Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mahaffey, Ashley, Mahaffey, Brian, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Herzog, Yuhas, Ehrlich & Ardell, Robert Weinstein & Associates, against Colorama Wholesale Nursery, Medina, Jose, Wilson, Richard, represented by Horton, Oberrecht & Kirkpatrick, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Corey G Lee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey G Lee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Notice
Date: August 08, 2023Exhibits List Filed
Date: August 02, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: April 05, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: July 28, 2023Answer Filed
Date: May 06, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 01, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 05, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 07, 2019Notice of Association of Counsel for Plaintiff Filed
Date: February 06, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: October 07, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 02, 2019Notice Filed
Date: July 28, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Reply Filed
Date: October 07, 2019Notice Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: May 31, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Amended Document Filed re:
Date: July 28, 2023Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: March 21, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 21, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 25, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 22, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Trial Setting Order filed
Date: February 15, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Motion Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Proof of Service
Date: January 14, 2021Declaration re:
Date: January 06, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: February 01, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 05, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: November 09, 2020Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 03, 2021Notice
Date: March 26, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Motion re:
Date: May 19, 2022Trial Brief Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Proof of Service
Date: February 14, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 07, 2023Proof of Electronic Service
Date: March 28, 2023Declaration re:
Date: December 23, 2022Declaration re:
Date: January 26, 2023Motion Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: March 17, 2021At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: February 07, 2020Reply Filed
Date: June 28, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: July 14, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 05, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Objection Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 05, 2021Declaration re:
Date: July 23, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 23, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Statement of Case Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Proof of Service
Date: July 13, 2022Reply Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Points and Authorities Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: June 24, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 03, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Declaration re:
Date: November 28, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 17, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Notice Filed
Date: January 26, 2023Motion Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Motion re:
Date: November 10, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: December 23, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: January 26, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 26, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Amended Order Filed
Date: March 09, 2021Declaration re:
Date: January 14, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: February 01, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: January 06, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: February 14, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 07, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Declaration re:
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Notice
Date: November 10, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Reply Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 24, 2023Declaration re:
Date: September 28, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 28, 2021Notice Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: November 24, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: January 14, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Notice of Re-Assignment
Date: January 27, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 09, 2023Motion Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Declaration re:
Date: June 02, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Notice Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: November 10, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: March 21, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: September 28, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: December 23, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: June 01, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 11, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: July 23, 2021Motion Re: Summary Adjudication
Date: March 26, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: January 14, 2021At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: September 05, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: March 23, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 03, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Reply Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Reply Filed
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 09, 2020Notice Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Reply Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 21, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Notice Filed
Date: January 06, 2021Declaration re:
Date: June 14, 2022Notice
Date: March 26, 2021Amended Document Filed re:
Date: February 03, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 06, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: January 26, 2023Objection Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Declaration re:
Date: June 02, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 21, 2019Motion Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 26, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: January 06, 2021Notice Filed
Date: December 23, 2022Motion Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 23, 2022Exhibits List Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 24, 2021Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 06, 2020Declaration re:
Date: March 17, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 25, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 17, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Declaration re:
Date: September 28, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Points and Authorities Filed
Date: January 06, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: March 17, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 04, 2021Reply Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 09, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Response Filed to:
Date: June 02, 2021Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 09, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 16, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Notice of Lodging of Exhibits
Date: February 17, 2022Witness List Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Notice
Date: February 14, 2023Motion re:
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 |
Department S37 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Important Correspondence |
|
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Important correspondance undeliverable |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoenaed Records Received from: Mercury General Corporation (1 env) |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion in Limine 11 & 12 via turbocourt is returned by the court for the following reason: Duplicate filing |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: 08/09/23 minute order |
|
August 09, 2023 |
Department S15 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF INTENT TO PRESENT TESTIMONY OF DOUGLAS ROGER, M.D. VIA HIS DEPOSITION; DECLARATION OF COUNSEL - Trial Date 8/10/23 |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 TO LIMIT EVIDENCE OF PAST MEDICAL EXPENSES |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11 FOR ORDER EXCLUDING EVIDENCE OF REALTY LOST OPPORTUNITIES - Trail Date 8/10/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.