Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Husband, Charles, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, Spanos, Evanthia M, against Albay Construction Company, All Asbestos Defendants See Scanned Documents, American Conference Of Governmental Industrial, Asbestos Defendants, Asbestos Manufacturing Company, (total of 71) See All represented by Bassi, Marte Joseph, Biderman, David T., Blackard, Eugene Charles, Brydon, John R, Campagne, Ingrid A., (total of 21) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia Ming-mei Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions331 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time3649 days |
This complaint is a notice of entry of an order granting leave to file an amendment to the complaint in a case involving asbestos. The plaintiff, Charles Husband, is seeking to substitute the true name of the defendant for two fictitious names, Does ...
ORDER RE: CLARIFICATION
Date: December 26, 2012ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED #47268869
Date: February 28, 2012DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 41058888) AS TO DEFENDANT CSK AUTO, INC.
Date: November 28, 2011ORDER GRANTING REQUEST BY PLAINTIFF FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 13, 2014ORDER STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 45104069)
Date: June 29, 2012ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2011MINUTES FOR APR-27-2012 9:00 AM
Date: April 27, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 43538697) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HUSBAND, CHARLES
Date: April 09, 2012ORDER - PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1 (TRANS. # 42586248)
Date: February 16, 2012ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34240981) FILED BY DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.
Date: November 08, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34360539) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Date: November 16, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34626610) FILED BY DEFENDANT CSK AUTO, INC.
Date: December 01, 2010ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS INC'S MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL
Date: September 08, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 02, 2009ORDER STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS
Date: April 23, 2009DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 28958426) FILED BY DEFENDANT PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION
Date: January 12, 2010ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO VACATE TRIAL
Date: August 31, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29098895) FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.
Date: January 19, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28816292) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY
Date: January 06, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34093720) FILED BY DEFENDANT CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Date: October 29, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33362444) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Date: September 21, 2010DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62829515)
Date: January 07, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (TRANSACTION ID # 39819544) FILED BY ATTORNEY HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY
Date: September 14, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63008253) AS TO DEFENDANT MARINE ENGINEERING AND SUPPLY COMPANY | |
February 07, 2019 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-07-2019. DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED 1/7/19. (503) | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62829515) | |
February 01, 2018 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-01-2018 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-07-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. KIMBERLY CHU, ESQ. APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503) | |
December 07, 2017 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-07-2017 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-01-2018 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JASON ROSE, ESQ. APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503) | |
December 01, 2016 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
December 01, 2016 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-01-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-07-2017 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. MICHAEL LEVINSON APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.