrogatories, Set 3) filed.
Date: August 03, 2022Motion to Quash Subpoena filed.
Date: August 05, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: August 04, 2022Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.
Date: August 04, 2022Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: August 05, 2022Motion to Quash Subpoena (Methodist Hospital of Sacramento) filed.
Date: August 05, 2022Motion to Quash Subpoena (to Travelers Property Casualty Company of America) filed.
Date: August 05, 2022Reply (iso Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication) filed.
Date: August 05, 2022Proposed Order filed.
Date: August 08, 2022Motion to Quash Subpoena (to Sacramento Orthopedic Center) filed.
Date: August 08, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion to Quash) filed.
Date: August 08, 2022Declaration - Other (of Arash S Khosrowshahi ISO Motion to Quash) filed.
Date: August 08, 2022Motion to Quash Subpoena (to Sockolov & Sockolov) filed.
Date: August 08, 2022Declaration - Other (of Arash S Khosrowshahi) filed.
Date: August 08, 2022Proposed Order filed.
Date: August 10, 2022Motion - Other (to Accept Deft's Expert Witness Designation) filed.
Date: August 09, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion) filed.
Date: August 09, 2022Declaration - Other (of James T Jones ISO Motion) filed.
Date: August 09, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Ex Parte) filed.
Date: August 10, 2022Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Ex Parte) filed.
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration - Other (of Arash S Khosrowshahi ISO Ex Parte) filed.
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: August 10, 2022Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: August 09, 2022Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: August 11, 2022Ruling on 8/11/22 Ex Parte for Order Specially Setting Hearings on Discovery Motions
Date: August 11, 2022Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: August 11, 2022Ex Parte Application - Other (for Order Extending the Deadline) filed.
Date: August 11, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: August 23, 2022Ex Parte Application - Other (for OST to Hear Motion to Compel) filed.
Date: August 24, 2022Notice of Hearing filed.
Date: August 24, 2022Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application (9:00AM) filed.
Date: August 25, 2022Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application (9:15AM) filed.
Date: August 25, 2022Declaration - Other (of Khosrowshahi) filed.
Date: August 25, 2022Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: August 25, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: August 25, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: August 26, 2022Minutes finalized for heard on 08/26/2022 01:30:00 PM .
Date: August 26, 2022Ex Parte Application - Other (to Continue Trial) filed.
Date: August 29, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: August 30, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities (to Ex Parte motion to Continue Trial Date) filed.
Date: August 30, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: August 29, 2022Declaration - Other (of James T Jones ISO Motion) filed.
Date: September 01, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Motion) filed.
Date: September 01, 2022Motion to Continue Trial filed.
Date: September 01, 2022Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: August 30, 2022Order After Hearing (Order DENYING Defendants' MSJ/MSA) filed.
Date: September 01, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Opposition To Motion To Continue Trial Date) filed.
Date: September 06, 2022Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: September 12, 2022Declaration - Other (Of Angela Beard ISO Opposition To Motion To Continue Trial Date) filed.
Date: September 06, 2022Declaration - Other (of Khosrwoshahi iso Opposition) filed.
Date: July 27, 2022Declaration - Other (of Zaman) filed.
Date: July 27, 2022Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: July 27, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: July 27, 2022Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: July 27, 2022Declaration - Other (Le) filed.
Date: July 27, 2022Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: August 01, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (Special Interrogatories, Set 5) filed.
Date: August 03, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (Special Interrogatories, Set 4) filed.
Date: August 03, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: September 06, 2022Minutes finalized for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion heard on 09/09/2022 09:30:00 AM .
Date: September 09, 2022Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: October 11, 2022Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: October 11, 2022Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: August 11, 2022Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.
Date: August 12, 2022Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Motion for Requests) filed.
Date: August 11, 2022Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Motion to Compel Discovery Responses) filed.
Date: August 11, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: August 12, 2022Declaration - Other (Declaration of Arash Khosrowshahi in opposition) filed.
Date: August 12, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: August 12, 2022Declaration - Other (of James T Jones ISO Opp) filed.
Date: August 16, 2022Declaration - Other (Declaration of James Jones) filed.
Date: August 15, 2022Minutes finalized for heard on 08/16/2022 01:30:00 PM .
Date: August 16, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: August 16, 2022Opposition (to Motion for Requests for Admissions) filed.
Date: August 16, 2022Proof of Service filed.
Date: August 18, 2022Opposition (to Motion to Compel Form Interrogatories) filed.
Date: August 16, 2022Proposed Order (Denying MSJ/SA) filed.
Date: August 23, 2022Reply to Opposition (to MTC Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Five) filed.
Date: August 18, 2022Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: August 23, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.