Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adams, William, Carlinsky, Michael Barry, Hardy, Kevin, Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, Llp, Roberts, Owen Fullerton, (total of 5) See All against Mpeg La, L.L.C.,, represented by Beeney, Garrard Russ, Holden, John David, Knudtsen, Morgan Rose, Sullivan & Cromwell Llp, Kusmin, Ben J., Mayron, Austin Philip, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with Melissa Anne Crane presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelissa Anne Crane Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This is a complaint filed in the Southern District of New York by Samsung against MPEG LA alleging breach of contract.
The contract at issue is a Licensing Administrator Agreement (LAA) and an Amended Agreement Among Licensors (AAAL) relating to the...
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 10, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 10, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: February 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: February 09, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 09, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: February 06, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 02, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 02, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 02, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 25, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: February 02, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 24, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 17, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 09, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 15, 2022STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 26, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY
Date: September 13, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 26, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 23, 2022MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 08, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 05, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 04, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 15, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: May 16, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 01, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 01, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: May 23, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: May 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8- Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 15, 2023ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: September 11, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 23, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 14, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 07, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #005)
Date: July 19, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: July 19, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 11, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 28, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW (W/NYSCEF DOC. #'S) Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 17, 2023SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 17, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 17, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 17, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 17, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 21, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 31, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 16, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 20, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW (W/NYSCEF DOC. #'S) Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW (W/NYSCEF DOC. #'S) Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #007) *Corrected*
Date: September 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #008)
Date: October 27, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 22, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 16, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 30, 2023ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: December 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 22, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 28, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: December 22, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 21, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 20, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #008)
Date: October 06, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: October 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW (W/NYSCEF DOC. #'S) Â (Motion #008)
Date: September 18, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #008)
Date: October 06, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 28, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 22, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 08, 2024STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: April 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 18, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 11, 2024JUDGMENT - MONEY
Date: April 11, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 22, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 18, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #008)
Date: December 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: March 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 13, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: December 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 12, 2024TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED
Date: February 07, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 07, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 07, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #010)
Date: November 30, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: January 16, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2024 | STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE | ||
April 18, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 11, 2024 | Notice of Entry of Judgment dated and entered April 11, 2024. | ||
April 11, 2024 | JUDGMENT - MONEY | ||
April 08, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 08, 2024 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
April 02, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 22, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Stipulated Proposed Judgment |
||
March 22, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 18, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.