Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Eng, Martin, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Chen, Quynh, De Clue, Joseph L., Kutrubes, Peter L, Mclaughlin, Michael J, against Castellanos, Marylou, Does 1 To 1000 Inclusive, Jp Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Lender Processing Services, Inc., Quality Loan Service Corporation Erroneously Sued, (total of 7) See All represented by Butler, Leticia "Tia", Goulding, Daniel J., Lynch, James K., Rockey, Daniel T., Smith, Stanley Wayne, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTeri L. Jackson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions213 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time783 days |
This complaint is a reply in support of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s demurrer to the plaintiff's first amended complaint. The plaintiff, Martin Eng, borrowed $1,800,000 from Washington Mutual Bank, FA, and the loan was secured by a deed of trust to a ...
ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER NAMING DOE DEFENDANTS
Date: June 17, 2016PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ENG, MARTIN
Date: December 14, 2015NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-21-2017 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.
Date: November 10, 2016NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 16292034) FILED BY ATTORNEY ROCKEY, DANIEL T.
Date: October 19, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15341051) FILED BY DEFENDANT JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Date: December 08, 2015NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 16, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT AND SANCTIONS
Date: July 10, 2017ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT JP MORGAN CHASE BANK'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 17197035) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ENG, MARTIN
Date: July 17, 2017ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF'S DEPOSITION AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS
Date: June 27, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16048038) FILED BY DEFENDANT JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Date: February 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2017 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR COURT
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
August 07, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Hearing Re Order To Show Cause Re Contempt Set for hearing on Monday, August 7, 2017, Line 2, Hearing Re Order To Show Cause Re Contempt Off calendar. The case was dismissed on July 17, 2017. =(302/HK...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
August 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing Re Order To Show Cause Re Contempt
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-07-2017 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, HEARING RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT IS OFF CALENDAR. THE CASE WAS DISMISSED ON JULY 17, 2017. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; CLERK: J. RIOS MERIDA; NOT REPORTED. (D302) | |
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event | MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-21-2017 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED 7/17/17. (206) | |
July 28, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Evidentiary, Terminating, And Monetary Sanctions For Plaintiff Martin Engs Failure To Comply With Court Order Compelling Plaintiff Martin Eng To Provide Discovery Respo...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
July 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion And Motion For Evidentiary, Terminating, And Monetary Sanctions For Plaintiff Martin Engs Failure To Comply With Court Order Compelling Plaintiff Martin Eng To Provide Discovery Responses
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.'S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY, TERMINATING, AND MONETARY SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF MARTIN ENGS FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF MARTIN ENG TO PROVIDE DISCOVERY RESPONSES IS OFF CALENDAR, PER DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON JULY 17 2017. JUDGE: JAMES FLEMING; CLERK: JOHNNY SENGMANY; NOT REPORTED. (302/JPT/HK) | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-28-2017 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 302 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.