Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fireman'S Fund Insurance Company filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, against 3M Company, 4520 Corp., Inc.,, A & A Mechanical Contractors Inc., A & A Sheet Metal, Aberthaw Construction Company, (total of 78) See All represented by Armstrong, William Henry, Bassi, Marte Joseph, Bergquist, Kenneth R, Bertrand, Jean Lynne, Biderman, David T., (total of 20) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Harold E. Kahn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarold E. Kahn Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2010 |
CategoryAsbestos |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions57 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time2178 days |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case. The plaintiff, Laurance Hagen, is suing the defendant, Asbestos Defendants (BP), in the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. The case number is CGC-10-275582....
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33232410) FILED BY DEFENDANT O.C. MCDONALD CO., INC.
Date: September 14, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33226995) FILED BY DEFENDANT MARINA HEATING & AIR CONDITIONING
Date: September 14, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33472068) FILED BY DEFENDANT MADLEM MECHANICAL, INC.
Date: September 27, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33395722) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGE F. SCHULER, INC.
Date: September 22, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 34752790) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABERTHAW CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Date: December 08, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 33699467) FILED BY DEFENDANT EMIL J. WEBER ELECTRIC CO.
Date: October 07, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35970691) FILED BY DEFENDANT KENT M. LIM & COMPANY, INC.
Date: February 15, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 33559061) FILED BY DEFENDANT N. P. I. CORPORATION
Date: September 30, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 33472068) FILED BY DEFENDANT MADLEM MECHANICAL, INC.
Date: September 27, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 33667256) FILED BY DEFENDANT N. P. I. CORPORATION
Date: October 06, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 33698444) FILED BY DEFENDANT EMIL J. WEBER ELECTRIC CO.
Date: October 07, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34752790) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABERTHAW CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Date: December 08, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 33665122) FILED BY DEFENDANT N. P. I. CORPORATION
Date: October 06, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32937097) FILED BY DEFENDANT PERINI CORPORATION
Date: August 30, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32990086) FILED BY DEFENDANT SWINERTON BUILDERS
Date: September 01, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32974712) FILED BY DEFENDANT E. MITCHELL, INC.
Date: August 31, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33194396) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC MECHANICAL CORPORATION
Date: September 13, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33037740) FILED BY DEFENDANT TUTOR-SALIBA CORPORATION
Date: September 03, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 33222864) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION CO
Date: September 14, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32999565) FILED BY DEFENDANT KINETIC SYSTEMS, INC.
Date: September 01, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33174703) FILED BY DEFENDANT AIRE SHEET METAL INC.
Date: September 10, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32999545) FILED BY DEFENDANT MCMILLAN BROTHERS ELECTRIC, INC.
Date: September 01, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32905443) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC
Date: August 27, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32934901) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIED PAINTERS, INC.
Date: August 30, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33012898) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGE M ROBINSON & CO.
Date: September 02, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32997670) FILED BY DEFENDANT COMMAIR MECHANICAL SERVICES
Date: September 01, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32995773) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Date: September 01, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 32820427) FILED BY DEFENDANT POWERS PROCESS CONTROLS
Date: August 23, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32739305) FILED BY DEFENDANT CARRIER CORPORATION
Date: August 18, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32695339) FILED BY DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.
Date: August 16, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32693506) FILED BY DEFENDANT N.V. HEATHORN, INC.
Date: August 16, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32810026) FILED BY DEFENDANT COOPER BROTHERS, INC.
Date: August 23, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32664611) FILED BY DEFENDANT TIMEC COMPANY, INC.
Date: August 13, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32810026) FILED BY DEFENDANT GIAMPOLINI & CO.
Date: August 23, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 32670869) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA
Date: August 13, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32444418) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY
Date: August 02, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32630694) FILED BY DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY
Date: August 12, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32623589) FILED BY DEFENDANT H.B. FULLER COMPANY
Date: August 11, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32613372) FILED BY DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.
Date: August 11, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32611428) FILED BY DEFENDANT THERMA CORPORATION
Date: August 11, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32631481) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: August 12, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 32647990) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Date: August 12, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32446907) FILED BY DEFENDANT O H I COMPANY, INC.
Date: August 02, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 32631481) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.
Date: August 12, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32647622) FILED BY DEFENDANT MAYTA & JENSEN
Date: August 12, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32647990) FILED BY DEFENDANT SEQUOIA VENTURES INC.
Date: August 12, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 32623589) FILED BY DEFENDANT H.B. FULLER COMPANY
Date: August 11, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32521247) FILED BY DEFENDANT OAKFABCO, INC.
Date: August 05, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 02, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32671693) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLUOR CORPORATION
Date: August 16, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32742319) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRANITE ROCK COMPANY
Date: August 18, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33222864) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION CO
Date: September 14, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33444371) FILED BY DEFENDANT W.G. THOMPSON, INC.
Date: September 24, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33283968) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOME CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION
Date: September 16, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33665122) FILED BY DEFENDANT N. P. I. CORPORATION
Date: October 06, 2010DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33433808) AS TO DEFENDANT MAYTA & JENSEN
Date: September 24, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33555530) FILED BY DEFENDANT THERMON MANUFACTURING CO.
Date: September 30, 2010REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 33698444)
Date: October 07, 2010REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 33699467)
Date: October 07, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34148467) FILED BY DEFENDANT WHEATLEY-JACOBSEN, INC.
Date: November 02, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34748318) FILED BY DEFENDANT JACOBS CONSTRUCTORS, INC.
Date: December 08, 2010DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36238665)
Date: March 02, 2011DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 36810937)
Date: April 01, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 35703415) FILED BY DEFENDANT HAAS AND HAYNIE CORPORATION
Date: February 01, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 59022803) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC. | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 59022803) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC. | |
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JUSTIN CLARK IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE A COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION (TRANSACTION ID # 59022803) FILED BY INTERVENOR FIREMAN'S FUND INSURANCE COMPANY ON BEHALF OF ITS SUSPENDED INSURED, DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA, INC. | |
January 17, 2012 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 41911721): HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY SUBSTITUTED FOR HAKE, WILLIAM MURRAY AS ATTORNEY FOR BRAGG INVESTMENT COMPANY, INC. | |
January 12, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 41864464) AS TO DEFENDANT CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. | |
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 38612422) FILED BY DEFENDANT MCMILLAN BROTHERS ELECTRIC, INC. | |
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 38612422) FILED BY DEFENDANT CUPERTINO ELECTRIC, INC. | |
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 38612422) FILED BY DEFENDANT CAHILL CONTRACTORS, INC. | |
July 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 38612422) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALBAY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.