Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Juelch, Joyce, Juelch Sr, Norman, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Donadio, David R, against 3M Company, 84 Lumber Company, 84 Lumber Company, A Limited Partnership, All Asbestos Defendants, Allis-Chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust, (total of 35) See All represented by Bassi, Marte Joseph, Brown, Eugene, Bruni, Christophe B., Brydon, John R, Duffy, Joseph, (total of 22) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 20, 2009 |
CategoryAsbestos |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1213 days |
This complaint is a request for dismissal in a legal case. The plaintiff, Norman Juelch, Sr., et al., is requesting the dismissal of the action against the defendants, Asbestos Defendants (BP), et al. The dismissal is requested with prejudice, meanin...
MINUTES FOR APR-12-2010 3:30 PM FOR DEPT 604
Date: April 12, 2010REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 29892963)
Date: March 04, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: May 20, 2009DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 29739046) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.
Date: February 24, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29233990) FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.
Date: January 27, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 29198707) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Date: January 25, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29122882) FILED BY DEFENDANT SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.
Date: January 21, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29198707) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Date: January 25, 2010ORDER STIPULATION RE: RELEASE OF RECORDS
Date: July 06, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26047466) FILED BY DEFENDANT 3M COMPANY
Date: July 10, 2009DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 26646386) FILED BY DEFENDANT 84 LUMBER COMPANY
Date: August 18, 2009MINUTES FOR APR-13-2010 1:45 PM FOR DEPT 604
Date: April 13, 2010ORDER SUBSTITUTING SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST FOR DECEASED PLAINTIFF
Date: April 07, 2011DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 46141653)
Date: August 28, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2012 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
September 14, 2012 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-27-2012. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206) | |
August 30, 2012 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
August 28, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 46141653) | |
August 28, 2012 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-30-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-27-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. (503) | |
May 16, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 44300808) AS TO DEFENDANT OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC. | |
February 23, 2012 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
February 23, 2012 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-23-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-30-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503) | |
January 26, 2012 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JAN-26-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-23-2012 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR PENDING DISMISSAL TO BE ENTERED. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (503) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.