Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Breckler, Joann, Breckler, Rodrick, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by , Donadio, David R, against Actuant Corporation, Airgas-Northern California & Nevada, Inc., Air Products And Chemicals, Inc., All Asbestos Defendants, Allied Manufacturing Company, (total of 53) See All represented by Angstadt, Todd A, , Armstrong, William Henry, Ashley, Eugene, Bailey, Curtis R., (total of 26) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Teri L. Jackson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 12, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions29 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time2137 days |
This complaint is a notice of entry of an order granting leave to file a first amendment to the complaint. The plaintiffs, Rodrick Breckler and Joann Breckler, are represented by Brayton@Purcell LLP. The complaint is filed against asbestos defendants...
MINUTES FOR JUL-19-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 503
Date: July 19, 2011ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 28, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 40273525) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC SCIENTIFIC COMPANY
Date: October 11, 2011MINUTES FOR JUL-21-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 503
Date: July 21, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 38272977) FILED BY DEFENDANT R.E. CUDDIE CO.
Date: June 21, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 36898682) FILED BY DEFENDANT W.W. GRAINGER, INC.
Date: April 06, 2011ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PREFERENCE AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF
Date: March 30, 2011REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 32427139)FILED BY DEFT
Date: July 30, 2010NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 35296640)
Date: January 11, 2011ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: November 19, 2010ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT
Date: December 04, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29055610) FILED BY DEFENDANT W.L. LARSEN, INC.
Date: January 15, 2010DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 29325615) FILED BY DEFENDANT B.E.E INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC.
Date: February 01, 2010STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (TRANSACTION ID # 29590923)
Date: February 18, 2010REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY THE JACK DYMOND COMPANY (TRANSACTION ID # 28751346)
Date: December 31, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 40043779) FILED BY DEFENDANT W.W. GRAINGER, INC.
Date: September 27, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29325615) FILED BY DEFENDANT B.E.E INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC.
Date: February 01, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 29325615) FILED BY DEFENDANT B.E.E INDUSTRIAL SUPPLY, INC.
Date: February 01, 2010ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 28209354) FILED BY DEFENDANT S & S WELDING, INC.
Date: November 24, 2009DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 28209354) FILED BY DEFENDANT S & S WELDING, INC.
Date: November 24, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19460505) FILED BY DEFENDANT CSK AUTO, INC.
Date: April 17, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 19453670) FILED BY DEFENDANT W.W. GRAINGER, INC.
Date: April 17, 2008ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: November 30, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 34641479) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, INC.
Date: December 02, 2010GENERAL DENIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 27015559) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMERICAN PLUMBING AND HEATING SUPPLIES
Date: September 10, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27125456) FILED BY DEFENDANT SOUTH BAY ELECTRIC
Date: September 17, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27139436) FILED BY DEFENDANT MADCO WELDING SUPPLY CO., INC.
Date: September 17, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27803229) FILED BY DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.
Date: October 29, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26651062) FILED BY DEFENDANT SASCO
Date: August 18, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22716016) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.
Date: December 02, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21616709) FILED BY PLAINTIFF BRECKLER, RODRICK BRECKLER, JOANN
Date: September 19, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22958391) FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTBURNE SUPPLY INC.
Date: December 17, 2008ANSWER (TRANSACTION ID # 22918788) FILED BY DEFENDANT EATON ELECTRICAL INC.
Date: December 15, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22996235) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROCKWELL AUTOMATION, INC.
Date: December 19, 2008DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 22805031) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACTUANT CORPORATION
Date: December 08, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22724179) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROBERT BOSCH LLC
Date: December 02, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22805031) FILED BY DEFENDANT ACTUANT CORPORATION
Date: December 08, 2008DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 22716016) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.
Date: December 02, 2008PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 38037399) FILED BY DEFENDANT R.E. CUDDIE CO.
Date: June 08, 2011JURY FEES, TRAN # R0211613J002, TAG # 028664 (TRANSACTION ID # 38102326)
Date: June 13, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19412695) FILED BY DEFENDANT BRYAN STEAM LLC
Date: April 15, 2008NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 12, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27764544) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE SERVICE CORPORATION
Date: October 27, 2009ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: February 16, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27443882) FILED BY DEFENDANT R.E. CUDDIE CO.
Date: October 07, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23176120) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, INC.
Date: January 06, 2009CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 1/11/2011)
Date: February 07, 2011ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23120923) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC SCIENTIFIC COMPANY
Date: December 31, 2008ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27744298) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Date: October 26, 2009DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27744298) FILED BY DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Date: October 26, 2009ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: January 09, 2009DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54731259)
Date: December 18, 2013REMITTITUR REVERSED (A131070 DIV 4)
Date: July 11, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2014 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014. DISMISSAL FILED 12/18/13. (503) | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 54731259) | |
December 05, 2013 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-05-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: RVELUZ/EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503) | |
June 20, 2013 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
|
June 20, 2013 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE OF JUN-20-2013 AND SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON DEC-05-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION PER REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; COURT REPORTER: KIM RICHARDSON, CSR#5915 FROM AIKEN WELCH (510)451-1580 FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY. (206) | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (TRANSACTION ID # 49214792) FILED BY DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, INC. | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 49214792) AS TO DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, INC. | |
December 13, 2012 | Hearing |
DEPT 206 ASBESTOS TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE
Judge: TERI L. JACKSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.