Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Randolph, Teresa, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Dimitre, Thomas Nicholas, against Daley, Cynthia, Larson, Debra, State Of California, Trustees Of The California State University, represented by Deschler, Jerry James, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts Superior Court of California, County of Butte with Benson, Stephen E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenson, Stephen E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management180 days |
Filing DateApril 19, 2019 |
Category(36) Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
Time To Trial962 days |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions297 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California, County of Butte |
Case Management Conference
Date: October 16, 2019Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: June 26, 2024Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: June 26, 2024Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: June 26, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: March 27, 2024Minute Order
Date: March 27, 2024Proof of Mailing
Date: April 19, 2024Stipulation and Order
Date: April 18, 2024Statement
Date: March 26, 2024Case Management Statement
Date: March 12, 2024Motion - Fee
Date: March 26, 2024Statement
Date: March 26, 2024Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 26, 2024Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 26, 2024Case Management Conference
Date: January 10, 2024Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: March 26, 2024Declaration
Date: March 26, 2024Motion - Fee
Date: March 26, 2024Minute Order
Date: January 10, 2024Case Management Statement
Date: December 28, 2023Motion - Fee
Date: March 26, 2024Minute Order
Date: November 01, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: November 01, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: July 25, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: October 19, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: October 17, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: August 09, 2023Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: March 11, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 09, 2023Minute Order
Date: June 28, 2023Settlement Conference
Date: June 28, 2023Proof of Mailing
Date: April 21, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: May 24, 2023Proof of Mailing
Date: May 11, 2023Minute Order
Date: May 24, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: June 01, 2022Minute Order
Date: November 17, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: March 02, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: September 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 02, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: September 22, 2021Order
Date: March 03, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: February 24, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: October 07, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: July 22, 2020Declaration
Date: January 25, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: September 09, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: September 16, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 28, 2020Reply
Date: September 04, 2020Declaration
Date: July 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 22, 2020Proof of Service
Date: July 06, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: July 06, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: March 11, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: May 20, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: May 20, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 05, 2020Minute Order
Date: May 20, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: May 26, 2020Order
Date: May 26, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: May 20, 2020Minute Order
Date: March 11, 2020Notice of Rescheduling
Date: March 20, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: March 03, 2020Response - No Fee
Date: February 24, 2020Proof of Service
Date: February 20, 2020Answer - No Fee
Date: February 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 20, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: February 18, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: January 29, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 29, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 18, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: October 01, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 04, 2019Motion - Fee
Date: September 09, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 18, 2019Complaint
Date: April 19, 2019Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: April 19, 2019Settlement Conference Statement
Date: June 22, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: May 18, 2023Ex Parte Application without Hearing
Date: April 06, 2023Stipulation
Date: May 02, 2023Case Management Statement
Date: March 01, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: November 17, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: November 01, 2021Stipulation - No Fee
Date: August 18, 2021Order
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration
Date: August 18, 2021Motion - Fee
Date: January 25, 2021Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: September 09, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: September 17, 2020Notice of Reassignment
Date: January 11, 2021Opposition - No Fee
Date: August 25, 2020Ruling
Date: September 17, 2020Declaration
Date: August 25, 2020Declaration
Date: October 25, 2019Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: October 02, 2019Opposition - No Fee
Date: September 19, 2019Demurrer
Date: September 11, 2019Notice
Date: July 25, 2019Minute Order
Date: March 02, 2022Settlement Conference
Date: November 01, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: March 11, 2021Motion - Fee
Date: August 18, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 25, 2021Amended Complaint
Date: September 28, 2020Response - No Fee
Date: February 16, 2021Settlement Conference Statement
Date: June 26, 2023Minute Order
Date: October 07, 2020Proof of Service
Date: September 28, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: May 22, 2023Request for Judicial Notice
Date: July 24, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: March 11, 2020Order
Date: May 09, 2023Order
Date: April 20, 2023Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: August 18, 2021Proof of Service
Date: November 01, 2021Motion - Fee
Date: July 30, 2020Reply
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order
Date: September 22, 2021Statement
Date: November 05, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 24, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 16, 2019Answer - No Fee
Date: December 21, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: March 03, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: January 25, 2021Declaration
Date: November 19, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 16, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: September 16, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 23, 2020Minute Order
Date: October 02, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: September 27, 2019Minute Order
Date: November 13, 2019Reply
Date: September 01, 2020Response - No Fee
Date: July 31, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 24, 2020Motion - Fee
Date: July 24, 2020Reply
Date: August 30, 2019Proof of Service
Date: May 29, 2019Proof of Mailing
Date: November 26, 2019Minute Order
Date: November 26, 2019Declaration
Date: November 06, 2019Motion - Fee
Date: November 05, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 25, 2019Response - No Fee
Date: November 21, 2019Opposition - No Fee
Date: November 19, 2019Proof of Service
Date: October 03, 2019Proof of Service
Date: September 27, 2019Reply
Date: November 12, 2019Motion - Fee
Date: October 25, 2019Declaration
Date: August 30, 2019Declaration
Date: September 19, 2019Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: July 18, 2019Order
Date: September 18, 2019Declaration
Date: July 18, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 24, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: May 29, 2019Response - No Fee
Date: August 27, 2019Order
Date: February 11, 2020Objection - No Fee
Date: February 13, 2020Order
Date: February 10, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: February 11, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: January 15, 2020Reply
Date: January 27, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: January 29, 2020Report
Date: January 24, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 15, 2020Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: December 04, 2019Proof of Service
Date: January 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 02, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: December 31, 2019Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: November 26, 2019Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: November 13, 2019Reply
Date: November 22, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 25, 2019Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: November 13, 2019Order
Date: November 26, 2019Reply
Date: November 21, 2019Opposition - No Fee
Date: November 19, 2019Response - No Fee
Date: November 07, 2019Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: April 24, 2024Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: April 24, 2024Motion hearings - Predisposition
Date: April 24, 2024Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: October 02, 2019Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: November 26, 2019Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: May 20, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: March 11, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: February 24, 2021Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: November 13, 2019Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: November 13, 2019Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: December 04, 2019Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: September 09, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: September 09, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: January 29, 2020Motion hearings - Predispo
Date: March 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2025 |
Jury Trial 7 Day Time Estimate Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
January 30, 2025 |
Trial Readiness Conference Jury Trial 2/3/2024; 7 Day Time Estimate Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
December 06, 2024 |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Heithecker, Philip H |
||
June 26, 2024 |
Notice of Motion & Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Documents & Sanctions Motion hearings - Predisposition Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Documents & Motion for Sanctions Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
June 26, 2024 |
Declaration of Deschler in Support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admissions Motion hearings - Predisposition Defendants Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Admissions & Motion for Sanctions Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
June 26, 2024 |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories Motion hearings - Predisposition Defendants Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories & Motion for Sanctions Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
April 24, 2024 |
Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents Motion hearings - Predisposition Defendants Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Admissions & Motion for Sanctions Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
April 24, 2024 |
Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Interrogatories & for Sanctions Motion hearings - Predisposition Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Documents & Motion for Sanctions Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
April 24, 2024 |
Notice of Motion & Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories & Motion for Sanctions Motion hearings - Predisposition Defendants Motion to Compel Further Responses to Interrogatories & Motion for Sanctions Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
||
April 19, 2024 | Proof of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.