Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ccsf Adult Protective Services, Dolch, Debra J., Ferrero, Jr., Marco, Ferrero, Natalie, Ferrero, Nicholas, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case against Knott, Eva, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with John Dearman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Dearman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 04, 2005 |
CategoryTrust (Petition To Determine Validity Of Purported Will) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1204 days |
ORIGINAL BANK LETTERS FOR FIRST REPUBLIC BANK & FIRST REPUBLIC SECURTIES CO.
Date: April 30, 2007ORDER EX PARTE ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Date: May 22, 2007DECLARATION OF GEORGE KING FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: March 20, 2007REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE FILED BY REQUESTOR KNOTT, EVA
Date: April 03, 2007DECLARATION OF ROBERT B. MITCHELL FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: March 20, 2007MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: March 20, 2007NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: March 28, 2007DECLARATION OF MICHAEL G. ZATKIN FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: March 22, 2007DECLARATION OF ROBER B. MITCHELL FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: February 27, 2007RESPONDENT'S DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: February 16, 2007REPLY SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA
Date: March 13, 2007DECLARATION OF MICHAEL G. ZATKIN FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: March 02, 2007DECLARATION OF MICHAEL G. ZATKIN FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: February 16, 2007AMENDMENT TO RESPONDENT EVA KNOTT'S OPPOSITION TO OBJECTION TO PROBATE OF WILL
Date: February 14, 2007DECLARATION OF MICHAEL G. ZATKIN FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: March 01, 2007INCREASED BID IN OPEN COURT FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: January 22, 2007ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS
Date: January 30, 2007ORDER MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO TRIAL IN THE DEPARTMENT OF THE PRESIDING JUDGE
Date: December 06, 2006ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY ADJUDICATION IN PART AND DENYING SUMMARY ADJUDICATION IN PART
Date: December 14, 2006MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO PRO BONO MEDIATION
Date: November 28, 2006ORDER CONFIRMING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: January 22, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER FERRERO, NATALIE FERRERO, NICHOLAS
Date: June 20, 2007ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #2, REPORT, FEES
Date: June 25, 2007NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER FERRERO, NATALIE FERRERO, NICHOLAS
Date: June 15, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: July 13, 2007RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: July 03, 2007RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: June 29, 2007NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER FERRERO, NATALIE FERRERO, NICHOLAS
Date: June 18, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: February 09, 2007WAIVER OF SERVICE, ETC. BY MARCO FERRERO, JR
Date: May 16, 2007RESPONDENT EVA KNOTT'S CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT
Date: June 08, 2007RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: June 12, 2007SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAR-20-2007 CONTINUED TO MAR-20-2007 AT 3:30 PM IN 318
Date: January 17, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: April 30, 2007NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: May 15, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: May 30, 2007ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING #1, FEES
Date: June 06, 2007ORDER APPROVING ACCOUNTING #1, REPORT, FEES FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: December 05, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: May 17, 2007NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: December 21, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: January 02, 2007RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: April 27, 2007PROOF OF PUBLICATION (SAN FRANCISCO DAILY JOURNAL)
Date: December 18, 2006PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: November 22, 2006COVER SHEET - FIRST REPUBLIC BANK STATEMENTS
Date: November 03, 2006PROBATE RESPONSE/ANSWER TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY OBJECTOR KNOTT, EVA
Date: November 14, 2006NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: November 03, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: November 07, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: September 12, 2006NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: April 27, 2007EXHIBITS TO OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY ADJUDICATION MOTION FILED BY OBJECTOR KNOTT, EVA
Date: November 14, 2006REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: November 14, 2006MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: September 27, 2006NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: August 28, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF STIPULATIONS FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: August 31, 2006EXHIBITS TO SUMMARY ADJUDICATION MOTION
Date: August 28, 2006NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: September 11, 2006STIPULATION RE SERVICE OF SUMMARY ADJUDICATION MOTION (FERRERO 1)
Date: August 28, 2006STIPULATION RE SERVICE OF SUMMARY ADJUDICATION MOTION (DOLCH 1)
Date: August 28, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY FACSIMILE
Date: March 12, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY FACSIMILE FILED BY PETITIONER CCSF ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICES
Date: March 19, 2007DECLARATION OF TERENCE HOWZELL FILED BY PETITIONER CCSF ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICES
Date: March 12, 2007DECLARATION OF CARRIE WONG FILED BY PETITIONER CCSF ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICES
Date: March 12, 2007NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER FERRERO, JR., MARCO
Date: April 16, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER FERRERO, JR., MARCO
Date: April 24, 2007PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: March 20, 2007ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS: COCHRANE, MICHAEL JOSEPH ADDED AS ATTORNEY FOR KNOTT, EVA
Date: March 16, 2007DECLARATION OF TERENCE HOWZELL FILED BY PETITIONER CCSF ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICES
Date: March 09, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL AND BY FAX FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: March 20, 2007NON-OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR ORDER QUASHING DEPOSITION OF DERICK LUU
Date: March 22, 2007ORDER DEYNING SUMMARY JUDGMENT & SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: April 14, 2006DECLARATION OF ROBERT B. MITCHELL FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: June 06, 2006SECOND AMENDMENT TO PETN TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF PURPORTED WILL AND TRUST
Date: July 12, 2006MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE TO PRO BONO MEDIATION
Date: April 04, 2006PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: February 09, 2006STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROPERTY TO MINOR CHILDREN
Date: March 10, 2006MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY RESPONDENT KNOTT, EVA
Date: January 25, 2006DECLARATION OF ROBERT B. MITCHELL FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: February 07, 2006ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE (JACKIE GORDON) FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: March 07, 2006RESPONDING PARTY'S 335 STATEMENT
Date: February 07, 2006DECLARATION OF DAVID J. FRIEDENBERG, ESQ. FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: January 25, 2006DECLARATION OR ROBERT B. MITCHELL FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: February 07, 2006MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: January 12, 2006DECLARATION OF DAVID J. FRIEDENBERG, ESQ. FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: January 12, 2006PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: January 25, 2006ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER DIRECTING COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM.
Date: December 14, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY ORDER
Date: December 23, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: January 12, 2006ERRATA NOTICE FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: October 20, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY RESPONDENT KNOTT, EVA
Date: October 20, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY RESPONDENT KNOTT, EVA
Date: October 20, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: September 06, 2005335 STATEMENT OF DEMANDS & ANSWERS IN CONTENTION
Date: September 06, 2005ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: August 29, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: August 26, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: October 13, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: August 25, 2005NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION
Date: August 25, 2005ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: August 17, 2005DECLARATION OF CARRIE WONG FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: August 23, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: August 19, 2005DECLARATION OF DAVID J. FRIEDENBERG FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: August 25, 2005DECLARATION BY ATTORNEY RE: NOTICE FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: July 22, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: July 22, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: July 26, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: July 13, 2005ORDER (EX PARTE) APPOINTING TEMPORARY SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Date: July 25, 2005STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PRELIM. INJUNCTION
Date: July 07, 2005PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: July 21, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: June 23, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: October 06, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: October 13, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: October 05, 2005DECLARATION OF DAVID J. FRIEDENBERG FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: September 15, 2005SEPARATE STMT.IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: October 05, 2005STATEMENT OF DEMANDS AAND ANSWER IN CONTENTION FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: October 06, 2005DECLARATION OF DEAN M. SPELLMAN FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: September 16, 2005DECLINATION TO SERVE
Date: September 15, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: September 16, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: September 22, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: October 11, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: September 08, 2005DECLARATION OF ROBERT B. MITCHELL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: October 05, 2005DECLARATION OF DAVID J. FRIEDENBERG, ESQ. FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: September 22, 2005NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: September 26, 2005ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE
Date: September 20, 2005PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: May 19, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE OF MO. TO SEAL RECORDS
Date: May 16, 2005PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: September 08, 2005MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: May 05, 2005NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT
Date: May 11, 2005DECLARATION OF DAVID J. FRIEDNBERG, ESQ. FILED BY PETITIONER KNOTT, EVA
Date: September 08, 2005ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION & TEMP. RESTRINING ORDER
Date: May 05, 2005RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: November 13, 2007RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: August 13, 2007PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER MITCHELL, CAROL
Date: March 01, 2007ORDER RE: FEES FILED BY PETITIONER FERRERO, NATALIE FERRERO, NICHOLAS
Date: July 30, 2007RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: August 20, 2008RECEIPT ON PARTIAL DEDISTRBUTION OF CASH RESERVE-EVA KNOTT FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J.
Date: November 27, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 67780625): HINSHAW, CAROLINE K SUBSTITUTED FOR SPELLMAN, DEAN MARVIN AS ATTORNEY FOR FERRERO, JR., MARCO | |
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J. | |
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF CASH RESERVE - CAROL MITCHELL FILED BY TRUSTEE DOLCH, DEBRA J. | |
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON PARTIAL DEDISTRBUTION OF CASH RESERVE-EVA KNOTT FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J. | |
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J. | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION MARCO FERRERO JR, SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE, MINORS TRUST FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J. | |
August 14, 2007 | Hearing |
ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR Proof Of Filing Bond
Judge: JOHN DEARMAN |
|
August 14, 2007 | Docket Event | ADDED TO CALENDAR FOR PROOF OF FILING BOND, CALENDAR OF AUG-14-2007, OFF CALENDAR PER COURT | |
August 13, 2007 | Docket Event | RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER DOLCH, DEBRA J. | |
August 06, 2007 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF FUNDS INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT ON BEHALF OF NICHOLAS FERRERO FILED BY PETITIONER FERRERO, JR., MARCO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.