Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Edward F Niderost, Individually And As Trustee Of The Edward F Niderost Revocable Living Trust Dated November 8, 1998, Patterson, Lawrence, Wayne A Cook, Trustee Of The Wayne A Cook 1998 Family Trust Dated 12 29 98, Wayne A Cook, Trustee Of The Wayne A. Cook 1998 Family Trust Dated 12 29 98, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Sandelman, Raymond Louis, against Edward F Niderost, Individually And As Trustee Of The Edward F Niderost Revocable Living Trust Dated November 8, 1998, represented by Knowles, Sara M, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Butte with Mosbarger, Tamara L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMosbarger, Tamara L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management189 days |
Filing DateApril 22, 2020 |
Category(26) Unlimited Other Real Property |
Time To Trial341 days |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions231 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Butte |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
Case Management Conference
Date: August 10, 2022Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: August 09, 2022Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied
Date: June 29, 2023Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied
Date: January 20, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: July 13, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: July 26, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 10, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 25, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 13, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 23, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: March 28, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 25, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: June 30, 2022Writ of Execution Issued
Date: April 13, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: May 09, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Issued
Date: March 23, 2022Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: March 25, 2022Order on Communication
Date: March 04, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Issued
Date: March 15, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: March 23, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: March 07, 2022Writ of Execution Issued
Date: March 09, 2022Motion Hearings - Postdisposition
Date: March 02, 2022Memorandum of Costs-Summary
Date: January 31, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 02, 2022Memorandum of Costs-After Judgment
Date: March 16, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: February 23, 2022Order
Date: March 03, 2022Abstract of Judgment - Issued
Date: February 23, 2022Motion - Fee
Date: February 02, 2022Communication
Date: February 23, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 23, 2022Judgment
Date: January 20, 2022Trial Readiness Conference
Date: January 20, 2022Settlement Conference
Date: December 22, 2021Statement of Decision
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 23, 2021Other
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Rescheduling
Date: December 03, 2021Objection - No Fee
Date: December 08, 2021Settlement Conference Statement
Date: December 16, 2021Other
Date: October 29, 2021Brief
Date: October 15, 2021Request
Date: August 17, 2021Minute Order
Date: September 16, 2021Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: May 18, 2021Order
Date: August 04, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: May 07, 2021Court Trial Long Cause
Date: April 05, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: June 30, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: May 28, 2021Declaration
Date: July 01, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: April 07, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 15, 2021Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 10, 2021Declaration
Date: April 22, 2021Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: April 08, 2021Trial Readiness Conference
Date: April 01, 2021Minute Order
Date: April 05, 2021Declaration
Date: March 26, 2021Amended Answer or Response - No Fee
Date: March 29, 2021Demurrer
Date: March 17, 2021Order
Date: March 16, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 23, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: February 03, 2021Proof of Service
Date: March 12, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: February 03, 2021Ex Parte Hearing - Predispo
Date: March 12, 2021Discovery Hearing
Date: February 23, 2021Order
Date: February 18, 2021Request
Date: March 04, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: February 09, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: January 26, 2021Declaration
Date: January 21, 2021Answer - No Fee
Date: January 13, 2021Reply
Date: January 27, 2021Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: February 02, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: January 13, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 23, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: January 05, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: January 11, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 30, 2020Declaration
Date: December 23, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 23, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 23, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 16, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 16, 2020Returned Mail
Date: December 20, 2021Evidence in Support
Date: December 08, 2021Response - No Fee
Date: December 14, 2021Notice
Date: November 15, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: November 19, 2021Other
Date: October 29, 2021Brief
Date: October 15, 2021Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: September 16, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: August 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 19, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 30, 2021Notice of Rescheduling
Date: June 10, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 08, 2021Minute Order
Date: May 19, 2021Declaration
Date: December 15, 2020Answer - No Fee
Date: May 03, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 21, 2021Reply
Date: December 09, 2020Report
Date: December 08, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 07, 2021Declaration
Date: April 05, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 30, 2021Amendment to Complaint
Date: March 29, 2021Trial Readiness Conference Statement
Date: March 24, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 19, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration
Date: March 12, 2021Reply
Date: March 10, 2021Reply
Date: January 06, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 16, 2020Notice
Date: February 22, 2021Memorandum of Costs-Summary
Date: January 31, 2022Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 26, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: January 28, 2022Opposition - No Fee
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: February 03, 2021Minute Order
Date: December 22, 2021Order
Date: January 15, 2021Declaration
Date: January 11, 2022Minute Order
Date: January 13, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: December 21, 2021Declaration
Date: January 06, 2021Settlement Conference Statement
Date: December 17, 2021Settlement Conference Statement
Date: December 03, 2021Statement of Decision
Date: November 19, 2021Reply
Date: October 29, 2021Report
Date: December 09, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 09, 2020Brief
Date: October 15, 2021Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: August 26, 2021Notice
Date: December 08, 2020Declaration
Date: December 03, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: November 25, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: December 14, 2020Declaration
Date: December 03, 2020Statement
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 28, 2020Reply
Date: December 08, 2020Order
Date: November 09, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: May 28, 2021Request
Date: May 18, 2021Motion - Fee
Date: November 12, 2020Reply
Date: December 02, 2020Answer - No Fee
Date: May 17, 2021Motion - Fee
Date: November 20, 2020Answer - No Fee
Date: April 27, 2021Minute Order
Date: April 08, 2021Motion - Fee
Date: July 01, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 08, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 15, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 07, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 28, 2020Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: April 06, 2021Proof of Service
Date: September 28, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 12, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 24, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: April 05, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: October 28, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 01, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: March 30, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: April 01, 2021Reply
Date: October 19, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 13, 2020Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem
Date: March 29, 2021Declaration
Date: March 23, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 30, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 25, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: March 16, 2021Exhibit List
Date: March 29, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 12, 2021Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: April 22, 2020Amendment to Complaint
Date: March 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: March 12, 2021Disclaimer
Date: February 18, 2021Declaration
Date: February 11, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: March 04, 2021Declaration
Date: February 02, 2021Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: January 27, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: February 19, 2021Declaration
Date: January 22, 2021Amended Cross-Complaint - No Fee
Date: January 13, 2021Answer - No Fee
Date: January 19, 2021Declaration
Date: January 11, 2021Declaration
Date: December 14, 2020Reply
Date: December 09, 2020Order
Date: December 23, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: December 24, 2020Order
Date: January 04, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 23, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: December 02, 2020Statement
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: November 25, 2020Declaration
Date: November 12, 2020Brief
Date: December 02, 2020Declaration
Date: December 22, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: November 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 28, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 12, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: November 06, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: October 28, 2020Order
Date: December 09, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: September 25, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: September 24, 2020Declaration
Date: October 19, 2020Report
Date: December 03, 2020Notice
Date: December 03, 2020Proof of Service
Date: September 23, 2020Report
Date: November 30, 2020Proof of Service
Date: May 04, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 22, 2020Declaration
Date: September 25, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: November 12, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 24, 2020Notice
Date: April 30, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: November 09, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: November 03, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: October 15, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: October 02, 2020Stipulation for Temporary Judge
Date: September 24, 2020Declaration
Date: September 23, 2020Ex Parte Application with Hearing
Date: September 23, 2020Ex Parte Application with Hearing
Date: September 23, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: August 13, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: August 10, 2020Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: July 21, 2020Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: June 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 22, 2020Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: May 04, 2020Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: June 24, 2020Cross Complaint - No Fee
Date: June 12, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 23, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 16, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: December 16, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 16, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: December 09, 2020Ex Parte Hearing - Predispo
Date: September 24, 2020Reply
Date: December 08, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 09, 2020Declaration
Date: December 08, 2020Opposition - No Fee
Date: December 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 09, 2020Order
Date: December 01, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: November 20, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: October 28, 2020Declaration
Date: November 03, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: October 28, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: November 10, 2020Ex Parte Hearing - Predispo
Date: September 24, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: October 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 16, 2020Declaration
Date: October 02, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: September 25, 2020Order
Date: August 13, 2020Declaration
Date: September 23, 2020Declaration
Date: September 23, 2020Declaration
Date: September 23, 2020Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: June 25, 2020Request
Date: August 03, 2020Proof of Service of Summons Filed
Date: June 23, 2020Answer - No Fee
Date: July 21, 2020Notice
Date: June 11, 2020Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: June 12, 2020Complaint
Date: April 22, 2020Proof of Service
Date: March 10, 2021Demurrer
Date: February 19, 2021Answer - No Fee
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 03, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: January 07, 2021Memorandum of Costs-Summary
Date: January 31, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 26, 2021Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: August 19, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 04, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 10, 2021Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: May 19, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: June 08, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: August 04, 2021Order
Date: May 03, 2021Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: June 08, 2021Brief
Date: June 10, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: April 16, 2021Minute Order
Date: May 18, 2021Court Trial - Ongoing
Date: April 07, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: May 17, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: April 05, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 29, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: April 09, 2021Minute Order
Date: April 06, 2021Request
Date: April 05, 2021Brief
Date: March 29, 2021Demurrer
Date: March 30, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: April 01, 2021Demurrer
Date: March 30, 2021Motion in Limine
Date: March 24, 2021Demurrer
Date: March 17, 2021Minute Order
Date: March 17, 2021Witness List
Date: March 29, 2021Order
Date: March 23, 2021Order
Date: March 12, 2021Ex Parte Application with Hearing
Date: March 12, 2021Notice
Date: March 12, 2021Reply
Date: March 10, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 23, 2021Demurrer
Date: February 19, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: February 19, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: March 04, 2021Cross Complaint - No Fee
Date: February 17, 2021Order
Date: February 03, 2021Request
Date: February 16, 2021Memorandum of Costs-Summary
Date: January 31, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 16, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: January 28, 2022Declaration
Date: January 06, 2021Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 16, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 16, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: February 03, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Issued
Date: March 23, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: June 23, 2021Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: February 03, 2021Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 23, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: January 13, 2021Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 23, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 23, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 16, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 16, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: October 28, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: January 20, 2021Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 09, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied | ||
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Cross-Complaint Filed by Edward Niderost Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Cross-Complaint Filed by Edward Niderost |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cross-Defendant/Cross-Complainant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
John Denton's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Laurence Patterson's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.