Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hello Living Developer Nostrand Llc, Hello Nostrand Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Aloe, Paul H., Curran, Francis M, Saponara, David Nicholas, Worms, Victor A., Zelman, Yitzchak, (total of 7) See All against 1580 Nostrand Mezz Llc, Madison Realty Capital Lp, represented by Bonneville, Michael James, Feuerstein, Jerold C, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2021SUMMONS
Date: August 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 17, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: October 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 29, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 18, 2021ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: October 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 17, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2021NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 21, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: September 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 22, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 22, 2021BOND/UNDERTAKING
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 10, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: November 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 11, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 10, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: December 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 11, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 03, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 21, 2021DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL
Date: December 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 16, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN
Date: December 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 03, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 21, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 21, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 04, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 21, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: July 05, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 16, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 06, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 08, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #005)
Date: September 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 25, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 19, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: September 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 30, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - c
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 30, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 29, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: November 30, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 24, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: January 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: March 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit C - 2022-11-30 (DE 157) Am Compl Ex B - mezzanine loan agreement |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit B - 2022-11-30 (DE 156) Am Compl Ex A - mezzanine promissory note |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit D - 2022-11-30 (DE 158) Am Compl Ex C - ownership pledge |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit G - 2021-10-25 (DE 058) Order |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit E - 2022-11-30 (DE 159) Am Compl Ex D - notice of sale |
||
March 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #006) Affirmation of Jeffrey D. Brooks in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint |
||
March 08, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006) Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint |
||
March 08, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #006) Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit A - 2022-11-30 (DE 155) Amended Complaint |
||
March 08, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #006) Brooks Exhibit H - 2022-09-08 (DE 084) Francis M. Curran Affirmation in Opposition to OTSC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.