Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jardan 520 Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Turnover Of Assets) case represented by Sorokoff, David H, against 86Th Street Lender Llp, Bvs Acquisition Co. Llc, M&T Bank, represented by Kohn, Greg Michael, Moar, Stacey Lynn, Rice, Bradley Lewis, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with W. Franc Perry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeW. Franc Perry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 25, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Turnover Of Assets) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
|
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 25, 2022PETITION
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: April 25, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: April 25, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: April 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 25, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 05, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: May 05, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 13, 2022ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: May 16, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 16, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: May 06, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: May 12, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 16, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT
Date: July 01, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 17, 2022BRIEFING SCHEDULE Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 17, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: May 17, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -OPPOSITION TO REQUEST -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: May 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT
Date: June 17, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 17, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: July 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: July 14, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF ORAL ARGUMENT Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 05, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 17, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: May 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: May 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 15, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 15, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: October 12, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2022STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: June 06, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: June 03, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 14, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: August 12, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -OPPOSITION TO REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: August 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 14, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: September 23, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: November 23, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 23, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 06, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: January 10, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 10, 2023DISCOVERY CONFERENCE NOTICE -FROM COURT
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 | DISCOVERY CONFERENCE NOTICE -FROM COURT | ||
January 10, 2023 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE | ||
January 10, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #003) So Ordered |
||
December 06, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 23, 2022 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE | ||
November 23, 2022 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE (Motion #003) So Ordered |
||
November 16, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order and Stipulation Extending Restraining Notices |
||
November 15, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Pursuant to CPLR 5240 to extend restraining notices |
||
November 15, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Extending Restraining Notices |
||
October 12, 2022 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST - BEFORE JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.