Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Acosta, Sandy, Jetcruzer International, Llc., filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Varner & Brandt, against Acosta, Sandy, Does 3 Through 50, Guzman, Marvin J., Zepeda, Ulises A., represented by David M. Shaby Ii & Associates, Apc, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas S Garza Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 08, 2019 |
CategoryFraud |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by JetCruzer International, LLC. The case is assigned to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Bernardino, with case number 2 CIVDS 1930132. The plaintiff is represented by Angelica A. Samaniego of Varne...
Motion in Limine re:
Date: May 30, 2023Reply Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Motion Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 13, 2020General Denial Filed
Date: December 13, 2019Reply Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: October 08, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 13, 2020Reply Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 13, 2020Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: December 13, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 13, 2020Motion Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 24, 2020Motion Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Reply Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: June 01, 2020At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: November 07, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 13, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 07, 2023Motion Filed
Date: June 01, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 07, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: May 30, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 07, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 18, 2020Answer Filed
Date: January 21, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 08, 2020Demurrer Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: April 06, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 08, 2019Declaration re:
Date: January 07, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: January 07, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: September 14, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Civil Subpoena Returned Served
Date: March 20, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Reply Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Declaration re:
Date: December 20, 2021Reply Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Witness List Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 10, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: January 07, 2021Declaration re:
Date: June 23, 2021Reply Filed
Date: February 25, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: October 08, 2019Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: May 26, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 18, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Reply Filed
Date: April 26, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: October 16, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 23, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 22, 2021Notice Sent re:
Date: September 16, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Judgment Filed
Date: January 21, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 08, 2019Objection Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 14, 2021Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 13, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 21, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Exhibits List Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 08, 2019Reply Filed
Date: March 11, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 01, 2021General Denial Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 16, 2021Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer
Date: September 10, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Reply Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 28, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 28, 2021Response Filed to:
Date: June 08, 2021Objection Filed
Date: February 19, 2021General Denial Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Statement of Case Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Summons Issued on
Date: August 10, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 10, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Notice Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 25, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 25, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 23, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Objection Filed
Date: June 08, 2021Reply Filed
Date: March 11, 2022Objection Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: October 16, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 02, 2021Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 17, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 25, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Request Filed Re:
Date: May 26, 2021Proof of Service
Date: December 20, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 06, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer
Date: September 14, 2021Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: January 07, 2021Answer Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: June 18, 2020Motion to Strike
Date: December 20, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: December 13, 2019Proof of Service of Civil Subpoena Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: May 26, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 04, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: December 20, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
June 12, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed Defendant Sandy Acostas Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 2 to exclude certain documents from evidence |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed Defendant Sandy Acostas Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion in Limine No. 1 to exclude certain witnesses |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Caption filed by plaintiff on 06/06/23 |
|
June 01, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Civil Subpoena Filed served Berlarmino Luna |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: #1 - TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN WITNESSES |
|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: #2 - TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN DOCS FROM EVIDENCE |
|
April 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 3 includes documents filed between 02/19/21 - 11/17/21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.