Case Last Refreshed: 22 hours ago
Arroyo Christal, Arroyo Heriberto, Christina Arlington Smith Individually And As Successor-In-Interest To Lalani Walton Deceased, Heriberto Arroyo Individually And As Successor-In-Interest To Arriani Jaileen Arroyo Deceased, Smith Christina Arlington, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Ayers Christopher L., Bergaman Matthew, Bergman Matthew P, Creed Jesse, Davis Lucy R., (total of 16) See All against Alphabet Inc, Alphabet Inc., Bytedance Inc., Google Llc, Tiktok Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Ayers Christopher L., Chiou Christopher C, Drake Geoffrey M., Fiterman Amy R., Hardin Ashley W., (total of 18) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Carolyn B. Kuhl presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarolyn B. Kuhl Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2022 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 17, 2022Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 08, 2024Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Seventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Response to Petition; Filed by: TIKTOK INC. (Defendant); BYTEDANCE INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of , Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Deposit of Complex Fees; Filed by: Tiktok Inc. (Defendant); Bytedance Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order (eFiling); Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-01T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Minute Order Dated February 17, 2023; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Case Management Order No. 2; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-17T00:00:00Order Granting Plaintiffs' Request to Add-On Cases #2; Filed by: Clerk; Charge Fee ?: YES
Date: 2023-03-21T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-03T00:00:00Case Management Order #3 defts. liaison counsel; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 21, 2023Notice Notice of Deposit of Complex Fee by Plaintiffs; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Lodging of Complaint Filed in Add-On Case; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-18T00:00:00Short Form Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Jessica Williams (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-14T00:00:00Amended Declaration of John Pizzuro; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-06-20T00:00:00Submission of Agreed Plaintiff Preservation Form; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-05-25T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-12T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-13T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-03T00:00:00Order Redacted Governing Preservation of CSAM; Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 31, 2023Notice of Ruling at August 24, 2023 Hearing; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: September 01, 2023Order on Media Request to Permit Coverage; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 08, 2023Notice of Deposit of Complex Fees by Defendant Snap Inc. Filed by: Snap Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2023-09-12T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: September 13, 2023Notice of Deposit of Complex Fees by Defendant Snap Inc. Filed by: Snap Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2023-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Deposit of Complex Fees by Defendant SNAP INC. Filed by: Snap Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2023-09-28T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 13, 2023Notice of Deposit of Complex Fees by Defendant SNAP INC. Filed by: Snap Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2023-10-19T00:00:00Notice Of Deposit Of Complex Fees By Defendant Snap Inc. Filed by: Snap Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2023-10-24T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 21, 2023Notice of Deposit of Complex Fees by Defendant Snap Inc. Filed by: Snap Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2023-11-07T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-11-22T00:00:00Notice of Deposit of Complex Fees by Defendant Snap Inc. Filed by: Snap Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2023-12-11T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Deposit of Complex Fees by Defendant SNAP INC. Filed by: Snap Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: 2023-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Rulings from December 7, 2023 Hearing; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling on March 22, 2023 Status Conference; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-04-06T00:00:00Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling - Status Conference; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Rulings from February 7, 2024 Hearing; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: February 13, 2024Notice of Rulings from January 12, 2024; Filed by: Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: February 13, 2024Notice of Deposit of Complex Fees by Defendant SNAP INC. Filed by: Snap Inc. (Non-Party)
Date: February 22, 2024Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 23, 2024Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 27, 2024Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2024-03-27T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 03, 2024Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 19, 2024Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: August 12, 2022Order - ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO ADD-ON CASES
Date: February 17, 2023Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: SNAP'S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR COORDINATION
Date: November 28, 2022Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 01, 2022Notice of Coordinated Cases - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF PETITION FOR COORDINATION
Date: September 20, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 26, 2023Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: January 11, 2023Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: December 30, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 13, 2023Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 19, 2022Complaint
Date: June 30, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 24, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 14, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 30, 2022Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: June 30, 2022Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (FILE AND SERVEXPRESS)
Date: February 02, 2023Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)
Date: February 17, 2023Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 27, 2023Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition
Date: December 14, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 16, 2023Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE
Date: June 30, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2022Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: July 26, 2022Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: 2022-07-01T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: August 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 06, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS’ DEMURRER
Date: October 06, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/06/2022
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 10/10/2022
Date: October 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)
Date: October 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: October 10, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING JCCP RULING
Date: 2022-10-24T00:00:00Response to Petition
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Unknown - [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: APPLICATION BY MATTHEW P BERGMAN FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE
Date: December 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 05, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/06/2023
Date: January 06, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 06, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION TRIAL JUDGE
Date: January 09, 2023Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/17/2023
Date: January 17, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 17, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS
Date: January 19, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED JANUARY 17, 2023
Date: January 19, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 26, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF COMPLEX FEES
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER ADMITTING CHRISTOPHER L. AYERS AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 27, 2023Request - REQUEST FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: February 07, 2023Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PETITION AND REQUEST FOR COORDINATION
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 10, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR PAUL W. SCHMIDT TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS
Date: February 16, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE; INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 17, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: February 21, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER DATED FEBRUARY 17, 2023
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: February 23, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: March 06, 2023Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE (CASE ANYWHERE)
Date: March 06, 2023Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Scheduled Hearing for a Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-11T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Seventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by Tiktok Inc. (Defendant); Bytedance Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Notice (Of Appearance Of Counsel On Behalf Of Plaintiffs) Filed by Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Order (Granting Petition and Request for Coordination) Filed by Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Notice (Of Entry Of Minute Order Dated January 17, 2023) Filed by Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Response to Petition Filed by Tiktok Inc. (Defendant); Bytedance Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-12-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of , Order Assigning Coordination Trial Judge) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Christina Arlington Smith (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-02-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Deposit of Complex Fees Filed by Tiktok Inc. (Defendant); Bytedance Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF CHRISTINA ARLINGTON SMITH, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 377.32)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Seventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Declaration (OF HERIBERTO ARROYO, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 377.32)
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.