Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
James Moran, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Glenn A. Reiner, Grand Slam Ventures, Llc, Jg Real Estate Ventures, Llc, 'John Does' 1-10 Inclusive, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, Jon Steinberg, (total of 5) See All represented by Delvalle, Richard Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Francis Ricigliano presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancis Ricigliano Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: May 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 23, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 21 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: August 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 25, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 25, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 25, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 25, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: August 25, 2022MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: August 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 25, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 22 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 23 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 24 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 28 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 26 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 25 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 29 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 27 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 19, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 23, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 25, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: February 14, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 16, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 19, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 19, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 19, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: July 24, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Order denying Plaintiff sanctions and summary judgment |
||
September 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Order denying Plaintiff leave to reargue and renew |
||
September 19, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order denying Plaintiff sanctions and summary judgment |
||
September 19, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 19, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order denying Plaintiff leave to reargue and renew |
||
July 24, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Francis D. Ricigliano |
||
March 20, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
February 14, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Fran Ricigliano |
||
October 20, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.