Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
632 N Palm Drive Llc, Gold Pacific Construction Inc, J.V. Mcburney Concrete Construction Inc. Roe 2, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Zakariaie Jack, Zakariaie Nilou A, Zakariaie Niloufar, against Gold Pacific Construction Inc., Pena Adan, Suretec Indemnity Company, Young Mark A., represented by Miller Randall Allen, Reynolds Sean, Weiss Andrew Duff, Zakariaie Nilou A, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateMarch 05, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions329 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Reply Reply to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint. Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00General Denial; Filed by: Ral Design and Managment, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Demurrer to FAXC; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Opposition and Request for Sanctions; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00; On the Amended Cross-Complaint (1st) filed by Gold Pacific Construction, INC on
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to MTC frogs; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Declaration Dec re: Opposition to MTC frogs; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Adan Pena (Defendant); As to: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Ral Design and Managment, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Ex Parte Application; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00; On the Amended Cross-Complaint (1st) filed by Gold Pacific Construction, INC on
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Declaration Dec. re Motion to compel; Filed by: Adan Pena (Defendant)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Russell Allen Linch (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Objection to Order and NOR; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Reply Reply to Motion for Reconsideration; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Reply Reply to Opp to Motion to Compel - RTP; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten time) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Other - Proof of Service-Civil; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to OSC; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration Declaration re OSC; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice Notice of lien; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: August 28, 2019Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: August 28, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 28, 2019General Denial
Date: September 03, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: September 03, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND COURT ORDERS
Date: September 05, 2019Answer - RUSSELL ALLEN LINCH'S AMENDEDANSWER TO GOLD PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S CROSS-COMPLIANT
Date: September 13, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: October 07, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 08, 2019Separate Statement
Date: October 07, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: November 14, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 06, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: December 18, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 18, 2019Declaration - DEC RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE MTC SROGS
Date: December 18, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE MTC SROGS
Date: December 18, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STRIKE MTC SROGS)
Date: December 19, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 12/20/2019
Date: December 20, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: January 13, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 13, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 14, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 14, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 16, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: January 21, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT.
Date: January 21, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: January 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO OSC RE SANCTIONS
Date: January 21, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 21, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 21, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO OSC RE SANCTIONS
Date: January 21, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 28, 2020Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: February 21, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MTC FROGS
Date: March 09, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DEC RE: OPPOSITION TO MTC FROGS
Date: March 09, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 09, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 11, 2020Request - REQUEST REQUEST TO CONTINUE MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 12, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DEC. RE MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 11, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/12/2020
Date: March 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 12, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 18, 2020Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: March 18, 2020Answer
Date: March 23, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 24, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 25, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 30, 2020Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00General Denial; Filed by: Russell Allen Linch (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to MTS to FAXC; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Opposition to OSC re sanctions 177.5; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Opposition to OSC re sanctions; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Request Request to continue Motion to Compel; Filed by: Adan Pena (Defendant); Charge Fee ?: YES
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 01, 2020Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order
Date: April 03, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 07, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 08, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: April 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: May 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: April 21, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: June 25, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION OF GOLD PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Date: June 25, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: June 29, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: June 29, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 29, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MTS TO FAXC
Date: June 29, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FAXC
Date: June 29, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RULING
Date: July 02, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE TABLE OF AUTHORITIES AND CONTENTS
Date: July 06, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDERS
Date: July 06, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 07, 2020Status Report
Date: July 07, 2020Statement of the Case
Date: July 09, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 10, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO OSC RE SANCTIONS 177.5
Date: July 22, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 22, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO OSC RE SANCTIONS
Date: July 22, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO OSC RE SANCTIONS 177.5
Date: July 22, 2020Unknown - AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (SECOND)
Date: July 23, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 23, 2020Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: July 24, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 24, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 24, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA RE GOLD SAXC
Date: July 24, 2020Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: August 03, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 03, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO RESPONSE RE SANCTIONS FOR OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER
Date: August 05, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 06, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: August 10, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 11, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: August 12, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 25, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Date: October 19, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 21, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH NONMONETARY SANCTIONS OF MCLE.
Date: October 20, 2020Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: October 21, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO OPP TO MOTION TO COMPEL - RTP
Date: October 23, 2020Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 30, 2020Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: November 02, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 06, 2020Objection - OBJECTION TO ORDER AND NOR
Date: November 06, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: November 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 25, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/25/2020
Date: November 25, 2020Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: November 25, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: November 30, 2020Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: November 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF MINUTE ORDER OF NOVEMBER 25, 2020 AND NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT
Date: December 08, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: December 08, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 08, 2020Notice of Motion
Date: December 09, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME
Date: December 09, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 10, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 10, 2020Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: December 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME)
Date: December 10, 2020Writ of Execution
Date: December 11, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 17, 2020Other - - OTHER - PROOF OF SERVICE-CIVIL
Date: December 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: December 18, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/18/2020
Date: December 18, 2020Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: December 21, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE OSC
Date: December 22, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 22, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE RE: OSC SANCTIONS OF $13,903.50 PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER OF 8.10.20
Date: December 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER HEARINGS TRANSFERRED AND CONTINUED FROM DEPARTMEN...)
Date: December 24, 2020Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: December 24, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO RESPONSE TO ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE IN THIS AND THE RELATED ACTIONS
Date: December 30, 2020Reply - REPLY SURREPLY TO OSC RE RECONSIDERATION AND UNRELATING
Date: December 31, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: December 31, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: January 12, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 01/12/2021
Date: January 12, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 12, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: January 13, 2021Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: January 15, 2021Answer
Date: January 20, 2021Cross-Complaint
Date: January 20, 2021Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE
Date: February 09, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO COMPEL COMPL
Date: February 09, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 16, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 16, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE/STRIKE MOTION
Date: February 17, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION 2-18
Date: February 17, 2021Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: February 17, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 17, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACAT...)
Date: February 18, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION RE OPPOSITION TO MTC PRODUCTION
Date: February 24, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 24, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MTC PRODUCTION
Date: February 24, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE
Date: March 02, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 03, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DEC RE OBJECTIONS TO REPLY.
Date: March 03, 2021Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO REPLY.
Date: March 03, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING JOINT STATEMENT
Date: March 04, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 04, 2021Order - ORDER SHAWNDA R DORN
Date: March 09, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: March 11, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF SANCTION MOTION.
Date: March 12, 2021Motion for Sanctions
Date: March 12, 2021Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO RESPONSE.
Date: March 16, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 16, 2021Answer
Date: March 16, 2021Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: March 22, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: March 23, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 23, 2021Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO DECL OF SEAN REYNOLDS
Date: March 23, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 25, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: March 25, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: March 29, 2021Reply - REPLY REPLY TO SANCTION MOTION
Date: March 29, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO SANCTION MOTION
Date: March 29, 2021Order - ORDER COURT REPORTER ORDER
Date: April 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: April 06, 2021Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: April 16, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: April 22, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: May 17, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 17, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: June 11, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 11, 2021Response - RESPONSE RESPONSE TO UNILATERALLY FILED IDC STMT BY GOLD
Date: June 14, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 14, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 17, 2021Opposition Opposition to Ex Parte Application 2-18; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: J.V. Mcburney Concrete Construction, Inc. (Roe 2) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Objection Objections to Reply. Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Declaration regarding Joint Statement; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to MTC production; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration Dec re Objections to Reply. Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Errata; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Reply Reply to Sanction Motion; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Appellant)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Status Report; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Adan Pena (Defendant); Gold Pacific Construction, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Objection Objections to Response. Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Order Shawnda R Dorn; Signed and Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Objection Objection to Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: -U B311221; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal "U"; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Opposition Opposition to Motion for sanctions; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance NOA: B311221; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-04T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Appellant)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal;B311221, NA & ;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Objection Objection to Decl of Sean Reynolds; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance NOA: -U B311221; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Adan Pena (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Response Response to Unilaterally Filed IDC Stmt by Gold; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Order court reporter order; Signed and Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B311221; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Appellant)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Suretec Indemnity Company (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B311221; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Appeal Document B311221, NA & ; DCA ORDER; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: March 05, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 05, 2019Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: March 29, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: March 05, 2019Complaint
Date: March 05, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 12, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 10, 2019Answer - SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY’S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 10, 2019Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: May 15, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: June 27, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: May 28, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 27, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: July 02, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 02, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: July 15, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECL OF DEMURRING PARTY ISO AUTO EXTENSION
Date: July 24, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 26, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 15, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 20, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 20, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 22, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 23, 2019Proof of Service - No Service
Date: August 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: December 20, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 02, 2020Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF RESPONSE TO GOLD IDC BRIEF
Date: June 17, 2021Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: June 17, 2021Motion for Sanctions
Date: June 30, 2021Separate Statement
Date: June 30, 2021Status Report
Date: July 02, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 02, 2021Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: July 08, 2021Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: July 08, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 08, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 09, 2021Appeal Document - APPEAL DOCUMENT B311221, NA10/26/20 & 11/30/20; DCA ORDER
Date: July 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: July 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL STATUS CONFERENCE (TELEPHONIC))
Date: July 26, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 28, 2021Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF LIEN
Date: July 28, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 28, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: July 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: July 29, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 13, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 29, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: October 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: October 26, 2021Notice of Continuance
Date: October 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))
Date: November 29, 2021Complaint
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY?s ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (// Cross-Compliant)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (of Motion & Demurrer to Strike)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (Decl of Demurring Party ISO Auto Extension)
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in support of Objection to Declaration for automatic extension of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Summon on Cross-Compliant)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Declaration for automatic extension of Demurrer)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case Filed on August 12, 2019;))
Date: 2019-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (of Case Management)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Proof of Service - No Service
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00RAL Design and Management, Inc.'s Amended Answer to Gold Pacific Construction, Inc.'s Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference and Court Orders)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Russell Allen LInch's Amended Answer to Gold Pacific Construction, Inc.'s Cross-Compliant
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Objection (to "Joint Informal Discovery Conference Brief" Filed by Counsel for Gold Pacific)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Strike MTC SROGS)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Dec re: Ex Parte Application to Strike MTC SROGS
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application to Strike Motion to Compel)
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Strike MTC SROGS))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 12/20/2019)
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in support of Opposition to OSC re sanctions)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint.)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to OSC re sanctions)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00First Amended Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Notice (of Lack of Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Declaration (Dec re: Opposition to MTC frogs)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to MTC frogs)
Date: 2020-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Declaration (Dec. re Motion to compel)
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00Request (to continue Motion to Compel)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/12/2020)
Date: 2020-03-12T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-03-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-30T00:00:00Declaration (re: Objection to Demurrer and Motion to strike portions of First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order
Date: 2020-04-03T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Objection (to Demurrer and Motion to strike portions of First Amended Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing Hearing Date of 4 Discovery Motions Filed by Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Declaration (of Robin Chang Re: Non-Receipt of Mail Package Containing Motion to Compel Discovery)
Date: 2020-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Disc...))
Date: 2020-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/21/2020)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-04-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/27/2020)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application of Gold Pacific Construction, Inc.
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Gold Pacific Construction...))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF NILOU ZAKARIAIE IN OPPOSITION TO GOLD PACIFIC?S EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Demurrer to FAXC)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to MTS to FAXC)
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Objection (to Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Response (to Defendant Gold Pacific Construction, Inc'sObjection to Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of SPR in support of Gold status conference statement)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Notice (of Errata re Table of Authorities and Contents)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Notice (of Court Orders)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Reply (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: J.V. Mcburney Concrete Construction, Inc. (Roe 2) (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Motion for Order Motion to Compel Compliance; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Declaration Declaration in support of Mtn to Compel Compl; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gold Pacific Construction, INC (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: 632 N Palm Drive, LLC (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: August 25, 2020Answer
Date: August 25, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 27, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 10, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: September 10, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE FOR AN OST RE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION.
Date: September 10, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 11, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 25, 2020Reply - REPLY REPLY TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: September 28, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 28, 2020Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO AMENDED DECL OF REYNOLDS ISO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: September 29, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS
Date: October 19, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 01, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 19, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION)
Date: October 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE FOR AN OST RE MOTION...)
Date: September 11, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: September 17, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 17, 2020Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 17, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: September 17, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 17, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/17/2020
Date: September 17, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: September 17, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: September 24, 2020Status Report
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten time) of 12/10/2020)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Shorten time)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Shorten time))
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Other - (Proof of Service-Civil)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (Filed by Gold Pacific Construction Inc.,)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Response (to Orders To Show Cause In This And The Two Related Actions; Declaration Of Nilou Zakariaie)
Date: 2020-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/18/2020)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Unavailability)
Date: 2020-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration re OSC)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to OSC)
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Re: Notice of Compliance Re OSC Sanctions of $13,903.50)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Notice (of Compliance Re: OSC Sanctions of $13,903.50 Pursuant to Court Order of 8.10.20)
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Hearings transferred and continued from Departmen...))
Date: 2020-12-24T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Response to Orders to Show Cause In This and the Related Actions)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Reply (Surreply to OSC re reconsideration and unrelating)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in support of Surreply to OSC re reconsideration and unrelating)
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Continuance of January 07, 2021...))
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00in Department K
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00in Department G
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/12/2021)
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default])
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Shawnda Renee Dorn #11387)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00in Department G
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: (1) recon...))
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in support of Mtn to Compel Compl)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Motion for Order (Motion to Compel Compliance)
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application 2-18)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte application to vacate/strike Motion)
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte application to vacat...))
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to MTC production)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance)
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration re Opposition to MTC production)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Declaration regarding Joint Statement
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Declaration (Dec re Objections to Reply.)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Objection (Objections to Reply.)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Zakariaie ISO Joint Status Report of all Counsel except Reynolds)
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance (Requesting party Plai...))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Order (Shawnda R Dorn)
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in support of sanction Motion.)
Date: 2021-03-12T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Response (Response to Gold Pacific's Objection to Plaintiff's Notice of Ruling)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Declaration of Sean P. Reynolds dated March 15, 2021)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Objection (Objections to Response.)
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Decl of Sean Reynolds)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for sanctions)
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-23T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Sanction Motion)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal ("U")
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in support of Reply to Sanction Motion)
Date: 2021-03-29T00:00:00Order (court reporter order)
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (NOA:11/30/20-U B311221)
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (NOA:10/26/20 B311221)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Non-Compliance (NOA: 11/30/20-U B311221)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Order Thereon)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 11/30/20-U B311221)
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal (;B311221, NA10/26/20 & 11/30/20;)
Date: 2021-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Response (Response to Unilaterally Filed IDC Stmt by Gold)
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Case Management Conference))
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00Objection (Objections to Plaintiff response to GOLD IDC Brief)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) (of Designation of Record on Appeal)
Date: 2021-06-17T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00JOINT STATUS REPORT RE COORDINATION OF DISCOVERY IN RELATED ACTIONS
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC); Case Management Conferen...))
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Motion to be Relie...))
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Appeal Document (B311221, NA10/26/20 & 11/30/20; DCA ORDER)
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/20/2021)
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Status Conference (Telephonic)))
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice (Notice of lien)
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Declaration (Dec. re Ex Parte to Vacate hearings)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte re vacating hearings given settlement)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte re vacating hearings...))
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2021-10-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)))
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B311221)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B311221)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: August 13, 2021Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MAINTAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CCP 664.6
Date: September 03, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: September 09, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B311221
Date: September 15, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DEC. RE EX PARTE TO VACATE HEARINGS
Date: September 09, 2021Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE RE VACATING HEARINGS GIVEN SETTLEMENT
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE RE VACATING HEARINGS...)
Date: September 10, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B311221
Date: October 22, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) TO F...))
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Opposition (to OSC re sanctions)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Opposition (to OSC re sanctions 177.5)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Opposition to OSC re sanctions 177.5)
Date: 2020-07-22T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Errata Re GOLD SAXC)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Amended Cross-Complaint ((2nd))
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-07-23T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Response (to Opposition to Order to Show Cause re: 128.5 sanctions re 6/26 GPC ex parte)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to OSC re sanctions on Opposition to Demurrer and MTS FAXC)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Response (Response to Opposition to Order to Show Cause re CCP 177.5 sanctions)
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Limited Scope Representation
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Response Re Sanctions For Opposition to Demurrer)
Date: 2020-08-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions Pursuant to California Code...))
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 08/10/2020)
Date: 2020-08-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of hearing on Plaintiff's Motions to Compel further responses)
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Sean P. Reynolds in Support of Moiton for Reconsideration)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Order to Deposit (on Motion to Reconsideration by Gold Pacific Contruction, Inc)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte for an OST re Motion for Reconsideration.)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in support of Ex Parte for an OST re Motion for Reconsideration.)
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte for an OST re Motion...))
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/17/2020)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Objection (Objection to Amended Decl of Reynolds ISO Motion for Reconsideration)
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Declaration (In Support of Opposition and Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Notice (of Compliance with Nonmonetary sanctions of MCLE.)
Date: 2020-10-20T00:00:00Opposition (and Request for Sanctions)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Reply (Reply to Opp to Motion to Compel - RTP)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses To Re...))
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Service By Electronic Service
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Objection (to Order and NOR)
Date: 2020-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/25/2020)
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice (of Minute Order of November 25, 2020 and Notice of Case Reassignment)
Date: 2020-12-08T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance Motion to be Relie...))
Date: 2021-07-14T00:00:00Notice (of Appeal)
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Notice (of Appeal)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Objection (of Sean P. Reynolds in Support of Opposition of Gold Pacific Construction, Inc. to OSC"s)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-01-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.