Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mcguigan Kathryn T., filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Manuwal Sheri Ellen, Trotter James Michael, Panish Brian Joseph, Rudorfer David Anthony, against Academy Focus Point, Bell Michael, County Of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Department Of Mental Health, Mcdonald Brian, (total of 10) See All represented by Doumanian Nancy P., Doumanian Nancy Prapion, Monroy Jon F., Xanders Edward Laucks, Ramirez Javier, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Malcolm Mackey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMalcolm Mackey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateMay 25, 2017 |
CategoryIntentional Infliction Of Emotional Distress (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Document:Summons Issued Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Reply Brief RE Motion; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine no. 12; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Scheduled MSC) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine no. 11; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 5; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Sheri Ellen Manuwal (Attorney)
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Document:Supporting Docs/ P's & A's Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 9; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine no. 16; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 7; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 10; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 1; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Brief Volume I; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Brief supplemental brief; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Opposition Opp to Ex Parte to Con't Trial; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Trial Schedule and Court Availability) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-11T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order setting briefing schedule; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Order Setting briefing schedule; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Miscellaneous Judgments; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 4; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Document:Demurrer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 6; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Amended; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine no. 15; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Reply brief re motion to compel; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Document:Third Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Opposition to Ex Parte; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Document:Receipt-Depository Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Order granting ex parte application; Filed by:
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine no. 14; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine #10; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 8; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Brief Plaintiff's brief; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-27T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Plaintiff's lodging; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Brief Plaintiff's supplemental brief; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Reply Reply brief in support of plaintiff's motion in limine; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order trial disputes; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-23T00:00:00Opposition PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs - Amended; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-28T00:00:00Jury Question 1 and 2; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Jury Instructions 67 pages given; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine no. 13; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine NO. 11; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Opposition TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Statement of the Case Plaintiff's Proposed; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Motion to Quash; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff); Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Judgment Following General Verdict; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-14T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 01, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 21, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: August 29, 2017Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)
Date: October 09, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 03, 2019Reply - Reply Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Ex parte Motion to Compel Deposition
Date: January 29, 2019Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: March 08, 2019Reply - REPLY BRIEF RE MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: April 16, 2019Reply - REPLY BRIEF RE MOTION
Date: May 14, 2019Motion for Sanctions - MOTION FOR SANCTIONS TERMINATING, ISSUE AND/OR EVIDENCE SANCTIONS
Date: November 01, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: November 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION BY PLAINTIFF (JANE DOE), FOR TERMINATING, ISSUE AND/OR...)
Date: November 26, 2019Motion to Quash
Date: February 24, 2020NOTJCE OF AND DEMURRER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: February 21, 2018Brief - BRIEF REGARDING THE COURT’S DEFERRED RULING ON PUSD’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 18
Date: August 08, 2022Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT’S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NONSUIT
Date: August 18, 2022Notice of Hearing of Motion for New Trial
Date: December 14, 2022Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: December 16, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: December 16, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION FOR BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: December 20, 2022Motion to Tax Costs
Date: December 23, 2022Motion to Tax Costs - MOTION TO TAX COSTS - AMENDED
Date: December 27, 2022Motion for New Trial
Date: December 29, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: January 12, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL)
Date: February 07, 2023Order - ORDER NEW TRIAL MOTION - CONDITIONAL GRANTING
Date: February 08, 2023Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: February 23, 2023COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. PERSONAL INJURY: BATTERY OF A MINOR; ETC
Date: May 25, 2017DEFENDANTS PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT AND BRIAN MCDONALD'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2018PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC.
Date: January 16, 2018NOTICE OF AND DEMURRER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: March 01, 2018PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2018NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.
Date: March 20, 2018REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2018SUMMONS ON SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 18, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OFF CALENDAR
Date: April 26, 2018NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: May 23, 2018NOTICE OP RULING RE DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2018NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC.
Date: September 05, 2018PLAINTIFPS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES:
Date: July 31, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 10, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 25, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 22, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 17, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 05, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 21, 2023Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Kathryn t. McGuigan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-23T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order as to Judge Madden, Long Beach Dept. S28 , OTR on at 9:30 a.m. Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Reply Plaintiff's reply in support of motion in limine no. 3; Filed by: Jane Doe (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Order Jury trial rules; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-17T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-08-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: April 22, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE #10
Date: April 26, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: April 27, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11
Date: April 26, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: April 27, 2022Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: May 18, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 AMENDED
Date: June 02, 2022Reply - REPLY REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 06, 2022Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17
Date: July 11, 2022Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-06-07T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Receipt-Depository
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-03-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-29 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-29T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant's Person Most Qualified Kelly Raney)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Stipulation To Dismiss Certain...))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Stipulation To Dismiss Certain Defendants and Take Demurrer Off Calendar
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Order (Granting Independent Medical Examination)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Compel IME))
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Compel Deposi...))
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice (Court's notice re continuance of hearing and order)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant PUSD Amended Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Terminating, Issue)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Following Order That Defe...))
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions (Terminating, Issue and/or Evidence Sanctions)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Initial Status Conference Order
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Reply ( Brief RE Motion)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Ex parte Motion to Compel Deposition)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Order on the Defendant's Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Reply (brief re motion to compel)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00[Proposed] Court Order Authorizing Release of School Records Issued on
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Obtain Unredacted Inciden...))
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION BY PLAINTIFF (JANE DOE), FOR TERMINATING, ISSUE AND/OR...))
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ISSUANCE OF PROTECTIVE O...))
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Trial Schedule and Court Availability) of )
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 8)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Application of plaintiff for an Order to Reopen Disc...))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 9)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial))
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#10)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Amended)
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant PUSD Opposition to Ex parte Term Sanctions)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (no. 14)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 10)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 9)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Cont Trial)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DIS...))
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Trial Transfer Order (as to Judge Madden, Long Beach Dept. S28 , OTR on at 9:30 a.m.)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STAT...))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (no. 15)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (no. 12)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER TO VACATE TRIAL AN...))
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Jury Question (-Defendants List of Proposed Voire Dire By The Court)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Reagan Evans)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Order (Jury trial rules)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial; Hearing o...))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Reply (Plaintiff's reply in support of motion in limine no. 3)
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff's brief)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Brief (supplemental brief)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Re Expert Fees)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiff's supplemental brief)
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial; Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO COMPEL PAYMENT...))
Date: 2022-06-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine (Plaintiff's motion in limine no. 5 AMENDED)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC Plaintiff unavailability to testif...))
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (NOTICE OF LODGING WITH THE COURT TRIAL SUBPOENA SERVED ON PLAINTIFF)
Date: 2022-06-02T00:00:00Order (COURT ORDER AUTHORIZING RELEASE OF SCHOOL RECORDS ISSUED ON 11-26-19)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Other - (Plaintiff's Opposition To Demurrer)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-11T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Compel Deposi...))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL A...))
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Following Order That Defe...))
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTI...))
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING, ISSUE, EVIDENCE AND MONETARY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-08-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (PUSD Ex Parte to Compel IME)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Opposition ( to Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR FOLLOWING ORDERS (1) THAT...))
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-07-12T00:00:00Opposition (Opp to Ex Parte to Con't Trial)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED EX PART...))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (5 years on )))
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTI...))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 11)
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-10T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case (Plaintiff's Proposed)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ISSUANCE OF PROTECTIVE OR...))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Notice (COURT'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND FSC DATE)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore ([Jorge P. Dominguez, 12523])
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 6)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 5)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant Pasadena Unified...))
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (- Tammie Moore, 11525)
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER TO VACATE TRIAL AN...))
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00RETURNED MAIL
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Scheduled MSC))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Notice (of court's continuance of hearings)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine (no. 13)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (no. 16)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO COMPEL DEFENSE EXPERT DR. ...))
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Trial Schedule and Court Availability))
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 4)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAINTIFF FOR TERMINATING OR OTHER SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Scheduled MSC) of )
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Notice (COURT'S NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION RE AUDIO RECORDINGS AND ORDER)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (no. 11)
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (McGivern #7576)
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions (Terminating, Issue and/or Evidence Sanctions)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses))
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Other - (Plaintiff's Opposition To Demurrer)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Stipulation To Dismiss Certain...))
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Compel Deposi...))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order to Compel Deposi...))
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Ex parte Motion to Compel Deposition)
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTI...))
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Notice (Court's notice re continuance of hearing and order)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant's Person Most Qualified Kelly Raney)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Reply ( Brief RE Motion)
Date: 2019-05-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Obtain Unredacted Inciden...))
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Following Order That Defe...))
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Opposition (Opp to Ex Parte to Con't Trial)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Following Order That Defe...))
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR FOLLOWING ORDERS (1) THAT...))
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Opposition ( to Ex Parte)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (PUSD Ex Parte to Compel IME)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Order (Granting Independent Medical Examination)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Compel IME))
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions (Terminating, Issue and/or Evidence Sanctions)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Opposition (Defendant PUSD Amended Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Terminating, Issue)
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION BY PLAINTIFF (JANE DOE), FOR TERMINATING, ISSUE AND/OR...))
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL A...))
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00[Proposed] Court Order Authorizing Release of School Records Issued on 11/26/19
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Order (COURT ORDER AUTHORIZING RELEASE OF SCHOOL RECORDS ISSUED ON 11-26-19)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING, ISSUE, EVIDENCE AND MONETARY SANCTIONS)
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ISSUANCE OF PROTECTIVE O...))
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ISSUANCE OF PROTECTIVE OR...))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTI...))
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice (COURT'S NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION RE AUDIO RECORDINGS AND ORDER)
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/01/2020)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Notice (COURT'S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE AND FSC DATE)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/17/2020)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice (of court's continuance of hearings)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER TO VACATE TRIAL AN...))
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER TO VACATE TRIAL AN...))
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Scheduled MSC))
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Scheduled MSC) of 08/04/2020)
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Defendant Pasadena Unified...))
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED EX PART...))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO COMPEL DEFENSE EXPERT DR. ...))
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL STAT...))
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions (Terminating, Issue and/or Evidence Sanctions)
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Reply (brief re motion to compel)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DIS...))
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Application of plaintiff for an Order to Reopen Disc...))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.