Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Alicia M Arundel, Arthur A Belli Jr As Parent And Natural Guardian Of Stephanie Belli, Deceased, And As The Administrator Of The E O Stephanie Belli, Joelle Dimonte, Melissa A Crai, Mindy Grabina A O E Amy Grabina, And Mindy Grabina, Individually,, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Block, Jeffrey Aaron, Bondi-Stoddard, Annamarie, Chaikin, Ianiv Moshe, Cruz, Brandon Michael, Donahue, Stephen J., (total of 15) See All against Cabot Coach Builders, Inc D B A Royale Limousine, Carlos F Pino, County Of Suffolk, Romeo Dimon Marine Service, Inc., Steven D Romeo, (total of 8) See All represented by Arntsen, David Henry, Carter, Alexys Marie, Cascone, Leonard Michael, Devlin, Rebecca K, Holland, David R., (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with JOHN H. ROUSE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJOHN H. ROUSE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 27, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 19, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 20, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 14, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 27, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 31, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 27, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 27, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 17, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 13, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 27, 2016ANSWER
Date: March 09, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED) *Corrected*
Date: March 02, 2017ANSWER
Date: April 25, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: June 29, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 10, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: June 01, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 28, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: June 21, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 07, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: June 09, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 27, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 14, 2017ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: May 01, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 28, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 07, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 18, 2017ANSWER
Date: May 01, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 10, 2017ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: May 01, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 07, 2017ANSWER
Date: April 27, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: June 01, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 08, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 26, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 30, 2017ANSWER
Date: April 27, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: May 04, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 14, 2017ANSWER
Date: May 01, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 25, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: March 28, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 27, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 30, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 21, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: October 31, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 06, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017ANSWER
Date: November 03, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 16, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 06, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 24, 2017INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 03, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 09, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 16, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 26, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 09, 2017COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: October 29, 2019REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: October 31, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: October 26, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 19, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 13, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: October 31, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 19, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 09, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 17, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 18, 2017ANSWER
Date: November 20, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: November 27, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 17, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 23, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 24, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 18, 2018REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 05, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 07, 2017ANSWER
Date: November 03, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: October 03, 2017ANSWER
Date: November 20, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 04, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 14, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 31, 2018ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 05, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: June 26, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 30, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 23, 2017ANSWER
Date: September 18, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 08, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 19, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 12, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 05, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 09, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 05, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 13, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 11, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 19, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 07, 2017INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 02, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 03, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 11, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 27, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 30, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 13, 2019REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: January 15, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 15, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 16, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 16, 2018NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: February 07, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 17, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 01, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 24, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 13, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 17, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 06, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 09, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 19, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 07, 2017ANSWER
Date: November 20, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 06, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 23, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 07, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: February 05, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 08, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 07, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 01, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: February 07, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 04, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 22, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 22, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 18, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 15, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 12, 2019REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: January 11, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 12, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 19, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 24, 2019ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 23, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 12, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 01, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 05, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 01, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 13, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 07, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 19, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 22, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 18, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 06, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 01, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 09, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 25, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 24, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 14, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 30, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 19, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #010)
Date: January 21, 2020COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: October 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: January 23, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 09, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: February 18, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: February 06, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 14, 2020COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: October 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 29, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #011)
Date: July 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 19, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 14, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 09, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 04, 2020COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: October 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 18, 2020SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 20, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 19, 2020ANSWER
Date: June 01, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 22, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 31, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: June 08, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 18, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 14, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 18, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: April 28, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 11, 2017SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: June 26, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 03, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: April 06, 2017ANSWER
Date: November 03, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 17, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 17, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 22, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017ANSWER
Date: November 20, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: October 26, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 11, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 15, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 07, 2019REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: February 05, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 07, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 30, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 14, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 06, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 09, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 04, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 01, 2018NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: April 07, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: September 26, 2017ANSWER
Date: May 31, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 05, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: November 02, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: October 24, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 18, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: April 17, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: June 09, 2017ANSWER
Date: June 21, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 24, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: June 01, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 25, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 11, 2018RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 12, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 11, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 14, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 19, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: March 05, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 04, 2020ORDER - CONSOLIDATION
Date: May 08, 2017INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 07, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 24, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 14, 2017ANSWER
Date: October 24, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 18, 2017INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 13, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 31, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 13, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 26, 2018REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: January 02, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 05, 2018REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 23, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 23, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 14, 2017ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: May 01, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 30, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 21, 2018REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 22, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 29, 2018INTERROGATORIES Response to Interrogatories Joelle DiMonte Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 03, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 27, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 31, 2018NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 23, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 05, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 27, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 29, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 12, 2020COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: October 29, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 27, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 30, 2019REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 14, 2017COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: October 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #009)
Date: February 18, 2020REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: October 24, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 26, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 22, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 10, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 03, 2018REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: May 01, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 07, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: October 31, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 24, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 26, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 11, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 17, 2019ANSWER
Date: May 11, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 01, 2019NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 31, 2019REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: August 21, 2017RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 01, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 10, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 25, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 30, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 06, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 24, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 08, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 09, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 12, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 12, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 12, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 27, 2018BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 15, 2017SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: April 18, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 09, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 03, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 02, 2016SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: April 26, 2017SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: April 24, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 26, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 18, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 25, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 09, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 30, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 30, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2017SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: May 22, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 22, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 18, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 12, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2017SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: April 28, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 27, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 05, 2017SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: May 09, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 22, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 30, 2017SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: October 05, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 17, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 25, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 17, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 18, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 18, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2017ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 07, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 30, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 30, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 23, 2017AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 07, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 07, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 08, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 23, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 08, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 23, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2017AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 30, 2017AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 08, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 07, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 08, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 08, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 23, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 31, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 18, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 18, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 18, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2017ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: March 15, 2018CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 09, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #006)
Date: January 31, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 07, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 23, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 07, 2017NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 24, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 17, 2018NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: October 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2018BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 17, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 08, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 16, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: April 24, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 18, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 16, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: June 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 17, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 21, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 18, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 18, 2018CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 04, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 19, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 14, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 19, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: June 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: June 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 03, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: June 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 09, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: October 04, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: October 04, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 04, 2019SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: July 31, 2019NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: August 05, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 19, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 19, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2019NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: September 26, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 12, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 09, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 12, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 01, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 09, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #009)
Date: January 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #009)
Date: January 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #009) Vehicle Registration Info. Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 14, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: January 23, 2020AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: December 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: January 23, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #009)
Date: January 23, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 31, 2020NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: April 03, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2020NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: March 05, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 04, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: January 19, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 16, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 11, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 15, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 28, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 10, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: September 23, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 20, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 09, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 10, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 22, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 05, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 27, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 06, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: December 03, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 03, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Response to Notice for Discovery and Inspection
Date: November 25, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: December 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 24, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 01, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: December 03, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 25, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 25, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: December 03, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 23, 2020INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 16, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 04, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: May 07, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 15, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 14, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #013)
Date: December 01, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 25, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: July 09, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: August 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 09, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 16, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 11, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 07, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 15, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 24, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 01, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 29, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 07, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 01, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 01, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 11, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #013)
Date: December 08, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 16, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 15, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 15, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 20, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 08, 2021INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 29, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #012)
Date: February 11, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: April 27, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 02, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 07, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 07, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 07, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 01, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 08, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: July 27, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 02, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G-1
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 04, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 10, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE *Corrected*
Date: May 11, 2022ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 19, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 17, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 03, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: May 06, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 22, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: August 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 18, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #016)
Date: May 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #016)
Date: May 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G-4
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 04, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 17, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: August 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #016) *Corrected*
Date: May 31, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 02, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #016)
Date: May 31, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 26, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 13, 2022DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: May 13, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 29, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 11, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 18, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 24, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #016)
Date: May 31, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 17, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #016) *Corrected*
Date: May 31, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: August 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #016) *Corrected*
Date: May 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #015)
Date: May 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: August 04, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #015)
Date: May 31, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #015)
Date: May 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 27, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 11, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 18, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G-2
Date: August 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G-3
Date: August 04, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #016)
Date: May 31, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: August 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: August 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 17, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #016)
Date: May 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2016RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 20, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2016AFFIRMATION
Date: July 22, 2016NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 27, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 25, 2016NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: July 14, 2016AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2016TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: January 20, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2016SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: March 02, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 23, 2017BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 15, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2017BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 27, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 19, 2016ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 27, 2017PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 20, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2016ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2015AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 26, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 23, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 13, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2016BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 16, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 14, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2016STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #016)
Date: May 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 12, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 16, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #015)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 13, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #014)
Date: August 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #016)
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 03, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 03, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 04, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 03, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: November 09, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #018)
Date: October 18, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 11, 2022STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: September 20, 2022SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 21, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 21, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 11, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 22, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 21, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 28, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: November 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #019)
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 01, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #018)
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - a
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 01, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: June 24, 2019NOTICE OF FILING DURING THE COVID-19 PUBLIC HEALTH EMERGENCY
Date: May 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 09, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: December 03, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 09, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 04, 2020NOTICE OF FILING DURING THE COVID-19 PUBLIC HEALTH EMERGENCY Â (Motion #009)
Date: May 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 09, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 20, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #009)
Date: May 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #011)
Date: June 30, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011)
Date: July 28, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: July 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 04, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 04, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 27, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #011)
Date: September 03, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 10, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #011)
Date: May 04, 2020NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: September 01, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #011)
Date: July 28, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 28, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 08, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 27, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 28, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 28, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 16, 2020AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: November 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 16, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 16, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 11, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 11, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 16, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 17, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #012)
Date: November 16, 2020AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: November 25, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 18, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 07, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 19, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 28, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - UU Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #020)
Date: November 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 08, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 13, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: December 08, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #018)
Date: December 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 13, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: December 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 08, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 08, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - EE Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 14, 2022ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: December 14, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 15, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H-1 Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #020)
Date: December 16, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 07, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 23, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 21, 2015ANSWER
Date: November 12, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 28, 2016REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: February 23, 2016REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: April 01, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 19, 2018REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: December 08, 2015REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: February 25, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 22, 2017REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: December 03, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 02, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 08, 2015REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: December 08, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 19, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 10, 2017ORDER - CONSOLIDATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 29, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 18, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 12, 2018REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: December 08, 2015RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 03, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 03, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 03, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 01, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #017)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 04, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 01, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 04, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 03, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 31, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 03, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 04, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 01, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #018) 50H transcript for Melissa Crai
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #018) 50H transcript for Joelle Dimonte
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #018) Carlos Pino transcript with notice to execute
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #018) 50H transcript for Alicia Arundel
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #018) Philip Stock transcript
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #018) Matthew Silver transcript with notice to execute
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - EE Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - II Â (Motion #018) Alicia Arundel medical records Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - GG Â (Motion #018) Joelle Dimonte medical records Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #018) Stephanie Belli medical records Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - LL Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - MM Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - NN Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - OO Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - PP Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - QQ Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - RR Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - TT Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - SS Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - VV Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - XX Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #019) Dresch Transcript
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - WW Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - YY Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #019) Transcript Flatley
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AAA Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - ZZ Â (Motion #018)
Date: September 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #019)
Date: September 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #020)
Date: September 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Weintraub (report) |
||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Weintraub (CV) |
||
June 07, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Notice Pursuant to CPLR 3101 d - Weintraub |
||
January 09, 2023 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #0020) Motion- PNM Post Note Motion Part From Judge Rouse to Judge Hackeling. Judge: Hackeling, Hon. C. Stephen |
|
January 09, 2023 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #0019) Motion- PNM Post Note Motion Part From Judge Rouse to Judge Hackeling. Judge: Hackeling, Hon. C. Stephen |
|
January 09, 2023 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #0018) Motion- PNM Post Note Motion Part From Judge Rouse to Judge Hackeling. Judge: Hackeling, Hon. C. Stephen |
|
December 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #020) EBT - Carlos Pino |
||
December 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - U (Motion #020) DPW Traffic Study Memo |
||
December 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #020) Scott Russell Interrogatories |
||
December 16, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - EE (Motion #020) Addendum A-9 Elizabeth Ann Neville |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.