Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mccann Holdings Ltd, filed a(n) case represented by Norse, Kristin Ann, against Benderson, Randall, Rodriguez, Henry, Sdc Communities Inc, Vott A Llc, Vott B Llc, (total of 7) See All represented by Bentley, Morgan, Sandridge, Hala A, Vogler, Edward Ii, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with MERCURIO, FREDERICK P presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 16, 2011 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
This complaint is a reply to the affirmative defenses made by the defendants, SDC Communities, Inc. and Henry Rodriguez, in response to the third amended complaint filed by the plaintiff, McCann Holdings, Ltd. The plaintiff argues that the defendants...
MOTION - JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: June 07, 2011NOTICE OF PRODUCTION
Date: June 10, 2011MOTION -LEAVE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 23, 2011OBJECTION - TO REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE
Date: June 21, 2011REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 12, 2011REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 13, 2011RESPONSE - HENRY RODRIGUEZ
Date: July 29, 2011REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 29, 2011RESPONSE - SDC COMMUNITIES, INC.
Date: July 29, 2011ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND
Date: August 09, 2011NOTICE - SERVING PLTF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT
Date: July 28, 2011COMPLAINT - AMENDED
Date: August 30, 2011REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - PLTF - TO DEFT HENRY RODRIGUEZ
Date: August 22, 2011REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TO DEFT SDC COMMUNITIES INC
Date: August 22, 2011RESPONSE -REQUEST PRODUCTION
Date: September 01, 2011REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 02, 2011STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: September 08, 2011RESPONSE - MCANN HOLDINGS, INC.
Date: September 09, 2011REQUEST FOR COPIES- STEVEN HUTTON
Date: September 08, 2011NOTICE - SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFTS INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 12, 2011ANSWER - TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - VOTT-A LLC - VOTT-B LLC - VOTT-C LLC - VOTT-D LLC
Date: September 19, 2011DEFENDANT'S , SDC COMMUNITIES, INC., AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ REQUEST - FOR COPIES
Date: September 20, 2011RESPONSE - TO PLTF PRODUCTION REQUEST
Date: September 21, 2011MOTION -PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 07, 2011ORDER - APPROVING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: September 23, 2011RESPONSE-MOTION COMPEL
Date: October 26, 2011DEFENDANTS, SDC COMMUNITIES, INC. AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ, REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 14, 2011MOTION COMPEL INSPECTION OF COMPUTERS
Date: November 16, 2011NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: December 14, 2011REQUEST - COPIES
Date: December 22, 2011OBJECTION - TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: December 20, 2011ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S SDC COMMUNITIES INC HENRY RODRIGUEZ MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: February 03, 2012NOTICE OF PRODUCTION
Date: January 06, 2012COMPLAINT - AMENDED -SECOND
Date: February 14, 2012OBJECTION - TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY
Date: March 28, 2012REQUEST - FOR COPIES - SDC COMMUNITIES INC & RODRIGUEZ, HENRY
Date: June 22, 2012REQUEST - COPIES - DEFT
Date: March 07, 2012NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - FROM NON-PARTY
Date: March 26, 2012ANSWER - TO PLTF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 21, 2012REQUEST - COPIES
Date: March 28, 2012PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE VOTT DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 27, 2012MOTION STRIKE AFF
Date: June 28, 2012ANSWER - SDC COMMUNITIES, INC.
Date: June 21, 2012NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - FROM NON-PARTY
Date: March 08, 2012PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT SDC COMMUNITIES INC
Date: May 15, 2012OBJECTION - TO PLTF NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: March 19, 2012RESPONSE SECOND REQUEST ADMISSIONS
Date: September 14, 2012RESPONSE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 14, 2012REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 24, 2012NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - FROM NON-PARTY
Date: September 26, 2012DEFENDANTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ'S THIRD REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTFF
Date: September 26, 2012NOTICE - OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS' FOURTH SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 03, 2012REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - DEFT
Date: October 12, 2012MOTION - PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 10, 2012MOTION - AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 10, 2012ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: October 26, 2012ORDER SETTING COURT DATE
Date: October 23, 2012RESPONSE - DEFTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ - TO PLTF FOURTH PRODUCTION REQUEST
Date: November 06, 2012DEFENDANTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ'S FIFTH REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 13, 2012MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 09, 2012RESPONSE - TO DEFT FOURTH PRODUCTION REQUEST
Date: November 19, 2012RESPONSE - PLTF - TO DEFTS THIRD PRODUCTION REQUEST
Date: November 19, 2012RESPONSE MOTION JUDGMENT
Date: November 20, 2012DR GARY KOMPETHECRA'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THE ENTRY OF A PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 20, 2012PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO AMENDED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER OF NON-PARTY GARY KOMPOTHECRAS
Date: November 26, 2012REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO AMENDED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (GARY KOMPOTHECRAS)
Date: November 27, 2012MOTION - DEFT HENRY RODRIGUEZ - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNTS III AND IV WITH MEMO OFLAW
Date: December 03, 2012RESPONSE REQUEST PRODUCTION
Date: December 13, 2012NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - OF EMAILS
Date: December 13, 2012RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: November 28, 2012ORDER ON AMENDED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER OF NON-PARTY GARY KOMPOTHECRAS
Date: December 10, 2012PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2012MOTION PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2012SECOND NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF EMAILS
Date: December 28, 2012NOTICE OF PRODUCTION
Date: January 10, 2013DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: January 14, 2013COMPLAINT - AMENDED - THIRD
Date: March 01, 2013MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTORNEY: VOGLER, EDWARD II (0380970)
Date: March 22, 2013REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - DEFTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC & HENRY RODGRIGUEZ
Date: May 13, 2013PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS
Date: May 28, 2013PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM REGARDING FIDUCIARY DUTY
Date: June 10, 2013RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS TO SUBPOENA
Date: June 25, 2013ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: June 19, 2013MOTION -PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNTS VI AND IX OF THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: September 10, 2013INTERROGATORIES - SECOND SET
Date: July 29, 2013ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: August 21, 2013INTERROGATORIES -FIRST SET
Date: July 29, 2013AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: August 23, 2013MOTION PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNTS VII, VIII, IX
Date: September 10, 2013NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: September 24, 2013PLAINTIFF'S FIFTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT HENRY RODRIGUEZ
Date: September 24, 2013PLAINTIFF'S FIFTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT SDC COMMUNITIES INC
Date: September 24, 2013NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: October 03, 2013NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: October 07, 2013DEFENDANTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC'S AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: October 07, 2013OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: October 08, 2013REQUEST FOR COPIES -DEFENDANTS SCD COMMUNITIES INCS AND HENRY RODRIGUEZS
Date: October 09, 2013PLAINTIFFS SIXTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT HENRY RODRIGUEZ
Date: October 23, 2013RESPONSE - TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: October 09, 2013PLAINTIFFS SIXTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC
Date: October 23, 2013NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: October 23, 2013DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY
Date: October 29, 2013NOTICE-FILING- TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER DATED OCTOBER 10,2013
Date: December 04, 2013PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE UNSIGNED AFFIDAVIT OF HENRY RODRIGUEZ
Date: December 05, 2013PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 05, 2013PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 05, 2013PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO RELY ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT EVIDENCE
Date: December 17, 2013PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, HENRY RODRIGUEZ
Date: May 15, 2012NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: March 14, 2012MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 29, 2012ORDER DENYING MOTION DISMISS
Date: July 09, 2012NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - FROM NON-PARTY
Date: July 20, 2012OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: July 23, 2012NOTICE OF PRODUCTION
Date: July 20, 2012REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 03, 2012DEFENDANTS SDC COMMINITIES INC AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ REQUEST - FOR COPIES
Date: July 24, 2012DEFENDANTS SDC COMMUNITIES INCS AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ REQUEST - FOR COPIES
Date: July 24, 2012NOTICE - WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: August 22, 2012NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - FROM NON-PARTY
Date: August 01, 2012MOTION -INTERVENE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF OPPOSING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: August 14, 2012MOTION - FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER - VOTT-A LLC VOTT-B LLC VOTT-C LLC VOTT-D LLC
Date: July 24, 2012OBJECTION - TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: August 14, 2012RESPONSE MOTION COMPEL
Date: August 23, 2012ANSWER- SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTORNEY: BENTLEY, MORGAN RAY (0962287)
Date: August 28, 2012NOTICE OF FILING - FOURTH INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF
Date: August 29, 2012REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - SECOND - DEFTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC & RODRIGUEZ, HENRY - TO PLTF
Date: August 29, 2012REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS - THIRD - DEFTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC & RODRIGUEZ, HENRY - TO PLTF
Date: August 29, 2012TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: December 09, 2013PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 18, 2013RESPONSE - DEFENDANT HENRY RODRIGUEZ'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S SIXTH REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 20, 2013DEFENDANT SDC COMMUNITIES INC RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS SIXITH REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 23, 2013PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS LIST
Date: February 14, 2014NONPARTY WITNESS JAMES L LEYS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 06, 2014DEFENDANTS, SDC COMMUNITIES, INC'S AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: March 12, 2014DEFENDANTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ EXPERT WITNESS LIST
Date: March 14, 2014PLAINTIFFS AMENDED EXPERT WITNESS LIST
Date: March 27, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 31, 2014PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 16, 2014NOTICE - OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS' EXPERT INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 30, 2014MOTION TO AUTHORIZE IDENTIFICATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES
Date: August 06, 2014ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL
Date: September 02, 2014JOINT MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: August 25, 2014MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIAL
Date: August 06, 2014DEFENDANTS VOTT-A LLC VOTT-B LLC AND VOTT-D LLC AND RANDALL BENDERSON'S EXPERT WITNESS LIST
Date: September 10, 2014AGREED ORDER ON MODIFICATION OF TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: August 29, 2014NOTICE OF FILING - DOCUMENTS FOR USE IN CONJUNCTION WITH DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2014REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: September 24, 2014NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 01, 2014REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: October 02, 2014PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF CALEB GRIMES
Date: February 13, 2015MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION OF PURE OPINION TESTIMONY
Date: February 13, 2015PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER LITIGATION
Date: February 13, 2015PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING MCANNS "FAILURE TO ACT"
Date: February 13, 2015MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE HEARSAY EVIDENCE
Date: February 13, 2015DEFENDANTS, SDC COMMUNITIES, INC. AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ, MOTION TO STAY MARCH 2, 2015 TRIAL
Date: February 13, 2015NON-PARTY WITNESS NORA PATTERSON'S AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: February 18, 2015DISMISSAL OF APPEAL /PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI 2D15-522
Date: February 20, 2015SUBPOENA SERVED - CALEB GRIMES, ESQ.
Date: February 20, 2015NON-PARTY WITNESS NORA PATTERSON'S SECOND AMENDED MOTION IN LIMINE FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: February 23, 2015SUBPOENA SERVED - JAMES PAULMANN
Date: February 20, 2015PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE SUMMARY
Date: February 20, 2015ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS 2D15-522
Date: February 23, 2015PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST - FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: February 23, 2015PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIDAVIT OF HENRY RODRIGUEZ
Date: January 18, 2013ORDER - MOTION SEEKING RULING ON DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLANTIFFS NOTICES OF PRODUCTION
Date: February 19, 2013PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2013ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: January 18, 2013DEFENDANTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC'S AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ'S REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 28, 2013ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM TRIAL POSTURE
Date: February 25, 2013PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE - TO BENDERSON/VOTT'S MOTION IN LIMINE AS TO LEGISLATIVE PRIVILEGE
Date: February 23, 2015PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE - TO RODRIGUEZ/SDC'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE HEARSAY EVIDENCE
Date: February 23, 2015NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - TELEPHONIC
Date: November 13, 2014SUBPOENA RETURNED - FOR TRIAL - SERVED - NORMAN STEWART
Date: November 12, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 11, 2015PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER
Date: February 12, 2015EXHIBIT LIST OF DEFENDANTS' VOTT-A LLC, VOTT-B LLC, VOTT-C LLC, VOTT-D LLC AND RANDALL BENDERSON
Date: February 09, 2015DISMISSAL OF APPEAL /PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI 2D15-522
Date: February 26, 2015ORDER ESTABLISHING ORDER OF PARTY PRESENTATIONS AT TRIAL
Date: March 02, 2015AGREED ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING TRIAL SUBPOENAS
Date: March 02, 2015PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR NON-PARTY WITNESS NORA PATTERSON
Date: March 02, 2015ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER LITIGATION
Date: March 02, 2015ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE HEARSAY EVIDENCE
Date: March 02, 2015ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE AS TO LEGISLATIVE PRIVILEGE
Date: March 02, 2015ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF CALEB GRIMES
Date: March 02, 2015ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE AS TO "SCANDALOUS" MATTERS AND ALLEGATIONS
Date: March 02, 2015MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA- JON SUSCE
Date: March 03, 2015PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM REGARDING CONSPIRACY
Date: March 09, 2015ORDER REGARDING DIRECTED VERDICT
Date: March 13, 2015SUBPOENA RETURNED - RICHARD W BASS
Date: February 17, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED
Date: February 17, 2015PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 17, 2015ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS (ORDER NOW FINAL) 2D15-522
Date: March 26, 2015SUBPOENA RETURNED - SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL - DONALD A. NEU
Date: February 18, 2015PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND PLAINTIFFS COUNTER-DESIGNATIONS
Date: February 18, 2015PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 18, 2015SUBPOENA RETURNED - JAMES PAULMANN
Date: February 19, 2015LIST-PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED EXHIBIT
Date: February 19, 2015PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 20, 2015ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE - OF TRIAL SUBPOENAS
Date: February 20, 2015SUBPOENA RETURNED - CALEB GRIMES ESQ
Date: February 19, 2015RESPONSE - MCCAN'S - TO DEFENDANTS POST-TRIAL MOTIONS
Date: April 10, 2015PLAINTIFF'S FIFTH AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 23, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE SUPPORT OF APPELLATE COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS
Date: April 10, 2015ORDER ON DEFENDANTS POST-TRIAL MOTIONS
Date: May 08, 2015JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2015056277)
Date: May 08, 2015NOTICE OF APPEAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2015068078)
Date: June 03, 2015EXHIBIT - FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: June 03, 2015EXHIBIT - FINAL JUDGMENT (CORRECTED)
Date: June 03, 2015NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2015070061)
Date: June 08, 2015ACKNOWLEDGEMENT BY APPELLATE COURT OF NEW APPEAL CASE - 2D15-2447
Date: June 08, 2015ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D15-2447
Date: June 08, 2015ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL FOR APPELLATE RECORD 2D15-2447 (25 DAYS FOR INDEXES)
Date: September 15, 2015ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS
Date: June 08, 2015APPEAL CORRESPONDENCE - INABILITY LETTER TO COMPLETE APPELLATE RECORD AFTER EXTENSION - 2D15-2447
Date: September 04, 2015ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D15-2447
Date: January 04, 2016PLAINTIFF'S SEVENTH REQUEST-PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ
Date: January 04, 2016NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS' SECOND SET OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 20, 2016DEFENDANTS SDC COMMUNITITS INC AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ'S EIGTH REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 21, 2016ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL / 2D15-2447
Date: February 18, 2016PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: October 17, 2014DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING VOGLER AS A WITNESS
Date: October 23, 2014PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING VOLGER AS A WITNESS
Date: October 27, 2014ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: November 03, 2014NOTICE -SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: November 04, 2014PLTFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SDC COMM. SEVENTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: November 04, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW AS TO COUNT I -DECLARATORY JUDGMENT
Date: January 09, 2015ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING VOGLER AS A WITNESS
Date: November 17, 2014ORDER ON BENDERSON'S AND VOTT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 03, 2014NON PARTY WITNESSES MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: December 15, 2014MCCANN'S MEMORANDUM REGARDING DECLARATORY JUDGMENT - COUNT I
Date: January 16, 2015REQUEST -PRODUCE REGARDING EXPERTS
Date: December 18, 2014STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF MODIFIED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 05, 2014REQUEST -COPIES
Date: December 18, 2014STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER
Date: December 29, 2014MODIFIED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 12, 2014PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO NON-PARTY WITNESSES' MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: January 16, 2015PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO BENDERSON AND VOTT DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO PRODUCE REGARDING EXPERTS
Date: January 23, 2015ORDER ON NON PARTY MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: January 26, 2015MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATED TO FUTURE LAND USE CHANGES AS SPECULATIVE
Date: January 26, 2015DEFENDANTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ REQUEST FOR COPIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 26, 2015MOTION IN LIMINE AS TO LEGISLATIVE PRIVILEGE
Date: February 03, 2015PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE SUMMARY
Date: February 04, 2015MOTION IN LIMINE AS TO IRRELEVANT AND SCANDALOUS ALLEGATIONS
Date: February 12, 2015ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS 2D15-522
Date: February 09, 2015REQUEST - JUDICIAL NOTICE - PLAINTIFFS 2ND
Date: February 11, 2015PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE SUMMARY
Date: February 12, 2015PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: February 11, 2015ACKNOWLEDGEMENT BY APPELLATE COURT OF NEW APPEAL CASE 2D15-522
Date: February 09, 2015NON-PARTY WITNESS NORA PATTERSON'S MOTION IN LIMINE FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: February 12, 2015ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D15-2447
Date: March 14, 2016ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D15-2447
Date: July 05, 2016ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D15-2447
Date: July 25, 2016STIPULATION REGARDING MEDIATION
Date: September 01, 2016ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D15-2447
Date: November 28, 2016ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D15-2447
Date: December 09, 2016NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: November 30, 2016ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D15-2447
Date: July 25, 2016APPEAL MANDATE & OPINION ISSUED ON APPEAL / 2D15-2447 / AFFIRMED
Date: August 31, 2017AMENDED ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: November 01, 2016ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPOENA - JAMES L. LEY
Date: February 26, 2015ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS / 2D15-2447
Date: May 01, 2017SUBPOENA RETURNED - JOHN F COOK - SERVED
Date: February 26, 2015SUBPOENA RETURNED - SERVED - JOHN F COOK
Date: February 26, 2015ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D15-2447
Date: September 30, 2016ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: August 18, 2016ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS / 2D15-2447
Date: July 17, 2017ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D15-2447
Date: August 29, 2016SUBPOENA RETURNED - JOHN ROCHE
Date: February 26, 2015DEFENDANT SDC COMMUNITIES INC AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: September 07, 2016ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D15-2447
Date: November 21, 2016DISMISSAL OF APPEAL CROSS APPEAL ONLY - 2D15-2447
Date: August 10, 2016ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D15-2447
Date: December 05, 2016APPEAL - ORDER / 2D15-2447
Date: October 24, 2016ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL / 2D15-2447
Date: November 04, 2016COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: March 05, 2015SUBPOENA RETURNED - JON SUSCE
Date: March 04, 2015COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: March 02, 2015COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: March 04, 2015COURT APPEARANCE RECORD ( FOR PROCEEDINGS OF MARCH 3, 2015 )
Date: March 04, 2015COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: March 06, 2015COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: March 09, 2015COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: March 11, 2015JURY INSTRUCTION #8
Date: March 17, 2015JURY INSTRUCTION #7
Date: March 17, 2015JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: March 17, 2015JURY INSTRUCTION #10
Date: March 17, 2015JURY QUESTION
Date: March 17, 2015JURY INSTRUCTION #13 - COUNT IX - CONSPIRACY
Date: March 17, 2015JURY SEATING CHART
Date: March 17, 2015SATISFACTION - OF JUDGMENT OF MAY 18, 2015
Date: November 09, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 18, 2015EVIDENCE RECORD - PLAINTIFF #35867 CONTINUED - PART 2 OF 2
Date: March 18, 2015EVIDENCE RECORD - PLAINTIFF #35867 PART 1 OF 2
Date: March 18, 2015EVIDENCE RECORD - DEFENDANT SDC #35868
Date: March 19, 2015EVIDENCE RECORD - DEFENDANT VOTT #36051
Date: March 19, 2015EVIDENCE RECORD - PLAINTIFF #35869
Date: March 19, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: March 31, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF APPELLATE OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: April 10, 2015MCCANN'S MOTION FOR RECOVERY OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: June 01, 2015NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS (NO ATTACHMENT)
Date: June 03, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: June 03, 2015MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS
Date: June 03, 2015PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2015063392
Date: June 03, 2015APPEAL CORRESPONDENCE - ACKNOWLEDGEMENT RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL 2D15-2447
Date: June 08, 2015NOTICE OF FILING FOR APPEAL FOR TRANSCRIPTS / AA
Date: June 15, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL / MOTION HEARING FROM MANATEE COUNTY 9/4/2014
Date: June 15, 2015PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2015067402
Date: June 15, 2015DIRECTIONS TO CLERK BY PLAINTIFF/APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE MCCANN HOLDINGS
Date: June 15, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL/ MOTION HEARING FROM MANATEE COUNTY 10/28/2014
Date: June 15, 2015APPEAL COST SHEET PREPARED & FORWARDED - 2D15-2447
Date: June 24, 2015PAYMENT $9,681.50 RECEIPT #2015075358
Date: July 06, 2015DESIGNATIONS TO COURT REPORTER - APPEAL /AA
Date: June 26, 2015ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL FOR TRANSCRIPTS BY 9/3/2015
Date: August 03, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - MOTION - JANUARY 23, 2013
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 1 - MARCH 3, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - MASTER TRIAL INDEX VOLUMES 1 - 19
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - MOTION - FEBRUARY 25, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - MOTION - OCTOBER 30, 2014
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 4 - MARCH 4, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 2 - MARCH 3, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 5 - MARCH 5, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 3 - MARCH 4, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 6 - MARCH 5, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 9 - MARCH 9, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 8 - MARCH 6, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 7 - MARCH 6, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 10 - MARCH 9, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 13 - MARCH 11, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 12 - MARCH 10, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 14 - MARCH 11, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 16 - MARCH 12, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 11 - MARCH 10, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 15 - MARCH 12, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 18 - MARCH 13, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 19 - MARCH 16, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015APPEAL COVERSHEET & INDEX PREPARED AND FORWARDED TO APPELLATE PARTIES - 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL - 2D15-2447
Date: September 11, 2015APPEAL COVERSHEET & INDEX PREPARED AND FORWARDED TO APPELLATE PARTIES - 2D15-2447
Date: September 11, 2015TRANSCRIPT - APPEAL - TRIAL VOL 17 - MARCH 13, 2015
Date: September 09, 2015NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 18, 2015AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 04, 2016NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: December 10, 2015SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 26, 2016ORDER - RE: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF REHEARING
Date: August 29, 2016NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: April 15, 2016RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES & COSTS
Date: July 25, 2016PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR REHEARING
Date: August 24, 2016DEFENDANTS' DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: November 24, 2014ORDER CONTINUING JURY TRIAL
Date: December 08, 2014NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS CO-COUNSEL (FOR THE DEFENDANTS)
Date: November 24, 2014ORDER RESCHEDULING MANDATORY PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: December 15, 2014SUBPOENA RETURNED - FOR TRIAL - SERVED - JOHN ASK
Date: November 10, 2014CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM STEVEN D HUTTON PL
Date: December 03, 2014NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED
Date: November 25, 2014SUBPOENA RETURNED - FOR TRIAL - SERVED - MADELEINE HAVLIK
Date: November 10, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 30, 2014SUBPOENA RETURNED - JOSH ROBINSON, TRANSPORTATION ENGINEERING INC
Date: November 05, 2014SUBPOENA RETURNED - FOR TRIAL - SERVED - SUZANNE K LEX
Date: November 10, 2014PLAINTIFFS FINAL WITNESS LIST
Date: November 24, 2014DEFENDANTS SDC COMMUNITIES INC AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ'S FINAL WITNESS LIST
Date: November 24, 2014ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPOENA - ON BEHALF OF DAVID BULLOCK
Date: January 21, 2015ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPOENA - ON BEHALF OF JOSEPH A BARBETTA
Date: January 21, 2015ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPOENA
Date: January 22, 2015ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPOENA - ON BEHALF OF CAROLYN J MASON
Date: January 21, 2015ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPOENA - ON BEHALF OF THOMAS C POLK
Date: January 21, 2015ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPOENA - ON BEHALF OF SHANNON STAUB
Date: January 21, 2015PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE SUMMARIES
Date: February 09, 2015PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS FOR USE AT TRIAL
Date: February 09, 2015PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 09, 2015PLAINTIFF'S FINAL WITNESS LIST
Date: February 09, 2015MOTION IN LIMINE AS TO IRRELEVANT ALLEGATIONS CONCERNING FORMER COUNTY ADMINISTRATOR JAMES LEY
Date: February 12, 2015SDC COMMUNITIES INC'S AND HENRY RODRIGUEZ'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: February 11, 2015MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: July 28, 2016AMENDED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES & COSTS
Date: August 10, 2017ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE
Date: December 06, 2017COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: March 10, 2015COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: March 12, 2015COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: March 16, 2015COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: March 13, 2015JURY QUESTIONS
Date: March 16, 2015VERDICT
Date: March 16, 2015JURY INSTRUCTION #12
Date: March 17, 2015JURY INSTRUCTION #13
Date: March 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE FILE | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION - OF JUDGMENT OF MAY 18, 2015 | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | APPEAL MANDATE & OPINION ISSUED ON APPEAL / 2D15-2447 / AFFIRMED | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES & COSTS | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS / 2D15-2447 | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS / 2D15-2447 | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D15-2447 | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D15-2447 | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
November 28, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D15-2447 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.