Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Benudiz Sonny, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fischbach Joseph S., Tushinsky-Fox Jacques, against Soroky William A., represented by Slates Ronald P., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Upinder S. Kalra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUpinder S. Kalra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Separate Statement; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant); As to: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00Notice of case reassignment; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-06-23T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Motion for Leave to File Proposed Third Amended Complaint (1928); Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-15T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Order of Court's Final Ruling; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Status Report RE: FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by: WILLIAM A. SOROKY (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: March 13, 2023Notice of Ruling; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Final Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-11-28T00:00:00Association of Attorney NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL; Filed by: SONNY BENUDIZ (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: August 11, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 12, 2021Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)
Date: September 23, 2021Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: November 04, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) RE F...)
Date: December 02, 2021Amended Complaint - SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: January 07, 2022Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: January 07, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 25, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)
Date: February 09, 2022Notice of Continuance
Date: March 28, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: March 28, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: May 12, 2022Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DISQUALIFY
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: June 15, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 15, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DISQUALIFY)
Date: June 16, 2022Motion to Disqualify Counsel
Date: June 24, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: 2022-06-24T00:00:00Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFANDANT'S DEPOSITION
Date: July 06, 2022Separate Statement
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: July 11, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: July 21, 2022Association of Attorney
Date: July 25, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 06, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 15, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING LOCAL RULE 3.26
Date: September 19, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: September 26, 2022Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF’S REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Date: September 26, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KEVIN A. HOANG REGARDING LOCAL RULE 3.26 AND APPENDIX 3.A.
Date: September 26, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 10/03/2022
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: October 03, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: October 27, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/02/2022
Date: November 02, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: November 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 02, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 11/09/2022
Date: November 09, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: November 10, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 14, 2022Separate Statement
Date: November 14, 2022Status Report - STATUS REPORT RE: FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: November 23, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, SONNY BENUDIZ, TO DISQUALIFY RONALD SLAT...)
Date: November 28, 2022Order - FINAL RULING
Date: November 28, 2022Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: November 28, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00Association of Attorney - ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Date: January 12, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE;)
Date: March 08, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: March 13, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF WILLIAM A. SORO...)
Date: September 19, 2022Order - ORDER OF COURT'S FINAL RULING
Date: September 19, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) re F...))
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-24T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) re F...))
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint ( (1st))
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.