Case Last Refreshed: 10 hours ago
Bradbury D.D.S., Michael G, Bradbury, Rhonda, Odeh, Ali, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Katherine Cohan, Pro Se, against Cohan, Kat, Odeh, Ali, Fernandez D.D.S, Lyngladen, Fernandez Dds, Lyngladen, Kingsley Dentistry, (total of 12) See All represented by Akita, Jerry S, Law Office Of Jerry S Akita, Peterson Bradford Burkwitz, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Kory Mathewson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKory Mathewson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2018 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a request for dismissal filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff/petitioner is Ali, and the defendant/respondent is Lyngadlen Silagan-Fernandez. The request for dismissal is made with prejud...
Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: September 11, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 10, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 11, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: October 10, 2018Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: September 11, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 11, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: October 02, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 24, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 07, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 17, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 21, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: January 17, 2019Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: January 07, 2019Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: February 25, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 17, 2019Motion Filed
Date: April 08, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 08, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 18, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 05, 2019Amended Complaint Filed
Date: July 05, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: April 12, 2019Reply Filed
Date: April 25, 2019Motion Filed
Date: August 02, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 07, 2019Motion Filed
Date: August 06, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 19, 2019Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: July 24, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: August 02, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 16, 2019Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2019Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 06, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 09, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 09, 2019Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: September 09, 2019Objection Filed
Date: September 09, 2019Reply Filed
Date: September 12, 2019Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: September 10, 2019Reply Filed
Date: September 12, 2019Reply Filed
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 24, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 24, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 19, 2019Answer Filed
Date: September 30, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 30, 2019Reply Filed
Date: February 03, 2020Motion Filed
Date: January 08, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2020Motion Filed
Date: January 10, 2020Motion Filed
Date: January 08, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 26, 2019Amended Document Filed re:
Date: December 26, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 20, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 20, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 08, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 01, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 14, 2020Reply Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 23, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 27, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 27, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 17, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 27, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 27, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 13, 2020Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: August 17, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 17, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 17, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 17, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 24, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 17, 2020Order on Req for Waiver of Addtnl Crt Fees/Cost Filed Denied
Date: August 25, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 28, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 10, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 14, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 15, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 28, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 28, 2020Motion Filed
Date: September 23, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 29, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 05, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 30, 2020Motion Filed
Date: October 05, 2020Notice Sent re:
Date: October 05, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 08, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: October 06, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 08, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 08, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: October 09, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 16, 2020Reply Filed
Date: October 16, 2020Declaration re:
Date: October 19, 2020Notice of Appeal filed
Date: October 23, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 23, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: October 21, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 23, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 28, 2020Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: October 29, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 03, 2020Document(s) Placed in File
Date: October 30, 2020Objection Filed
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 04, 2020Objection Filed
Date: November 05, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 05, 2020Motion Filed
Date: November 06, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 09, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 13, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 12, 2020Request for Extension of Time Filed
Date: November 13, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 25, 2020Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: November 17, 2020Request for Extension of Time Filed
Date: November 13, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Notice of Appeal on Order or Motion Filed - Court of Appeal
Date: December 03, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 18, 2020Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: December 02, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 02, 2020Notice Filed
Date: November 25, 2020Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: December 04, 2020Complaint in Intervention Filed
Date: December 04, 2020Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: December 04, 2020Letter Sent To:
Date: December 04, 2020Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: December 04, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 07, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 04, 2020Proof of Service
Date: December 04, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 08, 2020Objection Filed
Date: December 09, 2020Notice Filed
Date: December 07, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 09, 2020Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: December 10, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 08, 2020Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt of
Date: December 14, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: December 15, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: December 11, 2020Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: December 16, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: December 17, 2020Summons Issued on
Date: December 16, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 18, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 18, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 16, 2020Ex Parte Correspondence Received and Returned to:
Date: December 17, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 18, 2020Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: December 18, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: December 24, 2020Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: December 22, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: February 03, 2021Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: December 24, 2020Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: December 18, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 13, 2021Judgment Filed
Date: February 24, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: January 29, 2021Statement of Damages Filed
Date: February 10, 2021Statement of Damages Filed
Date: February 10, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 02, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 06, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 10, 2021Partial Remittitur Issued
Date: February 23, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 12, 2021Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: February 10, 2021Order After Hearing Filed
Date: January 13, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 18, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 10, 2021Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: February 10, 2021Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: February 25, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 25, 2021Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: February 24, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: March 02, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: February 24, 2021Notice Filed
Date: February 25, 2021Proof of Service
Date: March 02, 2021Proof of Service
Date: March 02, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 01, 2021Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: April 21, 2021Memorandum of Costs
Date: March 03, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 02, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: March 03, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: March 05, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 04, 2021Motion to Amend Complaint
Date: June 01, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: September 11, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 12, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: June 12, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 17, 2019Reply Filed
Date: June 18, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 19, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 02, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 23, 2019Reply Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 04, 2022Objection Filed
Date: July 13, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: May 05, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 04, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 07, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: August 08, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 28, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 20, 2022Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: August 28, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: August 28, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 09, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 09, 2023Motion re:
Date: October 09, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 09, 2023Motion re:
Date: October 09, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 11, 2023Motion to Set Aside
Date: October 11, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 11, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 13, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 16, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: October 17, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: October 17, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 17, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: October 18, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 18, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 19, 2023Request Filed Re:
Date: October 23, 2023Request Filed Re:
Date: October 23, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: October 24, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: October 24, 2023Motion Re: Joinder Filed
Date: October 25, 2023Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 25, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 26, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 25, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 26, 2023Amended Document Filed re:
Date: May 18, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: October 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: October 27, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: May 19, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 27, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 17, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 18, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 19, 2023Memorandum of P&A ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: November 06, 2023Notice Filed
Date: November 06, 2023Proof of Service
Date: November 06, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: May 19, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 19, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 15, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 21, 2022Opposition to Law and Motion Received & Filed
Date: October 20, 2022Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 15, 2023Ex Parte Filed
Date: October 21, 2022Proof of Service
Date: November 15, 2023Request for Judicial Notice ISO Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 15, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 15, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: November 16, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: December 04, 2023Amended Document Filed re:
Date: October 15, 2019Reply Filed
Date: October 02, 2019Reply Filed
Date: January 30, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 17, 2020Answer Filed
Date: November 06, 2019Motion Filed
Date: February 18, 2020Motion Filed
Date: February 18, 2020Reply Filed
Date: March 09, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 24, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 09, 2020Reply Filed
Date: March 03, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 06, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 24, 2020Reply Filed
Date: March 04, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 24, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 09, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: April 08, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: April 29, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 10, 2020Reply Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Motion Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 12, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 27, 2020Notice of Appeal on Order or Motion Filed - Court of Appeal
Date: December 07, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 07, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 23, 2023Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: December 08, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 24, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 13, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 13, 2023Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: December 19, 2023Declaration re:
Date: July 13, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: December 28, 2023Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: January 04, 2024Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: January 04, 2024Ntc of Entry of Default Filed and Fwd to the Court of Appeal
Date: January 04, 2024Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: January 09, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: January 09, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: January 09, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: January 09, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: January 09, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: January 09, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: January 09, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: January 09, 2024Received an Order Dismissing Appeal from the Reviewing Court
Date: January 16, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 30, 2024Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: February 14, 2024Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: February 22, 2024Received an Order Dismissing Appeal from the Reviewing Court
Date: March 18, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 09, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 09, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 23, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 18, 2021Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: March 16, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: March 09, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 08, 2021Amended Document Filed re:
Date: April 19, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 21, 2021Motion re:
Date: May 03, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: December 21, 2018Demurrer Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: July 20, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 21, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 04, 2021Received an Order Dismissing Appeal from the Reviewing Court
Date: August 19, 2021Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: March 21, 2024Reply Filed
Date: September 12, 2019Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: September 17, 2021Motion Filed
Date: December 23, 2019Proof of Service
Date: March 09, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 20, 2019Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: March 09, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 14, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 21, 2019Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: March 23, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 07, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 28, 2022Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: March 28, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: April 04, 2024Amended Judgment Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 04, 2021Motion re:
Date: April 09, 2024Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 12, 2022Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date
Date: April 16, 2024Notice Waiver of Court Fees Filed
Date: April 12, 2024Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: February 16, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 05, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: March 06, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 17, 2024Motion Filed
Date: May 13, 2019Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: April 22, 2024Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 11, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 11, 2019Motion for Reconsideration
Date: April 28, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 27, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 11, 2019Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: June 12, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: February 23, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: February 23, 2023Reply Filed
Date: September 18, 2019Reply Filed
Date: September 12, 2019Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: April 28, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 06, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Remittitur Filed
Date: May 25, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 16, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Legacy Minutes
Date: November 06, 2020Notice of Appeal on Order or Motion Filed - Court of Appeal
Date: December 07, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: June 07, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2024 |
Department R12 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Mathewson, Kory |
||
May 09, 2024 |
Department R12 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Mathewson, Kory |
||
May 09, 2024 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Partial Remittitur |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date Appellant's motion to vacate the dismissal and reinstate the appeal is STRICKEN. Appellant's motion to vacate the dismissal and reinstate the appeal filed April 2, 2024 is GRANTED. The dismissal order filed March 18, 2024 is VACATED and appeal is REINSTATED. |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Appeal reinstated | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice Waiver of Court Fees Filed | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion re: - $60.00 (Motions) | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Received an Order from the Court of Appeal on this Date Appellant's 2nd motion to vacate dismissal and reinstate appeal is DENIED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.