Case Last Refreshed: 21 hours ago
635 Gravois Road Leasing Llc, 635 Gravois Road Real Estate Llc, Milton 635 Gravois Road Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Lemay, Robert, against Rbr Real Estate Holdings, Llc, Trt Holdings, Inc., Zeitsiff, Adam, Zelman, Brian, represented by Strader, Elliot, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 44th District Court with FRAZIER, VERETTA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFRAZIER, VERETTA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House44th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Milton 635 Gravois Road LLC and 635 Gravois Estate, (collectively "Plaintiffs"), sue TRT Holdings, RBR Real Estate Holdings, LLC, and Richard Zelman, (collectively "Defendants"), for statutory fraud in a real estate transaction, fraudulent inducement...
DISCOVERY
Date: September 21, 2023MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 15, 2023RESPONSE
Date: September 19, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2023RESPONSE
Date: September 13, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 12, 2023MOTION - STRIKE
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 08, 2023DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT
Date: August 10, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 16, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 25, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: August 16, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: August 09, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 08, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 04, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 10, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 14, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 21, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 12, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 05, 2023MOTION - ENTER ORDER
Date: July 03, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 16, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 26, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: March 24, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 18, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: March 24, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: March 24, 2023RESPONSE
Date: March 21, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: March 16, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: March 08, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: March 20, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: November 30, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: March 02, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 03, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: March 02, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 03, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: February 15, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 03, 2023Motion - Leave
Date: October 21, 2022OBJECTION
Date: February 15, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 29, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 28, 2022ORDER - LEAVE
Date: October 21, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 24, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 04, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 18, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 02, 2021RESPONSE
Date: November 04, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 28, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 24, 2021ORDER - SETTING SCHEDULING CONF
Date: October 11, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2021ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 31, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2021ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 24, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: August 25, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: August 17, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 14, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 17, 2023OBJECTION
Date: June 15, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 10, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 28, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: December 30, 2022ORDER - DENY
Date: December 15, 2022JURY DEMAND
Date: December 14, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: December 11, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: November 04, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: November 04, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 19, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 16, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 08, 2023Motion - Continuance
Date: December 02, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 28, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: March 01, 2023DISCOVERY
Date: February 25, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 05, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: February 08, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 01, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 04, 2022RESPONSE
Date: September 13, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 18, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 20, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2023MOTION - PROTECT
Date: May 15, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: March 27, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: January 27, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2023ORDER - DENY
Date: December 30, 2022AMENDED PETITION
Date: May 13, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: January 17, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 02, 2021COUNTER CLAIM
Date: April 18, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 12, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 28, 2023MOTION - COMPEL
Date: July 19, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: July 05, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: December 08, 2022ORDER - MISC.
Date: January 18, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 01, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 04, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 29, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: September 22, 2023ORDER - DENY
Date: September 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 25, 2023AMENDED CROSS-CLAIM - AMENDED COUNTER-PETITION
Date: September 22, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: September 22, 2023AMENDED PETITION
Date: September 22, 2023Motion - Compel
Date: September 22, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 15, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: November 07, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 08, 2022CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: November 04, 2022MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: October 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: October 27, 2022RESPONSE
Date: October 18, 2022RESPONSE
Date: October 28, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 24, 2022DISCOVERY
Date: December 02, 2021RESPONSE
Date: October 27, 2022AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 14, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: May 20, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 28, 2022MOTION - LEAVE
Date: September 27, 2022ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 17, 2022RESPONSE
Date: May 13, 2022RESPONSE
Date: May 17, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 18, 2022Plea in Abatement
Date: November 11, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2021MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 11, 2022ORDER - MISC.
Date: January 10, 2022RESPONSE
Date: November 17, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: November 05, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: November 04, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 02, 2021RESPONSE
Date: October 25, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 25, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: October 25, 2023OBJECTION
Date: October 20, 2023ORDER - DENY
Date: October 12, 2023Motion - Leave
Date: October 12, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 02, 2023MOTION - LEAVE
Date: September 29, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: November 15, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: November 14, 2023RESPONSE
Date: November 06, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: November 01, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: November 01, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: November 01, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 30, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: November 01, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: October 27, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: October 27, 2023OBJECTION
Date: October 26, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: October 26, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 25, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: October 25, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 25, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 25, 2023OBJECTION
Date: October 25, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 07, 2023OBJECTION
Date: October 25, 2023OBJECTION
Date: October 16, 2023ORDER - MISC.
Date: November 06, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 20, 2023OBJECTION
Date: October 16, 2023BRIEF FILED
Date: November 06, 2023ORDER - COMPEL
Date: October 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2023ORDER - DENY
Date: October 05, 2023MOTION - NEW TRIAL
Date: March 14, 2024RESPONSE
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: November 02, 2023OBJECTION
Date: November 01, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: November 01, 2023OBJECTION
Date: October 31, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 26, 2023RULE 166
Date: October 25, 2023RULE 166
Date: October 25, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: October 25, 2023OBJECTION
Date: October 25, 2023OBJECTION
Date: October 16, 2023RESPONSE
Date: October 09, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 02, 2023WAIVER
Date: September 29, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: February 09, 2024RESPONSE
Date: February 09, 2024MOTION HEARING
Date: February 01, 2024RESPONSE
Date: February 05, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 06, 2024RESPONSE
Date: February 06, 2024RESPONSE
Date: February 08, 2024CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 28, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 09, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 16, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 17, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 11, 2024MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: January 11, 2024NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 08, 2024MOTION - ATTORNEY FEES
Date: January 08, 2024CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 05, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: November 16, 2023STRIKE SHEET
Date: November 16, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 16, 2023COUNTER CLAIM
Date: March 14, 2024MOTION HEARING
Date: February 09, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT APPENDIX TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL MOTION - NEW TRIAL |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL COUNTER CLAIM |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
E-SERVED COPY OF ORDER FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER TO DISREGARD JURY FINDINGS AND FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT MOTION HEARING P/M/DISREGARD JURY FINDING & D/M/ATTORNEY FEES - SET BY ABBY 214-500-6423 - 30M - IN PERSON - C.C REQ |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS'S FEES AND JUDGMENT RESPONSE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS'S FEES AND JUDGMENT |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND FINAL JUDGMENT MOTION HEARING M/ATTORNEY FEES - SET BY ABBY 214-500-6423 - 30M - IN PERSON - C.C REQ |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISREGARD JURY FINDINGS AND FOR JUDGMENT NOTWITHSTANDING THE VERDICT |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISREGARD JURY FINDINGS RESPONSE TO DEEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISREGARD JURY FINDINGS |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS CC REC'D FOR 2/9 HEARING MOTION TO DISREGARD JURY FINDINGS NOTEBOOK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.