Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Hwang, Shirley S., Fedex Office And Print Services, Inc, Lum, Winston, Merchants Bonding Company, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Bassett, Craig Jay, Eisenhart, Marc A, Estavillo, Jason W, Pro Per, Schaffer, Dylan L, (total of 11) See All against Aeschbacher, Bruno, Afraimi, Morad, Does 1-25, Does 1-50, Emerich, Melvin Lee, (total of 20) See All represented by Austin, Todd M., Bassett, Craig Jay, Busch, Richard, Cannata, Therese Yvonne, Ching, Michael M., (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Richard B. Ulmer, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard B. Ulmer, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2010 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions119 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case between Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company and FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc. The document is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The request for ...
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF SHIRLEY HWANG'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Date: August 16, 2019REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A156674 DIV 3
Date: December 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 100062144) FILED BY APPELLANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT
Date: February 07, 2019MINUTES FOR DEC-18-2019 9:30 AM
Date: December 18, 2019NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT [APPEAL FILED 2/7/19, A156674 DIV 3]
Date: December 30, 2019REMITTITUR AFFIRMED (A160429 DIV 3)
Date: February 24, 2022CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: August 03, 2020NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT
Date: March 11, 2019SETOFF FILED BY COURT
Date: December 03, 2018ORDER ENTERING REVISED JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: January 25, 2019CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 4-16-20)
Date: June 16, 2020CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: June 04, 2020STATEMENT OF DECISION PROPOSED STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: July 06, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF TENTATIVE STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: April 17, 2018ORDER - TRANSFER AND TRANSPORTATION ORDER
Date: August 22, 2017ORDER TO TRANSPORT AND HOUSE JAY CHANDRAKANT SHAH (PENAL CODE 2620)
Date: September 11, 2017MINUTES FOR AUG-14-2017 2:00 PM
Date: August 14, 2017MINUTES FOR AUG-15-2017 10:00 AM
Date: August 15, 2017ORDER TO TRANSPORT AND HOUSE JAY CHANDRAKANT SHAH (PENAL CODE 2620)
Date: July 10, 2017MINUTES FOR AUG-10-2017 9:00 AM
Date: August 10, 2017NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUN-12-2017 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.
Date: February 22, 2017JAY SHAH'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEFENDANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT
Date: August 09, 2017MINUTES FOR AUG-08-2017 10:00 AM
Date: August 08, 2017ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION FOR JAY CHANDRAKANT SHAH TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Date: February 17, 2017MINUTES FOR NOV-08-2017 9:00 AM
Date: November 08, 2017AMENDED WITNESS LIST OF JAY SHAH FILED BY DEFENDANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT
Date: June 30, 2017ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT JAY SHAH'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: June 01, 2017ORDER - TRANSPORATION AND HOUSING ORDER
Date: July 10, 2017OF MTN TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT
Date: May 09, 2017WITNESS LIST OF JAY SHAH FILED BY DEFENDANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT
Date: June 07, 2017JAY SHAH'S TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY DEFENDANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT
Date: June 07, 2017NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY DEFENDANT EMERICH, MELVIN
Date: May 16, 2017ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: May 03, 2017ORDER RELATING TO MOTION FOR STAY PROCEEDINGS AND LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: August 28, 2015DECLARATION OF INDIGENCY FILED BY DEFENDANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT EMERICH, MELVIN LEE
Date: August 25, 2016DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15043028) AS TO DEFENDANT REPLOGLE, DAVID
Date: February 13, 2015NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY LARRY L. COOK TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY DEC-24-2014
Date: November 12, 2014SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT FEDEX OFFICE AND PRINT SERVICES, INC
Date: January 28, 2014ORDER VACATING THE MAY 5, 2014 TRIAL DATE AND SETTING TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 16, 2014ORDER TO TAKE THE DEPOSITION OF PRISONER DAVID REPOGLE
Date: October 24, 2013SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 21, 2014ORDER AUTHORIZING THE DEPOSITION OF PRISONER, KAUSHAL NIROULA
Date: November 08, 2013ORDER - STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: June 11, 2013ORDER AUTHORIZING THE PARTIES TO TAKE THE DEPOSITION OF PRISONER WINSTON LUM
Date: September 30, 2013ORDER GRANTING CROSS-DEFENDANT/PLAINTIFF SHIRLEY S. HWANG'S MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY
Date: February 13, 2013RESPONSE FILED BY DEFENDANT LUM, WINSTON
Date: October 24, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: January 07, 2011MINUTES FOR FEB-05-2020 9:30 AM
Date: February 05, 2020BRIEF RE OFFSET (TRANSACTION ID # 100050256) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT
Date: October 09, 2018TENTATIVE DECISION RENDERED
Date: March 13, 2018MINUTES FOR OCT-01-2019 10:00 AM
Date: October 01, 2019CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 11, 2019STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: September 18, 2018ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT EMERICH, MELVIN
Date: March 09, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT LUM, WINSTON
Date: March 02, 2012ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF DEFENDANT MELVIN LEE EMERICH FOR RELIEF FROM ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: January 11, 2012ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT WINSTON LUM'S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PROCEEDINGS
Date: December 20, 2011ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS OF CASE(S) CGC-11-512102 WITH CASE CGC-10-503332
Date: November 01, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT LUM, WINSTON
Date: May 04, 2012ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: February 18, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LUM, WINSTON
Date: December 20, 2010ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY
Date: February 16, 2011EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY DEFENDANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT
Date: June 30, 2017MINUTES FOR AUG-07-2017 2:40 PM
Date: August 07, 2017JAY SHAH'S EXHIBITS LIST FILED BY DEFENDANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT
Date: June 07, 2017ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT JAY SHAH TO PRODUCE RECORDS OF HIS FINANCIAL CONDITION
Date: September 11, 2017ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER RELEASING INTERPLED NOTARY BOND PROCEEDS TO SHIRLEY HWANG
Date: August 15, 2017MINUTES FOR AUG-11-2017 9:00 AM
Date: August 11, 2017MINUTES FOR AUG-09-2017 9:00 AM
Date: August 09, 2017ORDER - TRANSPORTATION AND HOUSING ORDER
Date: June 16, 2017NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: September 08, 2010ORDER OVERRULING CCP 170.6 CHALLENGE
Date: November 13, 2019ORDER FROM COURT OF APPEAL. A159096 DIV. 3 [SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS]
Date: December 27, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100063644)
Date: February 20, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SANTA CLARA COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT MEGAN & KASI PROPERTIES LLC M & K PROPERTIES, LLC MARTINI & CHNOOGLE, INC. | |
September 12, 2022 | Hearing |
Plaintiff Shirley S. Hwangs Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Vacating February 5, 2020 Order Granting Assignment Order In Favor Of Plaintiff Shirley S. Hwang And Restraining Judgment Debtors And Their Agents
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-12-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | LAW AND MOTION 302, PLAINTIFF SHIRLEY HWANG'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 5, 2020 ORDER GRANTING ASSIGNMENT ORDER IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF SHIRLEY S. HWANG AND RESTRAINING JUDGMENT DEBTORS AND THEIR AGENTS IS GRANTED. PREVAILING PARTY IS REQUIRED TO PREPARE A PROPOSED ORDER REPEATING VERBATIM THE SUBSTANTIVE PORTION OF THE COURT'S RULING. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR., CLERK: S. LE, NOT REPORTED. =(302/RBU) | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RETURN OR DESTROY EXHIBITS AND/OR DEPOSITIONS SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT (TRANS # 67938336) | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF SHIRLEY S. HWANGS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER VACATING FEBRUARY 5, 2020 ORDER GRANTING ASSIGNMENT ORDER IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF SHIRLEY S. HWANG AND RESTRAINING JUDGMENT DEBTORS AND THEIR AGENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 100172545) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HWANG, SHIRLEY S. (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #512102) HEARING SET FOR SEP-12-2022 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100172545) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HWANG, SHIRLEY S. (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #512102) | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 100172545) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HWANG, SHIRLEY S. (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #512102) AS TO DEFENDANT SHAH, JAY CHANDRAKANT | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $527.70 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE APR-21-2022,, (TRANSACTION ID # 100160186) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HWANG, SHIRLEY S. (PLAINTIFF FROM CONSOLIDATED CASE #512102) | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR AFFIRMED (A160429 DIV 3) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.