Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cathay Bank, A California Banking Corporation, Qui, Dong Ying, Ray Kai, Llc, A California Limited Liability, Xiang Kai, Llc.; A California Limited Liability, Zhang, Cindy, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Fletcher, Michael Gerard, against Does 1 Through 200, Inclusive, Qui, Dong Ying, Ray Kai, Llc, A California Limited Liability, Xiang Kai, Llc.; A California Limited Liability, Zhang, Cindy, (total of 7) See All represented by Hu, Chijeh, Schinner, Michael George, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions136 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1021 days |
This complaint is a document related to a legal case between Cathay Bank, a California banking corporation, and Raymond Xiang Kai Zhang, Cindy Zhang, Dong Ying Qui, Xiang Kai LLC, Ray Kai LLC, Zhangs LLC, and Does 1 through 200. The document is an ob...
ORDER AND STIPULATION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE
Date: October 17, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: October 04, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: October 01, 2012ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR CONSUMER RECORDS
Date: October 30, 2012DECLARATION OF MAUREEN MCCUAIG FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: September 14, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: September 25, 2012NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY HU, CHIJEH
Date: June 25, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: September 14, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE ; REPLYS FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: October 19, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: March 05, 2012ORDER GRANTING CROSS-COMPLAINANTS LEAVE TO AMEND 2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2011DECLARATION OF HANNA B RAANAN FILED BY PLAINTIFF CATHAY BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANKING CORPORATION
Date: December 08, 2011OPPOSITION TO PLTF'S DEMURRER FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: November 07, 2011ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CATHAY BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANKING CORPORATION
Date: November 29, 2011ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO 2ND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2011ORDER ON JOINT APPLICATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND.
Date: August 23, 2011ORDER REGARDING APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Date: June 03, 2011ORDER FOR CONFIRMATION OF RECEIVER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN AID OF THE RECEIVER
Date: August 06, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 22, 2010REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: October 25, 2012MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: September 14, 2012NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CATHAY BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANKING CORPORATION
Date: November 29, 2012NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: November 29, 2012SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: October 10, 2012SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: September 14, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: September 25, 2012ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS (DENIED)
Date: November 14, 2012SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: September 25, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL
Date: October 01, 2012REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOS OT MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS
Date: October 01, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCEY OF ACTION RE 229-255 INTERNATIONAL BOULEVARD, OAKLAND, CALIFORNIA FILED BY DEFENDANT ZHANG, RAYMOND XIANG KAI, AKA RAYMOND KAI ZHANG, AKA RAYMOND ZHANG, AKA XIANG KAI ZHANG, AKA XIANG ZHANG, AKA ZHANG XIANG, AN INDIVIDUAL SERVED APR-05-2013, MAIL AS TO PLAINTIFF CATHAY BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANKING CORPORATION | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION RE: 229-255 INTERNATIONAL BLVD, OAKLAND, CA FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT ZHANG, CINDY ,AN INDIVIDUAL ZHANG, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL | |
March 27, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING MAR-26-2013 AT 10:30 AM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event | JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL AND STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF THE ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF CATHAY BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANKING CORPORATION | |
March 26, 2013 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-26-2013 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610 | |
March 26, 2013 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
January 29, 2013 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
January 23, 2013 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-29-2013 CONTINUED TO MAR-26-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 03, 2012 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR DEC-03-2012. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENTS FILED ON 11/29/12. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON JAN-29-2013 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.