Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Bolen, Suzanne, Newton, Harold, Newton, Patsy, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Laird, Sean Ryan, against Enloe Medical Center, represented by Scharg, Ian A, Zimmerman, Robert Harry, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Butte with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management96 days |
Filing DateMay 29, 2020 |
Category(35) Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial199 days |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Butte |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint alleges several claims against Enloe Medical Center and Doe Defendants. The plaintiffs in this case are Patsy Newton, Harold Newton, and Suzanne Bolen. Patsy Newton is described as an elder within the meaning of Welfare and Institution...
Trial Readiness Conference
Date: June 04, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 15, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full
Date: February 09, 2024Order on Communication
Date: December 05, 2023Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: November 20, 2023Decision from 3rd Appellate Court Received
Date: September 12, 2023Notice
Date: October 18, 2022Ex Parte Hearing - Predispo
Date: July 23, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: July 23, 2021Jury Fees Posted
Date: July 14, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 14, 2021Ex Parte Application with Hearing
Date: July 22, 2021Verdict Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Receipt for Exhibits
Date: July 14, 2021Verdict Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: July 14, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: July 14, 2021Receipt for Exhibits
Date: July 14, 2021Jury Question
Date: July 14, 2021Jury Question
Date: July 14, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: July 14, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: July 08, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: July 13, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: July 12, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 08, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: July 09, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: July 06, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 06, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 02, 2021Brief
Date: July 07, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: July 02, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 01, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: July 01, 2021Brief
Date: June 30, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 23, 2021Request for Court Reporter
Date: June 30, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 28, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 29, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 23, 2021Brief
Date: June 21, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 22, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 21, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 18, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 18, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 16, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 16, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 14, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 14, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 11, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 09, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 11, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 09, 2021Brief
Date: June 08, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 07, 2021Jury Trial
Date: June 07, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 04, 2021Request for Court Reporter
Date: June 04, 2021Court Reporter's Estimate for Transcript on Appeal
Date: April 06, 2022Request for Estimate of Court Reporter's Transcript
Date: March 17, 2022Returned Mail
Date: February 16, 2022Opposition - No Fee
Date: October 27, 2021Declaration
Date: October 19, 2021Jury Trial
Date: February 08, 2021Trial Readiness Conference
Date: February 04, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Request for Courtroom Audio Visual Equipment
Date: June 03, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Objection - No Fee
Date: October 26, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: October 06, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Witness List
Date: May 28, 2021Exhibit List
Date: May 28, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 13, 2021Reply
Date: May 27, 2021Declaration
Date: May 21, 2021Notice of Rescheduling
Date: May 03, 2021Motion - No Fee
Date: July 08, 2021Request for Courtroom Audio Visual Equipment
Date: May 28, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: August 18, 2020Motion - No Fee
Date: July 16, 2020Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: June 23, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Trial Readiness Conference
Date: December 10, 2020Order from the Third District Court of Appeal
Date: July 21, 2022Court Reporter's Estimate for Transcript on Appeal
Date: April 06, 2022Court Reporter's Estimate for Transcript on Appeal
Date: February 17, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: March 17, 2022Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Request for Estimate of Court Reporter's Transcript
Date: February 04, 2022Communication
Date: January 05, 2022Notice of Appeal - Appellate Court
Date: December 28, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: November 25, 2020Appeal - Default Notice Issued
Date: December 28, 2021Ex Parte Application with Hearing
Date: October 26, 2021Declaration
Date: October 19, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: January 20, 2021Ex Parte Application with Hearing
Date: January 14, 2021Order
Date: January 14, 2021Proof of Service
Date: December 28, 2020Proof of Service
Date: December 28, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 16, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: January 14, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 21, 2020Declaration
Date: December 21, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: December 21, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: December 17, 2020Notice
Date: January 14, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: October 04, 2021Notice
Date: September 27, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 09, 2021Order
Date: November 02, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: March 24, 2022Opposition - No Fee
Date: July 30, 2020Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 28, 2021Proof of Service
Date: October 19, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: March 09, 2022Motion - Fee
Date: July 14, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: October 13, 2021Returned Mail
Date: September 30, 2021Verdict Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 29, 2021Order
Date: December 21, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Jury Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 22, 2021Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: May 29, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: December 16, 2021Objection - No Fee
Date: June 09, 2021Proof of Service
Date: June 03, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 27, 2021Declaration
Date: October 19, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: May 21, 2021Declaration
Date: October 13, 2021Verdict Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Declaration
Date: December 03, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: October 28, 2020Proof of Service
Date: October 05, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: November 25, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: October 22, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 05, 2020Notice of Returned Documents
Date: August 19, 2020Motion to Continue
Date: October 09, 2020Declaration
Date: October 05, 2020Cost of Preparation of Clerk's Transcript
Date: June 23, 2022Returned Mail
Date: September 17, 2020Notice to Prepare Court Reporter's Transcript
Date: April 21, 2022Reply
Date: August 05, 2020Declaration
Date: July 14, 2020Returned Mail
Date: February 17, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 12, 2020Order
Date: August 21, 2020Jury Trial
Date: December 14, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: February 04, 2022Proof of Service
Date: August 05, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: June 24, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: April 21, 2022Request for Estimate of Court Reporter's Transcript
Date: March 24, 2022Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: January 18, 2022Request for Estimate of Court Reporter's Transcript
Date: March 09, 2022Notice
Date: December 28, 2021Returned Mail
Date: February 14, 2022Clerk's Notice re Notice of Appeal with Proof of Mailing
Date: December 28, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: December 16, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: December 22, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: December 21, 2021Ex Parte Application with Hearing
Date: December 21, 2021Ruling
Date: December 15, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 15, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: December 15, 2021Notice
Date: December 14, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: December 14, 2021Request for Court Reporter
Date: December 13, 2021Judgment
Date: December 09, 2021Appeal - Default Notice Issued
Date: December 08, 2021Proof of Service
Date: December 07, 2021Declaration
Date: December 07, 2021Clerk's Notice re Notice of Appeal with Proof of Mailing
Date: December 07, 2021Objection - No Fee
Date: December 07, 2021Reply
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Appeal - Appellate Court
Date: December 07, 2021Exhibit List
Date: November 24, 2021Declaration
Date: November 24, 2021Declaration
Date: November 10, 2021Order
Date: November 16, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: November 23, 2021Objection - No Fee
Date: November 24, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 10, 2021Motion for a New Trial
Date: November 10, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: November 24, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 10, 2021Motion Hearings - Postdisposition
Date: November 10, 2021Response - No Fee
Date: November 04, 2021Declaration
Date: October 19, 2021Proof of Service
Date: October 27, 2021Proof of Service
Date: October 26, 2021Stipulation - No Fee
Date: September 28, 2021Objection - No Fee
Date: August 31, 2021Order
Date: September 08, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: October 06, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: September 24, 2021Memorandum of Costs-Summary
Date: August 31, 2021Motion Hearings - Postdisposition
Date: August 18, 2021Proof of Service
Date: August 18, 2021Judgment after Verdict
Date: August 18, 2021Proof of Service
Date: August 18, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: July 26, 2021Reply
Date: August 10, 2021Proof of Service
Date: August 06, 2021Order
Date: July 26, 2021Minute Order
Date: July 23, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: August 06, 2021Motion - Fee
Date: July 29, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: July 26, 2021Proof of Service
Date: July 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 29, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Declaration
Date: December 08, 2020Notice
Date: September 27, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: December 07, 2020Order
Date: December 07, 2020Proof of Service
Date: December 04, 2020Proof of Service
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration
Date: December 04, 2020Declaration
Date: December 04, 2020Motion - No Fee
Date: December 04, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 04, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Change of Address
Date: August 09, 2021Trial Readiness Conference Statement
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Proof of Service
Date: December 03, 2020Proof of Service
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: June 21, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 02, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: December 02, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 02, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Trial Readiness Conference Statement
Date: December 02, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: November 25, 2020Reply
Date: November 30, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 25, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: June 02, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 24, 2020Proof of Service
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration
Date: November 24, 2020Request for Court Reporter
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration
Date: November 23, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: November 24, 2020Reply
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration
Date: November 23, 2020Proof of Service
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration
Date: November 23, 2020Proof of Service
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration
Date: November 23, 2020Declaration
Date: November 23, 2020Reply
Date: November 23, 2020Reply
Date: November 23, 2020Ex Parte Hearing - Predispo
Date: November 19, 2020Declaration
Date: November 23, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: November 20, 2020Statement
Date: November 20, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: November 20, 2020Declaration
Date: November 20, 2020Statement
Date: November 20, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 19, 2020Statement
Date: November 20, 2020Proof of Service
Date: November 20, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: November 19, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: November 20, 2020Order
Date: November 19, 2020Declaration
Date: November 17, 2020Request for Court Reporter
Date: November 18, 2020Request
Date: November 17, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: November 17, 2020Ex Parte Application with Hearing
Date: November 17, 2020Declaration
Date: November 17, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: November 04, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: November 17, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 17, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 17, 2020Statement
Date: November 17, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 17, 2020Proof of Service
Date: May 21, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: November 07, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: January 17, 2023Request and Order for Extension of Time
Date: May 17, 2022Court Reporter's Estimate for Transcript on Appeal
Date: March 24, 2022Court Reporter's Estimate for Transcript on Appeal
Date: March 17, 2022Court Reporter's Estimate for Transcript on Appeal
Date: February 15, 2022Order from the Third District Court of Appeal
Date: January 04, 2022Clerk's Notice re Notice of Appeal with Proof of Mailing
Date: January 19, 2022Reply
Date: November 04, 2021Ex Parte Hearing - Postdispo
Date: October 27, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 20, 2021Notice of Rescheduling
Date: September 28, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 02, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: October 19, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: September 02, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: August 12, 2020Statement
Date: November 17, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: November 17, 2020Declaration
Date: November 17, 2020Statement
Date: November 17, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 17, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: November 17, 2020Settlement Conference
Date: November 09, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: November 16, 2020Ex Parte Application with Hearing
Date: November 16, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 16, 2020Order
Date: November 16, 2020Ex Parte Hearing - Predispo
Date: November 16, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 09, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration
Date: November 30, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: November 04, 2020Order
Date: November 04, 2020Settlement Conference Statement
Date: November 04, 2020Minute Order
Date: November 04, 2020Declaration
Date: October 22, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 28, 2020Order
Date: October 28, 2020Request for Court Reporter
Date: November 02, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: October 29, 2020Settlement Conference Statement
Date: November 03, 2020Declaration
Date: October 28, 2020Reply
Date: October 28, 2020Proof of Service
Date: October 22, 2020Motion in Limine
Date: December 03, 2020Reply
Date: October 21, 2020Response - No Fee
Date: October 15, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: May 29, 2020Declaration
Date: October 15, 2020Declaration
Date: October 15, 2020Declaration
Date: October 21, 2020Notice of Returned Documents
Date: September 08, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 09, 2020Statement
Date: October 21, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: October 05, 2020Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: July 13, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 09, 2020Statement
Date: October 05, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: October 15, 2020Declaration
Date: October 09, 2020Proof of Service
Date: July 16, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: August 31, 2020Proof of Service
Date: August 18, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 14, 2020Declaration
Date: July 30, 2020Appeal - Default Notice Issued
Date: January 18, 2022Complaint
Date: May 29, 2020Proof of Service
Date: July 14, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: October 26, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: December 09, 2020Declaration
Date: October 19, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Declaration
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: October 05, 2021Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: November 04, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: November 25, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 02, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: November 25, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 16, 2020Request-Notification for Courtroom Audio Visual Equipment
Date: May 28, 2021Request-Notification for Courtroom Audio Visual Equipment
Date: June 03, 2021Motion hearings - Postdispo
Date: August 18, 2021Court Reporter's Estimate for Transcript on Appeal
Date: February 15, 2022Court Reporter's Estimate for Transcript on Appeal
Date: February 17, 2022Court Reporter's Estimate for Transcript on Appeal
Date: March 17, 2022Cost of Preparation of Clerk's Transcript
Date: June 23, 2022Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: October 28, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: November 25, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: August 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2024 | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full | ||
December 28, 2023 | Remittitur | ||
December 05, 2023 |
Order on Communications Received Order on Communication Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
||
November 20, 2023 | Letter(s) Submitted to Court | ||
September 12, 2023 | Decision from 3rd Appellate Court Received | ||
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing Appeal Transcript to Attorney Sean Laird | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Appeal - Payment for Clerk's Transcript | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing Supplemental Reporter's Transcript | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Omission in Reporter's Transcript in Appeal Notice |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing Appeal Transcripts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.