Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Karidis-Koepke, Nancy, Koepke, Harold, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Pietrykowski, Michael J., Satterley, Joseph D., against A.B.C. Mobile Systems, A.B.C. Mobile Systems, Individually And As, American Honda Motor Co. Inc., Bell Industries, Inc., Bell Industries Inc., Individually And As, (total of 44) See All represented by Bishop, Bruce T., Conn, Martin A., Cox, John, Foley, Patrick J, Gilbert, Peter Ray, (total of 31) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 03, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions50 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1871 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a class action lawsuit. The plaintiffs, Harold Koepke and Nancy Karidis-Koepke, are listed as the plaintiffs/petitioners, and the defendant/respondent is Ford Motor Company, et al. The case number is CGC13...
MINUTES FOR JUL-15-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 15, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-09-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 09, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-22-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 22, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-16-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 16, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-23-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 23, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-17-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 17, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-14-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 14, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-11-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 11, 2014EXHIBIT/DEPOSITION RECEIPT
Date: January 17, 2019MINUTES FOR JUL-10-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 10, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-02-2014 1:30 PM
Date: July 02, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-03-2014 8:00 AM
Date: July 03, 2014MINUTES FOR JUN-24-2014 3:30 PM
Date: June 24, 2014JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: June 30, 2014PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 55639373)
Date: June 24, 2014MINUTES FOR JUN-26-2014 9:00 AM
Date: June 26, 2014MINUTES FOR JUN-25-2014 3:00 PM
Date: June 25, 2014ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 16, 2014ORDER FOLLOWING MAY 21, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 10, 2014ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT BELNORTEL CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: June 10, 2014ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' EXPERTS
Date: May 22, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54788626) FILED BY DEFENDANT KELSEY-HAYES COMPANY
Date: January 03, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54808426) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Date: January 08, 2014JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 54808426) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Date: January 08, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54790653) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY
Date: January 06, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54812070) FILED BY DEFENDANT COOPER INDUSTRIES LLC
Date: January 08, 2014NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: December 03, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54813115) FILED BY DEFENDANT H.M. ROYAL, INC.
Date: January 09, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54829031) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE HERTZ CORPORATION
Date: January 10, 2014ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICE OF HAROLD KOEPKE
Date: December 19, 2013DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 54813115) FILED BY DEFENDANT H.M. ROYAL, INC.
Date: January 09, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54800180) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Date: January 07, 2014DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 54800180) FILED BY DEFENDANT FMC TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Date: January 07, 2014CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 1-15-15)
Date: February 03, 2015MINUTES FOR JUN-27-2014 9:30 AM
Date: June 27, 2014WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: July 31, 2014EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: August 06, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-28-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 28, 2014JURY NOTES
Date: July 30, 2014JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: July 30, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-25-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 25, 2014JURY VERDICT SPECIAL VERDICT FORM FILED
Date: July 30, 2014DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56287241) AS TO DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY
Date: November 04, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-29-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 29, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-24-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 24, 2014CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 07, 2014CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: November 14, 2014MINUTES FOR JUL-30-2014 9:00 AM
Date: July 31, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THYSSENKRUPP BUDD COMPANY SUED AS "THE BUDD COMPANY"
Date: December 19, 2013MINUTES FOR FEB-18-2014 9:30 AM
Date: February 18, 2014ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 01, 2014JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 55006452) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.
Date: February 14, 2014ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PREFERENCE
Date: February 18, 2014ORDER OVERRULING VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.'S DEMURRER
Date: February 04, 2014NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 54945560) FILED BY ATTORNEY ONGARO, DAVID R
Date: February 04, 2014JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 54790653) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY
Date: January 06, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54876978) FILED BY DEFENDANT DON L. MORRIS, INC.
Date: January 21, 2014DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 54788265) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.
Date: January 03, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54793636) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Date: January 06, 2014JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 54788265) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.
Date: January 03, 2014NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT KOEPKE, HAROLD KARIDIS-KOEPKE, NANCY
Date: January 15, 2015DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 55865981) AS TO DEFENDANT H.M. ROYAL, INC.
Date: August 11, 2014NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT KOEPKE, HAROLD KARIDIS-KOEPKE, NANCY
Date: September 29, 2014ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED (APPEAL FILED ON 1/15/15) (TRANSACTION ID # 56910330)
Date: March 12, 2015REMITTITUR DISMISSED A143227 DIV 1
Date: April 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT/DEPOSITION RECEIPT | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61113455) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
September 01, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIFT OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 59502911) FILED BY DEFENDANT THYSSENKRUPP BUDD COMPANY SUED AS "THE BUDD COMPANY" | |
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59268390) FILED BY DEFENDANT MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC., A ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59211240) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS, INC. F/K/A CONTINENTAL TEVES, INC. | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58818644) AS TO DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC. AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION | |
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 57897721) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57789016) AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 57788831) AS TO DEFENDANT A.B.C. MOBILE SYSTEMS | |
May 13, 2015 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JOHN R. HENDERSON
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.