Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Pacific Union International, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Jones, Shannon Ball Rossi Domingue Llp, against Booth, Paul D., Trustee Of The Anything Trust, Erik Ludwick, The Anything Trust Dated Oct. 12, 2007, represented by Nangano, Michael Anthony John Michael Aj Nangano, A Law Corporation, Skidmore, Lawrence E. Aronowitz & Skidmore Inc, in the jurisdiction of Placer County. This case was filed in Placer County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2018 |
CategoryCivil-Roseville |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPlacer County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Pacific Union International, Inc. against Erik Ludwick, beneficiary of The Anything Trust Dated October 12, 2007, Paul D. Booth as trustee of the trust, and Does 1-50. The complaint alleges breach of contract, breach of the...
Summons -
Date: November 07, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: November 07, 2018Motion Change of Venue -
Date: January 02, 2019Declaration -
Date: January 02, 2019Notice Case Management Conference -
Date: November 07, 2018Proof Service- Summons -
Date: November 26, 2018Notice -
Date: December 24, 2018Proof Service- Summons -
Date: December 04, 2018Order Compel -
Date: July 25, 2019Reply -
Date: July 03, 2019Notice Entry of Order -
Date: June 24, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: June 28, 2019Notice Entry of Order -
Date: August 05, 2019Declaration Support -
Date: September 04, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: July 10, 2019Brief Reply -
Date: February 11, 2019Proof Service -
Date: January 02, 2019Proof Service -
Date: February 07, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: February 19, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: April 26, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: March 01, 2019Complaint -
Date: November 07, 2018Order Ruling on Submitted Matter -
Date: February 28, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: March 08, 2019Demurrer -
Date: March 29, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: February 04, 2019Notice -
Date: April 05, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: February 22, 2019Notice Entry of Order -
Date: March 11, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: May 02, 2019Brief Reply -
Date: May 02, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: May 08, 2019Motion Compel -
Date: June 13, 2019Declaration -
Date: March 29, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: May 16, 2019Statement -
Date: June 13, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: May 03, 2019Request Judicial Notice -
Date: March 29, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: June 17, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: September 04, 2019Notice Related Case -
Date: September 04, 2019Declaration -
Date: February 18, 2020Notice Entry of Order -
Date: October 21, 2019Ex Parte Application -
Date: February 18, 2020Order Continuance of Trial -
Date: February 18, 2020Proof Service -
Date: June 02, 2020Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: December 26, 2019Notice Rejection by Clerk -
Date: February 14, 2020Answer -
Date: May 24, 2019Objection -
Date: August 14, 2020Notice -
Date: June 18, 2019Case Management Conference Statement -
Date: June 14, 2019Order -
Date: June 03, 2019Motion Summary Judgment -
Date: May 29, 2020Notice Entry of Order -
Date: August 19, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 19, 2020Exhibit List -
Date: August 28, 2020Proof Service -
Date: August 28, 2020Proof Service -
Date: August 14, 2020Declaration -
Date: June 13, 2019Declaration -
Date: October 16, 2020Opposition -
Date: October 16, 2020Declaration -
Date: June 27, 2019Order Continuance of Trial -
Date: August 18, 2020Proof Service -
Date: August 12, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: June 27, 2019Document Other -
Date: June 27, 2019Opposition -
Date: September 20, 2019Request Judicial Notice -
Date: May 29, 2020Declaration Supplemental -
Date: September 26, 2019Objection -
Date: September 30, 2019Document Other -
Date: September 26, 2019Order Ruling on Submitted Matter -
Date: October 04, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: October 02, 2019Brief Reply -
Date: September 26, 2019Minutes - Civil -
Date: August 12, 2020Request Judicial Notice -
Date: June 05, 2020Proof Service -
Date: July 24, 2020Statement -
Date: June 05, 2020Declaration -
Date: May 29, 2020Declaration -
Date: June 05, 2020Declaration Support -
Date: October 22, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: June 05, 2020Declaration Support -
Date: July 24, 2020Document Other -
Date: June 05, 2020Motion Summary Judgment -
Date: June 05, 2020Opposition -
Date: July 30, 2020Declaration -
Date: July 30, 2020Petition -
Date: July 24, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: July 24, 2020Notice -
Date: July 24, 2020Document Other -
Date: July 24, 2020Proof Service -
Date: August 07, 2020Objection -
Date: July 30, 2020Proof Service -
Date: October 16, 2020Request Judicial Notice -
Date: July 30, 2020Reply -
Date: August 07, 2020Proof Service -
Date: August 06, 2020Notice -
Date: October 19, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: October 21, 2020Proof Service -
Date: July 30, 2020Opposition -
Date: August 06, 2020Declaration -
Date: August 06, 2020Declaration -
Date: August 14, 2020Request Judicial Notice -
Date: August 06, 2020Proof Service -
Date: October 22, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: July 30, 2020Statement -
Date: July 30, 2020Reply -
Date: August 14, 2020Memorandum Points & Authorities -
Date: October 22, 2020Minutes - Civil -
Date: October 28, 2020Proof Service -
Date: June 05, 2020Declaration -
Date: August 28, 2020Notice Entry of Order
Date: January 28, 2021Witness List
Date: September 08, 2023Proof Service of Pacific Union International, Inc.'s Motions in Limine
Date: July 28, 2022Notice Of change of Trustee For Defendant "The Anything Trust Dated October 12,2017"
Date: April 05, 2019Stipulation Order to Continue Trial Date
Date: February 22, 2021Minutes - Civil
Date: October 28, 2020Statement of Case Pacific Union International Inc's 08/08/22
Date: July 28, 2022Brief Trial - 08/08/2022
Date: July 28, 2022Proof Service
Date: August 06, 2020Notice Rejection by Clerk
Date: February 14, 2020Opposition to Motion for Stay or alternatively for Lave to File a Cross-Complaint
Date: August 01, 2022Declaration Supplemental of Shannon B Jones ISO Plt's Mtn to Transfer 10-3-19
Date: September 26, 2019Notice Settlement of Entire Case
Date: September 15, 2023Proof Service oppo's to MIL's
Date: August 04, 2022Waiver waiver of jury trial
Date: August 08, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: August 04, 2022Notice Entry of Order
Date: July 30, 2021Declaration Of Michael AJ Nangano In Support of Motion For Change of Venue Filed 02-19-19
Date: January 02, 2019In Limine Motion No. 5
Date: September 11, 2023Case Management Conference Statement 07-02-19
Date: June 17, 2019Notice Entry of Order
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: December 24, 2018Motion Compel Further Responses to Request for Admissions, Set 1
Date: June 13, 2019Stipulation Order to Continue Trial
Date: July 28, 2021In Limine Motion -No. 4 to Exclude Defendants' Expert John P. Hughes
Date: July 28, 2022Case Management Conference Statement 7/2/19
Date: June 14, 2019Notice Hearing
Date: September 08, 2022Notice Entry of Order
Date: August 05, 2022Declaration Support of Jones for Mtn to Transfer 10-3-19
Date: September 04, 2019Memorandum Points & Authorities ISO Mtn for Transfer 10-3-19
Date: September 04, 2019Order Ruling on Submitted Matter From 02-19-2019 hearing
Date: February 28, 2019Proof Service remote requests for 8/08/2022
Date: August 01, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance -08/08/2022
Date: August 01, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 07, 2018In Limine Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1
Date: August 03, 2022Proof Service
Date: July 22, 2022Proof Service Re Motion To Change of Venue 02-19-19
Date: January 02, 2019Minutes - Civil
Date: October 21, 2020Notice Entry of Order and Ruling on DEFs' MSJ
Date: March 25, 2021Attorney Substitution - Update Attny Jones info
Date: February 01, 2023Stipulation Order re Confidential Information and Protective Order
Date: July 20, 2021Proof Service of Petition for Coordination and Related Documents
Date: July 24, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: May 16, 2019Order Continuance
Date: September 07, 2022Notice Rejection
Date: September 12, 2023Statement OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PACIFIC UNION INTERNATIONAL, INC,'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: September 08, 2023Notice Entry of Order
Date: April 01, 2021Brief Trial
Date: September 07, 2023Proof Service AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: March 10, 2021Case Management Conference Statement 5/21/19
Date: May 03, 2019Proof Service - MIL to S Jones, L Morgan, M Nangano
Date: July 29, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: February 19, 2019Order Continuance of Trial
Date: August 18, 2020In Limine Motion NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF NON-DISCLOSED EXPERTS
Date: September 08, 2023Proof Service motionstay document 8/04/2022
Date: July 25, 2022Proof Service opposition documents 8/4/2022
Date: August 01, 2022Proof Service Stip & Order continue trial
Date: August 12, 2020In Limine Motion -No. 3 to Exclude Testimony of Non-Disclosed Experts
Date: July 28, 2022Minutes - Civil
Date: September 05, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: September 12, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: March 08, 2019Statement of Case
Date: September 07, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: July 29, 2022Order Show Cause
Date: September 15, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: February 24, 2021In Limine Motion NO. 4 TO LIMIT TRIAL TO CAUSES OF ACTION IN THE OPERATIVE COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: July 10, 2019Order Continuance of Trial
Date: March 16, 2023Order Ruling on Submitted Matter - re July 28, 2022
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration Support of Petiiton for Coordination
Date: July 24, 2020Proof Service- Summons The ANything Trust dated October 12, 2007
Date: November 26, 2018Notice Entry of Order
Date: March 11, 2019Order Continuance of Trial Ruling on Ex Parte Application
Date: February 18, 2020Petition for Coordination
Date: July 24, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: June 28, 2019Case Management Conference Statement
Date: February 22, 2019Case Management Conference Statement
Date: March 01, 2019Notice of Submission of Petition to Coordinate
Date: July 24, 2020Declaration Support of Morgan for Mtn to Transfer 10-3-19
Date: September 04, 2019Proof Service
Date: August 07, 2020Proof Service AMENDED Attorneys for Erik Ludwick; Paul Booth
Date: February 07, 2019Reply DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 07, 2020Minutes - Civil
Date: July 28, 2022Summons
Date: November 07, 2018Opposition to Mtn to Transfer 10-3-19
Date: September 20, 2019Minutes - Civil
Date: October 02, 2019Order overruling defendants' demurrer to complaint 5/9/19
Date: June 03, 2019Request Judicial Notice ISO Mtn to Transfer 10-3-19
Date: September 04, 2019Answer
Date: May 24, 2019Notice Related Case
Date: September 04, 2019Notice Case Management Conference
Date: November 07, 2018Minutes - Civil
Date: January 27, 2021Order Ruling on Submitted Matter on Defendants’ Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 11, 2021Order Continuance
Date: August 03, 2023Demurrer 5-9-19
Date: March 29, 2019Complaint
Date: November 07, 2018Notice Entry of Order re Confidential Information order
Date: July 27, 2021Request Judicial Notice in Support of Def's Demurrer to Plt's Complaint 5-9-19
Date: March 29, 2019Declaration of Michael AJ Nangano 5-9-19
Date: March 29, 2019Notice Entry of Order - No SASE
Date: June 24, 2019Brief Reply ISO Mtn to Transfer 10-3-19
Date: September 26, 2019Declaration Support of Petition for Coordination
Date: July 24, 2020Notice Rejection by Clerk
Date: December 26, 2019Order Compel Denied as to Further Response to Request for Admissions, Set One
Date: July 25, 2019Proof Service- Summons The Anything Trust Dated October 12, 2007
Date: December 04, 2018Proof Service - Ex Parte docs to Attnys Jones & Morgan
Date: July 27, 2022Attorney Address Change Notice
Date: August 31, 2023Minutes - Civil
Date: May 08, 2019Minutes - Civil
Date: August 19, 2020Order on PLT's Ex Parte Application for Trial Continuance - 07/28/2022
Date: July 28, 2022Order Continuance
Date: June 27, 2022Notice Entry of Order
Date: August 19, 2020Request Judicial Notice In support of Summary Judgment - Filed 8/13/2020
Date: May 29, 2020Case Management Conference Statement 05-21-19
Date: May 02, 2019Brief Reply in Support of Motion to Change Venue
Date: February 11, 2019Notice Rejection
Date: June 18, 2019Brief Reply Defendant In Support of Demurrer to Complaint
Date: May 02, 2019Minutes - Civil
Date: August 12, 2020Order Compel Denied as to Further Response to Special Interrogatories, Set One
Date: July 25, 2019Witness List -joint list
Date: July 28, 2022Notice NOTICE OF ORDER ASSIGNING COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE AND SETTING DATE FOR HEARING
Date: October 19, 2020Statement -
Date: August 06, 2020Objection -
Date: August 07, 2020Objection -
Date: August 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Settlement of Entire Case | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Show Cause | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Rejection | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes - Civil | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | In Limine Motion No. 5 | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness List | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | In Limine Motion NO. I T0 EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF AND REFERENCES TO MADISON HILDEBRAND'S AUGUST 27, 2017 EMAIL WHICH INADVERTENTLY INCLUDED JOSEPHINE ANTOCI | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PACIFIC UNION INTERNATIONAL, INC,'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | In Limine Motion NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF NON-DISCLOSED EXPERTS | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | In Limine Motion NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE REFRENCES QUESTIONING WHETHER PACIFIC UNION INTERNATIONAL, INC. ACQUIRED PARTNERS TRUST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.