Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Richard Von Der Lieth, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Carlini, Anthony Carlos, against Barbara Giordano A K A Barbara Leonaggeo A K A Barbara Giordano-Leonaggeo, Catania, Mahon, Milligram & Rider, Pllc, H&L Equine, Llc, Jack Giordano, Jane Doe 1-10, (total of 11) See All represented by Ealy, David H., Hagstrom, Karen E, Stenger, Kenneth M., in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Maria G Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 30, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 18, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 15, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: October 07, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 19, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 21, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2022ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: August 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 24, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 12, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 10, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 10, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: March 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: March 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 25, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2022NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT Notice of Computation
Date: July 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 10, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 29, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 04, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 07, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 07, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 13, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 03, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 31, 2022JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: September 01, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: September 01, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 07, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 07, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 31, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: November 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 31, 2022TERMS OF SALE
Date: November 01, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM *Corrected*
Date: November 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 11, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 14, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 12, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 31, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #6)
Date: October 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 15, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 17, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #6)
Date: November 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #6)
Date: November 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 27, 2023CERTIFICATE AS TO NOTICES OF CLAIM
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 27, 2023NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: February 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #7)
Date: February 27, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 27, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 13, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: February 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 10, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 08, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #7) Response to Motion of Defendant M-M2 RE Holdings 4, LLC, to Confirm Report of Sale and Direct Paymen Response to Motion of Defendant M-M2 RE Holdings 4, LLC, to Confirm Report of Sale and Direct Paymen ... show more |
||
February 28, 2023 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #7) judgment of foreclosure |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #7) letter |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #7) referee deed 11.4.22 |
||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #7) referee report of sale |
||
February 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #7) deed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.