Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
Runyon, Nathan Peter, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Cochran, Claire E., Stevens, Gregory W., against Does 1-50, Inclusive, Ng, Kaiser, Payward, Inc., A California Corporation, represented by Calderon, Andrew E., Lavigne, Christopher N., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel K. Feng Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions106 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a reply in support of the defendants' demurrer to the plaintiff's first amended complaint. The plaintiff's opposition to the demurrer is criticized for applying improper legal standards, including an improper pleading standard that ...
ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 11, 2020MINUTES FOR MAR-11-2020 9:30 AM
Date: March 11, 2020STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: March 04, 2021ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: August 23, 2021ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: March 29, 2021ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL
Date: August 26, 2021ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXCUSE LATE-FILING
Date: August 26, 2021NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 26, 2019ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF EMPLOYEE 5
Date: May 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | JUN-08-2022 PRO HAC VICE STATUS CALENDAR AS TO ATTORNEY GREGORY W. STEVENS - OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON OCT-29-2021 | |
June 08, 2022 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY GREGORY W. STEVENS
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | JAN-12-2022 PRO HAC VICE STATUS CALENDAR AS TO ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER N. LAVIGNE - OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON OCT-29-2021 | |
January 12, 2022 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER N. LAVIGNE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
January 11, 2022 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-11-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
November 16, 2021 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100145860) | |
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF NOV-16-2021 CONTINUED TO JAN-11-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
September 13, 2021 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.