Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Baum Thornley Architects, Llp One Ferry Building, Suite, Bibbs, Paula R. Unk San Francisco, Ca 94102, Hart, Rosia Lee, Williams, Rosalind Reed, Thomas, Herb, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Conrad, Daniel Alfred, Schultz, Andrew K., against Wiggins, Gregory, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Ross C. Moody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoss C. Moody Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2006 |
CategoryTrust (Petition To Revoke Powers Of Trustees) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1774 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 54287660) FILED BY TRUSTEE THOMAS, HERB
Date: September 26, 2013ORDER PARTIALLY APPROVING FIRST AMENDMENT TO ROSIA L. HART REVOCABLE TRUST DATED 5-19-2004
Date: October 31, 2013PROBATE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO INCREASE BOND. FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: September 05, 2012NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY TRUSTEE THOMAS, HERB
Date: November 07, 2012NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY TRUSTEE THOMAS, HERB
Date: April 11, 2011NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: October 22, 2012NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: March 28, 2011ORDER INCREASING BOND TO $177,000.00 FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: September 12, 2012ORDER EXPANDING COURT APPOINTED COUNSEL'S SCOPE OF REPRESENTATION.
Date: January 31, 2011NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: February 13, 2013ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF LITIGATION COUNSEL FEES
Date: July 10, 2013NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: April 09, 2013NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 66380110) FILED BY PETITIONER BIBBS, PAULA R.
Date: March 01, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 65957224) FILED BY PETITIONER BIBBS, PAULA R.
Date: September 23, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 64093381) FILED BY PETITIONER HART, ROSIA LEE
Date: August 13, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 64482495) FILED BY PETITIONER HART, ROSIA LEE
Date: December 03, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 62344987) FILED BY PETITIONER BIBBS, PAULA R.
Date: August 14, 2018ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PETITIONER BIBBS, PAULA R.
Date: September 10, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY TRUSTEE THOMAS, HERB
Date: June 25, 2013NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 63008316) FILED BY ATTORNEY FEDER, BRUCE ALLEN
Date: February 27, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 61863879) FILED BY PETITIONER BIBBS, PAULA R.
Date: April 02, 2018ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #4, FEES FILED BY TRUSTEE THOMAS, HERB
Date: July 09, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: February 22, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: August 20, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: May 04, 2012ORDER [EX PARTE] AUTHORIZING REPAIR TO REAL PROPERTY
Date: November 27, 2007ORDER AFTER HEARING.
Date: October 06, 2010NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: June 03, 2010ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: May 27, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: August 06, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: March 03, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: June 28, 2010PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY TRUSTEE THOMAS, HERB
Date: July 31, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (INSTRUCTIONS) FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: August 20, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: September 06, 2012MINUTES FOR SEP-28-2010 2:00 PM FOR DEPT 501
Date: September 28, 2010PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: August 19, 2010NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: August 10, 2010NOTICE OF RECUSAL AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON PETITIONS
Date: September 17, 2010NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: August 05, 2010NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: March 09, 2010INTEREIM BANK STATEMENTS TO ACCOUMPANY FIRST ACCOUNT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Date: May 22, 2008NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: November 15, 2007MINUTES FOR MAR-23-2011 3:00 PM FOR DEPT 501
Date: March 23, 2011NOTICE OF RECUSAL AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARINGS ON PETITIONS
Date: August 31, 2010ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (JACKIE GORDON) FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: June 05, 2007NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: September 20, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER BAUM THORNLEY ARCHITECTS, LLP
Date: October 11, 2006REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: January 03, 2007NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: October 17, 2006STATEMENT OF INTEREST FILED BY PETITIONER BAUM THORNLEY ARCHITECTS, LLP
Date: October 10, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER WILLIAMS, ROSALIND REED
Date: August 17, 2006NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: May 23, 2006DECLARATION OF ANDREW K. SCHULTZ FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: May 24, 2006ESTATE PLANNING DOCUMENTS OF ROSIA L. HART FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: August 31, 2006MINUTES FOR NOV-16-2006 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 204
Date: November 16, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: November 16, 2007NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: July 26, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER WILLIAMS, ROSALIND REED
Date: October 17, 2006NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 69054853) FILED BY TRUSTEE BIBBS, PAULA R.
Date: February 01, 2023ORDER EX PARTE ORDER SUSPENDING POWERS OF TRUSTEES
Date: August 31, 2006REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 54022254)
Date: September 04, 2013REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 64553218) FILED BY OBJECTOR WITHERSPOON & SIRACUSA
Date: December 23, 2019ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (SHIRLEY C. YAWITZ) FILED BY TRUSTEE BIBBS, PAULA R.
Date: January 26, 2018ORDER INCREASING BOND
Date: August 17, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 54866083) FILED BY PETITIONER HART, ROSIA LEE
Date: January 21, 2014NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 68015786)
Date: September 01, 2022ORDER EX PARTE PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PAULA R. BIBBS AS TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Date: January 30, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 55356527) FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: April 28, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 54904619) FILED BY PETITIONER HART, ROSIA LEE
Date: January 27, 2014NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 68237365)
Date: October 11, 2022ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES FILED BY TRUSTEE BIBBS, PAULA R.
Date: August 03, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY TRUSTOR HART, ROSIA L.
Date: July 02, 2013PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: February 14, 2013NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 54022961) FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: September 05, 2013NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 54277757) FILED BY OTHER HART, ROSIA LEE
Date: September 24, 2013ORDER (EX PARTE) FOR APPOINTMENT OF PAULA R. BIBBS AS TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Date: March 25, 2014ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER THOMAS, HERB
Date: November 02, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2023 | Hearing |
ORDER OF STATUS HEARING
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
October 02, 2023 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #1, Report, Fees
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
August 28, 2023 | Hearing |
ORDER OF STATUS HEARING
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
August 28, 2023 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #1, Report, Fees
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF STATUS HEARING CONTINUED FROM AUG-28-2023 TO OCT-02-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 - HEARING HELD - SEE MINI-MINUTES FOR THIS DATE - PER COURT | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-28-2023 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 204 | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES CONTINUED FROM AUG-28-2023 TO OCT-02-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 - HEARING HELD - SEE MINI-MINUTES FOR THIS DATE - PER COURT | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF STATUS HEARING - ORDER TO APPEAR; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE SHOULD NOT BE SUSPENDED OR REMOVED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR; ORDER SETTING FUTURE HEARING DATE HEARING SET FOR AUG-28-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 | |
July 24, 2023 | Hearing |
ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: Accounting #1, Report, Fees
Judge: ROSS C. MOODY |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES CONTINUED FROM JUL-24-2023 TO AUG-28-2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 HEARING HELD - SEE MINI-MINUTES FOR THIS DATE - PER COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.