Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nina Montoya, Oguntolu Olufemi, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Caldwell Susan L., against Montoya Nina C., Nina Montoya, Oguntolu Olufemi, represented by Bautista Joseph Issac, Seibert Shannon M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management161 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions590 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine DEFENDANT?S SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Objection PLAINTIFF?S JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORMS; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Other - Civil Deposit; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Undertaking; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Response to Objection to Proposed Order; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Order for Preliminary Injunction; Signed and Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Other - Civil Bond; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Order Decision on application for preliminary injunction: denied; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Exhibit List PLAINTIFF?S PROPOSED JOINT AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Opposition to MSJ; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Reply to opposition to request for preliminary injunction; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Answer to first amended Complaint; Filed by: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Declaration OF SHANNON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION; Filed by: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff); As to: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Other - Objections to proposed order; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Lodging re depos; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Reply Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for a New Trial; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Order on evidentiary hearing 402 EC; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Errata; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff); As to: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant); As to: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Response to Objection to Proposed Judgment on Special Verdict; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal NOA: B308369; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion re: (Motion to Compel Site Inspection); Filed by: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B308369; Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 21, 2021Amended Complaint (1st); Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff); As to: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Order granting mtn to compel and denying mtn re site inspection; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Order on mtn to strike/tax; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Order denying mtn for new trial and mtn jnov; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript B308369 NOA ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Request FOR CLARIFYING INSTRUCTION TO THE JURY; DECLARATION; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by:
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Jury Question re economic damages; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by:
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Declaration OF SHANNON SEIBERT IN SUPPORT OF MIL NO. 2; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Order denying mtn for reconsideration and denying ex parte re: contempt; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Declaration OF NINA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION; Filed by: Nina c. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Notice of errata of plaintiffs first amended complaint; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Jury Question re question 8; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging re trial; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Jury Question re question 4; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions - GIVEN; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Updated -- Motion for Sanctions: Filed By: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date:
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Order denying MSJ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Motion for Order Defendant's Motion for Nonsuit; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 21708.25
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Order denying mtn to stay; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Motion re: to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Second Amended) - Summary and Worksheet; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Appellant)
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for New Trial and JNOV; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Declaration Supp in Opp to Motion to Tax; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Judgment Following Jury Verdict At Trial; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Respondent)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Setting of Hearing) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Opposition to motion to strike and tax; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 18, 2021Order to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Appellant)
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 25, 2022Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Order on mtn to strike and tax costs; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal NOA: B308369; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Special Verdict after jury trial; Filed by:
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Opposition to Motion to Stay ENforcement; Filed by: Olufemi Oguntolu (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Other - - Other - Civil Deposit
Date: October 10, 2018Order - Order Decision on application for preliminary injunction: denied
Date: October 11, 2018Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause Re: Prelimiary Injunction)
Date: October 11, 2018Other - - Civil Bond
Date: October 12, 2018Order - Order for Preliminary Injunction
Date: October 12, 2018Other - - Other - Objections to proposed order
Date: October 18, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: October 18, 2018Notice - Notice of errata of plaintiffs first amended complaint
Date: October 19, 2018Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: October 19, 2018Response - Response to Objection to Proposed Order
Date: October 19, 2018Answer - Answer to first amended Complaint
Date: November 27, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: January 18, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 11, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: February 26, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 27, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: February 27, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference Matter is called for hearing. ...)
Date: February 27, 2019Separate Statement
Date: April 26, 2019Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: April 26, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF NINA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION
Date: May 13, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHANNON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION
Date: May 13, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 13, 2019Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION
Date: May 13, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: May 13, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 20, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 21, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 29, 2019Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION RE: (MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION)
Date: May 29, 2019Order - ORDER GRANTING MTN TO COMPEL AND DENYING MTN RE SITE INSPECTION
Date: June 05, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER
Date: August 02, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 02, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER OR CONTEMPT
Date: August 08, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 08, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: August 12, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER RE CONTEMPT
Date: August 22, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 23, 2019Separate Statement
Date: August 23, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 23, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (AMENDED)
Date: August 29, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA
Date: August 29, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 30, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ON CONTEMPT
Date: September 06, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS -...)
Date: September 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: September 11, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER) OF 09/11/2019
Date: September 11, 2019Order - ORDER DENYING MTN FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING EX PARTE RE: CONTEMPT
Date: September 11, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 26, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RE NTC ON MSJ AND CONTINUING MSJ
Date: September 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS RE NTC AND CONT OF MSJ; EX-PARTE PROCEED...)
Date: September 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS: (1) EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAI...)
Date: September 30, 2019Separate Statement
Date: October 17, 2019Motion for Sanctions
Date: October 17, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 24, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 28, 2019Separate Statement
Date: October 29, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 29, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: November 06, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 06, 2019Order - ORDER RULING RE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, ALTERNATIVELY, ADJUDICATION
Date: November 06, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE; HEARING ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS)
Date: November 08, 2019Order - ORDER RULING RE: PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY SANCTIONS AND/OR ISSUE SANCTIONS
Date: November 08, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 12, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION - RESERVATION ID #...)
Date: November 12, 2019Jury Instructions
Date: November 25, 2019Witness List
Date: November 25, 2019Exhibit List
Date: November 25, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 25, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 – TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OUSTER PRIOR TO JULY 2018
Date: November 25, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 – TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF HEALTH INFORMATION
Date: November 25, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 3.57 RE: MEET AND CONFER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: November 26, 2019Order Plaintiff?s Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions and/or Issue Sanctions; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Nina C. Montoya (Defendant)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO STRIKE RULING...)
Date: November 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS - CONT'D FROM 1...)
Date: December 04, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 04, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF ACE LEGAL RE: E-FILING OF MOTION TO SEVER-RE-SUBMISSION
Date: December 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS CONTINUED FROM 11/27/19; FINAL STATUS CO...)
Date: December 11, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 03, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: January 06, 2020Witness List
Date: January 21, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHANNON SEIBERT IN SUPPORT OF MIL NO. 2
Date: January 21, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHANNON SEIBERT IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENT TO MIL NO. 1
Date: January 21, 2020Exhibit List
Date: January 21, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 21, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: January 21, 2020Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION RE COPY OF PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT
Date: January 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: January 27, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: January 27, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 28, 2020Request - REQUEST FOR CLARIFYING INSTRUCTION TO THE JURY; DECLARATION
Date: January 29, 2020Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR NONSUIT
Date: January 29, 2020Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT’S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE COMMON LAW OUSTER ELEMENTS
Date: January 30, 2020Jury Instructions
Date: January 30, 2020Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: February 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: January 31, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: March 16, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: March 18, 2020Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) AMENDED
Date: March 16, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 02, 2020Motion to Tax Costs
Date: April 02, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 02, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 21, 2020Judgment - JUDGMENT FOLLOWING JURY VERDICT AT TRIAL
Date: May 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 01, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 01, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND JNOV
Date: June 15, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING OF HEARING)
Date: June 17, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 18, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 18, 2020Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: June 18, 2020Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL
Date: June 19, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX
Date: June 30, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 30, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 01, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: July 01, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: PAGE LIMITS
Date: July 01, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: July 01, 2020Reply - REPLY TO OPP TO PLTFS 2ND AMD MEMORANDUM OF COSTS; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 12, 2021Order - ORDER ON MTN TO STRIKE AND TAX COSTS
Date: March 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: March 22, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX COSTS
Date: April 22, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/23/2021
Date: April 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 23, 2021Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal
Date: October 18, 2021Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED B308369
Date: December 21, 2021Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 25, 2022Order
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Prelimiary Injunction))
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Order (Decision on application for preliminary injunction: denied)
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Other - (Civil Deposit)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Order (for Preliminary Injunction)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Reply (to opposition to request for preliminary injunction)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice (of errata of plaintiffs first amended complaint)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Of First Amended Complaint and Notice of Errata)
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Other - (Objections to proposed order)
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Answer (to first amended Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Other - (Civil Bond)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Response (to Objection to Proposed Order)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference Matter is called for hearing. ...))
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF NINA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Declaration (OF SHANNON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Motion re: (MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION)
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion re: (Motion to Compel Site Inspection))
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Hear...))
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Shannon Seibert in Support of Motion re: (Motion to Compel Site Inspection))
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Compel Site Inspection))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MSJ
Date: October 23, 2019Order - ORDER DENYING MSJ
Date: November 27, 2019Notice ( of Entry of Order)
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER OR CONTEMPT)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Application for Order to Compel Defendant's Complian...))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Order (granting mtn to compel and denying mtn re site inspection)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Shannon Seibert in Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Ex Parte Appearance)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order for An Order on Con...))
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for an Order re Contempt)
Date: 2019-08-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment ((AMENDED))
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Notice (of Errata)
Date: 2019-08-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Opposition ( TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ON CONTEMPT)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration; Ex-Parte Proceedings -...))
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 09/11/2019)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Order (denying mtn for reconsideration and denying ex parte re: contempt)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Order (on evidentiary hearing 402 EC)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Plaintiffs Lodging Of Exhibit Pre-Numbered As Exhibit 208-2 Video Of Front Yard)
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (Plaintiff's Lodging of Video Deposition of Defendant Nina Montoya)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFF?S JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORMS)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Minute Order ((JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Request (FOR CLARIFYING INSTRUCTION TO THE JURY; DECLARATION)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFF'S OBEJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED VERDICT FORM 1 (OUSTER))
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Motion for Order (Defendant's Motion for Nonsuit)
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Brief (Defendant's Supplemental Brief re Common Law Ouster Elements)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR NONSUIT)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Brief (DEFENDANT?S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE COMMON LAW OUSTER ELEMENTS)
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Jury Instructions (- GIVEN)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Jury Question (re economic damages)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Jury Question (re question 8)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Jury Question (re question 4)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) (Amended)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-03-18T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Hearing)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Judgment (Following Jury Verdict At Trial)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/01/2020)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Shannon Seibert in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike and Tax Costs)
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Response (to Objection to Proposed Judgment on Special Verdict)
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Notice (Defendant's Notice of Intention to Move for a New Trial)
Date: 2020-05-22T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment After Trial)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Notice (of Re-Service of Memorandum of Costs - Summary & Worksheet)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Memorandum (Amended Memorandum of Costs - Summary & Worksheet - Re-Served)
Date: 2020-05-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Shannon Seibert in Support of Defendant's Motion for a New Trial)
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Pltfs Opposition to Motion for New Trial/JNOV)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for New Trial and JNOV)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Setting of Hearing) of 06/17/2020)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Declaration ((AMENDED) to Plaintiff's Joint Opposition to Defendant's Motion for New Trial/JNOV)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Objection (by Plaintiff to Evidence in Support of Defenant's Motion for New Trial/JNOV)
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Setting of Hearing))
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Request (to Increase Page Limits and Timing for Opposition to Motion for New Trial and JNOV)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for a New Trial)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Coordinate Hearings on Pos...))
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Increase Page Limit for JOINT Opposition to Motion for New Trial/JNOV)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Coordinate Hearings on Post-Trial Motions for July 13, 2020)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2020-06-29T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Tax/Strike Costs Post Trial)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Reply (Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict)
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Opposition (to motion to strike and tax)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Increase Page Limit))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Ex Parte for Reconsideration Re: Page Limits)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Increase Page Limits)
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence in Support of Pltf's Opp to Def's Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence in Support of Pltf's Opp to Def's Motion for JNOV)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for Reconsideration of Page Limits to opp to JNOV/New Trial due to Mistake)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration of Page L...))
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Compendium of Evidence in Support of Pltf's Opp to Def's JNOV)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Order (denying mtn for new trial and mtn jnov)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for New Trial; Hearing on Motion for Judgme...))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Opposition ((Amended) to Motion to Tax Amended Memorandum of Costs)
Date: 2020-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Declaration (of Susan Caldwell in Support of Amended Opposition to Motion to Tax)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Order (on mtn to strike/tax)
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs))
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Appellate Order Reinstating Appeal (NOA: 10/13/20 B308369)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Stay ENforcement)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Untimely Declaration of Shannon Seibert Seeking to Tax Additional Costs)
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Appeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid
Date: 2020-10-27T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's Late-Filed Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Declaration (Supp in Opp to Motion to Tax)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Objection (DEFENDANT?S OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATIONS OF SUSAN L. CALDWELL FILED ON OCTOBER 19, 2020)
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Motion re: (to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Susan Caldwell in Support of Opposition to Motion to Stay Enforcement)
Date: 2020-11-23T00:00:00Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST PLAINTIFF’S PROPOSED JOINT AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST
Date: January 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: January 23, 2020Order - ORDER ON EVIDENTIARY HEARING 402 EC
Date: January 24, 2020Trial Brief
Date: January 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: January 24, 2020Exhibit List
Date: January 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: January 28, 2020Jury Instructions
Date: January 29, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: January 29, 2020Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF’S JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORMS
Date: January 29, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR NONSUIT
Date: January 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: January 30, 2020Brief - BRIEF DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF RE COMMON LAW OUSTER ELEMENTS
Date: January 30, 2020Special Verdict - SPECIAL VERDICT AFTER JURY TRIAL
Date: January 31, 2020Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING RE TRIAL
Date: January 31, 2020Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING RE DEPOS
Date: January 31, 2020Jury Question - JURY QUESTION RE QUESTION 4
Date: January 31, 2020Jury Question - JURY QUESTION RE ECONOMIC DAMAGES
Date: January 31, 2020Jury Question - JURY QUESTION RE QUESTION 8
Date: January 31, 2020Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS - GIVEN
Date: January 31, 2020Response - RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT ON SPECIAL VERDICT
Date: May 05, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RE-SERVICE OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS - SUMMARY & WORKSHEET
Date: May 07, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL
Date: May 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR A NEW TRIAL
Date: May 22, 2020Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: May 26, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 27, 2020Motion to Tax Costs
Date: May 27, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 27, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: June 01, 2020Motion for New Trial
Date: June 01, 2020Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: June 01, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 22, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: June 26, 2020Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: June 29, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 06, 2020Order - ORDER DENYING MTN FOR NEW TRIAL AND MTN JNOV
Date: July 13, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION (AMENDED) TO MOTION TO TAX AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF COSTS
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF SUSAN CALDWELL IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX
Date: September 21, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 24, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TAX COSTS)
Date: October 01, 2020Order - ORDER ON MTN TO STRIKE/TAX
Date: October 01, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: October 02, 2020Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: October 13, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION SUPP IN OPP TO MOTION TO TAX
Date: October 19, 2020Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: October 16, 2020Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: October 23, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL
Date: October 28, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 28, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 28, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: November 03, 2020Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: November 10, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT
Date: November 23, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 30, 2020Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION TO STAY ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL
Date: November 30, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: December 01, 2020Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL NOA: 10/13/20 B308369
Date: December 09, 2020Order - ORDER DENYING MTN TO STAY
Date: January 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: February 04, 2021Memorandum - MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SECOND AMENDED) - SUMMARY AND WORKSHEET
Date: February 26, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 05, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Her Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal)
Date: 2020-11-30T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal (NOA: 10/13/20 B308369)
Date: 2020-12-09T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFF?S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT NINA MONTOYA?S NOTICE OF APPEAL; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT)
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs; Hearing on Motion - Other Mot...))
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/04/2021)
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (B308369 NOA 10/13/2020)
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgm...))
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Order (denying mtn to stay)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Memorandum (of Costs (Second Amended) - Summary and Worksheet)
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Opposition ( to MSJ)
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings re ntc and cont of MSJ; Ex-Parte Proceed...))
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS: (1) EX PARTE APPLICATION BY PLAI...))
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Notice ( OF ERRATA RE: SUBMISSION OF AMENDED OPPOSITION)
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Defendant?s Motion for Summary Judgement, Alternatively, Adjudication)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment) of 11/06/2019)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Bifurcate; Hearing on Motion for Sanctions))
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Plaintiff?s Motion for Evidentiary Sanctions and/or Issue Sanctions)
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Reservation ID #...))
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 1 ? TO EXCLUDE YARD VALUATION EXPERT AND INTERNET PRINTOUTS REGARDING VALUATION)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 6 ? TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF HEALTH INFORMATION)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE DAMAGES RESULTING FROM DEFENDANT?S COMPLIANCE WITH A COURT ORDER)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 2 ? TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY REGARDING PROPERTY DAMAGE)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 5 ? TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OUSTER PRIOR TO JULY 2018)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE INVOICES PURPORTING TO EVIDENCE PROPERTY DAMAGE)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Declaration (Pursuant to 3.57 Re: Meet and Confer on Motions in Limine)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 to Exclude Evidence of Tentive Ruling and Pre-Judgment Reasoning)
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON MOTION TO STRIKE RULING...))
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Shorten Time For Motion To Strike Defendants Untimeley Expert Designation)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Order (denying MSJ)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine (NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE DAMAGES RESULTING FROM DEFENDANT?S COMPLIANCE WITH A COURT ORDER)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Ex-Parte Proceedings - cont'd from 1...))
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Ace Legal re: E-Filing of Motion to Sever-Re-Submission)
Date: 2019-12-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings Continued from 11/27/19; Final Status Co...))
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/06/2020)
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (DEFENDANT?S SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (OF SHANNON SEIBERT IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENT TO MIL NO. 1)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Opposition (DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Declaration (OF SHANNON SEIBERT IN SUPPORT OF MIL NO. 2)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PLAINTIFF?S [PROPOSED] AMENDED JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (re Copy Of Plaintiffs Deposition Transcript)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Statement of the Case (PLAINTIFF?S PROPOSED STATEMENT OF THE CASE TO BE READ TO THE JURY)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Exhibit List (PLAINTIFF?S PROPOSED JOINT AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PLAINTIFF?S PROPOSED JOINT CACI JURY INSTRUCTIONS & VERDICTS)
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PLAINTIFF?S [PROPOSED] 2nd AMENDED JOINT JURY INSTRUCTIONS)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial Ex-Parte Application re expert designations (CONT'...))
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS))
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (re trial)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (re depos)
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-06-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.