Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Tice, Victoria, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Gavron, Max W, Marder, William L, against Trader Joe'S Company, represented by Wasserman, Helene J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2020 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Employment (15) |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
This complaint is a class and representative action filed by Victoria Tice against Trader Joe's Company and Does 1 through 50. The complaint alleges violations of the California Labor Code, specifically sections 201-203 and 2698, et seq. The plaintif...
Reply, Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Stipulation, Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Separate Statement, Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Motion: Strike
Date: December 14, 2021Order, Filed
Date: December 28, 2021Motion: Strike
Date: December 28, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: December 28, 202152563DEFEN00dc08
Date: January 26, 202252563DECLA017b00
Date: January 26, 202252563DEFEN02fd44
Date: January 26, 2022220201 - Tice - Reply iso MTC SROGs s3
Date: February 01, 2022220201 - Tice - Suppl MG Decl iso MTC SROGs s3
Date: February 01, 2022220609 - Tice - CMC Statement
Date: June 09, 2022Motion: Compel
Date: February 08, 2022Motion: Strike
Date: January 11, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Ruling, Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Order, Filed
Date: December 28, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 09, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: June 24, 20222022_07_15_MPA_ISO_Motio_ash_Comdata_Subpoena
Date: July 15, 20222022_07_15_Separate_Stat_ash_Comdata_Subpoena
Date: July 15, 20222022_07_15_Def_s_RJN_ISO_ash_Comdata_Subpoena
Date: July 15, 20222022_07_15_Def_s_Notice_ash_Comdata_Subpoena
Date: July 15, 20222022_07_15_Declaration_o_ash_Comdata_Subpoena
Date: July 15, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Motion, Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Request, Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Request, Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Motion to Quash, Filed
Date: July 15, 2022220818 - Tice - Opp to MTQ
Date: August 18, 2022220818 - Tice - MG Dec iso Opp to MTQ
Date: August 18, 2022220818 - Tice - Proof of Service
Date: August 18, 2022220818 - Tice - Response to Def's Separate Statement
Date: August 18, 2022Opposition, Filed
Date: August 18, 2022Response, Filed
Date: August 18, 20222022_08_24_TICE_Reply_IS_ena_4879_0935_8895_1
Date: August 24, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: February 14, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: February 14, 2020Summons Issued, Filed
Date: February 14, 2020Disqualification/Challenge, Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: February 26, 2020Notice, Filed
Date: March 10, 2020Notice of Payment Due, Filed
Date: April 06, 2020Notice, Filed
Date: April 21, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 08, 2020Proof of Service, Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Case Management Order, Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Proof of Service, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Proof of Service, Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Proof of Service, Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Proof of Service, Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Proof of Service, Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Declaration, Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Opposition, Filed
Date: January 26, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: January 13, 2022Separate Statement, Filed
Date: January 26, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: January 26, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Case Management Order, Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Declaration, Filed
Date: August 18, 2022Reply, Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Proof of Service, Filed
Date: August 18, 2022220929 - Tice - CMC Statement
Date: September 29, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: September 29, 2022Motion: Quash
Date: August 31, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 31, 20222022_10_12_Def_s_CMC_Sta_022_4870_4611_5896_1
Date: October 12, 2022Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: October 12, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: October 14, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: October 14, 2022221220 - Tice - Notice of Settlement
Date: December 20, 2022230202 - Tice - Notice of Settlement
Date: February 02, 2023230310 Tice - MG Dec iso MPA
Date: March 11, 2023230310 Tice - MPA
Date: March 11, 2023230310 - Tice - Ptf Decl iso MPA
Date: March 11, 2023230310 Tice - LWL Dec iso MPA
Date: March 11, 2023230310 - Tice - BM Decl iso MPA
Date: March 11, 2023230313 -Tice - LWL Dec iso MPA
Date: March 13, 2023230313 - Tice - Ptf Decl iso MPA
Date: March 13, 2023230313 - Tice - MG Dec Granting MPA
Date: March 13, 2023230313 - Tice - MPA
Date: March 13, 2023230313 - Tice - BM Decl iso MPA
Date: March 13, 2023230310 Tice - MG Dec iso MPA
Date: April 18, 2023230814 - Tice - Trader Joes_Admin Dec
Date: August 14, 2023230814 - Tice - LWL Dec iso MFA
Date: August 14, 2023230814 - Tice - POS
Date: August 14, 2023230814 - Tice - BM Decl iso MFA
Date: August 14, 2023230814 - Tice - Tice Dec iso MFA
Date: August 14, 2023230814 - Tice - MFA
Date: August 14, 2023230814 - Tice - MG Dec iso MFA
Date: August 14, 2023230912 - Tice - Ntc of Entry of Order
Date: September 12, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: February 14, 2020Motion, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Notice of Entry of Order, Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Order, Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Stipulation, Filed
Date: April 16, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: April 06, 2021Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: March 22, 2021Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: February 24, 2021Order, Filed
Date: December 18, 2020Stipulation, Filed
Date: December 18, 2020Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: July 17, 2020Case Management Order, Filed
Date: June 23, 2020Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 23, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: June 23, 2020Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 08, 2020Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: April 06, 2020Order and Notice of Case Re-Assignment, Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: February 18, 2020Opposition, Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Order, Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Motion, Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 21, 2021Motion
Date: September 21, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Motion
Date: September 14, 2021Reply, Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 27, 2021Trial Confirmation Conference
Date: July 27, 2021Order, Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Stipulation, Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: June 22, 2021Stipulation, Filed
Date: November 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | 230912 - Tice - Ntc of Entry of Order | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 230814 - Tice - Trader Joes_Admin Dec | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 230814 - Tice - LWL Dec iso MFA | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 230814 - Tice - POS | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 230814 - Tice - BM Decl iso MFA | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 230814 - Tice - Tice Dec iso MFA | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 230814 - Tice - MFA | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 230814 - Tice - MG Dec iso MFA | |
May 03, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Motion of Plaintiff for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement For Plaintiff Victoria Tice and Plaintiff class: Larry W. Lee, Max W. Gavron, Diversity Law Group, P.C.; ...
Judge: Judge Thomas Anderle |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | 230310 Tice - MG Dec iso MPA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.