Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ruiz, Alexander, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Gary M. Schneider, against Loma Linda University Medical Center, Nabil Koudsi, M.D., San Antonio Regional Hospital, Steven Ernst, M.D., represented by Davis Grass Goldstein & Finlay, Kjar Mckenna & Stockalper Llp, Mcgirr, Bradley James, Prindle, Goetz, Barnes & Reinholtz, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph T Ortiz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2019 |
CategoryComplaint For Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: June 22, 2023Notice Filed
Date: July 18, 2023Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: July 18, 2023Notice Filed
Date: June 28, 2023Notice Filed
Date: July 10, 2023Answer Filed
Date: May 01, 2019Notice Filed
Date: June 28, 2023Declaration re:
Date: May 09, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 09, 2020Motion re:
Date: June 23, 2023Answer Filed
Date: April 22, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 12, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: May 09, 2019Application for Order Filed re:
Date: July 18, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 09, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 07, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 04, 2019Peremptory Challenge Under CCP 170.6 Filed
Date: May 09, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 09, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 09, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 11, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: March 12, 2019Answer Filed
Date: May 09, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: August 11, 2023Notice Filed
Date: July 14, 2023Order signed and filed.
Date: July 03, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: June 22, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 09, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 31, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 03, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: July 09, 2020Answer Filed
Date: May 09, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 03, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: July 24, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Declaration re:
Date: October 01, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Declaration re:
Date: December 06, 2021Declaration re:
Date: December 06, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 22, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 05, 2023Notice Filed
Date: February 05, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 04, 2020Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication
Date: October 01, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Declaration re:
Date: December 06, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: June 15, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 12, 2019Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Notice
Date: January 05, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 05, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: December 04, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 21, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 24, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 23, 2023Notice
Date: December 20, 2021Notice Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: December 15, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 10, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Summary Judgment Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 12, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: March 12, 2019Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 12, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 01, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 29, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: October 01, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: December 04, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 02, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant With prejudice filed on 8/29/23 by plaintiff Alexander Ruiz. |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: on Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement as to San Antonio Regional Hospital |
|
July 31, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
July 25, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant with prejudice |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Settlement, filed 7/18/23 |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application for Order Filed re: Good Faith Settlement filed by defendant San Antonio Regional Hospital, filed 7/18/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.