Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Kerns Capital Management, Inc., Kerns, Cody, Wftmb Holdings Llc, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Levine David M, against Bbrc Real Estate, Llc, Brito Cutie, Rafael, Da Rocha Gomes Bastos, Renan, Fxwinning, Ltd., Kuschner, Julian, (total of 7) See All represented by Barakat, Brian, Bianchi, Jaime Augusto, Kaplan, Justin B, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts with CA44 - Downtown Miami - Judge Walsh, Lisa S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCA44 - Downtown Miami - Judge Walsh, Lisa S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2023 |
CategoryBusiness Torts |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs Cody Kerns, Kerns Capital Management, Inc., and WFTMB Holdings LLC against Defendants FXWinning, Ltd., Jonathan Lopez, Julian Kuschner, David Merino, Renan da Rocha Gomes Bastos, Rafael Brito Cutie, and BBRC Real...
Complaint
Date: July 24, 2023Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: December 20, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 12, 2024Order:
Date: December 27, 2023Order of Dismissal
Date: January 19, 2024Response:
Date: January 05, 2024Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 12, 2024Motion for Extension of Time
Date: January 30, 2024Motion for Protective Order
Date: January 31, 2024Response to Motion
Date: February 13, 2024Response to Motion
Date: February 09, 2024Order:
Date: February 07, 2024Response to Motion
Date: February 12, 2024Motion for Extension of Time
Date: February 14, 2024Voluntary Dismissal
Date: February 14, 2024Response:
Date: February 19, 2024Motion to Consolidate
Date: February 20, 2024Response to Motion
Date: March 01, 2024Response:
Date: March 06, 2024Order:
Date: March 10, 2024Order:
Date: March 13, 2024Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 13, 2024Motion:
Date: March 14, 2024Motion to Compel
Date: March 14, 2024Agreed Order
Date: March 15, 2024Motion:
Date: March 20, 2024Order of Continuance
Date: March 22, 2024Response to Motion
Date: March 25, 2024Request:
Date: March 29, 2024Response:
Date: April 01, 2024Order:
Date: April 02, 2024Motion for Leave
Date: April 03, 2024Agreed Order
Date: April 08, 2024Order:
Date: April 09, 2024Response to Motion
Date: April 12, 2024Motion:
Date: August 03, 2023Order:
Date: August 12, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: August 15, 2023Motion:
Date: August 15, 2023Agreed Order
Date: August 16, 2023Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 18, 2023Order:
Date: August 18, 2023Response to Motion
Date: August 30, 2023Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: September 03, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 05, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 06, 2023Agreed Order
Date: September 07, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 11, 2023Agreed Order
Date: September 12, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 12, 2023Response to Motion
Date: September 15, 2023Request for Copies
Date: September 15, 2023Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 15, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 22, 2023Agreed Order
Date: September 17, 2023Response to Request for Production
Date: September 22, 2023Agreed Order
Date: September 25, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 02, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 12, 2023Response to Motion
Date: October 12, 2023Order:
Date: October 17, 2023Agreed Order
Date: October 15, 2023Response to Motion
Date: October 17, 2023Order:
Date: October 20, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: October 25, 2023Order Extending Time for
Date: October 27, 2023Amended Complaint
Date: October 31, 2023Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 01, 2023Response to Motion
Date: November 13, 2023Request for Copies
Date: November 02, 2023Motion to Dismiss
Date: November 17, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: November 20, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: November 20, 2023Motion to Quash
Date: November 20, 2023Stipulation
Date: November 21, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 22, 2023Agreed Order
Date: November 29, 2023Order:
Date: November 29, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: November 30, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 29, 2023Agreed Order
Date: December 03, 2023Subpoena Served
Date: December 05, 2023Response:
Date: December 11, 2023Motion:
Date: December 06, 2023Response to Motion
Date: December 07, 2023Response to Motion
Date: December 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference INTERIM |
|
September 12, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference INTERIM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference INTERIM |
|
August 08, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference INTERIM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 11, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference INTERIM |
|
July 11, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference INTERIM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
June 13, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference INTERIM |
|
June 13, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference INTERIM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference INTERIM |
|
May 09, 2024 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference INTERIM Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.