Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Amaya, Jaime, Bass, Ryne, Gonzalez, Paula, Jaime Amaya, On Behalf Of Themselves And All Others Similarly Situated, Mazariegos, Alida, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited Class Action case represented by Brender, Valerie, Brome, Daniel, Riggin, Jessica Lee, against Buddha Capital Corporation, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Rr Franchising, Inc, Vanguard Cleaning Systems, Inc, Vanguard Cleaning Systems Of The Central Valley, (total of 6) See All represented by Ott, Damon M, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Fineman, Nancy L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFineman, Nancy L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2020 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited Class Action |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by plaintiffs Alida Mazariego, Paula Gonzalez, and Jaime Amaya against Vanguard Cleaning Systems, RR Franchising, Wine Country Ventures, and Buddha Capital Corp. The plaintiffs allege various labor code ...
EPOS - Stip and Order re deadlines
Date: January 27, 2024Stip and Order re certificate dates
Date: January 27, 202490593propo003560
Date: January 24, 2024Answer (Unlimited)
Date: December 17, 2020Order
Date: December 01, 2020Notice
Date: April 16, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 19, 2020Answer
Date: November 20, 2020Order
Date: April 09, 2021Case Management Order
Date: March 11, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: October 14, 2021Order
Date: August 13, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: November 12, 2021Order
Date: July 07, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: July 15, 2021Case Management Order
Date: October 05, 2020Complaint
Date: October 01, 2020Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: August 03, 2021Answer
Date: March 09, 2021Answer
Date: November 18, 202052320STIPU0042c6
Date: January 21, 202252320PROOF0173aa
Date: January 21, 2022dec
Date: April 05, 2022POS
Date: April 05, 2022ex parte
Date: April 05, 2022mpa
Date: April 05, 2022order
Date: April 05, 202257323STIPU00c887
Date: May 06, 2022Discovery Conference
Date: April 15, 2021COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 09, 2022Stipulation & Order
Date: April 06, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: March 09, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 12, 2021Motion for Class Certification
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration
Date: November 12, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 01, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 09, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 09, 2022Stipulation & Order
Date: June 10, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: June 10, 2022Stipulation & Order
Date: January 26, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 02, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: October 01, 2020Class Action Complex Notice
Date: October 01, 2020Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: October 29, 2020Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: January 04, 2021Notice
Date: July 02, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 29, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: December 10, 2020Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Date: January 05, 2021Affidavit of Mailing
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration
Date: November 12, 2021Joint Status Statement
Date: June 29, 2021Declaration
Date: November 12, 2021Status Conference Statement
Date: November 02, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: May 17, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 15, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: July 29, 2021Declaration
Date: July 02, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: July 06, 2021Objection
Date: June 10, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: July 07, 2021Notice
Date: August 03, 2021Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 10, 2022Order
Date: July 09, 2021Declaration
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: July 15, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: July 15, 2021Declaration
Date: November 12, 2021Declaration
Date: November 12, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 09, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 16, 2021Proposed Order Received
Date: November 12, 2021Notice of Hearing re
Date: March 04, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: May 09, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: January 20, 2022Order
Date: May 09, 2022Informal Discovery Conference
Date: April 14, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 09, 2022Affidavit of Mailing
Date: March 04, 2022_1_Regional_Franchisors_Cons_Opp_to_MFCC
Date: June 10, 2022Electronic_Proof_of_Serv_tion_papers_06_10_22
Date: June 10, 2022_2_Rob_Dusthimer_Decl_IS_with_Exs_compressed
Date: June 10, 2022_4_John_S_Newman_Decl_IS_with_Exs_compressed
Date: June 10, 2022Declaration_of_Alexis_McNichols_First_Legal
Date: June 11, 2022_3_Ed_Gong_Decl_ISO_BCC_d_Part2_1_compressed
Date: June 11, 2022_5_Lounsbury_Declaration_with_Exs_compressed
Date: June 11, 2022_3_Ed_Gong_Decl_ISO_BCC_d_Part1_1_compressed_2
Date: June 11, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: December 31, 2020Stipulation & Order
Date: January 26, 2022Proposed Order Received
Date: June 10, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 10, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 10, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 10, 2022Declaration
Date: June 10, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 10, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 10, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: June 10, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 10, 202259113PROOF01e5f8
Date: June 16, 202259113NOTIC00d981
Date: June 16, 2022Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: June 15, 2022Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record
Date: June 15, 2022notice
Date: July 06, 2022pos
Date: July 06, 2022POS re Reply ISO Cert. Motion
Date: July 07, 2022Vanguard - Class Cert Reply
Date: July 07, 2022Joint Stip & Prop. Order re Class Cert Hearing
Date: July 14, 2022Proof of Electronic Service
Date: July 15, 2022Joint Notice of New and Relevant Authority
Date: July 15, 2022EPOS - Request for an Official Court Reporter
Date: January 04, 2024Request For An Official Court
Date: January 04, 202489239HRG11004f53
Date: January 02, 202488653Proof015eb2
Date: December 19, 202388653Suppl0022fc
Date: December 19, 2023Stip and Proposed Order re Class Cert Dates
Date: April 05, 2022MazariegosEPOS -Stip and order
Date: December 13, 2023Stip and Order
Date: December 13, 2023Declaration in Support
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: July 15, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: February 05, 2021Notice of Supp. Authority ISO Cert Motion
Date: August 17, 2022SF107053.4160999.Joint Status Conference Statement for hearing on 8-23-22
Date: August 22, 2022SF107053.4160998.Proof of Electronic Service
Date: August 22, 2022Proof of Service re Errata
Date: August 23, 2022Notice of Errata
Date: August 23, 202263311Propo00c972
Date: September 12, 202263387PROPO00f71a
Date: September 13, 202264608PLAIN004513
Date: October 07, 202264608Proof03bb31
Date: October 07, 202264608DECLA026516
Date: October 07, 202264608DECLA015ec2
Date: October 07, 202264608DECLA0405c6
Date: October 07, 202264608DECLA05c615
Date: October 07, 202264608DECLA073d0d
Date: October 07, 202264608DECLA08aeab
Date: October 07, 202264608Reque062967
Date: October 07, 202264608PROPO109cb9
Date: October 07, 202264608DECLA093032
Date: October 07, 202264608DECLA110eb3
Date: October 07, 202264649DECLA02248e
Date: October 10, 202264649Proof0633bb
Date: October 10, 202264649PLAIN0035f9
Date: October 10, 202264649PLAIN045d4d
Date: October 10, 202264649PROPO0155b1
Date: October 10, 202264649DECLA08ebfe
Date: October 10, 202264649DECLA10195e
Date: October 10, 202264649DECLA11cd72
Date: October 10, 202264649DECLA032432
Date: October 10, 202264649DECLA05f7be
Date: October 10, 202264649DECLA07509b
Date: October 10, 202264649DECLA09af4f
Date: October 10, 2022Vanguard - Notice of Withdraw of Counsel
Date: October 27, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2022OPPOSITION
Date: December 07, 202267450Objec000003
Date: December 07, 2022DEC
Date: December 07, 202267450Decla014a64
Date: December 07, 202267450Decla024dc1
Date: December 07, 202267450Proof0561f0
Date: December 07, 202267450Propo044ceb
Date: December 07, 202267450Objec0647d1
Date: December 07, 202267450Compe03b910
Date: December 07, 202268686Regio00530e
Date: January 04, 202368758REGIO00c910
Date: January 05, 2023Vanguard - Renewed Class Cert Reply 1-6-23
Date: January 06, 2023Mazariegos (Vanguard) POS
Date: January 06, 2023Vanguard - Ntc of Change of Firm Address
Date: January 23, 2023Mazariegos (Vanguard) POS
Date: April 19, 2023Dec ISO Motion to file SAC
Date: April 19, 2023Motion to file SAC
Date: April 19, 2023Proposed Order re Motion to file SAC
Date: April 19, 202374890Defen006025
Date: April 28, 202374890Proof015eeb
Date: April 28, 2023SAC
Date: May 19, 2023Mazariegos POS - DSB
Date: May 19, 2023SF34015128
Date: June 03, 2023SF34015447
Date: June 09, 2023SF34015553 I
Date: June 13, 2023SF34015553 II
Date: June 13, 2023SF34015981 III
Date: June 23, 2023SF34015981 II
Date: June 23, 2023SF34016113 I
Date: June 28, 2023SF34016113 II
Date: June 28, 2023Answer to TAC
Date: July 17, 2023ANSWER (2)
Date: July 17, 2023ANSWER (3)
Date: July 17, 2023ANSWER (1)
Date: July 17, 2023Proof of Service -
Date: July 17, 20232023.07.31 - Vanguard -CMC Statement
Date: July 31, 202384932HRG120216c1
Date: October 18, 202384932HRG1200d0c1
Date: October 18, 202384932hrg12018d70
Date: October 18, 202384932HRG12035432
Date: October 18, 202384932PROPO047655
Date: October 18, 202384932Proof055664
Date: October 18, 202384952MEMOR019a23
Date: October 19, 202384952DECLA03a6c6
Date: October 19, 202384952PROPO041f89
Date: October 19, 202384952Proof05fc93
Date: October 19, 202384952DECLA02af76
Date: October 19, 202384952DEFEN008461
Date: October 19, 202384996PROPO006a22
Date: October 19, 202385023Propo00e43d
Date: October 19, 202385240Stipu007fd6
Date: October 23, 202385240Proof01d60b
Date: October 23, 2023SF34021707 III
Date: October 31, 2023SF34021707 I
Date: October 31, 2023SF34021707 IV
Date: October 31, 2023SF34021707 II
Date: October 31, 2023SF34021707 V
Date: October 31, 2023SF34021709 V
Date: October 31, 2023SF34021709 IV
Date: October 31, 2023SF34021709 II
Date: October 31, 2023SF34021709 III
Date: October 31, 2023SF34021709 I
Date: October 31, 2023Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: July 02, 202158855DECLA039c9d
Date: June 10, 202258855PROOF05ca75
Date: June 10, 202258855DEFEN02b795
Date: June 10, 202258855DEFEN001a6c
Date: June 10, 202258855DECLA04a1c3
Date: June 10, 202258856STIPU00f82f
Date: June 10, 202258882DEFEN00856f
Date: June 10, 202258882PROOF0197e8
Date: June 10, 202258882PROPO021657
Date: June 10, 2022Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: November 12, 2020Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: November 12, 2020Affidavit of Mailing
Date: October 05, 2020Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 18, 2020Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: November 19, 2020Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: November 24, 2020Affidavit of Mailing
Date: December 01, 2020Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: December 31, 2020Notice of Posting Jury Fees
Date: January 04, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: April 06, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: April 06, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: May 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2024 | Docket Event | EPOS - Stip and Order re deadlines | |
January 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Stip and Order re certificate dates | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | 90593propo003560 | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | EPOS - Request for an Official Court Reporter | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Request For An Official Court | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | 89239HRG11004f53 | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | 88653Proof015eb2 | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | 88653Suppl0022fc | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MazariegosEPOS -Stip and order | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Stip and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.