Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Kharbawy, A. Sameh El, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Board Of Trustees Of California State Of University, Castro, Joseph I., Fu, Xuanning, Hamm, Daryl L., Jimenez-Sandoval, Saul, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Fresno with Gaab, Kimberly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaab, Kimberly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2020 |
Category15 Unlimited - Other Employment |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Fresno |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Declaration Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Order Denied
Date: September 17, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: September 17, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 17, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: September 14, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: September 10, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 10, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: September 10, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: September 03, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: August 27, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 18, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 11, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: August 10, 2021Ex parte Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Order filed
Date: May 19, 2021Opposition filed
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Proof of Service
Date: April 30, 2021Reply filed
Date: April 23, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 08, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 25, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 24, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Proof of Service
Date: March 18, 2021Objection filed
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 12, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: March 11, 2021Proof of Service
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Order filed
Date: October 27, 2020Civil case cover sheet
Date: October 23, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: September 17, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 10, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: September 10, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 04, 2021Objection filed
Date: April 30, 2021Response filed
Date: April 30, 2021Notice Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: April 13, 2021Supplement to
Date: April 05, 2021Order filed
Date: March 25, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: September 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 23, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: September 27, 2021Objection filed
Date: March 18, 2021Pursuant to CCP 170.6 - Judge Disqualified
Date: August 16, 2021Supplement to
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 12, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 19, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 01, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 05, 2021Notice Filed
Date: October 23, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Reply filed
Date: January 11, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Civil Complaint filed
Date: October 23, 2020Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: September 03, 2021Request Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Order filed
Date: January 19, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: December 21, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Summons issued and filed
Date: October 23, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: August 27, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Order filed
Date: May 04, 2021Ex parte Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: January 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Notice Filed
Date: October 27, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 30, 2021List filed
Date: September 17, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 17, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: September 17, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 10, 2021Supplement to
Date: April 23, 2021Statement filed
Date: September 10, 2021Order Denied
Date: September 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 17, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: August 27, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 10, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: August 27, 2021Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing
Date: August 10, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 16, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 14, 2021Supplement to
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 06, 2020Objection filed
Date: March 24, 2021Proof of Service
Date: January 08, 2021Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: April 08, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 26, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Supplement to
Date: March 18, 2021Answer Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 12, 2021Objection filed
Date: March 23, 2021Reply filed
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Ex parte Filed
Date: October 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 30, 2021Opposition filed
Date: October 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 05, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Opposition filed
Date: November 17, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: November 18, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 05, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 30, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: October 05, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 05, 2021Reply filed
Date: November 10, 2021Document filed
Date: November 30, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 19, 2021Ex parte Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 18, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 16, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 05, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Opposition filed
Date: November 04, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 05, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Objection filed
Date: November 04, 2021Opposition filed
Date: September 30, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 19, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: October 05, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 18, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 18, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: November 16, 2021Request Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Request Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 18, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 16, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 18, 2021List filed
Date: November 18, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 18, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 19, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter
Date: November 18, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 16, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: November 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 05, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: November 18, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 02, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 03, 2021Trial brief filed
Date: December 07, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter
Date: December 02, 2021Opposition filed
Date: December 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: December 02, 2021Letter Received
Date: December 14, 2021Case Management Statement Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: January 11, 2022Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: November 04, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 11, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 13, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: August 29, 2022Stipulation and Order filed
Date: June 30, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 14, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 07, 2022Notice of Motion
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: April 12, 2022Stipulation and Order filed
Date: January 12, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 11, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: June 29, 2022Stipulation and Order filed
Date: August 29, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 14, 2022Stipulation and Order filed
Date: April 18, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Hamilton, Jr., Jeffrey Y. |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mangano, Robert |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
General Motion Filed 6/14/22 - to Continue the Action Per CCP 377.31 - Andrew Hillier Judge: Hamilton, Jr., Jeffrey Y. |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
11-4-22 Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice or Order Vacating Stay filing of dismissal |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed 11/19/21 ~ Nathan Jackson Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
10.13.22 Law & Motion Minute Order and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Minute Order Attachment and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
10/11/22 Declaration Declaration Filed of Mohammed Hani Alkherbawy |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed 11/18/21 ~ Nathan Jackson Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.